Ferrari, et al v. Accredo Health, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Tennessee Western District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-02216
District Judge Bernice B. Donald, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 24, 2017 at 2:10 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Stein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eitan Misulovin

Represented by Barrett, Johnston & Parsley

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas M. McKeige +1 212 554 1400 + 212 554 1444 dmckeige@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chernau, Chaffin & Burnsed, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda F Burnsed +1 615 244 5480 lburnsed@cbslawyers.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley M. Chernau +1 615 244 5480 +1 615 460 7484 s.chernau@chernau.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crone & Mason, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/31/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin P. McDaniel +1 901 683 1850 +1 901 683 1963 erinpmcd@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GLASSMAN WYATT TUTTLE & COX, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B.J. Wade +1 901 527 4673 +1 901 521 0940

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

No Logo Debra Swiman, Plaintiff

Represented by Barrett, Johnston & Parsley

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett M Middleton +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 brettm@blbglaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/28/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Schulman +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323
TERMINATED: 08/31/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew Thorpe +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 davidt@blbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crone & Mason, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/31/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin P. McDaniel +1 901 683 1850 +1 901 683 1963 erinpmcd@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GLASSMAN WYATT TUTTLE & COX, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B.J. Wade +1 901 527 4673 +1 901 521 0940

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

No Logo James Miles, Plaintiff

Represented by Abbey Spanier Rodd & Abrams, LLP

Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Represented by Gardy & Notis, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily C. Komlossy +1 954 630 1001 +1 212 818 0477 ekomlossy@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of F. Guthrie Castle, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED F. Guthrie Castle, Jr. +1 901 756 6100 +1 901 347 0445 fgc@castle-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Mitchell +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 DavidM@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Joan Ferrari, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BOROD & KRAMER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Quitman Robins Ledyard, II +1 901 524 0200 +1 901 523 0043 bledyard@borodandkramer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DRESCHER & SHARP PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Hunter Sharp +1 615 425 7113 ksharp@dsattorneys.com

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo John Andrew Hokenson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E. Moskovitz +1 312 521 2000 +6211 621 621 1750

Toggle Switch Represented by BOROD & KRAMER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Quitman Robins Ledyard, II +1 901 524 0200 +1 901 523 0043 bledyard@borodandkramer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carol V. Gilden +1 312 357 0370 +1 312 357 0369 cgilden@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David J. Syrios

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Guri Ademi +1 414 482 8000 +1 414 482 8001 gademi@ademilaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shpetim Ademi +1 414 482 8000 sademi@ademilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Mitchell +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 DavidM@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

No Logo Ken Altschuld, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218

Toggle Switch Represented by Egleston Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Michael Egleston +1 212 683 3400 +1 212 683 3402 greg.egleston@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Mitchell +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 DavidM@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AX

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen M. Campbell +1 901 756 6300 +1 901 757 1296 kcampbell@appersoncrump.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary K. Smith +1 901 756 6300 +1 901 757 1296 gsmith@appersoncrump.com
No Logo Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett M Middleton +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 brettm@blbglaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niki L. O'Neel +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 nikio@blbglaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell F.A. Riviere +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 russellr@blbglaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Nicholas Rodelli +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 nicholasr@blbglaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/28/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Schulman +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323

Toggle Switch Represented by GLASSMAN WYATT TUTTLE & COX, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B.J. Wade +1 901 527 4673 +1 901 521 0940

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

No Logo Raphael Mbouwe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren S. Antonino +1 404 201 6908 +1 404 876 4476 lauren_antonino@hotmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dixie W. Ishee +1 901 725 1316 +1 901 725 1349 woodcarltonishee@bellsouth.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jef Feibelman +1 901 524 5000 +1 901 524 5024 jfeibelman@bpjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Javier Bleichmar +1 212 907 0887 +1 212 818 0477 jbleichmar@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Mitchell +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 DavidM@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Stanley Sved, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc S. Henzel +6106608000 888 643 6735 +1 610 660 8080 mhenzel182@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bramlett Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Kent Bramlett +1 615 248 2828 +1 866 816 4116 pknashlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Mitchell +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 DavidM@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Vincent R. Angichiodo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BOROD & KRAMER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Quitman Robins Ledyard, II +1 901 524 0200 +1 901 523 0043 bledyard@borodandkramer.com

