TOWNSHIP OF TINICUM DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA v. FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-03409
District Judge LOUIS H. POLLAK, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TOWNSHIP OF TINICUM DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo AirTran Airways, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com
No Logo America West Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Officer/Director, AMR Corporation
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com
No Logo Atlantic Aviation Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McBreen & Kopko

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/02/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas J. Bradley +1 215 864 2600 tjbradley@mcbreenkopko.com
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
Officer/Director, Clear Secure, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com
No Logo DHL WORLDWIDE EXPRESS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com
FedEx Corporation FedEx Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION"

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com
No Logo Frontier Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. ROY GOLDBERG +1 202 218 0007 +1 202 218 0020 rgoldberg@sheppardmullin.com
No Logo Midwest Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com
No Logo Northwest Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com
Southwest Airlines Company Southwest Airlines Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com
United Parcel Service United Parcel Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, CO."

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TRACEY DOLIN WALDMANN +1 215 751 2407 twaldmann@schnader.com
No Logo THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 215-683-5142

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES P. COUSOUNIS +1 215 683 5020 +1 215 683 5071 james.cousounis@phila.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by TOWNSHIP OF TINICUM DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(DEVINEY, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss 1st Amended Complaint and to Lift Stay filed by AIRTRAN AIRWAYS, INC., AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., MIDWEST AIRLINES, INC., NORTHWEST AIRLINES, INC., SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, CO., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., US AIRWAYS, INC., FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, DHL WORLDWIDE EXPRESS, FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC..Proposed Order, Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum of Law, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2)(WALDMANN, TRACEY) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
      ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE "STATEMENT OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS" IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RENEW, IF APPROPRIATE, AFTER THE STAY OF ALL PROCEEDINGS HAS BEEN LIFTED.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 8/8/08.8/8/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(ah) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
        ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS STAYED PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE THIRD CIRCUIT APPEAL.SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 5/2/08. 5/12/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ah) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
          RESPONSE to Motion re 50 MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motions to Dismiss filed by TOWNSHIP OF TINICUM DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Certificate of Service)(PILEGGI, FRANCIS) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
            MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motions to Dismiss filed by AIRTRAN AIRWAYS, INC., AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., MIDWEST AIRLINES, INC., NORTHWEST AIRLINES, INC., SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, CO., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., US AIRWAYS, INC., FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, DHL WORLDWIDE EXPRESS, FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC..Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Statement of Supplemental Authority, # 3 Exhibit 1)(SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
              RESPONSE in Opposition re 48 MOTION to Stay re 47 Order on Motion to Stay All Proceedings filed by AIRTRAN AIRWAYS, INC., AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., MIDWEST AIRLINES, INC., NORTHWEST AIRLINES, INC., SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, CO., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., US AIRWAYS, INC., FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, DHL WORLDWIDE EXPRESS, FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None
                MOTION to Stay re 47 Order on Motion to Stay filed by TOWNSHIP OF TINICUM DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(PILEGGI, FRANCIS) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                  ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO STAY IS GRANTED. ALL DISCOVERY IN THIS ACTION IS STAYED UNTIL FURTHER NOTICE.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 4/2/08.4/3/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(ah) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by AIRTRAN AIRWAYS, INC., AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., MIDWEST AIRLINES, INC., NORTHWEST AIRLINES, INC., ATLANTIC AVIATION CORPORATION, SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, CO., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., US AIRWAYS, INC., FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, DHL WORLDWIDE EXPRESS, FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC., THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                      ORDER THAT THE STAY OF ALL PROCEEDINGS IS LIFTED. THE MOTION FOR INTERVENTION IS GRANTED. PARTIES SHALL EXCHANGE INITIAL DISCLOSURES BY 4/21/08. A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 5/21/2008 AT 3:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, WITH PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL INITIATING THE CALL. FACT BASED DISCOVERY IS TO PROCEED AND IS TARGETED TO BE COMPLETED WITHIN SIX MONTHS AS OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 3/18/08. 3/20/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(ah) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK: Telephone Conference held on 3/17/08 (ah) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                          Minute Entry for a Telephone Conference on 2/14/08 held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL (ah) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                            ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/17/2008 03:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL INITIATE THE CALL. THE STAY OF ALL PROCEEDINGS IS EXTENDED TO 3/17/08.SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 2/14/08. 2/15/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(ah) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                              ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS STAYED UNTIL 2/11/2008 AS DISCUSSED AT THE CONFERENCE. A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/14/2008 03:00 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL INITIATE THIS CONFERENCE CALL TO 215-597-6079.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 12/12/2007. 12/14/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED.(ap, ) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: R16 Conference held on 12/12/2007. (ap, ) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
                                  Report Of Defendant Airlines and City of Philadelphia Regarding Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by AIRTRAN AIRWAYS, INC., AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., MIDWEST AIRLINES, INC., NORTHWEST AIRLINES, INC., ATLANTIC AVIATION CORPORATION, SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, CO., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., US AIRWAYS, INC., FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, DHL WORLDWIDE EXPRESS, FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC., THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
                                    Report Of Plaintiff Regarding Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by TOWNSHIP OF TINICUM DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (JOBES, THEODORE) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                      ORDER THAT THE IN-PERSON INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED UNTIL 12/12/2007 AT 2:20 PM IN COURTROOM 7 BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 11/05/2007. 11/07/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS ON 11/05/2007.(nda) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
