SCHREIBER v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:05-cv-02616

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 11:54 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (225) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFFS. ALL COUNTS OF PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ALL COUNTERCLAIMS OR CROSS CLAIMS BY LILLY AGAINST PENN ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. EACH PARTY SHALL BEAR ITS OWN COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 12/23/2008. 12/24/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
    Joint Stipulation requesting the Court entered Judgment and Dismissal with prejudice filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC and ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (mbh, ) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
      STIPULATION and proposed Judgment and Dismissal with Prejudice by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC, ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
        ORDER THAT THE PARTIES SHALL ADVISE THIS COURT IN WRITING OF THE STATUS OF THEIR SETTLEMENT EFFORTS NO LATER THAN 12/22/2008. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 12/17/2008. 12/19/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
          ORDER THAT ALL DISCOVERY IN THIS MATTER SHALL BE STAYED UNTIL 12/15/08. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 12/2/08. ) 12/3/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) Modified on 12/3/2008 (gn, ). (Entered: 12/03/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
            ORDER THAT ALL DISCOVERY IN THIS MATTER SHALL BE STAYED UNTIL 12/1/2008. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 11/15/2008. 11/17/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
              ORDER THAT ALL DISCOVERY IN THIS MATTER SHALL BE STAYED UNTIL 11/17/2008. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 11/3/2008. 11/3/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                SEVENTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL DISCOVERY IN THIS MATTER IS STAYED UNTIL 10/31/2008. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 10/20/2008. 10/22/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None
                  Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Further Support of their Motion for an In Camera review of Eli Lilly and Company's Withheld Communications Relating to James Sales. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, ) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None
                    ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS ALLEN SCHREIBER AND ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR AN IN CAMERA REVIEW OF ELI LILL6 AND COMPANY'S WITHHELD COMMUNICATIONS RELATING TO JAMES SALES IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 9/30/2008. 10/2/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None
                      PLAINTIFFS ALAN SCHREIBER AND ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR AN IN CAMERA REVIEW OF ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S WITHHELD COMMUNICATIONS RELATING TO JAMES SALES. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 9/29/2008 TO FILE A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY AND ACCOMPANYING PROPOSED REPLY TO DEFENDANT LILLY'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN IN CAMERA REVIEW OF DEFENDANT LILLY'S WITHHELD COMMUNICATIONS RELATING TO JAMES SALES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 9/20/2008. 9/24/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                          Declaration of James J. Sales. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                            Declaration of L. Scott Burwell in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs Dr. Alan Schreiber and Zabecor Pharmaceutical Company, LLC's Motion for an In Camera Review of Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Withheld Communications Relating to James Sales. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                              Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs Dr. Alan Schreiber and Zabecor Pharmaceutical Company, LLC's Motion for an In Camera Review of Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Withheld Communications Relating to James Sales. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE UNTIL 9/8/2008 TO FILE ITS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN IN CAMERA REVIEW OF DEFENDANT'S WITHHELD COMMUNICATIONS RELATING TO JAMES SALES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/20/2008. 8/21/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
                                  SIXTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACTUAL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 10/28/2008. MARKMAN AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 5/4/2009. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/21/2008. 8/21/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                    STIPULATION And Proposed Order Modifying The Scheduling Order by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (JESKIE, SANDRA) Modified on 8/21/2008 (md) (FILED IN ERROR; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY of filing stipulation and proposed order to extend time for Eli Lilly to file its opposition to plaintiffs' motion for in camera review of withheld communications relating to James Sales (SALAZAR, LISA) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 8/19/2008 (nd). (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                        ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TAKE THIS MATTER OUT OF CIVIL SUSPENSE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/13/2008. 8/13/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                          ORDER THAT DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/13/2008. 8/13/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                            ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO PLACE THIS MATTER IN CIVIL SUSPENSE PENDING THE OUTCOME OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/12/2008. 8/12/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) . (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                              PLAINTIFFS DR. ALAN SCHREIBER AND ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.'S MOTION FOR AN IN CAMERA REVIEW OF DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S WITHHELD COMMUNICATIONS RELATING TO JAMES SALES. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(mbh, ) . (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                Plaintiffs Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion to Compel (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, ) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                  ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE DEFENDANT'S REPLY UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/4/2008. 