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Mitchell +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 DavidM@rgrdlaw.com
v.
No Logo Accredo Health Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Accredo Health, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Quirk Bassett +1 404 881 7000 +8817 881 881 7777 peter.bassett@alston.com
TERMINATED: 06/14/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H. Goselin +1 404 881 7000 jgoselin@alston.com
TERMINATED: 11/29/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Kershaw +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 jeff.kershaw@alston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Trainer +1 404 881 7000 mark.trainer@alston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly C.. Wilcove +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 kwilcove@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott N. Sherman +1 404 443 6706 +1 404 238 9636 ssherman@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jef Feibelman +1 901 524 5000 +1 901 524 5024 jfeibelman@bpjlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas F. Halijan +1 901 524 5000 +1 901 524 5024 dhalijan@bpjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Molden, Holley & Thompson , LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/14/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oni A. Holley +1 404 324 4500 +1 404 324 4501 oholley@moldenholley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathan Walter Bear +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 nbear@csgrr.com
No Logo David D. Stevens, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Quirk Bassett +1 404 881 7000 +8817 881 881 7777 peter.bassett@alston.com
TERMINATED: 06/14/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H. Goselin +1 404 881 7000 jgoselin@alston.com
TERMINATED: 11/29/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Kershaw +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 jeff.kershaw@alston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly C.. Wilcove +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 kwilcove@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott N. Sherman +1 404 443 6706 +1 404 238 9636 ssherman@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jef Feibelman +1 901 524 5000 +1 901 524 5024 jfeibelman@bpjlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas F. Halijan +1 901 524 5000 +1 901 524 5024 dhalijan@bpjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathan Walter Bear +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 nbear@csgrr.com
No Logo Ernst & Young, LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ernst & Young"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ernst & Young, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia A. Connell +1 212 773 3914
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Bruce Hauben +1 212 773 2379 ron.hauben@ey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glankler Brown, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Ferguson Dudek +1 901 525 1322 adudek@glankler.com

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

No Logo Joel Kimbrough, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Quirk Bassett +1 404 881 7000 +8817 881 881 7777 peter.bassett@alston.com
TERMINATED: 06/14/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H. Goselin +1 404 881 7000 jgoselin@alston.com
TERMINATED: 11/29/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Kershaw +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 jeff.kershaw@alston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly C.. Wilcove +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 kwilcove@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott N. Sherman +1 404 443 6706 +1 404 238 9636 ssherman@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jef Feibelman +1 901 524 5000 +1 901 524 5024 jfeibelman@bpjlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas F. Halijan +1 901 524 5000 +1 901 524 5024 dhalijan@bpjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glankler Brown, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Saul C. Belz +1 901 525 1322 +1 901 525 2389 sbelz@glankler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Ferguson Dudek +1 901 525 1322 adudek@glankler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathan Walter Bear +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 nbear@csgrr.com
No Logo Randall D. Noel, Material Witness