                                        Reply Brief in Support of Additional Airline Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Stay Action Pending Administrative Review filed by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC. (nda) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
                                          Reply Brief in Support of Defendant, Frontier Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Stay Action Pending Administrative Review. (nda) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
                                            ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC. FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION PENDING ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW IS GRANTED; AND THE MOTION OF ADDITIONAL AIRLINE DEFENDANTS FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION PENDING ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 10/17/2007. 10/18/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS ON 10/17/2007.(nda) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Stay Action Pending Administrative Review filed by AIRTRAN AIRWAYS, INC., AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., MIDWEST AIRLINES, INC., NORTHWEST AIRLINES, INC., SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, CO., US AIRWAYS, INC., FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, DHL WORLDWIDE EXPRESS.Certificate of Service (REPLY BRIEF AND EXHIBIT ATTACHED).Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Proposed reply brief# 3 Exhibit 1 to proposed reply)(SHUPE, JAMES) Modified on 10/17/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                AFFIDAVIT re 9 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or Stay Action by TOWNSHIP OF TINICUM DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (PILEGGI, FRANCIS) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION to Intervene of the City of Philadelphia as a Right with Proposed Answer filed by TOWNSHIP OF TINICUM DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(PILEGGI, FRANCIS) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Brief in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Action Pending Administrative Review, 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Action Pending Administrative Review filed by TOWNSHIP OF TINICUM DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (PILEGGI, FRANCIS) Modified on 10/10/2007 (nd). (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                      Statement (Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure) by SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, CO.. (SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                        Statement (Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure) by NORTHWEST AIRLINES, INC.. (SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                          Statement (Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure) by AIRTRAN AIRWAYS, INC.. (SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                            Statement (Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure) by MIDWEST AIRLINES, INC.. (SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                              Statement (Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure) by DELTA AIRLINES, INC.. (SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                Statement (Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure) by DHL WORLDWIDE EXPRESS. (SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  Statement (Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure) by US AIRWAYS, INC.. (SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    Statement (Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure) by AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC.. (SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      Statement (Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure) by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.. (SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        Statement (Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure) by CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC.. (SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE by FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION Corporate Disclosure Statement (SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal against Atlantic Aviation Corporation by TOWNSHIP OF TINICUM DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (PILEGGI, FRANCIS) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, CO., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by ROY GOLDBERG on behalf of AIRTRAN AIRWAYS, INC., AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., MIDWEST AIRLINES, INC., NORTHWEST AIRLINES, INC., SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., US AIRWAYS, INC., FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, DHL WORLDWIDE EXPRESS, FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE CO. with Certificate of Service(GOLDBERG, ROY) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Action Pending Administrative Review filed by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, CO..Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LAMONACA, VINCENT) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC.. Certificate of Service (REPLY BRIEF AND EXHIBITS ATTACHED) .Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Proposed Reply Brief# 3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 to Proposed Reply Brief# 4 Exhibit Exhibits 4-9 to Proposed Reply Brief)(SHUPE, JAMES) Modified on 9/25/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Action Pending Administrative Review filed by AIRTRAN AIRWAYS, INC., AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., MIDWEST AIRLINES, INC., NORTHWEST AIRLINES, INC., SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., US AIRWAYS, INC., FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, DHL WORLDWIDE EXPRESS.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        Brief In Support of Motion to Intervene RE 11 MOTION to Intervene filed by THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (COUSOUNIS, JAMES) Modified on 9/25/2007 (nd). (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION FOR INTERVENTION FILED BY THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. BRIEF AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED. (nda) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            ORDER THAT AN IN-PERSON INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/28/2007 AT 2:20 PM IN COURTROOM 7 BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 09/21/2007. 09/21/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS ON 09/21/2007.(nda) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              BRIEF in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Action Pending Administrative Review filed by TOWNSHIP OF TINICUM DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to F# 2 Exhibit G to I# 3 Text of Proposed Order) (PILEGGI, FRANCIS) Modified on 9/14/2007 (nd). (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Action Pending Administrative Review filed by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service.Motions referred to M. FAITH ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Brief in Support# 3 Exhibit A)(SHUPE, JAMES) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                  First Amended Complaint against AIRTRAN AIRWAYS, INC., AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC., MIDWEST AIRLINES, INC., NORTHWEST AIRLINES, INC., ATLANTIC AVIATION CORPORATION, SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, CO., UNITED AIRLINES, INC., CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC., DELTA AIRLINES, INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, CO., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., US AIRWAYS, INC., FEDERAL EXPRESS CORPORATION, DHL WORLDWIDE EXPRESS and FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC. filed by TOWNSHIP OF TINICUM DELAWARE COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. Certificate of Service attached.(nda) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF M. ROY GOLDBERG, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 08/30/2007. 08/30/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nda) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of M. Roy Goldberg, Esquire filed by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC. Sponsor Statement and Certificate of Service attached. (nda) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Delaware County County. (nda) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE M. FAITH ANGELL, MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT PURPOSES, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 08/21/2007. 08/23/2007 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(nda) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC..(ks, ) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FRONTIER AIRLINES, INC. from Delaware County Court of Common Pleas, case number 07-8903. Certificate of Service, (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 941561)(ks, ) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 340 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?