8/6/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(mbh, ) Modified on 8/7/2008 (afm, ). (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                    PLAINTIFFS DR. SCHREIVER AND ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND IN EXCESS OF TEN-PAGE LIMIT.(FILED UNDER SEAL - SEALED ENVELOPE)(mbh, ) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 7/18/2008 TO FILE A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY AND ACCOMPANYING PROPOSED SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 7/14/2008. 7/16/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                        ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL AND IN EXCESS OF THE TEN PAGE LIMIT IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE DEFENDANT'S REPLY UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 07/09/08.07/10/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(ac, ) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                          DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL AND IN EXCESS OF THE TEN PAGE LIMIT filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(ap, ) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY NO LATER THAN 7/2/2008. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 6/24/2008. 6/25/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                              First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 194 Memorandum, 189 MOTION to Compel filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SALAZAR, LISA) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Plaintiffs DR. ALAN SCHREIBER and ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY's Motion to Compel Discovery. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, ) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL 5 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FROM 6/11/2008 UNTIL 6/16/2008. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 6/11/2008. 6/13/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLFFS SHALL HAVE A 14 DAYS EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFT ELI'S MOTION TO COMPLE TO 6/11/08. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 6/4/08. ) 6/5/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MICHAEL W. HOGUE, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 6/4/08. ) 6/5/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Application of MICHAEL W. HOGUE, ESQUIRE to Practice in the Court Pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.5.2(b) on behalf of ELI LILY AND COMPANY, Statement and Certificate of Service.(mbh, ) Modified on 6/2/2008 (le, ). (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM PLAINTIFFS DR. ALAN D. SCHREIBER AND ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            FIFTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACTUAL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 8/28/2008. MARKMAN AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 3/3/2009. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 4/9/2008. 4/9/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) . (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACTUAL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 8/28/2008. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 3/31/2008. 4/2/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                STIPULATION and Proposed Order Modifying The Scheduling Order by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, ALAN SCHREIBER(DR.), ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC, ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (KERR, ALEXANDER) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 3/27/2008 (nd). (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  Lilly's Request to Withdraw Its Motion to Compel Discovery to the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (SALAZAR, LISA) Modified on 3/3/2008 (afm, ). (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Discovery from The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, Exhibits (FILED UNDER SEAL). (fdc) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE DEFENDANT'S REPLY BRIEF UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 2/6/08.2/7/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        ELI LILLY AND COMPANY MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM THE TRUSTEE OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. (FILED UNDER SEAL)..(jl, ) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          Entry of Appearance of ANGELA VERRECCHIO, ESQUIRE on behalf of PLAINTIFF THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, Certificate of Service.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 175 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (LUCCI, JOSEPH) Modified on 1/24/2008 (nd). (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE INSPECTION OF THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA AND DR. ALAN SCHREIBER'S ORIGINAL LECTURE SLIDES BY A FORENSIC CONSULTANT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 1/18/2008. 1/22/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Sur-Reply in Opposition to Eli Lilly and Company's Motion to Compel Forensic Inspection of Original Lecture Slides filed by PLAINTIFFS ALAN SCHREIBER and ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (mbh, ) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FORENSIC INSPECTION OF ORIGINAL LECTURE SLIDES IS GRANTED. THE PROPOSED SURREPLY IS ATTACHED TO THE INSTANT MOTION AS EXHIBIT A. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ENTER ON THE DOCKET PLAINTIFFS' SURREPLY MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 1/14/2008. 1/14/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Companys Motion to Compel Forensic Inspection of Original Lecture Slides filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit "A" (Plaintiffs Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Lillys Motion to Compel Forensic Inspection of Original Lecture Slides))(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Reply Brief in Support of Eli Lilly and Company's Motion to Compel the Inspection of the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania's and Dr. Alan Schreiber's Original Lecture Slides by a Forensic Consultant. (mbh, ) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL THE INSPECTION OF THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA'S AND DR. SCHREIBER'S ORIGINAL LECTURE SLIDES BY A FORENSIC CONSULTANT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 1/8/2008.1/10/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Eli Lilly and Company's Motion to Compel the Inspection of the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania's and Dr. Alan Schreiber's Original Lecture Slides by a Forensic Consultant filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.Affidavit, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A (Reply in Support of Eli Lilly and Company's Motion to Compel the Inspection of the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania's and Dr. Alan Schreiber's Original Lecture Slides by a Forensic Consultant), # 3 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of Gerald B. Richards)(BURWELL, L.) