Michael B. Mitchell
Bankruptcy Case Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-55043
District Judge MARILYN SHEA-STONUM, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jennifer M. Mitchell, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel F Gigiano +1 330 336 3330 +1 330 336 3331 dgigiano@msn.com
No Logo Michael B. Mitchell, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel F Gigiano +1 330 336 3330 +1 330 336 3331 dgigiano@msn.com
No Logo Keith Rucinski, Trustee
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Transfer of Claim other than for Security w/BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 20 ) Service Date 01/28/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/29/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
    Notice of Transfer of Claim other than for Security w/BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 19 ) Service Date 01/28/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/29/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
      Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Claim No. 8) To CR Evergreen, LLC Filed by Creditor CR Evergreen, LLC. (Tran, Linh aty) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
        Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Claim No. 9) To CR Evergreen, LLC Filed by Creditor CR Evergreen, LLC. (Tran, Linh aty) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
          Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Service Date 01/20/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/17/2011, Entered: None
            Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (ADIdktclrk) (Entered: 01/17/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
              Trustee's Interim Report. (mjones, Keith Rucinski tr) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                Meeting of Creditors Held Filed by Keith Rucinski (RE: related document(s) 13 Meeting of Creditors Continued) (jneunz, Keith L Rucinski tr) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                  Chapter 13 Trustee Report on Business Case The Trustee is in agreement with the petition as filed. Filed by Keith Rucinski (neverly, Keith Rucinski tr) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                    Meeting of Creditors Continued Filed by Keith Rucinski 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/9/2010 at 08:30 AM at PNC Center. (jneunz, Keith L Rucinski tr) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                      Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 11 ) Service Date 11/12/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/13/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                        Order for debtor to pay trustee $449.00 monthly Signed on 11/10/2010 . (meldr crt) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                          Notice of Chapter 13 Plan w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 2 ) Service Date 11/03/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                            Notice of Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13 w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 8 ) Service Date 11/03/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                              Meeting of Creditors Filed by Keith Rucinski 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/2/2010 at 10:30 AM at PNC Center. Proofs of Claims due by 3/2/2011. Last day to Object to Confirmation 1/7/2011.Confirmation Hearing scheduled for 1/13/2011 at 01:30 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (aroyer, Keith L Rucinski tr) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (meldr) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                  Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Jennifer M. Mitchell. (Gigiano, Daniel aty) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                    Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Michael B. Mitchell. (Gigiano, Daniel aty) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                      Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Jennifer M. Mitchell, Michael B. Mitchell. (Gigiano, Daniel aty) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                        Rights and Responsibilities of Chapter 13 Debtors and their Attorneys Filed by Jennifer M. Mitchell, Michael B. Mitchell. (Gigiano, Daniel aty) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                          Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Jennifer M. Mitchell, Michael B. Mitchell. (Gigiano, Daniel aty) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                            Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $274 Filed by Michael B. Mitchell, Jennifer M. Mitchell (Gigiano, Daniel aty) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?