IN RE: CIGNA CORPORATION SECURITIES LITIGATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:02-cv-08088
District Judge Michael M. Baylson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 1:13 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo EDWARD KAMINSKI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD KAMINSKI

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHANIE M. BEIGE +1 212 779 1414 beige@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN S. COHEN +1 212 779 1414
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANCIS P. KARAM +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 karam@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy John MacFall +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 macfall@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ELEANOR MORRIS ILLOWAY +1 215 851 6700 +1 215 851 6710 emi@harkinscunningham.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTOPHER REYNA , +1 215 561 3600

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah R. Gross +1 215 561 3600 +1 215 561 3000 debbie@bernardmgross.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEITH M. FLEISCHMAN +1 212 594 5300

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara A. Podell +1 215 923 5400 +1 215 923 5400
No Logo PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHANIE M. BEIGE +1 212 779 1414 beige@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN S. COHEN +1 212 779 1414
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANCIS P. KARAM +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 karam@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy John MacFall +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 macfall@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HARKINS CUNNINGHAM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ELEANOR MORRIS ILLOWAY +1 215 851 6700 +1 215 851 6710 emi@harkinscunningham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEITH M. FLEISCHMAN +1 212 594 5300

Toggle Switch Represented by SAVETT FRUTKIN PODELL & RYAN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara A. Podell +1 215 923 5400 +1 215 923 5400
No Logo PETER SZANTO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Szanto +1 503 610 0865 +pleas eca llfirst szanto.pete@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHANIE M. BEIGE +1 212 779 1414 beige@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIAN S. COHEN +1 212 779 1414
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANCIS P. KARAM +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 karam@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy John MacFall +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 macfall@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ELEANOR MORRIS ILLOWAY +1 215 851 6700 +1 215 851 6710 emi@harkinscunningham.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah R. Gross +1 215 561 3600 +1 215 561 3000 debbie@bernardmgross.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEITH M. FLEISCHMAN +1 212 594 5300

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara A. Podell +1 215 923 5400 +1 215 923 5400
v.
Cigna Corporation Cigna Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "CIGNA CORP."

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALEXANDER R. SUSSMAN +1 212 859 8005 +1 212 859 4000 sussmal@ffhsj.com

Represented by HARKINS CUNNINGHAM

Toggle Switch Represented by SAVETT FRUTKIN PODELL & RYAN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara A. Podell +1 215 923 5400 +1 215 923 5400
No Logo H. EDWARD HANWAY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID M. MORRIS +1 212 859 8204 +1 212 859 4000 morrida@friedfrank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALEXANDER R. SUSSMAN +1 212 859 8005 +1 212 859 4000 sussmal@ffhsj.com

Represented by HARKINS CUNNINGHAM

Toggle Switch Represented by SAVETT FRUTKIN PODELL & RYAN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara A. Podell +1 215 923 5400 +1 215 923 5400
No Logo JAMES A. SEARS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/19/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY DAVID M. MORRIS +1 212 859 8204 +1 212 859 4000 morrida@friedfrank.com
TERMINATED: 07/19/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY ALEXANDER R. SUSSMAN +1 212 859 8005 +1 212 859 4000 sussmal@ffhsj.com

Represented by HARKINS CUNNINGHAM

Toggle Switch Represented by SAVETT FRUTKIN PODELL & RYAN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/19/2006 Barbara A. Podell +1 215 923 5400 +1 215 923 5400
No Logo James G. Stewart PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "JAMES G. STEWART"

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID M. MORRIS +1 212 859 8204 +1 212 859 4000 morrida@friedfrank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ALEXANDER R. SUSSMAN +1 212 859 8005 +1 212 859 4000 sussmal@ffhsj.com

