Leach v. Textron, Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 11:08 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Diana Leach, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stephen R. White

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. White +7370 737 737 0028 steve@srwesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent L. Greene, IV +4577 457 457 7730 +4577 457 457 7708 vgreene@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Klein +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 mklein@ssbny.com
Space Mark Levine , +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 687 7230 mlevine@ssbny.com
Space Edwin J Mills +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 emills@ssbny.com
v.
No Logo Cathy A. Strecker, Defendant
No Logo Deborah A. Imondi, Defendant
No Logo Douglas, Stewart, Defendant
No Logo Mary F. Lovejoy, Defendant
No Logo Nancy Gilman, Defendant
No Logo Richard L. Yates, Defendant
No Logo Terrence O'Donnell, Defendant
No Logo Textron Investment Committee, Defendant
No Logo Textron, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, United Industrial Corp /de/

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J. Killberg +Pleas eus eavalid

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole J. Benjamin +3514 351 351 4607 nbenjamin@apslaw.com
Space Patricia K. Rocha +2747 274 274 7200 +3514 351 351 4607 procha@apslaw.com
Space John A. Tarantino +3514 351 351 4607 jtarantino@apslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Blankenstein +1 202 955 8693 +1 202 530 9532 pblankenstein@gibsondunn.com
Space Mitchell Alan Karlan +1 212 351 3827 +1 212 351 5254 mkarlan@gibsondunn.com
Space Brian M. Lutz +1 212 351 3811 +1 212 351 6290 blutz@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Adrienne R. Harrington, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael K. Marran +4544 454 454 4000 +4577 457 457 7708 marranlaw@cox.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas James McKenna +1 212 983 1300 +1 212 983 0383 tjmlaw2001@yahoo.com
No Logo Alice Sage, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
No Logo Alma I. Perez, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lori Gwen Feldman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 lfeldman@milberg.com
Space Arvind Khurana +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 akhurana@milberg.com
Space Jennifer J Sosa +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 jsosa@milberg.com
No Logo Holly G. Sheets, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nancy Kulesa +1 860 493 6292 +1 860 493 6290

Toggle Switch Represented by IZARD NOBEL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Izard, Jr. +1 860 493 6292 +1 860 493 6290 rizard@snlaw.net
Space Mark Peter Kindall +1 860 493 6294 +1 860 493 6290 firm@izardnobel.com
No Logo Jubrina Hook, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Marion L. Tompkins, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by D'Amico & Burchfield, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. D'Amico, II +4904 490 490 4809 rad@dblawri.com
Space Patrick F. Dowling, Jr. +4541 454 454 1233 pfd@dblawri.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward W. Ciolko, PHV +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 eciolko@ktmc.com
No Logo Robert T. Arthur, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Felton, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@whesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McIntyre Tate & Lynch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S. Parker +3316 331 331 6095 rsp@mtlesq.com
No Logo Ted R French, Consol Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
  Entries (119) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached, the request for attorneys' fees of 30 per cent of the gross settlement fund is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/12/2014. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT re 74 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, 109 MOTION for FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT... -- Monetary awards as rendered at Page 7 (Paragraphs 18 and 20) of the attached Order/Final Judgment: $10,000 each as to Plaintiffs Alma Perez, Adrienne Harrington-Wheatley, Diana Leach, and Holly Sheets (all as Plaintiff Case Contribution Awards, to be paid from the Settlement Fund); Litigation Expenses incurred by Plaintiffs' counsel in the amount of $162,757.34 (to be paid from the Settlement Fund). -- The Court defers ruling on Plaintiffs' counsel's motion for attorneys' fees, pending submission of additional information from Plaintiffs' counsel. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/10/2014. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 116 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
      SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES -- SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE in Support re 109 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR: (1) FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; (2) APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS; AND (3) CERTIFICATION OF THE SETTLEMENT CLASS AND CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR: (1) AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AND (2) CASE CONTRIBUTION AWARDS filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Fairness Hearing: Re: Approval of Class Action Settlement held on 1/24/14 before Judge Mary M. Lisi. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra D. Lajoie, Telephone number 401-952-2731. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion.. Redaction Request due 2/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2014. (Lajoie, Debra) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01-24-2014 before Judge Lisi.. (Tarantino, John) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Fairness Hearing [Approval of Class Action Settlement] for proceedings held on 01/24/2014 before Judge Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi.. (Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
              SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Nashira Washington re: Dissemination of Notice re 109 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR: (1) FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; (2) APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS; AND (3) CERTIFICATION OF THE SETTLEMENT CLASS AND CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR: (1) AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AND (2) CASE CONTRIBUTION AWARDS by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                OBJECTION to Settlement; in letter form from Robert Thurston (dated 12/31/2013). -- Note: This document is restricted per order of the Court because it contains personal identifiers. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Textron, Inc of Filing of Report of Independent Fiduciary (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 109 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR: (1) FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; (2) APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS; AND (3) CERTIFICATION OF THE SETTLEMENT CLASS AND CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR: (1) AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AND (2) CASE CONTRIBUTION AWARDS WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Adrienne R. Harrington, Diana Leach, Alma I. Perez, Holly G. Sheets. Responses due by 11/25/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law, # 2 Supplement Sosa Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14)(Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                      MOTION for an Extension of the Objection Deadline for Objecting to the Additional Notices of Settlement, from November 27, 2013 to January 13, 2014 filed by Adrienne R. Harrington, Diana Leach, Alma I. Perez, Holly G. Sheets. Responses due by 11/22/2013 (Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, PRELIMINARILY CERTIFYING A CLASS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES, APPROVING FORM AND MANNER OF CLASS NOTICE, AND SETTING DATE FOR HEARING ON FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT (granting 105 Motion with 106 Supplement to Approve Entry of Preliminary Approval Order). So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/21/2013. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of 105 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                            Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Preliminary Approval Order by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/13/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum,# 2 Exhibit to Memorandum)(Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by Adrienne R. Harrington of Firm Name Change (McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                JOINT NOTICE AND JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND STAY OF DISCOVERY AND PROCEEDINGS NOT RELATED TO SETTLEMENT INDEFINITELY by Kathleen M. Bader, Lewis B. Campbell, R. Kelly Clark, Ivor J. Evans, Lawrence K. Fish, Joe T. Ford, Ted R French, Paul E. Gagne, Nancy Gilman, Dain M. Hancock, Adrienne R. Harrington, Deborah A. Imondi, Diana Leach, Mary F. Lovejoy, Terrence C. O'Donnell, Terrence O'Donnell, Alma I. Perez, Lord Powell, Holly G. Sheets, Douglas Stewart, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Textron, Inc, Lloyd G. Trotter, Richard L. Yates, James L. Ziemer (Greene, Vincent) Modified on 12/18/2012 to correct event code. (Duhamel, John). (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and Other Proceedings by All Parties. Responses due by 10/22/2012 (Tarantino, John) (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
                                    STIPULATION re 97 Response in Opposition to Motion, by All Plaintiffs. (Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                      DECLARATION re 97 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Brian Lutz by Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Textron, Inc, Richard L. Yates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION re 97 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Lawrence J. La Sala by Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Textron, Inc, Richard L. Yates. (Tarantino, John) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                          DECLARATION re 97 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Mitchell A. Karlan by Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Textron, Inc, Richard L. Yates. (Tarantino, John) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 93 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Textron, Inc, Richard L. Yates. (Tarantino, John) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF NANCY A. KULESA ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS by Holly G. Sheets. Responses due by 10/1/2012 (Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION re 93 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS extending Defendants' time to respond to Motion up to and including September 18, 2012 by All Parties. (Tarantino, John) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Seal Document : Exhibits 5 through 9 as attached to 93 Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production by All Plaintiffs. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                    MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/4/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5-9)(Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 91 Response in Opposition to Motion, WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Textron, Inc, Richard L. Yates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E)(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 90 Second MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses and for Sanctions PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO TEXTRON INC.S SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROGATORY RESPONSES AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Second MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses and for Sanctions WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Textron, Inc, Richard L. Yates. Responses due by 8/2/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION RULE 41 STIPULATION OF DISMISSALOF PLAINTIFF JUBRINA HOOK by Nancy Gilman, Jubrina Hook, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Terrence O'Donnell, Douglas Stewart, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Textron, Inc, Richard L. Yates. (Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                              APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 87 MOTION for Jennifer J. Sosa to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Jennifer J. Sosa to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Textron, Inc, Richard L. Yates.(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    STIPULATION re 68 Answer to Complaint [Stipulation to Amend Answer] by All Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Answer)(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER granting 83 Motion to Amend 66 Pretrial Scheduling Memorandum. Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Factual Discovery due by 10/15/2012. Expert Discovery due by 2/15/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 4/16/2013. Pretrial Memoranda due 30 days after a decision on any dispositive motion, or (if no dispositive motions are filed) 30 days prior to the commencement of trial. Pltfs' expert witness disclosures due by 11/16/2012; Defts' expert witness disclosures due by 12/17/2012. Pltfs' motion for class certification due by 2/29/2012; Defts' opposition to motion for class certification due 20 days after the last Pltf deposition has concluded; Pltfs' reply in support of class certification due 60 days after Defts' opposition is filed.. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 4/24/2012. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 66 Pretrial Scheduling Order,, by All Parties. Responses due by 5/10/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Pretrial Order)(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re: Motion to Compel Hearing for proceedings held on 04/02/2012 before Judge Almond.. (Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4-2-12 before Judge Almond. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joseph A. Fontes, Telephone number 561-452-7507. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion.. Redaction Request due 5/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2012. (Fontes, Joseph) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 72 Motion to Compel. Textron's Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses is GRANTED. However, Plaintiffs are granted thirty days from the date of this Order to respond in view of counsel's representation at the hearing that Plaintiffs were recently served with a significant document production from Defendants. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 4/11/2012. (Noel, Jeannine) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 04-02-2012 before Judge Almond.. (Tarantino, John) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 75 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Textron, Inc, Richard L. Yates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER as to documents and other information obtained in the course of discovery. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/15/2012. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER by All Parties. (Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO TEXTRON INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROGATORY RESPONSES filed by All Plaintiffs. (Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/19/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit A-B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            STIPULATION RULE 41 STIPULATION OF DISMISSALOF PLAINTIFF ALICE SAGE by Alice Sage. (Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Textron, Inc. Responses due by 3/12/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Chart identifying challenged interrogatories and responses)(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                STIPULATION RULE 41 STIPULATION OF DISMISSALOF PLAINTIFFS ROBERT ARTHUR, SUSAN FELTON, AND MARION TOMPKINS by Robert T. Arthur, Susan Felton, Marion L. Tompkins. (Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE by Susan Felton, Marion L. Tompkins re 69 Stipulation NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF RULE 41 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS MARION TOMPKINS AND SUSAN FELTON (Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STIPULATION RULE 41 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS MARION TOMPKINS AND SUSAN FELTON by Susan Felton, Marion L. Tompkins. (Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ANSWER to 28 Complaint, by Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Textron, Inc, Richard L. Yates.(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        AMENDED ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL: Lori G. Feldman & Arvind B. Khurana (MILBERG LLP) are appointed Interim Lead Class Counsel. Vincent L. Greene IV (MOTLEY RICE LLC) is appointed Interim Liaison Class Counsel. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/13/2011. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery due by 8/16/2012. Expert Discovery due by 12/17/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2013. Pltfs' expert witness disclosures due by 9/17/2012; Defts' expert witness disclosures due by 10/17/2012. Pltfs' motion for class certification due by 2/29/2012; Defts' opposition to motion for class certification due by 4/30/2012; Pltfs' reply in support of class certification due 6/29/2012. Pretrial Memoranda due 30 days after a decision on any dispositive motion or, if no dispositive motions filed, 30 days prior to commencement of trial. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/13/2011. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER denying 60 Motion for Reconsideration re 56 Memorandum and Order on Motion to Dismiss. However, the merits-based issues raised by the motion have not been decided by the Court. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/5/2011. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 63 MOTION for Nancy A. Kulesa to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Holly G. Sheets. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for Nancy A. Kulesa to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Holly G. Sheets. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re (61 in 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA, 44 in 1:09-cv-00504-ML-LDA, 58 in 1:09-cv-00412-ML-LDA, 64 in 1:09-cv-00424-ML-LDA, 47 in 1:09-cv-00440-ML-LDA, 40 in 1:09-cv-00542-ML-LDA, 58 in 1:09-cv-00421-ML-LDA) Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Textron Inc., Textron, Inc, Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Richard L. Yates. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re (54 in 1:09-cv-00412-ML-LDA, 43 in 1:09-cv-00440-ML-LDA, 57 in 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA, 40 in 1:09-cv-00504-ML-LDA, 54 in 1:09-cv-00421-ML-LDA, 36 in 1:09-cv-00542-ML-LDA, 60 in 1:09-cv-00424-ML-LDA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (35 in 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re (35 in 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, filed by Alice Sage, Holly G. Sheets, Marion L. Tompkins, Alma I. Perez, Robert T. Arthur, Susan Felton, Adrienne R. Harrington, Jubrina Hook, Diana Leach. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Feldman, Lori) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION (RENEWED) for Reconsideration re (56 in 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA, 42 in 1:09-cv-00440-ML-LDA, 53 in 1:09-cv-00421-ML-LDA, 39 in 1:09-cv-00504-ML-LDA, 35 in 1:09-cv-00542-ML-LDA, 53 in 1:09-cv-00412-ML-LDA, 59 in 1:09-cv-00424-ML-LDA) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, (45 in 1:09-cv-00440-ML-LDA, 42 in 1:09-cv-00504-ML-LDA, 56 in 1:09-cv-00412-ML-LDA, 62 in 1:09-cv-00424-ML-LDA, 38 in 1:09-cv-00542-ML-LDA, 59 in 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA, 56 in 1:09-cv-00421-ML-LDA) Reply to Response to Motion, (55 in 1:09-cv-00412-ML-LDA, 41 in 1:09-cv-00504-ML-LDA, 55 in 1:09-cv-00421-ML-LDA, 61 in 1:09-cv-00424-ML-LDA, 37 in 1:09-cv-00542-ML-LDA, 44 in 1:09-cv-00440-ML-LDA, 58 in 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA) Response in Opposition to Motion,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,, (60 in 1:09-cv-00424-ML-LDA, 54 in 1:09-cv-00412-ML-LDA, 43 in 1:09-cv-00440-ML-LDA, 57 in 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA, 40 in 1:09-cv-00504-ML-LDA, 54 in 1:09-cv-00421-ML-LDA, 36 in 1:09-cv-00542-ML-LDA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (35 in 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re (35 in 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, by Textron Inc., Textron, Inc, Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Richard L. Yates. Responses due by 11/7/2011 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re (61 in 1:09-cv-00424-PJB -LDA, 37 in 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA, 55 in 1:09-cv-00412-PJB -LDA, 41 in 1:09-cv-00504-PJB -LDA, 44 in 1:09-cv-00440-PJB -LDA, 58 in 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA, 55 in 1:09-cv-00421-PJB -LDA) Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Textron Inc., Textron, Inc, Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Richard L. Yates. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re (54 in 1:09-cv-00412-PJB -LDA, 43 in 1:09-cv-00440-PJB -LDA, 57 in 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA, 40 in 1:09-cv-00504-PJB -LDA, 54 in 1:09-cv-00421-PJB -LDA, 36 in 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA, 60 in 1:09-cv-00424-PJB -LDA) MOTION for Reconsideration re (35 in 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re (35 in 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, filed by Alice Sage, Holly G. Sheets, Marion L. Tompkins, Alma I. Perez, Robert T. Arthur, Susan Felton, Adrienne R. Harrington, Jubrina Hook, Diana Leach. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Feldman, Lori) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re (35 in 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA) Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM by Textron Inc., Textron, Inc, Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Richard L. Yates. Responses due by 10/7/2011 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (33) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA; granting in part and denying in part (30) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00412-PJB -LDA; granting in part and denying in part (30) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00421-PJB -LDA; granting in part and denying in part (36) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00424-PJB -LDA; granting in part and denying in part (19) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00440-PJB -LDA; granting in part and denying in part (16) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00504-PJB -LDA; granting in part and denying in part (12) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA -- MOTION TO DISMISS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT PLAINTIFFS BASE THEIR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY CLAIM ON ALLEGED MISSTATEMENTS BY THE DEFENDANTS. IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS, MOTION DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro (New Hampshire) on 9/6/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Duhamel, John) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Addendum re (36 in 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA, 22 in 1:09-cv-00440-PJB -LDA, 33 in 1:09-cv-00421-PJB -LDA, 15 in 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA, 19 in 1:09-cv-00504-PJB -LDA, 39 in 1:09-cv-00424-PJB -LDA) Response to Motion, by Alice Sage, Holly G. Sheets, Marion L. Tompkins, Alma I. Perez, Diana Leach, Robert T. Arthur, Adrienne R. Harrington, Jubrina Hook, Susan Felton. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Part 2 of oversized main document.)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Feldman, Lori) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Dismiss Proceedings held on June 29, 2011 before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan Bateman, Telephone number 603-225-1453. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion.. Redaction Request due 7/27/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Duhamel, John) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Alice Sage, Holly G. Sheets, Marion L. Tompkins, Alma I. Perez, Robert T. Arthur, Susan Felton, Adrienne R. Harrington, Jubrina Hook, Diana Leach Notice of Chart Filed As A Supplement Pursuant To The 6/29/11 Minute Entry Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Khurana, Arvind) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 6/29/2011 before Judge Barbadoro.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Benjamin, Nicole) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas J. McKenna Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Marion L. Tompkins Of Firm Name Change Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Addendum re (36 in 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA, 33 in 1:09-cv-00412-PJB -LDA, 22 in 1:09-cv-00440-PJB -LDA, 33 in 1:09-cv-00421-PJB -LDA, 15 in 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA, 19 in 1:09-cv-00504-PJB -LDA, 39 in 1:09-cv-00424-PJB -LDA) Response to Motion, by Alice Sage, Holly G. Sheets, Marion L. Tompkins, Alma I. Perez, Diana Leach, Robert T. Arthur, Adrienne R. Harrington, Jubrina Hook, Susan Felton. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Feldman, Lori) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Addendum re (19 in 1:09-cv-00440-PJB -LDA, 36 in 1:09-cv-00424-PJB -LDA, 12 in 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA, 30 in 1:09-cv-00412-PJB -LDA, 33 in 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA, 30 in 1:09-cv-00421-PJB -LDA, 16 in 1:09-cv-00504-PJB -LDA) MOTION to Dismiss by Nancy Gilman, Terrence O'Donnell, Douglas Stewart, Textron Inc., Douglas J Stewart, Textron Savings Plan Committee, Textron, Inc, Lewis B. Campbell, Douglas J. Stewart, Kathleen Bader, Ivor J. Evans, Lawrence K. Fish, Joe T. Ford, Paul E. Gagne, Dain M. Hancock, Lord Powell, Lloyd G. Trotter, Thomas B. Wheeler, James L. Ziemer, Kathleen M. Bader, R. Kelly Clark, Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Terrence C. O'Donnell, Lord Powell, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Richard L. Yates. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT re: Plaintiffs' Joint Response Concerning Lead Counsel Issues by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Khurana, Arvind) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on February 15, 2011 before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Court Reporter/Transcriber Pamela J. Carle. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion.. Redaction Request due 3/17/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Zinni, Concetta) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference: Proceedings held on 2/15/11 before Judge Judge Paul Barbadoro. Court Reporter Pamela Carle NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 02-14-2011 before Judge Barbadoro.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Reassign Case to a Single Judge by Textron Inc., Textron, Inc, Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Richard L. Yates. Responses due by 2/22/2011 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          PROCEDURAL ORDER - So Ordered by Chief Judge Steven J McAuliffe on 1/24/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            CONCURRING ORDER - So Ordered by Chief Steven J McAuliffe on 1/24/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to the District of New Hampshire for assignment by designation- So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 1/19/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Diana Leach, Alma I. Perez, Alice Sage, Holly G. Sheets, Marion L. Tompkins, Adrienne R. Harrington, Susan Felton re (15 in 1:09-cv-00542-ML-LDA) Response to Motion, PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re (36 in 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA, 33 in 1:09-cv-00412-ML-LDA, 22 in 1:09-cv-00440-ML-LDA, 33 in 1:09-cv-00421-ML-LDA, 15 in 1:09-cv-00542-ML-LDA, 19 in 1:09-cv-00504-ML-LDA, 39 in 1:09-cv-00424-ML-LDA) Response to Motion, WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Textron Inc., Textron, Inc, Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Richard L. Yates. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Dulude, Nicole) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Alice Sage, Holly G. Sheets, Marion L. Tompkins, Alma I. Perez, Diana Leach, Robert T. Arthur, Adrienne R. Harrington, Jubrina Hook, Susan Felton. Responses due by 6/14/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re (19 in 1:09-cv-00440-ML-LDA, 36 in 1:09-cv-00424-ML-LDA, 12 in 1:09-cv-00542-ML-LDA, 30 in 1:09-cv-00412-ML-LDA, 33 in 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA, 30 in 1:09-cv-00421-ML-LDA, 16 in 1:09-cv-00504-ML-LDA) MOTION to Dismiss With Supporting Memo filed by Diana Leach. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Counsel, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(White, Stephen) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Textron Inc., Textron, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re (12 in 1:09-cv-00542-ML-LDA) MOTION to Dismiss by Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Textron, Inc, Richard L. Yates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Yahoo Finance Record 12-17-07 through 3-6-09, # 2 Exhibit Yahoo Finance Record 7-17-07 through 3-5-10, # 3 Exhibit Relevant Portions of Textron Inc. Savings Plan, as Amended and Restated in 2009, # 4 Exhibit Relevant Portions of the Textron Inc. Savings Plan Summary Plan Description, October 2007, # 5 Exhibit Relevant Portions of the Textron Inc. Savings Plan, as Amended and Restated in 2009, # 6 Exhibit Relevant Portions of Textron Inc.'s Form 10-K filed on February 20, 2008)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Dulude, Nicole) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Textron, Inc, Richard L. Yates. Responses due by 4/5/2010 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Dulude, Nicole) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Dulude on behalf of Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Richard L. Yates Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Dulude, Nicole) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. Rocha on behalf of Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Richard L. Yates Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Rocha, Patricia) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Tarantino on behalf of Ted R French, Deborah A. Imondi, Mary F. Lovejoy, Cathy A. Strecker, Textron Investment Committee, Richard L. Yates Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Tarantino, John) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. McKenna on behalf of Robert T. Arthur Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(McKenna, Thomas) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Holly G. Sheets, Susan Felton, Alma I. Perez, Marion L. Tompkins, Adrienne R. Harrington, Alice Sage, Robert T. Arthur, Jubrina Hook, Diana Leach, Holly G. Sheets, Susan Felton, Alma I. Perez, Marion L. Tompkins, Adrienne R. Harrington, Robert T. Arthur, Jubrina Hook, Alice Sage.Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 25 Motion to Amend Caption- So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 2/1/10. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER consolidating C.A. No. 09-440ML (Tompkins v. Textron, et al) with CA 09-383 as the lead case; all further documents shall be filed in the lead case- So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 1/27/10. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct (1 in 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA) Complaint, CAPTION by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/12/2010 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-ML-LDA et al.