D.N. v. United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:09-cv-06180
District Judge Ann L. Aiken, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SCI Mahanoy, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "D.N."

Toggle Switch Represented by hlr-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher D Hatfield +1 541 317 5505 +1 541 317 5507 cdhatfield@hlr-law.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexis V. Andrews +1 202 307 6432 +1 202 307 0054 alexis.v.andrews@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
Copy of Time Schedule Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit re Notice of Appeal 27 . (cp) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
    Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit from Judgment 26 . Filing fee in amount of $455 collected; Receipt No. 600005086 issued. Filed by D.N. (cp) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
      LREF
      Blank 26 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
      Judgment: This action is dismissed. Signed December 9, 2009 by Deputy Clerk, Leslie Engdall. (cp) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 3 is Granted, Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 18 is Denied and this case is dismissed. Signed on December 8, 2009 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cp) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
          Redaction Complaint Recovery of Federal Income Tax and Interest Action (Redacted Version) by D.N.. Filed by D.N.. (Hatfield, Christopher) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Original Complaint and Motion to Allow Filing of Redacted Version 22 . Ordered Clerk to redact Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order 2 and text of docket entries to delete plaintiff's name and insert plaintiffs initials. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lae) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: None
              Motion to Seal Original Complaint and Motion to Allow Filing of Redacted Version for Public Record. Filed by D.N. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal Original Complaint and Motion to Allow Filing of Redacted Version for Public Record, # 2 Attachment Order) (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23)(cp). (Entered: 11/11/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: None
                Reply in Support of Plaintiff D.N.'s Motion for Summary Judgment to Motion for Summary Judgment 18 . Filed by D.N. (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23)(cp). (Entered: 11/11/2009)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                  Reply and Response to Motion for Summary Judgment 18 , Motion to Dismiss 3 . Filed by United States of America. (Andrews, Alexis) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                    Concise Statement re Motion for Summary Judgment 18 . Filed by D.N. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Affidavit of Daniel Ousley, # 2 Attachment Affidavit of Plaintiff's Counsel (Chris Hatfield)) (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23)(cp). (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                      Motion for Summary Judgment. Oral Argument requested. Filed by D.N. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Memorandum in Opposition to United States' Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of D.N.'s Motion for Summary Judgment) (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23) (cp). (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                        Response to United States' Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment to Motion to Dismiss 3 Oral Argument requested. Filed by D.N. (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23)(cp). (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Motions to Seal Original Complaint and Motion to Allow Filing Redacted Version for Public Record 14 , as well as the supporting memorandum and orders and amended complaint. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lae) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                            Proposed Proposed Form of Order Submitted. Filed by D.N. (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23)(cp). (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                              Motion to Strike both Motions to Seal Original Complaint and Motion to Allow Filing Redacted Version for Public Record. Filed by D.N. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Both Motions to Seal Original Complaint and Motions to Allow Filing Redacted Version for Public Record) (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23)(cp). (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 10 . Response is due by 10/13/2009. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 3 is taken under advisement as of 11/2/2009. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (lae) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                  Motion for Order Motion - Miscellaneous 10 . Filed by D. N. (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23)(cp). (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                    Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Filed by D. N. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous 10 .) (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23)(cp). (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                      Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Filed by D.N. (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23) (cp). (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                        STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER 16 - Motion for Order Motion - Miscellaneous 7 . Filed by D. N. (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 10/9/2009 to strike (lae). Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23)(cp). (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                          STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER 16 - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal Original Complaint and Motion to Allow Filing of Redacted Version for Public Record. Filed by D. N. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous 7 .) (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 10/9/2009 to strike (lae). Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23)(cp). (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                            STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER 16 - Motion to Seal Original Complaint and Motion to Allow Filing of Redacted Version for Public Record. Filed by D. N. (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 10/9/2009 to strike (lae). Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23)(cp). (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                              STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER 16 - Motion To Seal Original Complaint and Motion to Allow Filing of Redacted Version for Public Record. Filed by D.N. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Order) (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 10/9/2009 to strike (lae). Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23) (cp). (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER 16 Amended Complaint Redacted Version.Filed by D.N. against United States of America. (Hatfield, Christopher) Modified on 10/9/2009 to strike(lae). Modified on 11/17/2009 (See Order 23) (cp). (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by United States of America. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss 3 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B) (Andrews, Alexis) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                    Motion to Dismiss. Filed by United States of America. (Andrews, Alexis) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. Discovery is to be completed by 10/24/2009. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/24/2009. Pretrial Order is due by 11/24/2009. Ordered by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2009: # 1 REDACTED - Discovery Order) (cp). (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 99 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?