YAHAIRA RAMIREZ SERNA
Bankruptcy Case Puerto Rico Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 03-02792
District Judge Bankruptcy ENRIQUE S. LAMOUTTE INCLAN, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALEJANDRO OLIVERAS RIVERA, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Alejandro Oliveras-Rivera Chapter 13 Trustee Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MIRIAM D SALWEN ACOSTA aorecf@ch13sju.com
No Logo YAHAIRA RAMIREZ SERNA, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by PUBLIC INTREST ENVIRONMENTAL LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JULIO RIVERA TORO +1 787 841 1704 jriverapo1@prtc.net
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/30/2006, Entered: None
Certificate of service (RE: related document(s) 28 ) Service Date 09/30/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/01/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
    ORDER DISCHARGING TRUSTEE AND CLOSING CASE signed on 9/28/2006 .(FEIJO GONZALEZ, MARITZA) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None
      Trustee's Final Report and Account Plan Completed (20) days objection language for debtor's discharge and (30) days objection language for trustee's discharge. (OLIVERAS RIVERA (DAT), ALEJANDRO) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 7/16/2006, Entered: None
        Certificate of service (RE: related document(s) 25 ) Service Date 07/16/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
          DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR signed on 7/14/2006 .(FEIJO GONZALEZ, MARITZA) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None
            Notice of Plan Completion filed by ALEJANDRO OLIVERAS RIVERA (DAT) on behalf of ALEJANDRO OLIVERAS RIVERA (OLIVERAS RIVERA (DAT), ALEJANDRO) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: None
              Amended Schedule(s): I and J filed by JULIO RIVERA TORO on behalf of YAHAIRA RAMIREZ SERNA (RIVERA TORO, JULIO) (Entered: 08/02/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: None
                Motion for post confirmation modification of chapter 13 plan dated 8/1/05 (20 day objection language) filed by JULIO RIVERA TORO on behalf of YAHAIRA RAMIREZ SERNA [RIVERA TORO, JULIO] (Entered: 08/02/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
                  CERTIFICATE of service Re: Item # 20, [AUT], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #21A (Entered: 12/23/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                    MINUTES of hearing on motion to lift stay. ORDER: Movant's application to withdraw the motion to lift of stay is granted Re: Item # 14, [MLQ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #20A (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
                      MOTION withdrawing Trustee's request for dismissal. Re: Item # 18, [MLQ], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #19 (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                        TRUSTEE'S motion to dismiss allowing 30 days for objections [Disposed], [DZB], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #18 (Entered: 12/06/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None
                          DEBTOR'S answer to Reliable Financial's motion to lift stay Re: Item # 14, [LMR], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #17A (Entered: 12/03/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATE of service filed by Reliable Financial [served on 11/18/04] Re: Item # 14, [MM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #16A (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION under Servicemembers Civil Relief Act of 2003 Re: Item # 14, [MM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #15A (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE of service Re: Item # 12, [AUT], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #13 (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
                                    ORDER CONFIRMING PLAN dated 06/02/03. cc: debtor, J. Rivera, A. Oliveras Re: Item # 9, [CRL], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #12 (Entered: 06/12/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: None
                                      MINUTES confirmation:plan confirmed, order entered , [ECM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #11 (Entered: 06/12/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: None
                                        RECOMMENDATION of trustee for confirmation: recommends plan dated 6/2/03 , [ECM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #10 (Entered: 06/06/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
                                          AMENDED PLAN dated 06/02/2003 [served], [MFG], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #9 (Entered: 06/03/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: None
                                            MINUTES of 341 meeting [closed] and Trustee's favorable recommendation for confirmation Re: Item # 2, [MFG], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #8 (Entered: 04/30/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of appearance of attorney Carlos Perez on behalf of Reliable Financial Services Inc. , [CRL], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #7 (Entered: 04/21/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                OBJECTION to confirmation filed by Reliable Financial Services, Inc., [JMM], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #6 (Entered: 04/21/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                  CERTIFICATE of service Re: Item # 2, [AUT], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #5 (Entered: 03/28/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                    CERTIFICATE of service Re: Item # 3, [AUT], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #4 (Entered: 03/28/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of 341 meeting on 04/24/03 at 01:00 P.M. at HOTEL MELIA, CRISTINA STREET #75, PONCE, PR 00731 [Entered: 03/25/03], [DR] CLAIMS Bar Date due on 07/23/03 [Entered: 03/25/03], [DR] NOTICE of Confirmation Hearing on 06/11/03 at 08:30 A.M. at US POST OFFICE & COURTHOUSE BLDG, 300 RECINTO SUR STREET, SECOND FLOOR, SAN JUAN, PR 00901, [DR], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #3 (Entered: 03/25/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                        CHAPTER 13 Plan dated 03/13/03., [DR], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #2 (Entered: 03/24/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                          VOLUNTARY petition under chapter 13 [Entered: 03/19/03], [YLB] SCHEDULES and Statement of Affairs [Entered: 03/19/03], [YLB] ATTORNEY Statement of Compensation $1,500.00 , [YLB], ORIGINAL NIBS DOCKET ENTRY #1 (Entered: 03/19/2003)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?