(Greene, Vincent) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 3 Motion to Consolidate Cases- So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 12/21/09. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental MOTION to Consolidate Cases -Part Two- by Diana Leach. Responses due by 1/4/2010 (White, Stephen) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Diana Leach. Responses due by 1/4/2010 (White, Stephen) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 20 MOTION for William J. Kilberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by all defendants. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for William J. Kilberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Textron, Inc, Terrence O'Donnell, Douglas Stewart, Nancy Gilman. (Tarantino, John) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 18 MOTION for Paul Blankenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Textron, Inc., Terrence O'Donnell, Douglas Stewart, Nancy Gilman. (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Paul Blankenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Textron, Inc, Terrence O'Donnell, Douglas Stewart, Nancy Gilman. (Tarantino, John) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 16 MOTION for Mark Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Diana Leach. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Mark Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Diana Leach. (White, Stephen) (Entered: 10/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 13 MOTION for Brian M. Lutz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Textron, Inc, Terrence O'Donnell, Douglas Stewart, Nancy Gilman. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 12 MOTION for Mitchell A. Karlan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Textron, Inc, Terrence O'Donnell, Douglas Stewart, Nancy Gilman. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Brian M. Lutz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Textron, Inc, Terrence O'Donnell, Douglas Stewart, Nancy Gilman. (Tarantino, John) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Mitchell A. Karlan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Textron, Inc, Terrence O'Donnell, Douglas Stewart, Nancy Gilman. (Tarantino, John) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 9 MOTION for Michael J. Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Diana Leach. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 8 MOTION for Edwin J. Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Diana Leach. (Duhamel, John) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Michael J. Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice with supporting memo by Diana Leach. (White, Stephen) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Edwin J. Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice with supporting memo by Diana Leach. (White, Stephen) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Textron, Inc. (Tarantino, John) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Dulude on behalf of all defendants (Dulude, Nicole) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. Rocha on behalf of all defendants (Rocha, Patricia) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Tarantino on behalf of Textron, Inc, Terrence O'Donnell, Douglas Stewart, Nancy Gilman (Tarantino, John) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by all parties. Responses due by 10/2/2009 (White, Stephen) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Related case affirmation filed by Stephen White. Case related to CA 09-367ML. (Dube, Paulette) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/5/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (33) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA; granting in part and denying in part (30) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00412-PJB -LDA; granting in part and denying in part (30) Mot ion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00421-PJB -LDA; granting in part and denying in part (36) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00424-PJB -LDA; granting in part and denying in part (19) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00440-PJB -LDA; granting in part an d denying in part (16) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00504-PJB -LDA; granting in part and denying in part (12) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00542-PJB -LDA -- MOTION TO DISMISS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT THAT PLAINTIFFS BASE THEIR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY CLAIM ON ALLEGED MISSTATEMENTS BY THE DEFENDANTS. IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS, MOTION DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro (New Hampshire) on 9/6/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00383-PJB -LDA et al.(Duhamel, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Textron, Inc, Terrence O'Donnell, Douglas Stewart, Nancy Gilman ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 14670001768.), filed by Diana Leach. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Filing Fee Receipt)(Dube, Paulette) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2009: # 3 Complaint) (Urizandi, Nisshy). (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 174 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?