DODGE-REGUPOL, INCORPORATED v. PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:06-cv-05074

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 1:48 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Dodge-regupol, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "DODGE-REGUPOL, INCORPORATED"

Toggle Switch Represented by Barley, Snyder, Sneft & Cohen, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GEORGE C. WERNER +1 717 299 5201 +1 717 291 4660 gwerner@barley.com
v.
No Logo PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Astrachan Gunst Thomas, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/24/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY James B. Astrachan +1 410 783 3550 +1 410 783 3530 jastrachan@agtlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GAWTHROP GREENWOOD, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICK M. MCKENNA +1 610 696 8225 pmckenna@gawthrop.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JULIE D. PFAFF +1 215 751 2158 jpfaff@gawthrop.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 183
Nature of Suit Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DODGE-REGUPOL, INCORPORATED (WERNER, GEORGE) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 20 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
    MEMORANDUM AND AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TRANSFER VENUE, AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE A REPLY IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 08/24/07. 08/27/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ac, ) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None
      ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BY JAMES B. ASTRACHAN IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 07/24/07.07/25/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS 07/24/07.(ac, ) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ASTRACHAN, JAMES) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE D. PFAFF on behalf of PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC with Certificate of Service(PFAFF, JULIE) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK M. MCKENNA on behalf of PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC with Certificate of Service(MCKENNA, PATRICK) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
              ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PENDING APPEARANCE OF NEW COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 03/26/07.03/26/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(ac, ) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(ASTRACHAN, JAMES) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 First MOTION to Dismiss for Improper VenueFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionFirst MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, 7 Order, Set DeadlinesFirst MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, 7 Order, Set DeadlinesFirst MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, 7 Order, Set DeadlinesFirst MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, 7 Order, Set DeadlinesFirst MOTION to Transfer Venue Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue and Motion to Stay filed by PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of Andrew Naden)(ASTRACHAN, JAMES) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                    First MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support of Motion for Leave to File# 2 Order - Motion for Leave to File)(ASTRACHAN, JAMES) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 First MOTION to Dismiss for Improper VenueFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionFirst MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionFirst MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, 7 Order, Set DeadlinesFirst MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, 7 Order, Set DeadlinesFirst MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, 7 Order, Set DeadlinesFirst MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, 7 Order, Set DeadlinesFirst MOTION to Transfer VenueFirst MOTION to Transfer VenueFirst MOTION to Transfer VenueFirst MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by DODGE-REGUPOL, INCORPORATED, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support# 2 Exhibit)(WERNER, GEORGE) Modified on 1/31/2007 (np). (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None
                        Statement Disclosure Statement Form by PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC. (ASTRACHAN, JAMES) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None
                          EXHIBITS TO MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE BY PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC.(ac, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2007 (cw, ). (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/2/2007, Entered: None
                            First MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, First MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, 7 Order, Set Deadlines, First MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC.memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Personal Jurisdiction# 2 Text of Proposed Order re Venue# 3 Text of Proposed Order re Transfer of Venue# 4 Text of Proposed Order re Stay of Proceedings# 5 Affidavit by Andrew Naden# 6 Exhibit B - Pioneer Comm. Funding Corp. v. Norick# 7 Exhibit C - Driscoll v. Matt Blatt Auto Sales# 8 Exhibit D - Honeywell Int'l v. Audiovox Communications Corp.# 9 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer Venue and Motion to Stay)(ASTRACHAN, JAMES) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                              ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME UNTIL 1/2/2007 TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND WITH RESPECT TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/18/06. 12/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES FAXED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(le, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2007 (cw, ). (Entered: 12/19/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                Stipulation Extending Time to Answer the complaint. PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC answer due 1/2/2007, with Clerk's approval. (ac, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2007 (cw, ). (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION of Extension of Time by DODGE-REGUPOL, INCORPORATED, PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC. (WERNER, GEORGE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 12/15/2006 (np). (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None
                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service by George C. Werner, Esquire re: served Summons and Complaint upon President, Primary Acoustics by Certificate Mail 7160 3901 9849 2403 3959 on 11/27/06 (WERNER, GEORGE) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None
                                      Copy of Form to Commissioner of Patents. (tj, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2006 (tj, ). (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None
                                        Disclosure by DODGE-REGUPOL, INCORPORATED.(tj, ) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None
                                          COMPLAINT against PRIMARY ACOUSTICS LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 934596.), filed by DODGE-REGUPOL, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet# 2 Designation Form# 3 Tracking Form# 4 Ex. A)(tj, ) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?