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Memphis)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Wannamaker +1 901 525 8721 +1 901 525 6722 wannamakera@thomasonlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (495) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 498 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 497 Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Proceeds. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 3/16/2010. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None
    MOTION for Distribution of Net Settlement Proceeds (proposed order submitted) by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, Debra Swiman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Affidavit of Lara McDermott, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Consultation, # 5 Declaration of Service)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
      COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 491 Certificate of Service, filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System has been filed. For future reference, please note that #491 should have been submitted as an atttached document to #490, receiving only one docket entry number. Thanks.. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jml) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 2/19/2009. (agj) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bernice B. Donald: Conference to Approve Final Settlement held on 2/19/2009. Consolidated complex case settled by Mediation. Discussion re: case history and costs associated with case. Settlement is Granted ans stated in filings. Orders on pending motions and Judgment (with attachment) to enter. Present: B. Wade, T. DeLange, W. Ponder, T. Gronborg, J. Light, D. Halijan, P. Bassett, K. Wilcove, B. Halloway. (Court Reporter M. Dodson.) (tpe) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 2/19/09. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 492 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER Approving Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 2/19/09. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System re 490 Reply to Response to Motion,, Lead Plaintiffs' Notice Of Non-Objection To Motion For Final Approval Of Settlement And Plan Of Allocation And Application Of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel For An Award Of Attorneys' Fees And Expenses (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 478 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation (proposed order submitted), 479 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (proposed order submitted) Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Non-Objection To Motion For Final Approval Of Settlement And Plan Of Allocation And Application Of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel For An Award Of Attorneys' Fees And Expenses filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc Topaz. (vjm) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc Topaz. (vjm) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
                        Notice of Correction to 485 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Application and Motion of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for An Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Declaration of Service for Corrected Document - Motion. (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
                          DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 485 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Application and Motion of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for An Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Please note that the certificate of service page should be reflected as well(did not site in original deficency notice). You will need to go under the notice category then in the drop down box select 'notice of correction' and submit the certificate of service page only. Thanks and if you have questions please call 901-495-1505.. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jml) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Application and Motion of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for An Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 477 Notice (Other), filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Please note that you will need to resubmit #477 correctly. Document appears to be a motion and needs to be submitted as so in order to appear on the Judge's pending motion list. Thanks and if you have questions please call 901-495-1505.. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jml) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 482 Certificate of Service,, filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, 480 Affidavit,, filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, 478 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation (proposed order submitted) filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, 477 Notice (Other), filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, 481 Certificate of Counsel,,, filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, 479 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (proposed order submitted) filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System has been filed. For future reference, please note that #477 should have been submitted under the motion category. #478-479 should not have been submitted under the motion category, documents are reflect as the memorandums. Documents #480-482 should have been submitted as attached documents to the motion, receiving only one docket entry number. #478-479 will be termed from pending motion list. Thanks and if you have questions please call 901-495-1505.. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jml) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System re 480 Affidavit,, 478 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation (proposed order submitted), 477 Notice (Other), 481 Certificate of Counsel,,, 479 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (proposed order submitted) (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 478 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation (proposed order submitted), 479 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (proposed order submitted) Certificate of Consultation Filed in Conjunction with Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Application and Motion of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Timothy A. DeLange on behalf of Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT re 478 MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation (proposed order submitted), 479 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (proposed order submitted) Declaration of Timothy A. DeLange and Tor Gronborg by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Law in Support of Application of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (proposed order submitted) by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 478 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Settlement Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation (proposed order submitted) by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Application and Motion of Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to David Rosenfeld. (vjm) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to David Rosenfield. (vjm) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Samuel Rudman. (vjm) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Samuel Rudman. (vjm) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 472 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 11/20/08. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Bernice B. Donald: Preliminary Hearing re: Proposed Settlement held on 11/19/2008, (Final Hearing set for 2/19/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge Bernice B. Donald.)Present: B. Wade, E. Holloway, J. Feibelman; present by telephone: T. DeLange, J. Light, B. Nicholas, K. Wilcove. (Court Reporter L. Dudley.) (tpe) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          SETTING LETTER: Hearing Re: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement set for 11/19/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge Bernice B. Donald. (tpe) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 469 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Settlement Notice of Unopposed Motion and Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Of Law in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, # 2 Exhibit Stipulation of Settlement, # 3 Exhibit A to Stipulation of Settlement, # 4 Exhibit A-1 to Stipulation of Settlement, # 5 Exhibit A-2 to Stipulation of Settlement, # 6 Exhibit A-3 to Stipulation of Settlement, # 7 Exhibit B to Stipulation of Settlement, # 8 Certificate of Consultation, # 9 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance, # 10 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 466 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 10/8/08. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                Pro hac vice fee received: $ 100.00, receipt number J32320, rec'd in re: pro hac vice motion, Jeffrey Light. (ejs) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  MOTION for Leave for Jeffrey D. Light to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of good standing, # 2 declaration). Pro hac vice fee paid. Proposed order forwarded to Judge Breen.(ejs) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 9/30/08. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 464 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System Joint Notice Regarding Settlement (Wade, B.) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE: Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement 462 , the Pretrial Conference previously set for 9/22/08 is VACATED. (tpe) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 462 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Settlement by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System (Wade, B.) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 461 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                            MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion/Motion in Limine #24 to Preclude the Testimony of Proposed Expert J. Allen Overby (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation, # 2 Affidavit of Nathan W. Bear, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System re 458 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 12 To Preclude The Reports And Testimony Of Proposed Expert Randall Thomas, Esq.; Proposed Order Submitted, 442 Affidavit, 446 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 7 To Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating To Any Non-Party's Proportionate Liability; Proposed Order Submitted, 445 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 6 To Preclude Evidence And Argument Concerning Defendants' Reliance On Counsel Defense; Proposed Order Submitted, 436 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 2 Precluding Counsel from Communicating With A Witness Until The Witness' Testimony Is Concluded; Proposed Order Submitted, 435 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1 Precluding Defendants from Offering Deposition Testimony From Witnesses Who Are (1) Under Their Control; or (2) Not "Unavailable"; Proposed Order Submitted, 452 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 11 Limiting Expert Testimony From Christopher M. James To Those Opinions Set Forth In His Expert Reports; Proposed Order Submitted, 451 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 10 Excluding Evidence Regarding Dismissal Of Lead Plaintiffs' Claims Against Ernst & Young; Proposed Order Submitted, 459 Affidavit, 438 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4 To Preclude Reference To Investment Or Financial Information Other Than Class Period Transactions In Accredo Stock; Proposed Order Submitted, 437 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3 Precluding Fact Witnesses From Offering Impermissible Opinion Testimony; Proposed Order Submitted, 441 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 Precluding Evidence Of LSERS' Involvement In Other Securities Litigation; Proposed Order Submitted, 448 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 8 To Preclude Evidence Or Argument By Defendants Regarding Aggregate Damages; Proposed Order Submitted, 450 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 9 Requesting Judicial Notice That NASDAQ Is An "Efficient Market"; Proposed Order Submitted, 454 Affidavit, (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT re 458 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 12 To Preclude The Reports And Testimony Of Proposed Expert Randall Thomas, Esq.; Proposed Order Submitted Declaration of Timothy A. DeLange In Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 12 by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 458 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                  MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 12 To Preclude The Reports And Testimony Of Proposed Expert Randall Thomas, Esq.; Proposed Order Submitted by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 457 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                    MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #23 to Preclude Reference to or Testimony Relating in Any Way to the Lack of Any Enforcement Action by the Securities and Exchange Commission, the Philadelphia Stock Exchange, the National Association of Securities' Dealers and/or Other Regulators (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 456 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                      MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #22 to Preclude Reference to or Testimony Relating in Any Way to Counsel's Prior Association with Certain Lawyers or Law Firms (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 455 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #21 to Preclude Defendants from Introducing Evidence that This Litigation Is Limited to the Acute Portion of the SPS Accounts Receivable (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re 452 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 11 Limiting Expert Testimony From Christopher M. James To Those Opinions Set Forth In His Expert Reports; Proposed Order Submitted ; Declaration of Timothy A. DeLange in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 11 by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 453 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                            MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #20 to Preclude Defendants from Introducing Evidence of Unrelated Events that Occurred After the End of the Class Period (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 452 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                              MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 11 Limiting Expert Testimony From Christopher M. James To Those Opinions Set Forth In His Expert Reports; Proposed Order Submitted by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 451 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 10 Excluding Evidence Regarding Dismissal Of Lead Plaintiffs' Claims Against Ernst & Young; Proposed Order Submitted by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 450 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 9 Requesting Judicial Notice That NASDAQ Is An "Efficient Market"; Proposed Order Submitted by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 449 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #19 to Preclude Defendants from Introducing Evidence of the Price or Movement of Accredo