THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC. et al v. STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00716
District Judge Berle M. Schiller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bmc Players, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SORIN ROYER COOPER LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Lee Cohen +1 484 362 2628 +1 484 362 2630 bcohen@rccblaw.com
No Logo THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 484-362-2628

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Lee Cohen +1 484 362 2628 +1 484 362 2630 bcohen@rccblaw.com
v.
No Logo STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JEREMY D. MISHKIN + 215 772 7620 jmishkin@mmwr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN G. PAPIANOU +1 215 772 7389 jpapianou@mmwr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Montgomery McCracken Walker Rhoades

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EVELYN H. MCCONATHY +1 215 772 7550 emcconathy@mmwr.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1051
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 8/1/2008. 8/4/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER: Pretrial Conference held on 06/30/2008. (nds) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
      ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE (DOC. NO. 47) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/30/08. 7/1/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
        ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE (DOC. NO. 38) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE (DOC. NO. 39) IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE (DOC. NO. 41) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/30/08. 7/1/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (jpd) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
          MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR.Memorandum in Support, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Newspaper article, # 2 Exhibit Newspaper article)(MISHKIN, JEREMY) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
            RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Opinions of Expert, Manny D. Pokotilow filed by STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR. (MISHKIN, JEREMY) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
              RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Any and All Challenges to AND 1's Copyrighted Works filed by STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR, Certificate of Service. (MISHKIN, JEREMY) Modified on 6/30/2008 (nd). (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
                RESPONSE in Opposition re 41 MOTION in Limine Memorandum of Law in Opposition filed by THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC., BMC PLAYERS, INC.. (COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                  JOINT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. (PAPIANOU, JOHN) Modified on 6/24/2008 (jp, ). (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                    Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR. Certificate of Service (PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                      MOTION in Limine filed by STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                        Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC., BMC PLAYERS, INC.. Certificate of Service (COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                          MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Opinions of Expert, Manny D. Pokotilow filed by THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC., BMC PLAYERS, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                            MOTION in Limine to Preclude Any and All Challenges to AND 1's Copyrighted Works filed by THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC., BMC PLAYERS, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                              ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/12/2008. 6/13/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                                ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/9/2008. 6/10/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                    EXHIBITS TO RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR REVIEW OF PLAINTIFF BMC PLAYERS, INC., THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC. (jpd) Modified on 6/5/2008 (nd). (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                      Response to Request for Review of Plaintiff re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Memo of Law in Opposition and Certificate of Service filed by THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC., BMC PLAYERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Law in Opposition) (COHEN, BARRY) Modified on 6/5/2008 (nd). Modified on 6/6/2008 (le, ). (Entered: 06/04/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR.Order, Memorandum, Undisputed Facts, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order, # 3 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Undisputed Facts, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Undisputed Facts, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Undisputed Facts, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Undisputed Facts, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Undisputed Facts, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Undisputed Facts, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Undisputed Facts, # 11 Exhibit 8 to Undisputed Facts, # 12 Exhibit 9 to Undisputed Facts, # 13 Exhibit 10 to Undisputed Facts, # 14 Exhibit 11 to Undisputed Facts, # 15 Exhibit 12 to Undisputed Facts, # 16 Exhibit 13 to Undisputed Facts, # 17 Exhibit 14 to Undisputed Facts, # 18 Exhibit 15 to Undisputed Facts, # 19 Exhibit 16 to Undisputed Facts, # 20 Exhibit 16b to Undisputed Facts, # 21 Exhibit 17 to Undisputed Facts, # 22 Exhibit 18 to Undisputed Facts, # 23 Exhibit 19 to Undisputed Facts, # 24 Exhibit 20 to Undisputed Facts, # 25 Exhibit 21 to Undisputed Facts, # 26 Exhibit 22 to Undisputed Facts, # 27 Exhibit 23 to Undisputed Facts, # 28 Exhibit 24 to Undisputed Facts, # 29 Exhibit 25 to Undisputed Facts, # 30 Exhibit 26 to Undisputed Facts, # 31 Exhibit 26b to Undisputed Facts, # 32 Exhibit 27 to Undisputed Facts, # 33 Exhibit 28 to Undisputed Facts, # 34 Exhibit 29 to Undisputed Facts, # 35 Exhibit 30 to Undisputed Facts)(PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None
