Firestar Software Inc. v. Red Hat, Inc.
Federal Court Proceeding California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:07-mc-80204-MMC
District Judge Maxine M. Chesney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 24, 2017 at 6:38 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Firestar Software, Inc., Plaintiff
v.
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harvey Siskind LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth Isaac Appel +1 415 354 0100 +1 415 391 7124 sappel@harveysiskind.com
No Logo Thought Inc., Miscellaneous Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Jason Gentry Mullins
Office San Francisco
Filed 8/21/2007
Jury Demand
Demand
Nature of Suit
Cause
Jurisdiction
Disposition
County
Terminated 5/7/2008
Origin
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag REFDISC
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 ~Notice (other)
Summary of Negotiations Status Regarding Prior Order and Subpoena and Motion Hearing on Calendar by Thought, Inc. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER finding [1] Thought, Inc.'s Motion to Quash or in the Alternative for a Protective Order moot. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/18/2008. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document 29 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Clerks Notice
      CLERK'S NOTICE vacating 3/19/08 motion (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE by Red Hat, Inc. of Withdrawal of Subpoena (Appel, Seth) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT re Status of Dispute by Red Hat, Inc.. (Appel, Seth) (Filed on 3/18/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document 26 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
            STIPULATION AND ORDER re [25] Stipulation filed by Red Hat, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
              Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing reset for 3/19/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
                LREF
                Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Stipulation
                STIPULATION Rescheduling Hearing by Red Hat, Inc.. (Appel, Seth) (Filed on 1/31/2008)
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Mail Returned
                  Mail sent to John Jason Gentry Mullins returned as undeliverable re [23] Stipulation and Order. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2008)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                    STIPULATION AND ORDER re [21] Stipulation filed by Red Hat, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/18/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2007)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                      Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2007)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                        Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2008 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2007)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Letter
                          Letter from Appel to Mullins. (Appel, Seth) (Filed on 12/17/2007)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Stipulation
                            STIPULATION Rescheduling Hearing by Red Hat, Inc.. (Appel, Seth) (Filed on 12/17/2007)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                              STIPULATION AND ORDER re [17] Stipulation filed by Red Hat, Inc., [18] Stipulation filed by Red Hat, Inc., [1] MOTION to Quash filed by Thought, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/2/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2007)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing reset for 12/19/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2007)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                  MOTION for attorney Jayne A. Goldstein leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611012043.) filed by Firestar Software Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2007)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Stipulation
                                    STIPULATION Rescheduling Hearing by Red Hat, Inc.. (Appel, Seth) (Filed on 11/1/2007)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Stipulation
                                      STIPULATION Rescheduling Hearing by Red Hat, Inc.. (Appel, Seth) (Filed on 10/26/2007)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                        CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing reset for 11/21/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER re [1] MOTION to Quash filed by Thought, Inc., [14] Stipulation filed by Red Hat, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/16/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                            Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing reset for 11/7/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Stipulation
                                              STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Hearing on Thought's Inc.'s Motion to Quash Third Party Subpoena, or in the Alternative, for a Protective Order by Red Hat, Inc.. (Appel, Seth) (Filed on 10/15/2007)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing reset for 10/17/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER re [10] Stipulation filed by Thought, Inc., [11] MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR STIPULATIONS, ETC. re [1] MOTION to Quash, [10] Stipulation filed by Thought, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/4/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007, Terminated: 2/1/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR STIPULATIONS, ETC. re [1] MOTION Nto Quash, [10] Stipulation filed by Thought, Inc.. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Stipulation
                                                      STIPULATION REQUEST TO FACTS AND INFO RE THOUGHT INC'S MOTION TO QUASH THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA, ETC. by Thought, Inc. (bpf, COURT STAFF (Filed on 10/4/2007)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER resetting [1] MOTION to Quash filed by Thought, Inc., [8] Stipulation filed by Red Hat, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/1/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Stipulation
                                                          STIPULATION re [1] MOTION to Quash Rescheduling Hearing by Red Hat, Inc.. (Appel, Seth) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                            Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing reset for 10/17/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(from 10/3/07) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Red Hat, Inc. re [6] Declaration in Support, [5] Memorandum in Opposition re Thought, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Third Party Subpoena, or in the Alternative, for a Protective Order (Appel, Seth) (Filed on 9/12/2007)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                Declaration of Jon R. Pierce in Support of [5] Memorandum in Opposition to Thought, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Third Party Subpoena, or in the Alternative, for a Protective Order filed byRed Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Related document(s)[5]) (Appel, Seth) (Filed on 9/12/2007)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                Memorandum in Opposition to Thought, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Third Party Subpoena, or in the Alternative, for a Protective Order filed byRed Hat, Inc.. (Appel, Seth) (Filed on 9/12/2007)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Clerks Notice
                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2007 01:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/27/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2007)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery
                                                                      CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen for Third Party Thought, INc.'s Motion to Quah Third Party Subpeona, or in the altern, For a Protective Order. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2007)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for DiscoCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER REFERRING THOUGHT, INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2007. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2007) Modified on 8/23/2007 (mmclc1, COURT STAFF).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Motion to Quash
                                                                          MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoena or in the Alternative for a Protective Order filed by Thought, Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2007)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 181 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?