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:ALL FACTUAL DISCOVERY DUE BY 5/28/2008; EACH PARTY SHALL SERVE THE RULE 26(a)(2) INITIAL EXPERT DISCLOSURES FOR ANY ISSUE ON OR BEFORE 07/14/08; REBUTTAL EXPERT DISCLOSURES ON OR BEFORE 08/27/08; EXPERT DEPOSITIONS ON OR BEFORE 10/27/08; MARKMAN AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 12/03/08; ALL RESPONSES TO MARKMAN AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS FILED ON OR BEFORE 01/14/09; ALL REPLIES TO MARKMAN AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 02/04/09, ETC.SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 12/31/07. 12/31/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 12/31/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 167 MOTION to Compel the Inspection of the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania's and Dr. Alan Schreiber's Original Lecture Slides by a Forensic Consultant filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Sandra A. Jeskie, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Affidavit of Gus R. Lesnevich)(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC re 163 MOTION to Preclude Withdrawing Motion for Immediate Compliance with this Court's Prior Order Compelling Interrogatory Responses, or in the Alternative, Preclusion of Contrary Evidence (LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AMENDED DOCUMENT by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Amendment to 167 MOTION to Compel the Inspection of the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania's and Dr. Alan Schreiber's Original Lecture Slides by a Forensic Consultant (Affidavit of Gerald B. Richards). (BURWELL, L.) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel the Inspection of the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania's and Dr. Alan Schreiber's Original Lecture Slides by a Forensic Consultant filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.Memorandum, Affidavit, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Affidavit of Gerald B. Richards, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of L. Scott Burwell, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16)(BURWELL, L.) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY SHALL HAVE A 21-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S ORDER ON THE MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROGATORY RESPONSES FROM 11/30/2007 TO 12/21/2007. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 12/6/2007. 12/10/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DAVID E. DUKES, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 11/13/2007. 11/27/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF J. MARK JONES, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 8.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 11/13/2007. 11/19/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              PLAINTIFFS DR. SCHREIBER AND ZABECOR'S MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE COMPLIANCE WITH THIS COURT'S PRIOR ORDER COMPELLING INTERROGATORY RESPONSES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PRECLUSION OF CONTRARY EVIDENCE. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Application of DAVID E. DUKES, ESQUIRE to Practice in this Court Pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.5.2(b) filed by DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, Certificate of Service. (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Application of J. MARK JONES, ESQURIE to Practice in this Court Pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.5.2(b) filed by DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, Certificate of Service.(mbh, ) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACTUAL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 2/28/2008. MARKMAN AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 9/4/2008. UPON RESOLUTION OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS THE COURT WILL SCHEDULE A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 9/24/2007. 9/25/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant Eli Lilly, with Certificate of Service by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant, Eli Lilly, and Certificate of Service by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.(MILOWIC, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION IS DENIED WITH LEAVE TO FILE A SIMILAR MOTION AFTER FURTHER DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/30/07. 8/31/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(stb, ) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS DR. ALAN SCHREIBER AND ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM IS DENIED.SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/30/07.8/31/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(stb, ) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS DR. ALAN SCHREIBER'S AND ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL CO.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/30/07.8/31-07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(stb, ) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE UNIVERSITY'S TIME TO REPLY TO LILLY'S COUNTERCLAIMS IS EXTENDED UNTIL SEVEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS COURT'S ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS DR. ALAN SCHREIBER'S AND ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL CO.'S MOTION TO STRIKE. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/30/07.8/31/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(stb, ) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to Defendant Eli Lilly's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Eli Lilly's Amended Counterclaim filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit "A" (Plaintiffs' Proposed Reply with Exhibit 1 thereto))(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 144 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILOWIC, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint - the Second Amended Complaint by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, Certificate of Service. (MILOWIC, JOSEPH) Modified on 8/13/2007 (nd). (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Lilly's Amended Counterclaim or, in the alternative, Motion for Leave to Amend Lilly's Answer and Counterclaim and Declaration of L. Scott Burwell in Support Thereof. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, ) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY of Filing of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Lilly's Amended Counterclaim, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Amend Lilly's Answer and Counterclaim and Declaration of L. Scott Burwell under seal (SALAZAR, LISA) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Concurrence of the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania with Respect to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. (LUCCI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike 144 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit "A"# 3 Exhibit "B"# 4 Exhibit "C")(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant, Eli Lilly & Co's Counterclaim, by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (LUCCI, JOSEPH) Modified on 7/6/2007 (afm, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL BE NAMED AS A DEFENDANT. THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL FILE ITS ANSWER TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND WILL DO SO WITHIN 45 DAYS OF THE ENTRY OF THIS STIPULATION. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 6/21/2007. 6/27/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Lilly ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second), COUNTERCLAIM against THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (BURWELL, L.) Modified on 6/19/2007 (nd). (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY SHALL HAVE A 7 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE AN ANSWER TO DR. SCHREIBER AND ZABECOR'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FROM 6/11/2007 TO 6/18/2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 6/11/2007. 6/12/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SCHREIBER AND ZABECOR'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING TRAD SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT'S SUREPLY IS ALREADY ENTERED ON THE DOCKET AS ENTRY NO. 141. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 5/31/2007. 6/1/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          PLAINTIFFS DR. SCHRIEBER and ZABECOR's Sur-reply in Oppostion to Defendant Eli Lilly's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Trade Secret Misapproriation. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, ) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Trade Secret Misappropriation filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              Second Amended Complaint against DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY filed by PLAINTIFFS ALAN SCHREIBER and ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.(mbh, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ENTER ON THE DOCKET THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A TO THE MOTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 5/25/2007. 5/25/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' 134 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, Certificate of Service. (BURWELL, L.) Modified on 5/24/2007 (fh) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S Notice of Withdrawal of 130 MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal, Certificate of Service. (BURWELL, L.) Modified on 5/24/2007 (fh) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition to 130 MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal filed by ALAN SCHREIBER and ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC with Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LIPOWICZ, MARK) Modified on 5/11/2007 (le, ). (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit "A" (Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)# 3 Exhibit "B")(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memorandum in Support of Lilly's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Trade Secret Misappropriation. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, ) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Lilly's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Trade Secret Misappropriation filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SALAZAR, LISA) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH COURT APPROVAL. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 4/25/2007. 4/26/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.Certificate of Service, Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal)(BURWELL, L.) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS DR. ALAN SCHREIBER AND ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC MAY FILE THEIR MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION, THEIR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY & COMPANY'S STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AND THE ACCOMPANYING EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 4/10/2007. 4/11/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(mbh, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2007 (mbh, ). (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE UNCONTESTED MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR MODIFICATION OF THE SCHEDULING ORDER IS GRANTED. ALL FACTUAL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 11/30/2007. MARKMAN AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 6/6/2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 4/10/2007. 4/11/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (jl, ) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Trade Secret Misappropriation Under Seal filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Uncontested filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Rule 7.1(b) Certification of Uncontested Motion)(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING INVENTORSHIP OF SURRENDERED PATENTS IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 3/19/2007. 3/20/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(Attachments: # 1 Order)(mbh, ) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH RESPECT TO COUNT V IS DENIED WITH LEAVE TO FILE A SIMILAR MOTION AFTER FURTHER DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 3/19/2007. 3/20/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF ALAN SCHREIBER AND ZABECOR'S MOTION TO COMPEL FULL AND COMPLETE INTERROGATORY ANSWERS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 3/19/2007. 3/20/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RESOLUTION OF OVERRIDING PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 3/19/2007. 3/20/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE A 21 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION FROM 3/16/2007 TO 4/6/2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 3/14/2007. 3/14/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(mbh, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH RESPECT TO COUNT V IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF THE COURT HAS ALREADY FILED THE MOTION UNDER SEAL AS DOCUMENT NO. 116. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 3/13/2007. 3/14/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF THE COURT HAS ALREADY FILED THE MOTION UNDER SEAL AS DOCUMENT NO. 114. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 3/13/2007. 3/14/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Entry of Appearance by JOSEPH MILOWIC, III on behalf of PLAINTIFF THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.(mbh, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2007 (bj, ). (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lily's Motion for Summary Judgment with Regard to Count V filed by PLAINTIFFS ALAN SCHREIBER and ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, ) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Count V, Response To Statement of Material Facts, and the Accompanying Exhibits filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION FILED BY ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) Modified on 3/7/2007 (mbh, ). (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal motion for partial summary judgment re: trade secret misappropriation and supporting documents filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.certificate of service.