Represented by HARKINS CUNNINGHAM

Toggle Switch Represented by SAVETT FRUTKIN PODELL & RYAN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara A. Podell +1 215 923 5400 +1 215 923 5400
No Logo Hewitt Associates Llc, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Hangley, Aronchick, Segal & Pudlin, Esqs.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT L. EBBY +1 215 496 7053 +5680 568 568 0300 rebby@hangley.com
No Logo INTERNATIONALE KAPITALANLAGEGESELLSCHAFT, MBH, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean M. Handler, Esq. +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@ktmc.com
No Logo Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHANIE M. BEIGE +1 212 779 1414 beige@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FRANCIS P. KARAM +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 karam@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218
No Logo THE CITY OF MIAMI GENERAL EMPLOYEES' & SANITATION EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT TRUST, Movant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (293) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER DIRECTING CY PRES DISTRIBUTION OF RESIDUAL SETTLEMENT FUNDS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/22/2016.4/22/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM.Memorandum, Declaration, Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(PODELL, BARBARA) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
      NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: LRCP 5.1.5. 08/09/2010. COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(nds) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 290 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
        ORDER APPROVING DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUND AND ALLOWING PAYMENT OF SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATION COSTS WITH COURT APPROVAL. THE COURT ALSO FINDS THAT ONE YEAR AFTER THE FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF THE NET SETTLEMENT FUND TO AUTHORIZED CLAIMANTS, IT WILL BE APPROPRIATE FOR HEFFLER TO DESTROY ALL CLAIM FORMS AND RELATED CORRESPONDENCE. THE COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER ANY FURTHER MATTER WHICH MAY ARISE IN CONNECTION WITH THIS ACTION. ( SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/8/08. ) 8/12/08 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
          MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. with Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Edward J. Sincavage, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Claim Letters, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Payable Claims, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Non-Payable Claims, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Re-Cap of Claims, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Final Bill, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Settle. Fund Analysis, # 9 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Distribution Order)(PODELL, BARBARA) Modified on 7/29/2008 (le, ). (Entered: 07/28/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
            ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT THAT PLAINTIFFS' CO-LEAD COUNSEL ARE HEREBY AWARDED 23% OF THE SETTLEMENT FUND IN FEES, WHICH THE COURT FINDS TO BE FAIR AND REASONABLE, AND $1,390,976 IN REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, ETC. LEAD PLAINTIFF PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM IS HEREBY AWARDED $86,715, THE PENNSYLVANIA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL IS AWARDED $32,240, THE PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF MISSISSIPPI IS AWARDED $11,183, AND THE MIAMI GENERAL EMPLOYEES' SANITATION EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT TRUST IS AWARDED $1,400 FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF REASONABLE COSTS AND DIRECTLY RELATING TO THEIR REPRESENTATION OF THE CLASS, ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/13/07. 7/16/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(mac, ) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
              ORDER THAT THE FEE APPLICATION IS GRANTED AND PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL ARE AWARDED ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES IN THE TOTAL AMOUNT OF $720,000, ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/13/07. 7/16/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(mac, ) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE $6,000,000 SETTLEMENT REACHED IS REASONABLE. THE ALLOCATION OF $6,000,000 FROM DEFENDANTS' INSURANCE FUNDS TOWARD SETTLEMENT OF THE CLASS SETTLEMENT OF $93,000,000 IS APPROPRIATE, AND WILL AWARD COUNSEL FEES AND COSTS OF $720,000, FINDING THE FEES SOUGHT BY DERIVATIVE COUNSEL ARE REASONABLE IN THE OVERALL CONTEXT OF THIS CASE, ONCE AGAIN APPLYING THE THIRD CIRCUIT STANDARDS AS SET FORTH IN THE PRECEDENTIAL DECISIONS NOTED ABOVE. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/13/07. 7/13/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(mac, ) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/27/07 before Judge BAYLSON. Court Reporter: LENORA KASHNER WITTJE. HEARING (jl, ) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Settlement Conference held on 4/27/07. ESR Reporter: Lenora Kashner Wittje. (gn, ) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                      ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE THAT THE DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT IS APPROVED AS FAIR, REASONABLE AND ADEQUATE AND IN THE BEST INTERESTS OF CIGNA AND ITS SHAREHOLDS AND SHALL BE CONSUMMATED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS AND CONDITIONS OF THE STIPULATION. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/30/07. ) 5/1/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2007 (mac, ). (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 282 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                        FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION AND SETTLEMENT ARE FAIR; REASONABLE AND ADEQUATE AS TO THE CLASS AND THE STIPULATION AND SETTLEMENT ARE HEREBY FINALLY APPROVED IN ALL RESPECTS, AND THE PARTIES TO THE STIPULATION ARE HEREBY DIRECTED TO CONSUMMATE AND PERFORM ITS TERMS. THE ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFTS AND WITHOUT COSTS TO ANY PARTY AS AGAINST ANY OTHER, AND ALL MEMBERS OF THE CLASS, ETC. A SEPARATE ORDER OR ORDERS SHALL BE ENTERED TO APPROVE PLFFS' CO-LEAD COUNSEL'S ATTORNEYS' FEES AND OUT-OF-POCKET EXPENSES AND ANY AWARDS OF COSTS AND EXPENSES TO PLFFS FOR REPRESENTATION OF THE CLASS, AS ALLOWED BY THE COURT, AS WELL AS THE ALLOCATION OF THE SETTLEMENT FUND. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ). 5/1/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2007 (gn, ). (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE THE DEFINITION OF "SETTLED CLAIMS" IN PARAGRAPH 23 OF THE STIPULATION IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS: "SETTLED CLAIMS" SHALL COLLECTIVELY MEAN ANY AND ALL CLAIMS (INCLUDNG UNKNOWN CLAIMS), ACTIONS, DEMANDS, ALLEGATIONS, RIGHTS, LIABILITIES, ETC. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/23/07. ) 4/25/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EVELYN HOBBS re 279 Memorandum, 276 MOTION for Settlement, 278 Memorandum, 277 Declaration (HARWOOD, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                              Memorandum of Law in Support re 276 MOTION for Settlement and Fee Application filed by EVELYN HOBBS. (Attachments: # 1 Compendium of Unpublished Opinions# 2 Compendium Part 2# 3 Compendium Part 3# 4 Compendium Part 4# 5 Compendium Part 5)(HARWOOD, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                Memorandum re 276 MOTION for Settlement filed by EVELYN HOBBS. (HARWOOD, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                  Declaration re 276 MOTION for Settlement in Support of Settlement & Fee Application by EVELYN HOBBS. (HARWOOD, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                    MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT filed by EVELYN HOBBS, CERTIFICATION OF COUNSEL. (HARWOOD, ROBERT) Modified on 4/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                      APPENDIX OF ATTORNEY DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD FOR ATTORNEY FEES by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM.Appendix of Attorney Declarations - Part 1 of 3. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Part 2 of 3# 2 Appendix Part 3 of 3)(PODELL, BARBARA) Modified on 4/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                        EXHIBITS A&B IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM.(PODELL, BARBARA) Modified on 4/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                          MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES AND REIMBUSEMENT OF REASONABLE COSTS AND EXPENSES filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supporting Memorandum - Part 1 of 2# 2 Supplement Supporting Memorandum - Part 2 of 2# 3 Text of Proposed Order Order and Final Judgment Approving an Award)(PODELL, BARBARA) Modified on 4/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                            EXHIBIT C IN SUPPORT OF JOINT DECLARATION filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Declaration - Exhibit C - Part 2 of 2)(PODELL, BARBARA) Modified on 4/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                              EXHIBIT B IN SUPPORT OF JOINT DECLARATION filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM.(PODELL, BARBARA) Modified on 4/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                EXHIBIT A IN SUPPORT OF JOINT DECLARATION filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: # Exhibit A - Part 1 of 4. (1) Exhibit Joint Declaration - Exhibit A - Part 2 of 4# 2 Exhibit Joint Declaration - Exhibit A - Part 3 of 4# 3 Exhibit Joint Declaration - Exhibit A - Part 4 of 4)(PODELL, BARBARA) Modified on 4/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                  JOINT DECLARATION OF SHERRIE R. SAVETT AND FRANCIS P. KARAM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Part 1 of 2 Supplement Joint Declaration - Part 2 of 2)(PODELL, BARBARA) Modified on 4/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF EDWARD J. SINCAVAGE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(PODELL, BARBARA) Modified on 4/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Settlement filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, PROPOSED ORDER. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Lead Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation# 2 Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment of Dismissal With Prejudice# 3 Supplement Certificate of Service)(PODELL, BARBARA) Modified on 4/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 266 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                        Memorandum of Law In Support of Final Approval of Settlement filed by CIGNA CORP., Certificate of Service.(ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) Modified on 4/20/2007 (fh) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by JACOB A. GOLDBERG(GOLDBERG, JACOB) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR FCI TO SERVE THE POTENTIAL OBJECTION IS EXTENDED TO 4/13/07. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/10/07. ) 4/12/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2007 (gn, ). (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 263 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT, AS SET FORTH IN THE STIPULATION IS PRELIMINARILY APPROVED AS FAIR, REASONABLE AND ADEQUATE. THE SETTLEMENT HEARING SHALL BE HELD ON 4/27/2007 AT 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 3A, ETC. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/24/07. ) 1/29/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2007 (gn, ). (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                ORDER THAT A HEARING SHALL BE HELD BEFORE THIS COURT ON 4/27/2007 AT 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 3A FOR PURPOSES OF CONSIDERING: (a) WHETHER THE DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT, ON THE TERMS AND CONDITIONS SET FORTH IN THE STIPULATION, SHOULD BE APPROVED BY THE COURT. (b) WHETHER THE COURT SHOULD ENTER AN "ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL," IN THE FORM ANNEXED TO THE STIPULATION AS EXHIBIT C, DISMISS THE SETTLED DERIVATIVE CLAIMS AS PROVIED IN THE STIPULATION, ETC. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/25/07. ) 1/29/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2007 (gn, ). (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 261 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ORDER OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT FILED BY EVELYN HOBBS, Certificate of Service (STIPULATION AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ATTACHED). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(HARKINS, JOHN) Modified on 1/25/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ORDER OF PRELIMINAY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, (STIPULATION AND SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ATTACHED), EXHIBITS. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Stipulation And Agreement Of Settlement# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 6 Exhibit Exhibit B)(SAVETT, SHERRIE) Modified on 1/25/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. 240) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/22/07. ) 1/23/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (gn, ) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Daniella Quitt, Esq. filed by EVELYN HOBBS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Application of Daniella Quitt, Esq. and [Proposed] Order)(GOLDBERG, JACOB) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT I. HARWODD, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/10/07. ) 1/11/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Robert I. Harwood filed by EVELYN HOBBS.application, certificate of service. (Attachments: # 1 Application of Robert I. Harwood and Proposed Order)(GOLDBERG, JACOB) (Entered: 01/07/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE by EVELYN HOBBS Change of Firm Name (GOLDBERG, JACOB) (Entered: 01/07/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by JACOB A. GOLDBERG on behalf of EVELYN HOBBS with Certificate of Service (GOLDBERG, JACOB) (Entered: 01/07/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DATE FOR PLFFS AND DEFTS TO SERVE ANY REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS IS EXTENDED TO 12/22/06. THE DATE FOR PLFFS AND DEFTS TO FILE MOTINS IN LIMINE, PRETRIAL MEMORANDA AND DAUBERT MOTIONS IS EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING 1/18/07, THE DATE TO FILE RESPONDING BRIEFS IS EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING 2/2/07, AND THE DATE FOR FILING REPLY BRIEFS, IF ANY, IS EXTENDED TO AND INCLUDING 2/9/07. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 11/29/06. ) 11/29/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Telephone Conference held on 9/22/06 regarding status. (gn, ) (Entered: 10/13/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      APPENDIX Volume III in support of defts' motion for summary judgment, filed by CIGNA CORP. ( UNDER SEAL) (gn) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 240 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CIGNA CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(HARKINS, JOHN) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DATE FOR DEFTS TO FILE THEIR REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONFOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS EXTENDED FROM 10/3/06 TO 10/11/06. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/6/06. ) 10/10/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE : Telephone Conference held on 10/3/06 (gn, ) (Entered: 10/04/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DATE FOR PLFFS AND DEFTS TO SERVE ANY REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS IS EXTENDED FORM 10/10/06 TO 12/8/06. THE DATE FOR PLSS AND DEFTS TO FILE MOTIONS IN LIMINE, PRETRIAL MEMORANDA AND DAUBERT MOTIONS IS EXTENDED FROM 10/13/06 TO 12/22/06. THE DATE FOR FILING OPPOSITION BRIEFS IS 1/120/07, AND THEDATE FOR FILING REPLY BRIEFS IS 1/17/07. THE DATE THAT THE CASE WILL ENTER THE TRIAL POOL IS A DATE TO BE FIXED BY THE COURT AFTER 3/1/07. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ) 9/29/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to defts' motion for summary judgment, filed by plff PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Statement of Disputed or Undisputed Facts. (Appendix Boxes 1 and 2) ( UNDER SEAL) (gn, ) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DATE FOR PLFFS AND DEFTS TO SERVE ANY REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS IS EXTENDED FROM 10/6/06 TO 10/10/06. THE DATE OFR PLFFS AND DEFTS TO FILE MOTIONS IN LIMINE, PRETRIAL MEMO AND DAUBERT MOTIONS IS EXTENDED FROM 10/10/06 TO 10/13/06. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 9/19/06. ) 9/21/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2006 (gn, ). (Entered: 09/21/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Telephone Conference held on 8/10/06 (gn, ) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Motion Hearing held on 08/18/06 Court Reporter: Lenora Kashner Wittje.Court will grant class action motion. (jjf, ) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        APPENDIX VOLUME II by deft CIGNA CORP. in support of defts' motion for summary judgment. (gn, ) Modified on 9/5/2006 (rs, ). (FILED UNDER SEAL) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          APPENDIX VOLUME 1 by deft CIGNA CORP. in support of their motion for summary judgment. (gn, ) Modified on 9/5/2006 (rs, ).(FILED UNDER SEAL) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CIGNA CORP..Proposed Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(HARKINS, JOHN) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER THAT PLFF SHALL ON OR BEFORE 9/8/06 SUBMIT TO DEFT A WRITTEN GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DEMAND, ETC. A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/3/2006 AT 04:00 PM. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ) 8/25/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE : Telephone Conference held on 8/24/06 (gn, ) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE : Telephone Conference held on 8/21/06 (gn, ) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE COURT HELD A DISCOVERY HEARING ON 8/18/06, AS WAS SCHEDULED IN ITS MEMO AND ORDER RE: "PRICING GUIDELINES" DATED 8/11/06. THE TRANSCRIPT OF THE HEARING WILL CONTAIN THE COURT'S DETAILED RULINGS. HOWEVER, THE COURT DID PROVIDE FOR A CONTINUED DEPOSITION OF CATHERINE OVERBYE, AND STATED THE TERMS UNDER WHICH PLFFS MIGHT JUSTIFY FURTHER DEPOSITION OF MR. CARDANI, ETC. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/21/06. ) 8/23/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/18/06 before Judge Michael M. Baylson. ESR Reporter: L. Kashner Wittje. (gn, ) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDOMG CLASS CERTIFICATION THAT MPERS AND MIAMI EMPLOYEES HAVE MET THE REQUIREMENT FRCP 23(a) AND 23(b)(3), ETC. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/18/06. ) 8/21/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(gn, ) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO 182) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/18/06. )8/21/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (gn, ) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 8/21/2006 AT 04:30 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 8/14/06. ) 8/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: "PRICING GUIDELINES" DOCUMENTS: IF THIS ISSUE HAS NOT BEEN RESOLVED BY COUNSEL, THE COURT WILL HOLD A HEARONG ON THE ISSUE ON 8/18/06 AT 10:00AM IN COURTROOM 3A. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/11/06. ) 8/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                APPENDIX to plffs' reply to defts' opposition to the Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi's and Miami General employees' and Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust's motion for class certification. (gn, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Plffs' Reply to defts' opposition To the Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi's and Miani General Employees' and Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust's motion for class certification, filed by plffs'. (gn, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR CIGNA TO SERVE A DECLARATION CONCERNING THE DISPUTE ABOUT THE TES DATA BASE IS EXTENDED (2) BUSINESS DAYS FROM 8/4/06 TO 8/8/06. THE TIME FOR CIGNA TO SERVE ITS RESPONSES IS EXTENDED (2) BUSINESS DAYS FROM 8/11/06 TO 8/15/06. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/7/06. ) 8/7/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (gn, ) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 196 MOTION to Certify Class filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF MISSISSIPPI. (BEIGE, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 08/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/21/06 before Judge BAYLSON. Court Reporter: L. KASHER WITTJE. CONTINUATION OF HEARING HELD VIA TELEPHONE CONFERENCE (jl, ) Modified on 7/27/2006 (jl, ). (Entered: 07/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT CIGNA SHALL SERVE A DECLARATION CONCERNING THE DISPUTE ABOUT THE TES DATA BASE BY 8/4/06, ETC. PLFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL WITH REGARD INTERROGATORY NO. 6, FIRST SET, IS DENIED FOR THE REASONS STATED ON THE RECORD, ETC. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/25/06. ) 7/27/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Telephone Conference held on 7/21/06 (gn, ) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              APPENDIX to defts' memorandum of law in opposition to MPERS'S and MIAMI EMPLOYEES' motion for class certification. (gn, ) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 195 MOTION to Certify Class and Memorandum of Law filed by CIGNA CORP., Certificate of Service. (HARKINS, JOHN) Modified on 7/24/2006 (np). (Entered: 07/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT JAMES A. SEAS IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS A DEFT IN THE MATTER. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/18/06. ) 7/20/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 07/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/28/06 before Judge BAYLSON. Court Reporter: ANN FUHRMAN. HEARING (jl, ) (Entered: 07/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Telephone Conference held on 5/17/06 (gn, ) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Telephone Conference held on 6/14/06 (gn, ) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/14/06 before Judge BAYLSON. Court Reporter: LENORA KASHNER WITTJE. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE (jl, ) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/14/05 before Judge BAYLSON. Court Reporter: LENORA KASHNER WITTJE. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE (jl, ) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT AMENDS THE 12/30/2005 REVISED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AS FULLY OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/14/06. 6/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(le, ) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 214 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT LEAD PLFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTATION OF RESPONSES (DOC. NO. 204), LEAD PLFF'S SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (DOC. NO. 206) AND DEFTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVEY AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (DOC. NO. 205), THESE MOTIONS ARE ALL GRANTED IN PART ANDDENIED IN PART. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/15/06. ) 6/16/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (gn, ) Modified on 6/16/2006 (gn, ). (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Pretrial Telephone Conference held on 6/15/06 (gn, ) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery And For A Protective Order filed by EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Declaration, Certificate of Service with Exhibits Attached. (Exhibit C FILED UNDER SEAL) (ac, ) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PARTIES AGREE TO A 1 DAY EXTENSION UNTIL 6/13/2006 TO FILE ALL OPPOSITION BRIEFS ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL... SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/12/06. 6/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. MAILED BY CHAMBERS 6/12/06.(afm, ) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/12/06.6/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. MAILED BY CHAMBERS 6/12/06. (afm, ) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 205 MOTION to Compel Discovery And For A Protective Order filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(BEIGE, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 206 MOTION to Compel, 204 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by CIGNA CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tabs 1-4)(ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by SHANON J. CARSON on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY, FILED BY LEAD PLFF PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION, EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(gn, ) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Discovery And For A Protective Order filed by CIGNA CORP..Memorandum, Certificate of Compliance, Certificate of Service, Proposed Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A# 2 Exhibit Ex A-1# 3 Exhibit Ex A-2# 4 Exhibit Ex A-3# 5 Exhibit Exs. B through I)(ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO COMPEL (1) SUPPLEMENTATION OF DEFTS' RESPONSE TO LEAD PLFF'S STATEMENT OF FACTUAL CONTENTIONS ON LIABILITY AND DAMAGES AND (2) THE PRODUCTION OF E-MAILS FROM THE BACK-UP TAPES OF ANDREA ANANIA FROM OCTOBER 2001 THROUGH DECEMBER 2001, FILED BY LEAD PLFF PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ( EXHIBIT B) ( EXHIBIT A UNDER SEAL ) (gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2006 (gn, ). Modified on 6/5/2006 (gn, ). (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF BRIAN S. COHEN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/1/06. ) 6/5/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(gn, ) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JEFFREY M. HABER, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON undated. ) 6/5/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(gn, ) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF TIMOTHY J. MACFALL, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 6/1/06. ) 6/5/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(gn, ) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION/MOTION for Admission PRO HAC VICE Of BRIAN COHEN, ESQ., JEFFREY HABER, ESQ., TIMOTHY MACFALL, ESQ. filed by EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. Cert. of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Jeffrey Haber# 2 Timothy MacFall)(pr, ) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION by plffs' EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM for pro hac vice of BRIAN S. COHEN, Statement, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION by plffs' EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM for pro hac vice of JEFFREY M. HABER, Statement, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION by plffs' EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM for pro hac vice of TIMOTHY J. MACFALL, Statement, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Certify Class filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF MISSISSIPPI.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 # 7)(BEIGE, STEPHANIE) Modified on 6/5/2006 (md) (DUPLICATE ENTRY) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Certify Class filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF MISSISSIPPI.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Text of Proposed Order # 7)(BEIGE, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT PLFFS AND DEFT SHALL FILE DISCOVERY MOTIONS BY 6/2/06. ALL DISCOVERY RELATED TO THE TWO RECENTLY- ADDED PROPOSED CLASS REPRESENTATIVES SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 6/30/06. THE MOTIONS DOCKETED AS DOC. NO. 157 AND DOC. NO. 179 ARE DENIED AS MOOT. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/24/06. )5/25/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2006 (gn, ). (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Pretrial Telephone Conference held on 5/24/06 (gn, ) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment Seeking Dismissal of SERS's Claims for Lack of Economic Loss and Loss Causation filed by CIGNA CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Response to Statement of Disputed and Undisputed Facts# 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit)(ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT BY 5/16/06, HEWITT SHALL PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO THE SUBPOENA, AS NARROWED, RELATING TO ANY AUDIT HEWITT PERFORMED OF CIGNA'S WORK FOR THE FOLLOWING HEWITT CLIENTS: HONEYWELL, DUKE ENERGY ET AL. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/5/06. ) 5/8/06 ENTERED AND COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix of EXHIBITS to lead plff's memorandum in opposition to defts' motion for summary judgment seeking dismissal of SERS' Claims for lack of economic loss and loss causation. (gn, ) (Entered: 05/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SER'S Statement of disputed and Undisputed Facts by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF MISSISSIPPI, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2006 (gn, ). (Entered: 05/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to defts' motion for summary judgment seeking dismissal of SERS' Claims for lack of economic loss and loss causation, filed by defts' PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF MISSISSIPPI, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2006 (gn, ). (Entered: 05/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response of Non-Party Hewitt Associates LLC to lead plff's motion to compel compliance with subpoena dated 1/17/06, Certificate of Service.(gn, ) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT L. EBBY on behalf of non-party HEWITT ASSOCIATES LLC, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR FILING PLFF'S OPPOSITION BRIEF IS EXTENDED (7) DAYS FROM 4/27/06 TO 5/4/06. THE TIME FOR FILING DEFTS' REPLY IS EXTENDED (10) DAYS FROM 5/8/06 TO 5/18/06. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 4/19/06. ) 4/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint - Second Revised Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by CIGNA CORP. with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) Modified on 4/20/2006 (np). (Entered: 04/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPENDIX I and APPENDIX II in support of defts' motion for summary judgment seeking dismissal of SERS'S claims for lack of economic loss and loss causation, filed by deft CIGNA CORP.(gn, ) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment Seeking Dismissal of SERS's Claims for Lack of Economic Loss and Loss Causation filed by CIGNA CORP..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Seeking Dismissal of SERS's Claims for Lack of Economic Loss and Loss Causation)(HARKINS, JOHN) (Entered: 04/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second Revised Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint against CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS filed by EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, jury demand, certificate of service.(fdc) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT LEAD PLAINTIFF SERS' MOTION TO ALLOW MIAMI EMPLOYEES AND MPERS TO INTERVENE AS ADDITIONAL PROPOSED CLASS REPRESENTATIVES IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE LEGROME D. DAVIS FOR MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/30/06. 3/31/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Compliance by Hewitt Associates LLC with Subpoena dated January 17, 2006 filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM.Memorandum, Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel# 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel# 3 Exhibit B to Memorandum# 4 Proposed Order# 5 Certificate of Service)(SAVETT, SHERRIE) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 178 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS CERTAIN CLAIMS (DOCKET NO. 166) IS CONSIDERED AS A MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. PLFF SHALL FILE A NEW REVISED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, MAKING THE DELETIONS SPECIFIED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM AND NOT MAKING ANY ADDITIONS, BY 4/7/06. DEFT SHALL FILE ITS ANSWER WITHIN (20) DAYS OF SERVICE OF THE NEW REVISED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. THE CURRENT SCHEDULING ORDER SHALL REMAIN IN EFFECT. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/24/06.) 3/27/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (gn, ) Modified on 3/30/2006 (gn, ). (Entered: 03/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Support re 168 MOTION to Intervene The Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi and City of Miami General Employees' and Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust to Serve as Additional Proposed Class Representatives filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Certificate of Service. (BEIGE, STEPHANIE) Modified on 3/21/2006 (np). (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of 166 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims in the Revised Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by CIGNA CORP., Certificate of Service. (HARKINS, JOHN) Modified on 3/21/2006 (np). (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 166 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims in the Revised Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (BEIGE, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of Law in Opposition re 168 MOTION to Intervene filed by CIGNA CORP., Certificate of Service. (HARKINS, JOHN) Modified on 3/9/2006 (np). (Entered: 03/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER THE COMPLETION OF DISCOVERY IS BY 3/27/2006. DEFTS' DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 4/4/2006. PLFF'S OPPOSITION BRIEF SHALL BE FILED ON 4/27/06, INSTEAD OF 4/25/06. DEFTS' REPLY SHALL BE FILED ON 5/8/06, INSTEAD OF 5/4/06. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 2/28/06. ) 3/1/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL GRANT THE PENDING MOTION (DOC. NO. 170) AND WILL GRANT AN EXTENSION TO AND INCLUDING 3/8/06. DEFTS' REPLY BRIEF WILL BE DUE ON 3/20/06. AS TOTHE PNEDING JOINT MOTION TO INTERVENE (DOC. NO. 168), THE DEFTS' BRIEF SHALL ALSO BE FILED BY 3/8/06, AND PLFF'S REPLY IS DE ON 3/20/06. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 2/28/06. ) 3/1/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 170 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by CIGNA CORP., Certificate of Service. (HARKINS, JOHN) Modified on 2/27/2006 (np). (Entered: 02/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFS' MOTION TO DISMISS, FILED BY LEAD PLFF'S PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(gn, ) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 169 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE COMPLETION OF DISCOVERY IS EXTENDED TO 3/23/2006. DEFTS' DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 4/4/2006. PLFF'S OPPOSITION BRIEF SHALL BE FILED ON 4/25/06. DEFTS' REPLY SHALL BE FILED ON 5/4/06. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 2/21/06. ) 2/23/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION TO INTERVENE AND TO SERVE AS ADDITIONAL PROPOSED CLASS REPRESENTATIVES, FILED BY THE CITY OF MIAMI GENERAL EMPLOYEES' & SANITATION EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT TRUST, PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF MISSISSIPPI, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(gn, ) (Entered: 02/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS by defts' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS in support defts' motion to dismiss certain claims in the revised consolidated amended class action complaint. (gn, ) (Entered: 02/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims in the Revised Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by CIGNA CORP..Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Proposed Order.(ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) (Entered: 02/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CIGNA CORP..(ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) (Entered: 02/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS DENIED AS MOOT. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 2/2/06.) 2/6/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (gn, ) (Entered: 02/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 163 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS (DOC. NOS. 131 AND 133) ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/31/06.) 2/1/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (gn, ) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (DOC. NO. 126) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFT'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. NO. 130) IS GRANTED. DEFT'S MOTION TO QUASH OR MODIFY SUBPOENA AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (DOC. NO. 94) IS DENIED AS MOOT. AS TO PLFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL (DOC. NO. 132), RELATING TO THE "MILLER SPREADSHEET," THE PARTIES HAS AGREED TO CONTINUE FURTHER NEGOTIATIONS ON THE SUBJECT MATER OF THIS MOTION. THE COURT IS THEREFORE HOLDING THE MOTION UNDER ADVISEMENT, AND COUNSEL SHALL REPORT FURTHER TO THE COURT WITHIN (14) DAYS. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/31/06.) 2/1/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (gn, ) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/26/06 before Judge Michael M. Baylson. ESR Reporter: L. Kashner Wittje. (gn, ) (Entered: 01/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/16/05 before Judge Michael M. Baylson. ESR Reporter: L. Kashner Wittje. (gn, ) (Entered: 01/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Hearing on Motions held on 1/26/06 ESR Reporter: Lenora Kashner-Wittje. (gn, ) (Entered: 01/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Memorandum in support of its pending discovery motions filed by lead plff PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 01/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct Reply Memorandum filed by CIGNA CORP..motion, proposed order. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Plaintiff's Third Party Subpoenas)(ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Support re 131 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Third Party Subpoenas filed by CIGNA CORP., Certificate of Service. (ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) Modified on 1/24/2006 (np). (Entered: 01/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 126 MOTION to Compel Discovery From SERS, 130 Supplemental MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff filed by CIGNA CORP., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A through E to Defendants' Reply) (ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) Modified on 1/24/2006 (np). (Entered: 01/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CORRECTED MEMORANDUM IS GRANTED AND ITS CORRECTED MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THIRD PARTY SUBPOENAS IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE LAWRENCE F. STENGEL FOR JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/20/06.) 1/23/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (gn, ) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT DEFT'S PRIOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 121) IS DENIED AS MOOT. PLFF'S CORRECTED MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (DOC. NO. 147), PLFF'S PRIOR MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (DOC. NO. 136) ARE DENIED AS MOOT. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/18/06.) 1/20/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS (gn, ) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THIRD PARTY SUBPOENAS, FILED BY PLFF PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (EXHIBIT A CORRECTED MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS' MOTION ATTACHED. (UNDER SEAL)(gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2006 (gn, ). (Entered: 01/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPENDIX submitted in opposition to plff's motions to compel filed by defts' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS. (gn, ) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 132 First MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents and Witness Testimony Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) Notices of Deposition, 147 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by CIGNA CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 133 MOTION for Discovery Lead Plaintiff's Motion For An Order With Respect To The Scope of Customer Discovery re Form of Third Party Customer Subpoena filed by CIGNA CORP.. (ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM re 144 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Signed (SAVETT, SHERRIE) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Lead Plaintiff's Corrected Memorandum In Support of Its Motion To Compel Production of Documents Pursuant To Plaintiff's First and Second Sets For Request of Production Of Documents Directed To All Defendants# 2 Corrected Proposed Order# 3 Certificate of Service)(SAVETT, SHERRIE) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE TO FILE A CORRECTED MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED. PLFF SHALL FILE THE CORRECTED MOTION TO COMPEL NO LATER THAN 1/18/05. DEFT SHALL RESPOND BY 1/23/06. PLFF SHALL REPLY BY 1/25/06. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/17/06.) 1/18/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (gn, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defts' Supplemental Motion to Compel Discovery from Plff filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Cert of Serv. (Attachments: # 1)(jmp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 131 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Third Party Subpoenas Lead Plaintiff's Memorandum In Opposition To Defendants' Motion For A Protective Order Regarding Third Party Subpoenas filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-I to Lead Plaintiffs Memorandum In Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Protective Order Regarding Third Party Subpoenas# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# 3 Certificate of Service)(SAVETT, SHERRIE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE DOCUMENT) Modified on 1/18/2006 (np). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2006 (np, ). (Entered: 01/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT LEAD PLFF PA. STATE EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM SHALL FILE ITS MOTION TO COMPEL CONCERNING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS REQUESTED BY LEAD PLFF'S FIRST AND SECOND DOCUMENT REQUESTS ON 1/9/06. PLFFS SHALL FILE OPPOSITION BRIEFS TO DEFTS' DISCOVERY MOTIONS ON 1/17/06. DEFTS SHALL FILE OPPOSITION BRIEFS TO LEAD PLFF'S DISCOVERY MOTIONS BY 1/18/06. THE PARTIES' REPLY BRIEFS REGARDING ALL DISCOVERY MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON 1/23/06. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 1/11/06. ) 1/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Pretrial Telephone Conference held on 12/29/05 (gn, ) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Motion to Compel filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Lead Plaintiff's Corrected Motion To Compel Production of Documents Pursuant To Plaintiff's First and Second Sets For Request For Production Of Documents Directed To All Defendants# 2 Lead Plaintiff's Corrected Memorandum In Support Of Its Motion To Compel Production of Documents Pursuant To Plaintiff's First And Second Sets For Request Of Production Of Documents Directed To All Defendants# 3 Corrected Proposed Order# 4 Certificate of Service)(SAVETT, SHERRIE) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM re 136 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Memo in Support of Motion to Compel and Proposed Order (CARSON, SHANON) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM re 133 MOTION for Discovery Lead Plaintiff's Motion For An Order With Respect To The Scope of Customer Discovery Corrected Certificate of Service (SAVETT, SHERRIE) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Revised Consolidated AMENDED Class Action COMPLAINT by plff PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Certificate of Service.(gn, ) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to defts' motion to compel discovery from SERS, filed by lead plff PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 List of Exhibits) (gn, ) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Lead Plaintiffs Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel Production of Documents# 2 Proposed Order in Support of Lead Plaintiffs Motion to Compel)(SAVETT, SHERRIE) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM re 133 MOTION for Discovery Lead Plaintiff's Motion For An Order With Respect To The Scope of Customer Discovery (PODELL, BARBARA) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Francis P. Karam in support of plff's motion to compel. (UNDER SEAL) (gn, ) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Discovery Lead Plaintiff's Motion For An Order With Respect To The Scope of Customer Discovery filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Its Motion re Scope of Customer Discovery# 2 Schedule A to Memorandum# 3 Proposed Order)(CARSON, SHANON) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION to Compel The Production of Documents and Witness Testimony Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) Notices of Deposition filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# 3 Certificate of Service)(BEIGE, STEPHANIE) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Third Party Subpoenas filed by CIGNA CORP..Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A & B)(ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) Modified on 1/11/2006 (cdd, ). (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental MOTION to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff filed by CIGNA CORP., Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B )(ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) Modified on 1/11/2006 (cdd, ). (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF WILL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 1/9/2006. DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/21/2006. MOTIONS IN LIMINE, PRETRIAL MEMORANDA AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 10/10/2006. ARGUMENT ON DISCOVERY ISSUES IS SCHEDULED FOR 1/26/2006 AT 2:00 PM. THIS CASE WILL ENTER THE COURT'S TRIAL POOL ON 11/13/2006. SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/30/2005. 12/30/2005 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 12/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order Revised Pretrial Scheduling Order filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM..(SAVETT, SHERRIE) (Entered: 12/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Pretrial Order Defendants' Motion for Proposed Revised Pretrial Scheduling Order by CIGNA CORP.. (HARKINS, JOHN) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Discovery From SERS filed by CIGNA CORP..Memorandum, Brief, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service.(ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, AS TO PARAGRAPHS 247 THROUGH 250 OF THE PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT, IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE COURT WILL REQUIRE EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND THE OPPORTUNITY FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ON ECONOMIC LOSS AND LOSS CAUSATION ISSUES. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM, BY 1/9/06. THE PARTIES SHALL DISCUSS AND SUBMIT EITHER A JOINT OR SEPARATE PROPOSED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE COURT BY 12/28/05 AT 12:00 P.M., AND, AS PER THE COURT'S PRIOR AGREEMENT WITH COUNSEL, THE COURT SHALL HOLD A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL ON 12/28/05 AT 4:00 P.M.SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/23/05. 12/23/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED BY CHAMBERS AND E-MAILED.(cdd, ) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE TWO ABOVE CAPTIONED CASES 02-8271 AND 02-9135 ARE CONSOLIDATED WITH 02-8088 AND THAT THE CAPTION OF THIS CASE SHALL HEREAFTER BE REFERRED TO AS IN RE: CIGNA CORPORATION SECURITIES LITIGATION. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO MARK THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL REASONS. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/13/05. ) 12/20/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 12/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO AMEND/CORRECT SCHEDULING ORDER (DOC. NO. 73) IS DENIED. THE COURT WILL SET A REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER WHEN APPROPRIATE. THE MOTIONS FOR LEAVE (DOC. NO.'S 90, 95 AND 115)ARE ALL DENIED AS MOOT . SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 12/15/05.12/16/05 ENTERED. COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS ON 12/15/05. (gs) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appenidx by defts' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS in support of defts' motion for summary judgment. (gn, ) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CIGNA CORP..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1)(HARKINS, JOHN) (Entered: 12/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response of Defendants to Lead Plaintiff SERS's Post-Argument Memorandum and in Further Support of Their Motion to Dismiss SER's Claims by CIGNA CORP., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (HARKINS, JOHN) Modified on 12/7/2005 (np). (Entered: 12/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Post-Argument Memorandum of Pennsylvania State Employees' Retirement System, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (gn, ) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Hearing on Motions held on 11/16/05. Counsel argues on MOTION to Remand. Court Reporter: Lenora Kashner Wittje. (gs) (Entered: 11/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL ALLOW THE EXISTING CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT OT BE AMENDED TO ADD PARAGRAPHS 247-250, WHICHASSERT ALLEGATIONS UNDER THE CATEGORY OF LOSS CAUSATION. THE COURT WILL CONSIDER THE PENDING DEFENDANTS' MOTIO FOR DISMISSAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS SERS, ETC. PLAINTIFFS MAY FILE A RESPONSIVE BRIEF BY NOVEMBER 29, 2005. DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A REPLY BRIEF BY DECEMBER 6, 2005, ETC . SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 11/23/05. 11/25/05 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS 11/23/05.(ac, ) (Entered: 11/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/16/05 before Judge BAYLSON. Court Reporter: L. KASHNER WITTJE. HEARING (jl, ) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REVISED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, FILED BY LEAD PLFFS' PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(gn, ) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLFFS AND DEFTS HEREBY STIPULATION AND AGREE THAT THE COMPLAINTS IN 02-8204; 02-8217; 02-8261; 02-8281; 02-9024; AND 02-9073 ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND PLFFS JEFFREY LUBIN, JEAN MULLIN, JANIS DOLAN, HARVARD KOLM, JOSEPH G. BLANDFORD AND JEREMY SCHIFF ARE WITHDRAWN AS NAMED PLFFS IN THE CONSOLIDATED ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHTS AS MEMBERS OF THE CLASS. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 11/9/05. ) 11/14/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 11/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS by defts' to motion for leave to file corrected sur-reply memorandum in support of their motion for dismissal of SERS and in opposition to SERS's motion to amend (See Paper #112). (Attachments: # 1 proposed order)(gn, ) (Entered: 10/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Sur-Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Dismissal of SERS and in Opposition to SERS's Motion to Amend filed by CIGNA CORP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) Modified on 10/26/2005 (np). (Entered: 10/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Barbara A. Podell. (gn, ) (Entered: 10/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS to reply memorandum in support of motion for class certification, filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (gn, ) (Entered: 10/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum in support of motion for class certification, filed by deft PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 10/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLFF SHALL FILE ITS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF CLASS CERTIFICATION BY 10;24/05. DEFTS SHALL FILE A SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO PLFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND BY 10/18/05. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/17/05. ) 10/21/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 90 MOTION for Leave to File, 81 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Sur-Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Dismissal of SERS and in Opposition to SERS' Motion to Amend filed by CIGNA CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit in Support)(ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: ORAL ARGUMENT HEARING ON OUTSTANDING MOTIONS SET FOR 11/16/2005 03:00 PM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. (ltm, ) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT DEFTS' REQUEST FOR ASSIGNMENT IS DENIED, AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE CASES SHALL REMAIN ON THE CALENDARS OF THE JUDGES AS ASSIGNED OR UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE JAMES T. GILES ON 10/12/05. ) 10/13/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 10/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge MICHAEL M. BAYLSON : Telephone Conference held on 9/22/05 (gn, ) (Entered: 10/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY Memorandum in Further Support of Motion re 94 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena and for a Protective Order in further support of Defendants' Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoenas and for a Protective Order filed by CIGNA CORP., Certificate of Service. (ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) Modified on 10/13/2005 (np). (Entered: 10/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and Order by CIGNA CORP.. (ILLOWAY, ELEANOR) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 10/12/2005 (np). (Entered: 10/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS to defts' Memorandum of Law in opposition to SERS' motion for class certification filed by defts' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS. (gn, ) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to defts' motion to quash or modify subpoena and for a protective order, filed by plff PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 88 MOTION to Certify Class filed by CIGNA CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander R. Sussman in Support of Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to SERS' Motion for Class Certification)(HARKINS, JOHN) (Entered: 10/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFTS' MOTION TO QUASH OR MODIFY SUBPOENA AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IS DUE ON 10/6/05. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/3/05. ) 10/4/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) Modified on 10/4/2005 (gn, ). (Entered: 10/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Carole A. Broderick. (gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2005 (gn, ). (Entered: 09/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX of Exhibits to Lead Plff's reply memorandum in support of its motion for leave to file revised consolidated amended class action complaint and sur-reply in opposition to defts' cross-motion to dismiss SERS' claims, filed by lead plff PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (gn, ) (Entered: 09/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE T FILE REVISED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS' CROSS-MOTION TO DISMISS SERS' CLAIMS, FILED BY LEAD PLFF PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (REPLY MEMORANDUM ATTACHED)(gn, ) (Entered: 09/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena and for a Protective Order filed by CIGNA CORP..Memorandum, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(HARKINS, JOHN) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER TO JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. ( SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 9/13/05. ) 9/13/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 9/13/2005 (gn, ). (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Appendix defts' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS to memorandum of law in further support of defts' motion for dismissal of lead plff SERS and in opposition to SERS' motion to file a proposed revised second amended class action complaint.(gn, ) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Alexander R. Sussman in support of defts' memorandum of law in further support of defts' motion for dismissal of lead plff SERS and in opposition to SERS' motion to file a proposed revised second amended class action complaint. (gn, ) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF LEAD PLFF PA. STATE EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM, FILED BY DEFT'S CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. ( REPLY MEMORANDUM ATTACHED). (Attachments: # 1 TOC# 2 TOA# 3 memo of law# 4 order# 5 proposed order)(gn, ) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by plff's EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM to defts' Notice of Related Case and Request to the Chief Judge for Reassignment, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 09/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION FILED BY DEFT PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(gn, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Related Case and Request to the Chief Judge for Assignment by CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS, Cert of Serv. (Attachments: # 1)(jmp, ) (Entered: 09/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LEAD PLFF PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REVISED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND WITHDRAWAL OF PRIOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, MEMO, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Complaint attached) (Attachments)(sc, ) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum in further support of motion of Peter Szanto to withdraw as co-lead plff, filed by plffs' EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Certificate of Service. (UNDER SEAL) (gn, ) (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING LEAD PLFF PETER SZANTO'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (DOC. 76). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY (DOC. 79) IS GRANTED.( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 8/15/05.) 