CHAO v. KEYSTONE CONTRACTORS, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-04835
District Judge John R. Padova, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 11:33 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Chao, Elaine L. Chao, Elaine L., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "ELAINE L. CHAO"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, PROTECTIVE LIFE CORP
News Corporation Unknown Role, News Corporation
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Unknown Role, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ingersoll-Rand plc

Toggle Switch Represented by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Donald Edward Burgess +1 202 326 4000 burgess.donald@pbgc.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Kim Thu Hall +1 202 326 4199 hall.kim@pbgc.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Katherine Leong +1 202 326 4000 +1 202 326 4122 leong.katherine@pbgc.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Stephen E. Williams +1 202 326 4020 williams.steve@pbgc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Scott Risner +1 202 514 2395 +1 202 616 8470 scott.risner@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Labor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. NATALIE APPETTA
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. JOANNE BILETTA JARQUIN +1 215 861 5126 jarquin.joanne@dol.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Kristen Michelle Lindberg +1 202 693 5282 lindberg.kristen@dol.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Emelda Medrano +1 312 353 1169 +1 312 353 5698 medrano.emelda@dol.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Donald K. Neely +1 215 861 5139 neely.donald@dol.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. JOAN M. ROLLER +1 215 861 5142 roller.joan@dol.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. Mark V. Swirsky +1 215 861 5146 +1 215 861 5162 swirsky.mark@dol.gov
Chairwoman, Pension Benefits Guaranty Corp. LINDA D. THOMASSON +1 215 861 5137 thomasson.linda@dol.gov
v.
No Logo ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN INVESTOR SERVICES, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/11/2008 Russell Laurence Hirschhorn +1 212 969 3286 +1 212 969 2900 rhirschhorn@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reger Rizzo & Darnall LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/11/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert J. Foster +1 215 495 6500 +1 610 878 9902 rfoster@regerlaw.com
No Logo DONALD STAUFFER, JR., Defendant
No Logo KEYSTONE CONTRACTORS, INC., Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1001
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THIS MATTER MAY BE CLOSED STATISTICALLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/29/08. 7/30/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
    STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN INVESTOR SERVICES, INC. IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE WITH EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND OTHER EXPENSES,. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/11/2008. 6/16/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ap, ) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by ELAINE L. CHAO. (SWIRSKY, MARK) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
        ORDER THAT DEFTS KEYSTONE AND STAUFFER ARE REMOVED FROM THEIR POSITIONS AS FIDUCIARIES WITH RESPECT TO THE PLAN & J.M. PENSION ADVISORY, INC. IS APPOINTED AS AN INDEPENDENT FIDUCIARY TO ADMINISTER THE PLAN IN ORDER TO EFFECTUATE ITS TERMINATION, INCLUDING THE DISTRIBUTION OF PLAN ASSETS TO THE PARTICIPANTS AND BENEFICIARIES, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/20/08. 3/21/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None
          ORDER THAT THE 3/20/08 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS CANCELLED, AND WILL BE RESCHEDULED FOR A DATE TO BE SET.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 03/11/08. 3/13/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED (rf, ) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference filed by ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN INVESTOR SERVICES, INC... (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(FOSTER, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
              MOTION for Default Judgment as to Keystone Contractors, Inc. and Donald Stauffer, Jr. filed by ELAINE L. CHAO.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint, Exhibit A; Declaration of Mark V. Swirsky, Exhibit B; Declaration of Stephanie D. Thimodo, Exhibit C, # 2 Default Judgment, # 3 Certificate of Service)(SWIRSKY, MARK) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                Request for Default ELAINE L. CHAO against KEYSTONE CONTRACTORS, INC., DONALD STAUFFER, JR. (SWIRSKY, MARK) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                  SERVICE by Publication filed by ELAINE L. CHAO. Last publication date 1/31/2008. (SWIRSKY, MARK) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                    ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Keystone Contractors Inc. Re: accepted summons and complaint for ELAINE L. CHAO on 12/18/2007, answer due 1/7/2008. (SWIRSKY, MARK) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                      ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE IS GRANTED. THE PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED FOR 3/20/2008 09:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/5/08. 2/6/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(stb, ) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Continue Joint Motion for Continuance of Preliminary Pretrial Conference filed by ELAINE L. CHAO.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(SWIRSKY, MARK) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/26/2008 01:30 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Counsel, # 2 Scheduling Information Report)(gk, ) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                            ORDER THAT MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY RUSSELL L. HIRSCHHORN ON BEHALF OF ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN INVESTOR SERVICES, INC. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/7/2007.1/8/2008 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ap, ) Modified on 1/8/2008 (ap, ). (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                              Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN INVESTOR SERVICES, INC..(FOSTER, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to Complaint together with to Plaintiff's Complaint by ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN INVESTOR SERVICES, INC. with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (FOSTER, ROBERT) Modified on 12/26/2007 (nd). (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Russell L. Hirschhorn filed by ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN INVESTOR SERVICES, INC..Certificate of Service.(FOSTER, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. FOSTER on behalf of ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN INVESTOR SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(FOSTER, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELAINE L. CHAO. ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN INVESTOR SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 12/17/2007, answer due 2/15/2008. (SWIRSKY, MARK) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                        ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR SPECIAL ORDER DIRECTING METHOD OF SERVICE FOR DEFT DONALD STAUFFER, JR. IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 12/6/07.12/10/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                          ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SERVE PENNSYLVANIA SECRETARY OF STATE IN LIEU OF KEYSTONE CONTRACTORS, INC. IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 12/6/07.12/10/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Service for Special Order for Donald Stauffer, Jr. filed by ELAINE L. CHAO.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Donald Stauffer, Jr., # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(SWIRSKY, MARK) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Service through Special Order for Donald Stauffer, Jr. filed by ELAINE L. CHAO.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(SWIRSKY, MARK) Modified on 12/4/2007 (afm, ).(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY, REFILING CORRECT DOCUMENT) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for PERMISSION TO SERVE PENNSYLVANIA SECRETARY OF STATE IN LIEU OF KEYSTONE CONTRACTORS, INC. filed by ELAINE L. CHAO.Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit)(SWIRSKY, MARK) Modified on 12/4/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                  COMPLAINT against KEYSTONE CONTRACTORS, INC., DONALD STAUFFER, JR, ALLIANCEBERNSTEIN INVESTOR SERVICES, INC., filed by ELAINE L. CHAO.(cw, ) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?