(SALAZAR, LISA) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE A 7-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH RESPECT TO COUNT V FROM 2/27/2007 TO 3/6/2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 2/27/2007. 2/28/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(mbh, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2007 (mbh, ). (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment with Respect to Count V by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (LUCCI, JOSEPH) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/28/2007 (np). (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT DR. SCHREIBER'S AND ZABECOR'S COUNTS III, VII, VIII AND IX OF THE FIRSTAMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 2/26/2007. 2/27/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY re 102 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Identify Documents and Respond to Interrogatory NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL (BURWELL, L.) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE A 14 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH RESPECT TO COUNT V FROM 2/13/2007 TO 2/27/2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 2/8/2007. 2/12/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(mbh, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2007 (mbh, ). (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 102 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Identify Documents and Respond to Interrogatory filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit "A"# 3 Exhibit "B")(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMAMRY JUDGMENT WITH RESPECT TO COUNT V IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF THE COURT HAS ALREADY FILED THE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH RESPECT TO COUNT V UNDER SEAL AS DOC. 105. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 1/31/2007. 2/1/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (mbh, ) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGEMENT WITH RESPECT TO COUNT V (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Motion for Partial Summary Judgment With Respect to Count V filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(SALAZAR, LISA) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ERRATA by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY re 102 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Identify Documents and Respond to Interrogatory (Errata to Lilly's Motion to Compel) (BURWELL, L.) Modified on 1/29/2007 (np). (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Identify Documents and Respond to Interrogatory filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.Declaration, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Declaration of L. Scott Burwell# 3 Exhibit 1# 4 Exhibit 2# 5 Exhibit 3# 6 Exhibit 4# 7 Exhibit 5# 8 Exhibit 6# 9 Exhibit 7# 10 Exhibit 8# 11 Exhibit 9# 12 Exhibit 10# 13 Local Rule 26.1(f) Statement)(BURWELL, L.) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE 11/9/06, MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARE GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 12/28/06.12/29/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (stb, ) (Entered: 12/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL THE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RESOLUTION OF OVERRIDING PROTECTIVE ORDER ISSUES IS GRANTED.SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 12/28/06.12/29/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (stb, ) (Entered: 12/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR RESOLUTION OF OVERRIDING PROTECTIVE ORDER ISSUES IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 12/28/06.12/29/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (stb, ) (Entered: 12/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL A SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RESOLUTION OF OVERRIDING PROTECTIVE ORDER ISSUES IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 12/28/06.12/29/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (stb, ) (Entered: 12/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Inventorship filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit "A" (Plaintiffs' Proposed Sur-Reply))(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit A re: Surreply in Opposition to Motion of Plaintiffs for Resolution of Overriding Protective Order Issues and Entry of Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 81 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Counts III, VII, VIII, and IX of Non-Opposition filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Answer to Defendant's Statement of Facts)(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Surreply In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Resolution of Overriding Protective Order Issues and Entry of Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KERR, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit A to Plaintiffs Dr. Alan Schreiber and Zabecor Pharmaceutical Company's Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion for Resolution of Overriding Protective Order Issues Under Seal. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Support of Motion For Resolution Of Overriding Protective Order Issues Under Seal filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 12/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 72 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Inventorship of Surrendered Patents filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Reply in Support of Lilly Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Inventorship of Surrendered Patents)(BURWELL, L.) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Inventorship of Surrendered Patents filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Answer to Defendant's Statement Of Material Facts Not In Dispute and Plaintiffs' Statement of Additional Facts Which Preclude Summary Judgment# 3 Exhibit "A"# 4 Exhibit "B"# 5 Exhibit "C"# 6 Exhibit "D"# 7 Exhibit "E"# 8 Exhibit "F"# 9 Exhibit "G"# 10 Exhibit "H"# 11 Exhibit "I"# 12 Exhibit "J"# 13 Exhibit "K"# 14 Exhibit "L"# 15 Exhibit "M"# 16 Exhibit "N")(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 72 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Inventorship of Surrendered Patents filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, Certificate of Service. (LUCCI, JOSEPH) Modified on 12/6/2006 (np). (Entered: 12/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition to Motion of Plaintiff's for Resolution of Overriding Protective Order Issues and Entry of Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order filed by DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, ) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Lilly's Opposition to Motion of Plaintiffs for Resolution of Overriding Protective Order Issues and Entry of Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order and Supporting Declaration of L. Scott Burwell with Exhibits filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.certificate of service.