Raiser v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00189
District Judge Algenon L. Marbley, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 12:25 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aaron Raiser, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Raiser +1 818 581 4818
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kegler Brown Hill & Ritter Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Walter Hill +1 614 462 5400 +4625 462 462 5403 thill@keglerbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J Weber +1 614 462 5400 cweber@keglerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirton & Mcconkie, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Willis Orton +1 801 328 3600 worton@kmclaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn T. Richards +1 801 328 3600 srichards@kmclaw.com
No Logo Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo LDS Family Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kegler Brown Hill & Ritter Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Walter Hill +1 614 462 5400 +4625 462 462 5403 thill@keglerbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J Weber +1 614 462 5400 cweber@keglerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirton & Mcconkie, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Willis Orton +1 801 328 3600 worton@kmclaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn T. Richards +1 801 328 3600 srichards@kmclaw.com
No Logo LDS Social Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kegler Brown Hill & Ritter Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Walter Hill +1 614 462 5400 +4625 462 462 5403 thill@keglerbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J Weber +1 614 462 5400 cweber@keglerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirton & Mcconkie, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Willis Orton +1 801 328 3600 worton@kmclaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn T. Richards +1 801 328 3600 srichards@kmclaw.com
No Logo Police Officers Does 1-10, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
Notice from Supreme Court of the United States. The petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. (pes1) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
    Notice from Supreme Court of the United States: The petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on April 8, 2013 and placed on the docket on April 12, 2013 as case number 12-9725. (kk2) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
      MANDATE of USCA as to 53 Notice of Appeal filed by Aaron Raiser. Pursuant to the court's disposition that was filed 08/07/2012 the mandante for this case hereby issues today. (sr1) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
        ORDER of USCA as to 53 Notice of Appeal filed by Aaron Raiser. The district court's judgment is affirmed. (sr1) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
          ORDER of USCA as to 55 Notice of Appeal filed by Aaron Raiser - Appeal 11-3228 is Dismissed as a duplicate appeal of 11-3227. (jcw1) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 52 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; finding as moot 54 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; finding as moot 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File a notice of appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/1/11. (jr1) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (rew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appeal the previous notice of appeal did not show up on Pacer this one is submitted in the event there is some technical issue with the other one it can be ignored if the other ones are accepted by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (rew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 51 Clerk's Judgment, 50 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (rew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (rew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 51 Clerk's Judgment, 25 Order on Motion to Continue, 42 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 12 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 49 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 16 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 39 Memorandum & Opinion, Terminate Motions,, 48 Order on Motion for Recusal, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 3 Order on Motion to Seal Document, 50 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (rew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (rew) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Opinion and Order signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/28/2011. (cw) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 10 Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/28/2011. (cw) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER denying 47 Motion for Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/28/2011. (cw) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER denying 46 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 1/19/11. (jcw1) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Oral Argument by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (jcw1) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Recusal by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (jcw1) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                      PLAINTIFF's REPLY: Objections to Magistrate Ruling by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (jcw1) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
                                        Response re 43 Objection (non motion) Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Objection by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service. (Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                          Objection to re 39 Opinion & Order by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (rew) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is GRANTED until December 17, 2010 to file objections to or seek reconsideration of the Opinion and Order of November 16, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/10/10. (rew) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                              Objection to Magistrate Ruling Declartion re 39 Opinion and Order by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (rew) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to file objections to 39 Opinion and Order by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (rew) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's 17 MOTION for Discovery is DENIED. Plaintiff's 22 MOTION to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. Plaintiff may amend his complaint to clarify that he intends to assert a claim of intentional infliction of emotional distress. In all other respects, Plaintiff's request for leave to amend the complaint to assert additional claims is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 11/16/2010. (er1) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION, 36 MOTION to Strike and Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, LDS Family Services. (Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for a Jury Trial Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (rew) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Response in Opposition to 33 MOTION to Strike by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (rew) Modified on 10/27/2010 to correct text (jr1). (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY to 32 Response to 29 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. See Document 34 for document. Doc 35 created to correct event. (kjm1) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                            REPLY in Support of 29 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (kjm1) Modified on 10/19/2010 to correct event (kjm1). (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to Strike 28 MOTION for Jury Trial by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service. (Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 08/25/2010 Letter, # 2 Exhibit B - 09/18/2008 Order and Judgment, # 3 Exhibit C - 06/01/2009 Letter) (Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to 27 Response to 22 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proof of Service) (er1) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of 29 Rule 11 Filing; NOTICE of Pending Utah Action Related to the Rule 11 Motion filed by Aaron Raiser. (er1) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Rule 11 MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service) (er1) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Jury Trial by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (er1) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service. (Weber, Christopher) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION for Discovery filed by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (rew) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER denying 23 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 08/31/2010. (cw) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Continue filed by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service. (Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Continuance Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (rew) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Amend Complaint Memorandum of Point and Authorities by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (rew) Modified on 8/16/2010 (rew). (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION for Discovery filed by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of R. Willis Orton) (Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment ---DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CORRECTED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendants LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Edward N. Raiser) (Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (er1) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition to 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment & 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C) (er1) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Discovery by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (er1) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 14 Motion to Amend. Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to July 22, 2010, and defendants deadline for filing their Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to August 2, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 7/14/10. (rew) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (rew) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 01/15/2008 Utah Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Paul D. Rytting, # 3 Exhibit C - Edward Raiser Deposition Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit D - 09/23/2004 Utah Complaint, # 5 Exhibit E - 02/07/2006 Utah Order and Decision) (Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Filing Corrected Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 11 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of R. Willis Orton & Shawn T. Richards on the condition that counselors register for ECF with this Court or seek leave from doing so within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 6/21/2010. (er1) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of R. Willis Orton and Shawn T. Richards (Filing fee $ 400) by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing for R. Willis Orton, # 2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing for Shawn T. Richards, # 3 Text of Proposed Order to Admit Pro Hac Vice) (Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service. Responses due by 7/12/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2008 Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Paul D. Rytting, # 3 Exhibit C - Edward Raiser Deposition Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit D - 2004 Complaint, # 5 Exhibit E - 2006 Order and Memorandum Decision) (Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ANSWER to 5 Complaint filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service. (Hill, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER finding as moot 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 06/01/2010. (cw) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints. (see docket entry 6 for pleading). (rew) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service. (rew) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/27/2010) (rew). (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT, filed by Aaron Raiser against Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, Does 1-10, LDS Family Services, LDS Social Service. (rew) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        civil cover sheet. (rew) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 2 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 03/02/2010. (sr) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Declaration to Proceed In forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. ( Declaration manually filed in clerks office) (rew) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Aaron Raiser. (Attachments: # 1 civil cover sheet, # 2 Complaint, # 3 summons) (rew) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?