Securities After the Statutory 90-Day "Look Back" Period (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 448 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 8 To Preclude Evidence Or Argument By Defendants Regarding Aggregate Damages; Proposed Order Submitted by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 447 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #18 to Preclude Evidence and Argument Identifying Glennon Moyers' Opinions as an Audit and Opinion of KPMG (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 446 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 7 To Preclude Evidence and Argument Relating To Any Non-Party's Proportionate Liability; Proposed Order Submitted by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 445 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 6 To Preclude Evidence And Argument Concerning Defendants' Reliance On Counsel Defense; Proposed Order Submitted by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 444 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude any Testimony, Reference to, or Evidence Regarding Purported Violations of the Sarbanes-Oxley Act of 2002 (proposed order submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude any Testimony, Reference to, or Evidence Regarding Purported Violations of the Sarbanes-Oxley Act of 2002)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 443 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #17 to Preclude Reference to or Testimony Regarding the Existence of or Allegations Regarding Confidential Witnesses, Including Defendants' Assertions that Lead Plaintiffs Engaged in "Improper Pleading Tactics," "Bad Faith Conduct" or Any Similar Behavior Relating to Confidential Witnesses (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT re 441 MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 Precluding Evidence Of LSERS' Involvement In Other Securities Litigation; Proposed Order Submitted Declaration of Timothy A. DeLange in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 441 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 5 Precluding Evidence Of LSERS' Involvement In Other Securities Litigation; Proposed Order Submitted by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 440 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions and Testimony of Mercer Bullard (proposed order submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions and Tetimony of Mercer Bullard, # 3 Exhibit A to Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit B to Memorandum, # 5 Exhibit C to Memorandum)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 439 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #16 to Provide Certain Preliminary Jury Instructions (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 438 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4 To Preclude Reference To Investment Or Financial Information Other Than Class Period Transactions In Accredo Stock; Proposed Order Submitted by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 437 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 3 Precluding Fact Witnesses From Offering Impermissible Opinion Testimony; Proposed Order Submitted by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 436 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 2 Precluding Counsel from Communicating With A Witness Until The Witness' Testimony Is Concluded; Proposed Order Submitted by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 435 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1 Precluding Defendants from Offering Deposition Testimony From Witnesses Who Are (1) Under Their Control; or (2) Not "Unavailable"; Proposed Order Submitted by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 434 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude any Testimony, Reference to, or Evidence Regarding Medco Health Solutions, Inc.'s Due Diligence of Accredo Health INc. (proposed order submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation, # 2 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limineto Exclude any Testimony, Reference to, or Evidence Regarding Medco Health Solutions, INc's Due Diligence of Accredo Health Inc., # 3 Exhibit A to Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit B to Memorandum)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 433 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #15 to Permit Lead Plaintiffs to Examine Witnesses Identified with Defendants by Leading Questions and to Preclude Defendants from Examining Witnesses Identified with Them by Leading Questions During Lead Plaintiffs' Case-in-Chief (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 432 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #14 to Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial the Boilerplate Defenses Contained in Their Answer to the Complaint (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 431 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude any Testimony Reference to, or Evidence Regarding Express Scripts, Inc. (proposed order submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude any Testimony, Reference to, or Evidence Regarding Express Scripts, Inc., # 3 Exhibit A to Meomorandum, # 4 Exhibit B to Memorandum, # 5 Exhibit C to Memorandum, # 6 Exhibit D to Memorandum, # 7 Exhibit E to Memorandum, # 8 Exhibit F to Memorandum, # 9 Exhibit G to Memorandum, # 10 Exhibit H to Memorandum)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 430 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine Lead Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine #13 to Preclude the Presence of Percipient Witnesses in the Courtroom Unless They Are Testifying and to Prohibit Counsel and Witnesses from Communicating with Percipient Witnesses Who Have Not Yet Testified (Proposed Order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 429 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions and Testimony of D. Paul Regan (proposed order submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions and Testimony of D. Paul Regan, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Memorandum, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Memorandum, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Memorandum, # 8 Exhibit 6 to Memorandum, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Memorandum, # 10 Exhibit 8 to Memorandum, # 11 Exhibit 9 to Memorandum, # 12 Exhibit 10 to Memorandum, # 13 Exhibit 11 to Memorandum, # 14 Exhibit 12 to Memorandum, # 15 Exhibit 13 to Memorandum, # 16 Exhibit 14 to Memorandum, # 17 Exhibit 15 to Memorandum, # 18 Exhibit 16 to Memorandum, # 19 Exhibit 17 to Memorandum, # 20 Exhibit 18 to Memorandum, # 21 Exhibit 19 to Memorandum, # 22 Exhibit 20 to Memorandum, # 23 Exhibit 21 to Memorandum, # 24 Exhibit 22 to Memorandum)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Lead Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion and Memorandum to Exceed Page Limitation on Lead Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion/Motion in Limine #24 to Preclude the Testimony of Proposed Expert J. Allen Overby (Proposed Order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 427 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude any Testimony, Reference to, or Evidence Regarding the Shelf Registration and the Poison Pill (proposed order submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude any Testimony, Reference to, or Evidence regarding the Shelf Registration and the Poison Pill, # 3 Exhibit A to Memo, # 4 Exhibit B to Motion, # 5 Exhibit C to Motion, # 6 Exhibit D to Motion)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 426 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine Defendant's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala (proposed order submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion and Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Memorandum, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Memorandum, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Memorandum, # 8 Exhibit 6 to Memorandum, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Memorandum, # 10 Exhibit 8 to Memorandum, # 11 Exhibit 9 to Memorandum, # 12 Exhibit 10 to Memorandum, # 13 Exhibit 11 to Memorandum, # 14 Exhibit 12 to Memorandum, # 15 Exhibit 13 to Memorandum, # 16 Exhibit 14 to Memorandum, # 17 Exhibit 15 to Memorandum, # 18 Exhibit 16 to Memorandum, # 19 Exhibit 17 to Memorandum, # 20 Exhibit 18 to Memorandum, # 21 Exhibit 19 to Memorandum, # 22 Exhibit 20 to Memorandum, # 23 Exhibit 21 to Memorandum, # 24 Exhibit 22 to Memorandum)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Scott D. Hakala (proposed order submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 401 MOTION Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of J. Allen Overby and Randall S. Thomas (proposed order submitted) filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 9/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting (418) Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 9/1/2008. (Gerald B. Cohn) (Entered: 09/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 418 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of Overby and Thomas (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated has been filed. For future reference, please note that proposed documents are also sent to Judge's email(the text can state"proposed order and docuemnt submitted"). If you did not submit the reply with order, please do so, otherwise filer is not required to resubmit document. Thanks. (jml) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 418 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of Overby and Thomas (Proposed Order Submitted) MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of Overby and Thomas (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Bear, Nathan) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Correction to 402 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Correction to Exhibit 24, Part A to Lead Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, Replaces Prior Exhibit 24, Part A. (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of Overby and Thomas (Proposed Order Submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sur-Reply, # 2 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  SETTING LETTER to confirm Pretrial Information: Jury Trial set for 10/20/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge Bernice B. Donald. Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2008 08:45 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge Bernice B. Donald. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/15/2008. (tpe) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 401 MOTION Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of J. Allen Overby and Randall S. Thomas (proposed order submitted) MOTION Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of J. Allen Overby and Randall S. Thomas (proposed order submitted) MOTION Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of J. Allen Overby and Randall S. Thomas (proposed order submitted) filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Bear, Nathan) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 409 Response in Support of Motion, filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated, 410 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated has been filed. For future reference, please note that this document was filed twice and #409 will be sealed from further viewing. Thanks and if you have questions please call 901-495-1505.. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jml) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 408 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 07/28/2008. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Accredo Health, Incorporated of Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Statement of Undisputed Material Facts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to No. 7)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Accredo Health, Incorporated of Defendants' Response and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Statement of Undisputed Facts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to No. 6, # 2 Exhibit to No. 8, # 3 Exhibit to No. 9, # 4 Exhibit to No. 10, # 5 Exhibit to No. 12, # 6 Exhibit to No. 14, # 7 Exhibit to No. 16, # 8 Exhibit to No. 15, # 9 Exhibit to No. 17, # 10 Exhibit to No. 24, # 11 Exhibit to No. 23, # 12 Exhibit to No. 25, # 13 Exhibit to No. 26, # 14 Exhibit to No. 27A, # 15 Exhibit to No. 27B, # 16 Exhibit to No. 28, # 17 Exhibit to No. 29, # 18 Exhibit to No. 32, # 19 Exhibit to No. 33A, # 20 Exhibit to No. 33B, # 21 Exhibit to No. 35, # 22 Exhibit to No. 36, # 23 Exhibit to No. 37, # 24 Exhibit to No. 38, # 25 Exhibit to No. 40, # 26 Exhibit to No. 41, # 27 Exhibit to No. 42, # 28 Exhibit to No. 45, # 29 Exhibit to No. 48, # 30 Exhibit to No. 49, # 31 Exhibit to No. 50, # 32 Exhibit to No. 51, # 33 Exhibit to No. 53, # 34 Exhibit to No. 55, # 35 Exhibit to No. 56, # 36 Exhibit to No. 57, # 37 Exhibit to No. 60, # 38 Exhibit to No. 61, # 39 Exhibit to No. 63, # 40 Exhibit to No. 64)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 360 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 410 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 363 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion and Memorandum for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of J. Allen Overby and Randall S. Thomas (proposed order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 401 MOTION Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of J. Allen Overby and Randall S. Thomas (proposed order submitted) MOTION Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of J. Allen Overby and Randall S. Thomas (proposed order submitted) MOTION Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of J. Allen Overby and Randall S. Thomas (proposed order submitted) filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 386 MOTION to Compel the Production of the Improperly Withheld Brian Johnson Chronology (proposed order submitted) MOTION to Compel the Production of the Improperly Withheld Brian Johnson Chronology (proposed order submitted) filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting (403) Motion for Leave to File Reply in case 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-gbc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 7/15/2008. Associated Cases: 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-gbc et al.(Cohn, Gerald) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 07/07/2008. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion and Memorandum for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Production of the Improperly Withheld Brian Johnson Chronology (proposed order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System re 396 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, OF FILING LEAD PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS ("RSUF") (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, Part A, # 25 Exhibit 24, Part B, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41, # 43 Exhibit 42, # 44 Exhibit 43, # 45 Exhibit 44, # 46 Exhibit 45, # 47 Exhibit 46, # 48 Exhibit 47, # 49 Exhibit 48, # 50 Exhibit 49, # 51 Exhibit 50, # 52 Exhibit 51, # 53 Exhibit 52, # 54 Exhibit 53, # 55 Exhibit 54, # 56 Exhibit 55, # 57 Exhibit 56, # 58 Exhibit 57, # 59 Exhibit 58, # 60 Exhibit 59, # 61 Exhibit 60, # 62 Exhibit 61, # 63 Exhibit 62, # 64 Exhibit 63, # 65 Exhibit 64, # 66 Exhibit 65, # 67 Exhibit 66, # 68 Exhibit 67, # 69 Exhibit 68, # 70 Exhibit 69, # 71 Exhibit 70, # 72 Exhibit 71, # 73 Exhibit 72, # 74 Exhibit 73, # 75 Exhibit 74, # 76 Exhibit 75, # 77 Exhibit 76, # 78 Exhibit 77, # 79 Exhibit 78, # 80 Exhibit 79, # 81 Exhibit 80, # 82 Exhibit 81, # 83 Exhibit 82, # 84 Exhibit 