(SALAZAR, LISA) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Interrogatory Answers filed by PLAINTIFFS ALAN SCHREIBER and ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (mbh, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE DEFENDANT'S REPLY MEMORANDUM WITH THE COURT. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 11/29/2006. 11/30/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RESOLUTION OF OVERRIDING ORDER ISSUES AND ENTRY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER BY 12/7/2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 11/29/2006. 11/30/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEAL DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' COUNTS II, VII, VIII AND IX AND ALL THE SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS FOR THE MOTION. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 11/29/2006. 11/30/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition to PLAINTIFFS' 79 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Answers from Defendant Eli Lilly and Company filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(BURWELL, L.) Modified on 12/4/2006 (fh) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' COUNTS III, VII, VIII AND IX. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs? Counts III, VII, VIII, and IX, the Memorandum in support thereof, the Declaration of L. Scott Burwell in support thereof, and the accompanying Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(SALAZAR, LISA) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Answers from Defendant Eli Lilly and Company filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit "A" (Plaintiffs' Proposed Reply))(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 11/21/2006. 11/21/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (mbh, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Answers from Defendant Eli Lilly and Company and Supporting Declaration of L. Scott Burwell. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Declaration in Support filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(KERR, ALEXANDER) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by JOSEPH LUCCI (LUCCI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION FOR RESOLUTION OF OVERRIDING PROTECTIVE ORDER ISSUES AND ENTRY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFFS ALAN SCHREIBER AND ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (FILED UNDER SEAL).(mbh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILED UNDER SEAL FILED BY PLAINTIFFS ALAN SCHREIBER AND ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Inventorship of Surrendered Patents filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.Memorandum, Declaration, Statement of Material Facts. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion# 2 Statement of Material Facts# 3 Declaration in Support of Motion# 4 Exhibit 1# 5 Exhibit 2# 6 Exhibit 3# 7 Text of Proposed Order)(BURWELL, L.) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Full and Complete Interrogatory Answers from Defendant Eli Lilly and Company filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Brief and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit "A"# 3 Exhibit "B"# 4 Exhibit "C"# 5 Exhibit "D"# 6 Exhibit "E"# 7 Exhibit "F")(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Immediate Compliance with the Court's Order of 8/24/2006 filed by PLAINTIFFS ALAN SCHREIBER and ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (mbh, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTON FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IS GRANTED AND THE CLERK OF THE COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE DEFENDANT'S REPLY MEMORANDUM WITH THE COURT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE COMPLIANCE IS GRANTED. THE DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY ORDERED TO BE PRODUCED BY THIS COURT ON 8/24/2006 SHALL BE PRODUCED BY DEFENDANT BY 10/27/2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 10/20/2006. 10/23/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (mbh, ) (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re 67 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Immediate Compliance with the Court's Order of August 24, 2006 filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, Certificate of Service. (BURWELL, L.) Modified on 10/19/2006 (np). (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Immediate Compliance with the Court's Order of August 24, 2006 filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit "A" (Plaintiffs' Proposed Reply Brief))(MUSTOKOFF, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 65 MOTION to Enforce Immediate Compliance with the Court's Order of August 24, 2006 filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, Certificate of Service. (BURWELL, L.) Modified on 10/16/2006 (np). (Entered: 10/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Enforce Immediate Compliance with the Court's Order of August 24, 2006 filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit "A")(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (DOC. NO. 61) AND DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE (DOC. NO. 62), IT IS ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/24/06. 8/25/06 COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (gs) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT DEFT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY SHALL RESPOND ON OR BEFORE 8/21/06. IF DEFT ELI LILLY & COMPANY DOES NOT RESPOND, PLFFS' MOTIONMAY BE GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.1(c). ( SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 8/17/06. )8/18/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(gn, ) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re 61 First MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Eli Lilly and Company filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (BURWELL, L.) Modified on 8/18/2006 (np). (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Eli Lilly and Company filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Brief and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A"# 2 Exhibit "B"# 3 Exhibit "C"# 4 Exhibit "D"# 5 Exhibit "E"# 6 Exhibit "F"# 7 Exhibit "G"# 8 Exhibit "H"# 9 Exhibit "I"# 10 Exhibit "J"# 11 Exhibit "K"# 12 Exhibit "L"# 13 Exhibit "M"# 14 Exhibit "N"# 15 Exhibit "O"# 16 Exhibit "P"# 17 Exhibit "Q"# 18 Text of Proposed Order)(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT THE UNCONTESTED MOTION TO REALIGN THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA AS A PLAINTIFF (DOC. NO. 59) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL BE REALIGNED AS A PLAINTIFF. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 5/11/06. 