BRADBURY v. JACKSON et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:10-cv-01855
District Judge James Knoll Gardner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo STEVEN BRADBURY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of STEVEN L. CHUNG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS A. MASTERSON, JR. +1 215 567 3000 +1 215 567 2700 tmasterson@lundylaw.com
v.
No Logo John Jackson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Scarinci & Hollenbeck

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICK J. SWEENEY +1 201 392 8900
No Logo Western Express, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Scarinci & Hollenbeck

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PATRICK J. SWEENEY +1 201 392 8900
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN re: A Telephonic Settlement Conference was held on 7/12/11 and was not placed on the record. (ky, ) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 6/13/2011. (lbs, ) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 2/11/2011. (lbs, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
        ORDER THAT AN IN PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/18/2011 09:30 AM IN Allentown BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 2/10/2011. 2/10/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lbs, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
          ORDER THAT A JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/3/2011 AT 9:30 A.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER ON 1/21/11. 1/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
            ORDER THAT, EXCEPT OTHERWISE PROVIDED BELOW, ALL DISCOVERY DUE BY 4/4/2011., MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 8/8/2011, A JURY TRIAL OF THE WITHIN CASE SHALL COMMENCE BEFORE THE UNDERSIGNED ON MONDAY, OCTOBER 3, 2011 AT 9:30 O'CLOCK A.M., OR AS SOON THEREAFTER AS THE SCHEDULE OF THE COURT PERMITS WITH THE SELECTION OF AJURY AT THE JAMES A. BYRNE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA. AFTER COMPLETION OF JURY SELECTION, THE TRIAL SHALL CONTINUE IN COURTROOM B, EDWARD N. CAHN UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 504 WEST HAMILTON STREET, ALLENTOWN, PENNSYLVANIA. THIS ORDER SHALL SERVE AS A FORMAL ATTACHMENT FOR TRAIL BEFORE HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER ON 1/14/11. 1/19/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(lbs, ) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 1/14/11. (lbs, ) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                ORDER THAT THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 1/7/11 AT 8:30 A.M. IS RESCHEDULED TO 1/14/2011 AT 9:15 A.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER ON 1/7/11. 1/7/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 11/29/2010. (lbs, ) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                    AMENDED TELEPHONIC STATUS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: THE TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT/STATUS CONFERENCE IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, NOVEMBER 3, 2010, AT 11:30 AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE IS CONTINUTED TO MONDAY, NOVEMBER 29, 2010, AT 3:30 P.M., ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 10/14/2010. 10/15/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED BY DEPUTY COURT CLERK.(lbs, ) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                      ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL IS SET FOR 1/7/2011 08:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER ON 8/20/10. 8/20/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(lbs, ) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint by JOHN JACKSON, WESTERN EXPRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(SWEENEY, PATRICK) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                          AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against JOHN JACKSON, WESTERN EXPRESS, filed by STEVEN BRADBURY.(kp, ) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                            Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by WESTERN EXPRESS.(SWEENEY, PATRICK) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                              ORDER THAT WESTERN EXPRESS SHALL FILE A CONFORMING DISCLOSURE FORM WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN IMPOSITION OF APPROPRIATE SANCTIONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER ON 6/22/10. 6/23/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(lbs, ) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL JULY 19, 2010 TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WHICH PROPERLY PLEADS THE GROUNDS UPON WHICH THE COURT'S JURISDICTION DEPENDS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE TERMS OF THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER ON 6/16/10. 6/17/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(lbs, ) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                  ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/3/2010 11:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN ON 6/15/10. 6/15/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(lbs, ) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint by JOHN JACKSON. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(SWEENEY, PATRICK) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon John Jackson by Certified Mail on 05/20/2010 (MASTERSON, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                        Order Referring Case to UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN TO SCHEDULE AND CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAMES KNOLL GARDNER ON 5/26/10. 5/27/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(lbs, ) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint by WESTERN EXPRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Service)(SWEENEY, PATRICK) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Western Express by certified mail on 05/06/2010 (MASTERSON, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT against JOHN JACKSON, WESTERN EXPRESS ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number PPE021655.), filed by STEVEN BRADBURY.(cw, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 166 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?