                                          ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 3/27/2008. 3/31/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 29 MOTION to Stay of Defendant Steve & Barry's University Sportswear, a/k/a Steve & Barry's filed by THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC., BMC PLAYERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Stay filed by STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to 27 Amended Complaint by STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR.(PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Amended Complaint against DEFENDANTS STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR filed by PLAINTIFFS THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC. and BMC PLAYERS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Amd Cmp.)(mbh, ) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                    ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 2/26/2008. 2/28/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 2/5/2008 before Judge Schiller. (mbh, ) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC., BMC PLAYERS, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E-Part I, # 7 Exhibit E-Part II, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K-Part I, # 14 Exhibit K-Part II, # 15 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                          ORDER THAT ALL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY FROM THIS DATE FORWARD SHALL BE LIMITED TO ANY NEW IMAGES PRODUCED BY DEFENDANT IN RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S 1/16/08 ORDER; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 2/6/08. 2/6/08 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                            SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THIS COURT'S DECEMBER 20, 2007 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER IS VACATED AND THAT THIS COURT'S AUGUST 7, 2007 SCHEDULING ORDER IS AMENDED. ANY MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PLEADINGS AND ANY MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO JOIN OTHER PARTIES SHALL BE FILED BY FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 22, 2008. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY FRIDAY, APRIL 18, 2008. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY WEDNESDAY, MAY 21, 2008. RESPONSES TO ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY WEDNESDAY, JUNE 4, 2008. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON MONDAY, JUNE 30, 2008, AT 8:30 A.M. FINAL PRETRIAL MOTIONS ARE DUE MONDAY, JUNE 23, 2008. A BENCH TRIAL IS SET FOR TUESDAY, JULY 8, 2008, AT 8:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 5C. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 02/05/08. 02/06/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ac, ) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                              ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 2/5/2008. 2/5/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN G. PAPIANOU on behalf of STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR with Certificate of Service(PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR.Order, Memorandum, Statement of Facts, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum of Law, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Statement of Facts, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Statement of Facts, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Statement of Facts, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Statement of Facts, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Statement of Facts, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Statement of Facts, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Statement of Facts, # 11 Exhibit 8 to Statement of Facts, # 12 Exhibit 9 to Statement of Facts, # 13 Exhibit 10 to Statement of Facts, # 14 Exhibit 11 to Statement of Facts, # 15 Exhibit 12 to Statement of Facts, # 16 Exhibit 13 to Statement of Facts, # 17 Exhibit 14 to Statement of Facts, # 18 Exhibit 15 to Statement of Facts, # 19 Exhibit 16 to Statement of Facts, # 20 Exhibit 17 to Statement of Facts, # 21 Exhibit 18 to Statement of Facts, # 22 Exhibit 19 to Statement of Facts)(PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MUST PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFFS ALL INFORMATION AND DOCUMENTS PERTAINING TO ANY MERCHANDISE SOLD OR OFFERED FOR SALE BY DEFENDANTS 1/1/2003 THT CONTAINS IMAGES AND/OR LOGOS SIMILAR TO THOSE TRADEMARKS AND COPYRIGHTS IDENTIFIED IN PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. DEFENDANT MUST COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER BY 1/31/2008. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/16/2008. 1/16/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 1/14/2008. FINAL PRETRIAL MOTIONS ARE DUE ON 2/18/2008. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 12/20/2007. 12/20/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held on 11/1/2007 before Judge Hart. (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORIGINALLY SET FOR 9/25/2007 IS RECHEDULED FOR 11/1/2007 AT 10:00 AM. SIGNED BY JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 9/11/2007. 9/11/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(mbh, ) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge BERLE M. SCHILLER : Pretrial Conference held on 8/7/2007. (ap, ) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED ON 9/25/2007 AT 10:00 AM. SIGNED BY JUDGE JACOB P. HART ON 8/10/2007. 8/10/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 12/31/2007. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 2/25/2008 AT 8:30 AM. FINAL PRETRIAL MOTIONS ARE DUE ON 2/25/2008. A BENCH TRIAL IS SET FOR 3/3/20087 AT 8:30 AM IN COURTROOM 5C. SIGNED BY JUDGE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 8/7/2007. 8/8/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACOB P. HART FOR THE PURPOSES OF CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY JUDGE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 8/7/2007. 8/7/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    Entry of Appearance by EVELYN H. MC CONATHY on behalf of DEFENDANT STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR, Certificate of Service.(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE by STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (PAPIANOU, JOHN) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENE IS SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY, AUGUST 7, 2007, AT 10:30 A.M. IN CHAMBERS, ROOM 5614. SIGNED BY JUDGE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 06/22/07. 06/22/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ac, ) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(PAPIANOU, JOHN) Modified on 6/25/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC., BMC PLAYERS, INC. re 5 Notice (Other) of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service of Summons (COHEN, BARRY) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE by THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC., BMC PLAYERS, INC. of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service of Summons, waiver sent on 2/26/07, answer due 4/27/07. (COHEN, BARRY) Modified on 3/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                Copy of Form to Commissioner of Patents. (cw, ) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Copy of Form to Register of Copyrights. (cw, ) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC., BMC PLAYERS, INC..(cw, ) (britb, ). (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against STEVE & BARRY'S UNIVERSITY SPORTSWEAR ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 936927.), filed by THE BASKETBALL MARKETING COMPANY, INC., BMC PLAYERS, INC..(cw, ) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?