8/16/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (gn, ) (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF FRANCIS P. KARAM, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 8/15/05. ) 8/16/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS OF LEAD PLFF PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM, FILED BY DEFTS' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (APPENDIX ATTACHED)(Attachments: # 1 memo# 2 table of contents# 3 table of auth# 4 cos# 5 proposed order)(gn, ) (Entered: 08/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE CONSLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FRCP 15(a), FILED BY PLFF PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ATTACHED) (UNDER SEAL)(gn, ) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ENVELOPE (UNDER SEAL) (gn, ) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PETER SZANTO TO WITHDRAW AS CO-LEAD PLFF, FILED BY PLFF PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (UNDER SEAL) (REPLY MEMORANDUM ATTACHED UNDER SEAL)(gn, ) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix in support of defts' memorandum of law in opposition to the motion of Peter Szanto to withdraw as co-lead plff and to his counsel's continuing as co-lead counsel, filed by defts' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS. (gn, ) (Entered: 06/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to the motionof Peter Szanto to withdraw as co-lead plff and to his counsel's continuing as co-lead counsel, filed by defts' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 proposed order# 2 cos) (gn, ) (Entered: 06/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS CO-LEAD PLFF, FILED BY PETER SZANTO, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(gn, ) (Entered: 06/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION by plffs' EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM FOR PRO HAC VICE OF FRANCIS P. KARAM, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2005 (gn, ). (Entered: 06/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REVISED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/17/2006. DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 12/12/05. PLFFS' RESPONSE SHALL BE FILED BY 1/27/06. DEFTS' REPLY SHALL BE FILED BY 2/24/06. ANY MOTION IN LIMINE, ANY DAUBERT MOTION AND ANY DISPOSITIVE MOTION THAT DOES NOT DUPLICATE THE GROUNDS OF ANY PREVIOUSLY FILED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY 6/1/06. BRIEF IN OPPOSITION SHALL BE FILED BY 6/22/06. REPLY BRIEFS SHALL BE FILED BY 7/13/06. THE COURT SHALL HOLD A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ON A DATE TO BE DETERMINED. TRIAL WILL BEGIN ON A DATE TO BE DETERMINED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 5/25/05. ) 5/26/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(gn, ) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION FOR A REVISED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER FILED BY EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(pr, ) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by EDWARD KAMINSKI TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL FROM SERVICE LIST (GROSS, DEBORAH) (Entered: 05/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MICHAEL S. BIGIN, ESQ. TO PRACTIVE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 5/2/05. ) 5/2/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF STEPHANIE M. BEIGE, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 4/27/05. ) 5/2/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONOF KEITH M. FLEISCHMAN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 5/2/05. ) 5/2/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED BY COUNSEL.(gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2005 (gn, ). (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH COURT APPROVAL. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 4/27/05. ) 4/28/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(gn, ) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/27/05 before Judge Clarence C. Newcomer. (gn, ) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION AS TO STEPHANIE M. BEIGE, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2.(b), STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (cw, ) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION AS TO KEITH M. FLEISCHMAN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2.(b), STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (cw, ) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION AS TO MICHAEL S. BIGIN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2.(b), STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (cw, ) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by DEBORAH R. GROSS (GROSS, DEBORAH) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: THE PARTIES HAVE REQUESTED A PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON OR AFTER 3/28/05. THE DATE OF THE CONFERENCE IS 4/27/05 AT 10:00AM. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 2/17/06. ANY MOTION IN LIMINE AND ANY DAUBERT MOTION SHALL BE FILED 30 DAYS AFTER THE CLOSE OF EXPERT DISCOVERY. THE COURT SHALL HOLD A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ON DATE TO BE DETERMINED. TRIAL WILL BEGIN ON DATE TO BE DETERMINED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 3/29/05. ) 3/30/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT PLFFS' CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION SHALL BE DUE NO LATER THAN 9/6/05. RESPONSES TO THIS MOTION SHALL BE DUE NO LATER THAN 10/6/05. REPLY BRIEFS SHALL BE DUE NO LATER THAN 10/20/05. DEFTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, IF ANY, SHALL BE DUE NO LATER THAN 3/1/06. RESPONSE TO THESE MOTIONS SHALLBE DUE NOLATER THAN 3/22/06. REPLY BRIEFS SHALL BE DUE NO LATER THAN 4/12/06. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 3/29/05. ) 3/30/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum by EDWARD KAMINSKI, PETER SZANTO, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM setting forth their position on disputed pretrial scheduling issues, certificate of service. (fb) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum of Law in support of defts' request for permission to file a motion for summary judgment, filed by defts' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 03/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTION TO ENTER THE PROPOSED PETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND FOR A PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO FRCP 16 AND LOCAL RULE 16.1(b), FILED BY PLFF PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, DEFTS' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(gn, ) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by MARC A. TOPAZ, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER with Affirmative Defenses and Certificate of Service by CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART, JAMES A. SEARS.(wgc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER AND REASONING GRANTING DEFTS' MOTION TO STRIKE. PARAGRAPH 178 IS STRICKEN FROM THE COMPLAINT, AND DEFT ANANIA IS DISMISSED FROM THE CASE. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 11/15/04.) 11/17/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED. (gn, ) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTIONS ARE DENIED AS MOOT, THE PARTIES HAVING AGREED UPON A REVISED TIMETABLE FOR THE AMENDMENT AND BRIEFING OF THE CLAIMS. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 9/7/04.) 9/9/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS on 9/8/04. (gn, ) (Entered: 09/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum in further support of its motion to strike second revised paragraph 178, filed by defts' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 08/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition to defts' second motion to strike revised paragraph 178, filed by plffs' EDWARD KAMINSKI, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, PETER SZANTO, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Alexander R. Sussman in support of defts' motin to strike second revised paragraph 178. (gn, ) (Entered: 07/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND REVISED PARAGRAPH 178, FILED BY DEFTS' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (gn) (Attachments: # 1 memo of law# 2 COS# 3 proposed order)(gn, ) (Entered: 07/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second More Definite Statement of Paragraph 178 of the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, pursuant to the Court's order dated 1/30/04, filed by plffs' by EDWARD KAMINSKI, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, PETER SZANTO, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 06/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLFFS CONSENT TO DEFTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS' MOTION TO STRIKE REVISED PARAGRAPH 178. PLFFS WILL FILE A SECOND REVISED PARAGRAPH 178 OF THE COMPLAINT ON 6/11/04. DEFTS' WILL FILE ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OR A MOTION TO STRIKE THE SECOND REVISED PARAGRAPH 178 OF THE COMPLAINT BY 7/9/04, ETC. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 6/3/04. ) 6/4/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 06/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Praecipe by defts' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART to append the attached proposed order to defts' motionforleave to fle a supplemental declaration in support of defts' motion to strike revised paragraph 178, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 06/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFTS' MOTION TO STRIKE REVISED PARAGRAPH 178, FILED BY DEFTS' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION ATTACHED) EXHIBIT 9 TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLRATION ATTACHED) (Attachments: # 1 suppl declaration# 2 cert of service)(gn, ) Modified on 5/24/2004 (gn, ). Modified on 5/24/2004 (gn, ). (Entered: 05/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFTS' MOTION TO STRIKE REVISED PARAGRAPH 178, FILED BY DEFTS' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (REPLY MEMORANDUM ATTACHED) (Attachments: # 1 COS# 2 proporsed order# 3 reply memo)(gn, ) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition to CIGNA'S motion to strike revised paragraph 178 filed by plffs' PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, PETER SZANTO, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 04/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION TO STRIKE REVISED PARAGRAPH 178 FILED BY DEFTS' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART, MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION OF SARAH R. KRISSOFF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 memo of law# 2 cert of service# 3 proposed order)(gn, ) (Entered: 04/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        More Definite Statement of Paragraph 178 of the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, pursuant to the Court's order dated 1/30/04 filed by plffs' EDWARD KAMINSKI, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, PETER SZANTO, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2004 (gn, ). (Entered: 03/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING CASES ARE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES: 02-8204, 02-8217, 02-8261, 02-8281 AND 02-8924. THESE CASES WERE CONSOLIDATED IN AN ORDER FILED ON 5/16/03 (PAPER NUMBER 24) BUT INADVERTENTLY NEVER CLOSED. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 3/19/04. ) 3/22/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 03/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ON 3/9/04 PLFFS WILL PROVIDE TO DEFTS A REVISED DRAFT OF PRAGRAPH 178 OF THE COMPLAINT. ON 3/16/04, DEFTS WILL CONFER WITH PLFFS ON THE SUFFICIENCY OF THE REVISED DRAFT OF PARA 178 OF THE COMPLAINT. PLFFS WILLL FILE IT AS AN AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT ON 3/23/04, AND DEFTS WILL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT (AS AMENDED) ON 4/13/04. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 2/12/04. ) 2/17/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 02/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 29 MOTION TO DISMISS. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 1/30/04.) 1/30/04 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED. (gn, ) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by defts' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART of firm Name Change of Harkins Cunningham to Harkins Cunningham LLP, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 01/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by defts' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART of firm Name Change of Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson to Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2004 (gn, ). (Entered: 01/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply Declaration of Katherine D. Johnson in further support of defts' motion to dismiss, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Memorandum in support of 29 motion to Dismiss filed by defts' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition to defts' 29 motion to dismiss, filed by plffs' EDWARD KAMINSKI, PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, PETER SZANTO, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 10/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFT'S 29 MOTION TO DISMISS IS DUE 10/10/03. THE PARTIES AGREE THAT THE FILING DEADLINE FOR PLFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS MAY BE EXTENDED TO 10/14/03. THE PARTIES FURTHER AGREE THAT THE FILING DEADLINE FOR DEFTS' REPLY BRIEF MAY BE EXTENDED TO 10/31/03. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 10/10/03. 10/10/03 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) (Entered: 10/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART and ANDREA ANANIA of filing "iBRIEF" copy of defts' memorandum of law in support of motion to dismiss the consolidated class action complaint, Certificate of Service.(gn, ) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE ACTION IS CONSOLIDATED WITH 02-9073 AND MASTER FILE 02-8088 FOR ALL PURPOSES PURSUANT TO RULE 42(a) OF THE FRCP. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 9/12/03. ) 9/15/03 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(gn, ) Modified on 9/15/2003 (gn, ). (Entered: 09/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Julie E. Kamps in support of defts' motion to dismiss. (gn, ) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFTS' CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS VOLUMES 1 AND 2 ATTACHED) (gn, ) Modified on 8/28/2003 (gn, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2003 (gn, ). (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Disclosure Statement filed by deft CIGNA CORP., Certificate of Service.(gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2003 (gn, ). (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Praecipe by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM to file revised cover sheet to consolidated class action complaint, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 07/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consolidated Class Action COMPLAINT against CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART, filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, PETER SZANTO, Certificate of Service; jury demand.(kw, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2003 (gn, ). (Entered: 07/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE COMPLAINT IS DUE BY 7/3/03; DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR ANSWER IS DUE BY 8/26/03; ETC. . SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 6/30/03. 7/3/03 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT THE COURT CONSOLIDATES THE ACTIONS 02-8088, 02-8204, 02-8217, 02-8261, 02-8281, 02-8924 FOR ALL PURPOSES INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, DISCOVERY, PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS AND TRIAL PROCEEDINGS UNDER THE FOLLOWING CAPTION: IN RE CIGNA CORP. SECURITIES LITIGATION MASTER FILE 02-8088. THE COURT HEREBY APPOINTS THE PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM AND PETER SZANTO AS LEAD PLFFS. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT LEAD PLFFS ARE PERMITTED TO FILE A SINGLE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITHIN 45 DAYS OF THIS ORDER. ( SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 5/15/03. ) 5/19/03 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(gn, ) Modified on 8/1/2005 (gn, ). (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED JOINT MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION, FOR THEIR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLFFS AND FOR APPROVAL OF LEAD PLFFS' SELECTIONOF CO-LEAD COUNSEL FILED BY PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, PETER SZANTO, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(gn, ) Modified on 5/15/2003 (gn, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2003 (gn, ). (Entered: 05/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Memorandum in support of 8 motion for appointment as lead plff filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 05/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum filed by PETER SZANTO to the additional authorities submitted by The PA. State Employees' Retirement System. (gn, ) Modified on 5/1/2003 (gn, ). (Entered: 05/01/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Submission of Additional Authorities by the PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM in support of its 19 motion for appointment as lead plff, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 04/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS SURREPLY MEMORANUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLFF AND IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION OF PETER SZANTO FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLFF FILED BY DEFT PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (SURREPLY MEMORANDUM ATTACHED)(gn, ) (Entered: 01/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO BE APPOINTED AS LEAD PLFF AND TO APPROVE HIS SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL FILED BY MOVANT BY PETER SZANTO, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (REPLY MEMORANDUM ATTACHED)(gn, ) (Entered: 01/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memorandum filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM in further support of its motion for appointment as lead plff and in further opposition to the motion of PETER SZANTO for appointment as lead plff, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2003 (ldb, ). (Entered: 01/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF PETER SZANTO IN OPPOSITION MOTION OF PENNSYLVANIA STAE EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO BE APPOINTED AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND TO APPROVE HIS SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(See paper #14 in 02-cv-8088 for Original Pleading). (jpd, ) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition to 7 motion for appointment as lead plff filed by PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Certificate of Service. (gn, ) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to motion of Pennsylvania State Employees Retirement System and in further support of his motion to be appointed as lead plaintiff and to approve his selection of lead counsel, Certificate of service filed by PETER SZANTO (ph, ) (Entered: 01/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal of MOTION TO APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVE LEAD PLAINTIFF'S SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL filed by PLAINTIFF EDWARD KAMINSKI, Certificate of Service. (mbh, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2003 (ldb, ). (Entered: 01/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to plaintiffs' motions for appointment of lead plaintiff and consolidation, Certificate of service filed by CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES G. STEWART. (ph, ) (Entered: 01/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by THE CITY OF MIAMI GENERAL EMPLOYEES' & SANITATION EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT TRUST of Withdrawal of its Motion to Be Appointed As Lead Plaintiff, Certificate of Service. (MAGER, CAROL) Modified on 1/7/2003 (np). (Entered: 01/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal filed by INTERNATIONALE KAPITALANLAGEGESELLSCHAFT, MBH of MOTION TO APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVE LEAD PLAINTIFF'S SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL, Certificate of Service.(mbh, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/31/2002 (fh, ). (Entered: 12/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION BY MOVANT THE CITY OF MIAMI GENERAL EMPLOYEES' & SANITATION EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT TRUST TO BE APPOINTED AS LEAD PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO SECTION 21(D)(a)(3)(B) OF THE SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934; TO APPROVE PROPOSED LEAD PLAINTIFF'S CHOICE OF COUNSEL; AND TO CONSOLIDATE ALL RELATED ACTIONS, MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(fh) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2002 (fh, ). (Entered: 12/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION BY MOVANT PENNSYLVANIA STATE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM FOR CONSOLIDATION, FOR ITS APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND FOR APPROVAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFF'S SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL, MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(fh) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2003 (ldb, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2003 (ldb, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2003 (ldb, ). (Entered: 12/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION BY PETER SZANTO FOR CONSOLIDATION OF THE RELATED CASES, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF HIS SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL, MEMORANDUM, AFFIDAVIT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(rv, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2002 (rv, ). (Entered: 12/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION BY EDWARD KAMINSKI FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND FOR APPROVAL OF ITS SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL, MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(rv, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2003 (vw, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2003 (vw, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2003 (vw, ). (Entered: 12/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION BY INTERNATIONALE KAPITALANLAGEGESELLSCHAFT, MBH TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS, TO BE APPOINTED LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND FOR APPROVAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFF'S SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL, MEMORANDUM, AFFIDAVIT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(rv, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2002 (rv, ). (Entered: 12/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Praecipe by EDWARD KAMINSKI for alias summons. (gn, ) (Entered: 12/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ALEXANDER R. SUSSMAN AND DAVID M. MORRIS IS GRANTED PROVIDED THAT THE APPROPRIATE FEE HAS BEEN PAID. SIGNED BY JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER ON 12/5/02.12/6/02 ENTERED. COPIES FAXED BY CHAMERS 12/5/02. (afm, ) (Entered: 12/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ALEXANDER R. SUSSMAN, ESQ. AND DAVID M. MORRIS, ESQ. FILED BY DEFTS' IGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(gn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2002 (ldb, ). (Entered: 11/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against CIGNA CORP., H. EDWARD HANWAY, JAMES A. SEARS, JAMES G. STEWART ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 806357.), filed by EDWARD KAMINSKI.(iy, ) (Entered: 10/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?