5/11/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (jpd) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Uncontested Motion to Realign The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania as a Plaintiff filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service.(LUCCI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 05/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF GARY D. COLBY, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT ON BEHALF OF PLFF PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS. 5/5/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, AND FAXED.(sc, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 05/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Crossclaim by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, Certificate of Service. (LUCCI, JOSEPH) Modified on 5/5/2006 (np). (Entered: 05/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Counterclaim with Certificate of Service by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC, ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.(MUSTOKOFF, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ANTHONY J. FITZPATRICK, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 5/2/06. )5/3/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 05/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL DISCOVERY DUE BY 5/31/2007. MARKMAN AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON 12/7/2007. ALL RESPONSES TO MARKMAN AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON 1/18/08. ALL REPLIES TO MARKMAN AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON 2/8/08. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 5/2/06. )5/2/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(gn, ) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ROBERT F. MCCAULEY, ESQUIRE, FILED BY ELI LILLY AND COMPANY TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE, IS GRANTED . SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 4/27/06. 4/28/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gs) (bp, ). (Entered: 04/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Admission of Gary D. Colby, Esquire, to Practice Pro Hac Vice by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. Sponsor's Statement, Motion and Certificate of Service. (gs) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony J. Fitzpatrick, Esquire, to Practice Pro Hac Vice by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. Sponsor's Statement, Motion and Certificate of Service. (gs) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Admission PRO HAC VICE of ROBERT F. MC CAULEY, ESQ. filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Cert. of Service. (pr, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2006 (pr, ). (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MARK J. FELDSTEIN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 4/25/06. 4/26/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (gs) (bp, ). (Entered: 04/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF LAURA P. MASUROVSKY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 4/25/06. 4/26/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (gs) (bp, ). (Entered: 04/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DAVID S. FORMAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 4/25/06. 4/26/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (gs) (bp, ). (Entered: 04/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF L. SCOTT BURWELL, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 4/25/06. 4/26/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (gs) (bp, ). (Entered: 04/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CHARLES E. LIPSEY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED . SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 4/25/06. 4/26/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gs) (bp, ). (Entered: 04/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION of Mark J. Feldstein, Esquire, to Practice in this Court Pro Hac Vice by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Sponsor's Statement, Motion and Certificate of Service. (gs) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2006 (gs, ). (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION of Laura P. Masurovsky, Esquire, to Practice in this Court Pro Hac Vice by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Sponsor's Statement, Motion and Certificate of Service. (gs) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2006 (gs, ). (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION of David S. Forman, Esquire, to Practice in this Court Pro Hac Vice by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Sponsor's Statement, Motion and Certificate of Service. (gs) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2006 (gs, ). (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION of L. Scott Burwell, Esquire, to Practice in this Court Pro Hac Vice by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Sponsor's Statement, Motion and Certificate of Service. (gs) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2006 (gs, ). (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION of Charles E. Lipsey, Esquire, to Practice in this Court Pro Hac Vice by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Sponsor's Statement, Motion and Certificate of Service. (gs) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2006 (gs, ). (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN C. TIMMINS, Esquire, on behalf of THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA (gs) (bp, ). (Entered: 04/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.(SALAZAR, LISA) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by SANDRA A. JESKIE on behalf of ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC with Certificate of Service (JESKIE, SANDRA) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING: RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR MONDAY 5/1/2006 04:00 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS ROOM 6614 BEFORE HONORABLE LEGROME D. DAVIS. (cls, ) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRNSFER (DOC. NO. 13), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 3/27/06. 3/28/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(gs) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2006 (gs, ). (Entered: 03/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Copy of Order from U.S.D.C. - Southern District of Indiana, Indianapolis Division that a ruling on Motions to Dismiss is Stayed until resolution of the Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer Venue relating to the Pennsylvania Complaint which is currently pending before the Eastern District of PA. (mac, ) (Entered: 03/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer filed by PLAINTIFFS ALAN SCHREIBER and ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (mbh, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 12/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM WITH THE COURT. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 12/5/2005. 12/7/2005 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh, ) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Eli Lilly and Company's Motion to Dismiss or Motion to Transfer filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit "A")(MUSTOKOFF, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Memorandum in Support of Lilly's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Claims Brought in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE DEFENDANT'S REPLY MEMORANDUM WITH THE COURT. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 11/21/2005. 11/22/2005 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Claims filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.certificate of service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, etc.)(SALAZAR, LISA) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Memorandum of Law in Opposition re 13 First MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer with Certificate of Service filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (LIPOWICZ, MARK) Modified on 11/8/2005 (np). (Entered: 11/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM SHALL BE STRUCK FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE PAGE LIMITS SET FORTH IN THIS COURT'S PROCEDURES. PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS SHALL BE FILED BY 11/7/2005. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 10/31/2005. 10/31/2005 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 MOTION to Strike 23 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss or Transfer Claims Brought in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Certificate of Service filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike 23 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss or Transfer Claims Brought in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(SALAZAR, LISA) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 First MOTION to Dismiss Claims Brought in Plaintiffs' Amended ComplaintFirst MOTION to Transfer Claims Brought in Plaintiffs' Amended ComplaintFirst MOTION to Transfer Claims Brought in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order)(LIPOWICZ, MARK) (Entered: 10/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 First MOTION to Dismiss Claims Brought in Plaintiffs' Amended ComplaintFirst MOTION to Transfer Claims Brought in Plaintiffs' Amended ComplaintFirst MOTION to Transfer Claims Brought in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LUCCI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 10/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL HAVE UNTIL 10/10/2005 TO OPPOSE OR OTHER WISE RESPOND TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 10/3/2005. 10/4/2005 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN D. MASLOWSKI on behalf of THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA (MASLOWSKI, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN D. MASLOWSKI on behalf of THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA (MASLOWSKI, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE A 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FROM 9/9/2005 TO 10/10/2005. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 9/12/2005. 9/13/2005 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(mbh, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE A 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FROM 9/9/2005 TO 10/10/2005. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS ON 9/7/2005. 9/9/2005 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 09/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement of Corporate Disclosure by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA. (LUCCI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint by THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA.(LUCCI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibits in Support of Lilly's Motion to Dismiss, Transfer or Stay Claims Brought in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint.(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION to Dismiss Claims Brought in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, First MOTION to Transfer Claims Brought in Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.Memorandum and Certificate of Service, Declarations. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed form of Order# 3 Declaration of L. Scott Burwell# 4 Declaration of James Leeds# 5 Declaration of Mary Marks)(SALAZAR, LISA) (Entered: 08/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HON. STEWART DALZELL TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HON. LEGROME D. DAVIS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 8/19/2005. 8/22/2005 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ). (Entered: 08/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY SHALL HAVE A 13-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FROM 8/10/2005 TO 8/23/2005. SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ON 8/15/2005. 8/16/2005 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFT THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL HAVE UNTIL 8/25/2005 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ON 8/1/05. 8/3/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED: COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS ON 8/1/05.(kw, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 08/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY SHALL HAVE A 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FROM 7/11/2005 TO 8/10/2005. SIGNED BY JUDGE STEWART DALZELL ON 7/11/2005. 7/11/2005 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(mbh, ) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Mark Lipowicz, Esquire served Summons and Complaint upon DEFENDANT THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA by Certified Mail Return Receipt Requested on 7/5/2005, answer due 7/25/2005. (mbh, ) (Entered: 07/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.(mbh, ) (Entered: 07/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Stanley Large served Summons and Complaint upon ELI LILLY AND COMPANY by Personal Service on 6/20/2005, answer due 7/11/2005. (mbh, ) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA, ELI LILLY AND COMPANY , filed by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC; jury demand.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2005 (kw, ). (Entered: 06/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Praecipe to Issue Alias Summons filed by PLAINTIFF ALAN SCHREIBER. (mbh, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 06/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement by ALAN SCHREIBER, ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC.(cw, ) (Entered: 06/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Copy of Form to Commissioner of Patents. (cw, ) (Entered: 06/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against ZABECOR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY, LLC, ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 917649.), filed by ALAN SCHREIBER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(cw, ) (Entered: 06/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?