83, # 85 Exhibit 84, # 86 Exhibit 85, # 87 Exhibit 86, # 88 Exhibit 87, # 89 Exhibit 88, # 90 Exhibit 89, # 91 Exhibit 90, # 92 Exhibit 91, # 93 Exhibit 92, # 94 Exhibit 93, # 95 Exhibit 94, # 96 Exhibit 95, # 97 Exhibit 96, # 98 Exhibit 97, # 99 Exhibit 98, # 100 Exhibit 99, # 101 Exhibit 100, # 102 Exhibit 101, # 103 Exhibit 102, # 104 Exhibit 103, # 105 Exhibit 104, # 106 Exhibit 105, # 107 Exhibit 106, # 108 Exhibit 107, # 109 Exhibit 108, # 110 Exhibit 109, # 111 Exhibit 110, # 112 Exhibit 111, # 113 Exhibit 112, # 114 Exhibit 113, # 115 Exhibit 114, # 116 Exhibit 115, # 117 Exhibit 116, # 118 Exhibit 117, # 119 Exhibit 118, # 120 Exhibit 119, # 121 Exhibit 120, # 122 Exhibit 121, # 123 Exhibit 122, # 124 Exhibit 123, # 125 Exhibit 124, # 126 Exhibit 125, # 127 Exhibit 126, # 128 Exhibit 127, # 129 Exhibit 128, # 130 Exhibit 129, # 131 Exhibit 130, # 132 Exhibit 131, # 133 Exhibit 132, # 134 Exhibit 133, # 135 Exhibit 134, # 136 Exhibit 135, # 137 Exhibit 136, # 138 Exhibit 137, # 139 Exhibit 138, # 140 Exhibit 139, # 141 Exhibit 140, # 142 Exhibit 141, # 143 Exhibit 142, # 144 Exhibit 143, # 145 Exhibit 144, # 146 Exhibit 145, # 147 Exhibit 146, # 148 Exhibit 147, # 149 Exhibit 148, # 150 Exhibit 149, # 151 Exhibit 150, # 152 Exhibit 151, # 153 Exhibit 152, # 154 Exhibit 153, # 155 Exhibit 154)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of J. Allen Overby and Randall S. Thomas (proposed order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of J. Allen Overby and Randall S. Thomas, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Nathan W. Bear in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude and Strike the Attorney Affidavits of J. Allen Overby and Randall S. Thomas, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System re 396 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, OF FILING LEAD PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS ("SSUF") IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, Part A, # 56 Exhibit 55, Part B, # 57 Exhibit 56, # 58 Exhibit 57, # 59 Exhibit 58, # 60 Exhibit 59, # 61 Exhibit 60, # 62 Exhibit 61, # 63 Exhibit 62, # 64 Exhibit 63, # 65 Exhibit 64, # 66 Exhibit 65, # 67 Exhibit 66)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTACHMENT Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 70 to 394 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 73, # 2 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 74, # 3 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 75)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTACHMENT Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 51, Part 1 to 394 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 51, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 51, Part 3, # 3 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 51, Part 4, # 4 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 52, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 52, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 56, Part 1, # 7 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 56, Part 2, # 8 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 56, Part 3, # 9 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 60, Part 1, # 10 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 60, Part 2, # 11 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 66, # 12 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 67, # 13 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 68)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTACHMENT Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 44, Part 1 to 394 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 44, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 44, Part 3, # 3 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 49, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 49, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 50, Part 1, # 6 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 50, Part 2, # 7 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 50, Part 3, # 8 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 50, Part 4, # 9 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 50, Part 5, # 10 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 50, Part 6)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 396 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 363 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Timothy A. DeLange In Support Of Lead Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Trig R. Smith In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z, # 29 Exhibit AA, # 30 Exhibit BB, # 31 Exhibit CC, # 32 Exhibit DD, # 33 Exhibit EE, # 34 Exhibit FF, # 35 Exhibit GG, # 36 Exhibit HH, # 37 Exhibit II, # 38 Exhibit JJ, # 39 Exhibit KK, # 40 Exhibit LL, # 41 Exhibit MM, # 42 Exhibit NN, # 43 Exhibit OO, # 44 Exhibit PP, # 45 Exhibit QQ, # 46 Exhibit RR, # 47 Exhibit SS, # 48 Exhibit TT, # 49 Exhibit UU, # 50 Exhibit VV, # 51 Exhibit WW, # 52 Exhibit XX, # 53 Exhibit YY, # 54 Exhibit ZZ, # 55 Exhibit AAA, # 56 Exhibit BBB, # 57 Exhibit CCC, # 58 Exhibit DDD, # 59 Exhibit EEE, # 60 Exhibit FFF, # 61 Exhibit GGG, # 62 Exhibit HHH, # 63 Exhibit III, # 64 Exhibit Affidavit of Steven Aronica, # 65 Exhibit Affidavit of Terry Franklin, # 66 Exhibit Affidavit of Judith Canby)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTACHMENT Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 22 to 394 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 23, # 2 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 24, # 3 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 28, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 28, Part 2, # 5 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 28, Part 3, # 6 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 30, # 7 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 33, Part 1, # 8 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 33, Part 2, # 9 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 37, Part 1, # 10 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 37, Part 2, # 11 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 37, Part 3)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Accredo Health, Incorporated of Defendants' Response and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Facts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 10, # 2 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement #11, # 3 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 13, # 4 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 14, # 5 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 16, # 6 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 20, Part 1, # 7 Exhibit Response to Plaintiffs' Statement # 20, Part 2)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 393 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 360 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Accredo Health, Incorporated of Submission of Documents to Court for In Camera Inspection (Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 386 MOTION to Compel the Production of the Improperly Withheld Brian Johnson Chronology (proposed order submitted) MOTION to Compel the Production of the Improperly Withheld Brian Johnson Chronology (proposed order submitted) filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 380 MOTION to Seal Document Certain Exhibits Filed with Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Proposed Order Submitted) MOTION to Seal Document Certain Exhibits Filed with Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Proposed Order Submitted) Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Defendants' Response and Request for Clarification filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bear, Nathan) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Accredo Health, Incorporated of Response and Request for Clarification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF Verification of Order Granting Motion to Seal Document)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 380 MOTION to Seal Document Certain Exhibits Filed with Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Proposed Order Submitted) MOTION to Seal Document Certain Exhibits Filed with Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Proposed Order Submitted) (proposed order submitted) filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Bear, Nathan) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF TRANSFER - Case is is hereby transferred to Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn for further references and assignments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 6/16/08. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel the Production of the Improperly Withheld Brian Johnson Chronology (proposed order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Certificate of Consultation, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Correction to 363 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 379 Attachment Exhibit F, Rebuttal Expert Report of Glennon Moyers replaces prior Exhibit F (Parts 1, 2 and 3). (Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 381 Motion to Approve Class Notice Procedures. Associated Cases: 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp et al. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting (380) Motion to Seal Document in case 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 6/3/2008. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING MOTION: (363 in 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (360 in 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment for REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 6/3/2008. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 381 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Certify Class Unopposed Motion for Approval of Class Notice Procedures (Proposed Order Submitted) by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation, # 2 Declaration of Service)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document Certain Exhibits Filed with Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Proposed Order Submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTACHMENT to Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment (Exhibit F, Part 1) to 363 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, Part 2)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting (377) Motion to Set Page Limits on Summary Judgment Briefing in case 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 5/22/2008. Associated Cases: 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp et al. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION To Set Page Limits On Summary Judgment Briefing (proposed order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Bear, Nathan) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 373 Attachment filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated, 374 Attachment filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated, 371 Attachment filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated, 370 Attachment filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated, 368 Attachment filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated, 372 Attachment filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated has been filed. For future reference, please note that the documents should have been submitted as separate attachments(just as #366). Also #370 the main document and the attachment are the same and as to #373 you will need to review the ecf policies and procedures as to personal identifiers(main document contains check information). Thanks and if you have questions please call 901-495-1505.. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jml, ) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTACHMENT of Exhibit paragraphs 79-85 to Statement of Undisputed Material Facts to 364 Attachment, by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Feibelman, Jef) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTACHMENT of Exhibit paragraphs 72-78 to Statement of Undisputed Material Facts to 364 Attachment, by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTACHMENT of Exhibit paragraphs 150-154 of Statement to Undisputed Material Facts to 364 Attachment, by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Feibelman, Jef) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTACHMENT of Exhibit paragraphs 123-149 to 364 Attachment, by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTACHMENT of Exhibit paragraphs 101-122 to 364 Attachment, by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Feibelman, Jef) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTACHMENT of Exhibit Paragraphs 87-100 to 364 Attachment, by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Paragraphs 87-100)(Feibelman, Jef) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 369 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Paragraph 8, # 2 Exhibit Paragraph 10, # 3 Exhibit Paragraph 15, # 4 Exhibit Paragraph 16, # 5 Exhibit Paragraph 17, # 6 Exhibit Paragraph 19, # 7 Exhibit Paragraph 20, # 8 Exhibit Paragraph 24, Part 1, # 9 Exhibit Paragraph 24, part 2, # 10 Exhibit Paragraph 24, Part 3, # 11 Exhibit Paragraph 24, Part 4, # 12 Exhibit Paragraph 24, Part 5, # 13 Exhibit Paragraph 25, Part 1, # 14 Exhibit Paragraph 25, Part 2, # 15 Exhibit Paragraph 25, Part 3, # 16 Exhibit Paragraph 25, Part 4, # 17 Exhibit Paragraphs 26 - 44, # 18 Exhibit Paragraphs 45 - 121)(Feibelman, Jef) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTACHMENT of Exhibits to Statement of Undisputed Material Facts to 364 Attachment, by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Paragraphs 39 - 60, # 2 Exhibit Paragraphs 61 - 71)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTACHMENT to Statement of Undisputed Material Facts to 364 Attachment, by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Paragraph 28, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit Paragraph 28, Part 3, # 3 Exhibit Paragraph 28, part 4, # 4 Exhibit Paragraph 28, part 5, # 5 Exhibit Paragraph 28, part 6, # 6 Exhibit Paragraph 28, Parts 7-14)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTACHMENT to Statement of Undisputed Material Facts to 364 Attachment, by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Paragraph 18, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit Paragraph 19, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Paragraph 19, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit Paragraph 19, part 3, # 5 Exhibit Paragraph 21, # 6 Exhibit Paragraph 22, part 1, # 7 Exhibit Paragraph 22, part 2, # 8 Exhibit Paragragh 23, # 9 Exhibit Paragraph 24, Part 1, # 10 Exhibit Paragraph 24, Part 2, # 11 Exhibit Paragraph 25, # 12 Exhibit Paragraph 26, # 13 Exhibit Paragraph 27, Part 1, # 14 Exhibit Paragraph 27, part 2)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTACHMENT to Statement of Undisputed Material Facts to 364 Attachment, by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Paragraph 7, # 2 Exhibit Paragraph 8, # 3 Exhibit 9, Part 1, # 4 Exhibit Paragraph 9, part 2, # 5 Exhibit Paragraph 9, part 3, # 6 Exhibit Paragraph 10, part 1, # 7 Exhibit Paragraph 10, part 2, # 8 Exhibit Paragraph 11, part 1, # 9 Exhibit Paragraph 11, part 2, # 10 Exhibit Paragraph 12, # 11 Exhibit Paragraph 13, # 12 Exhibit Paragraph 14, # 13 Exhibit 15, # 14 Exhibit Paragraph 16, # 15 Exhibit Paragraph 17)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTACHMENT Statement of Undisputed Material Facts to 363 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Paragraph 2, # 3 Exhibit Paragraph 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit A, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit A, Part 3, # 5 Exhibit A, part 4, # 6 Exhibit B, Part 1, # 7 Exhibit B, Part 2, # 8 Exhibit B, Part 3, # 9 Exhibit C, Part 1, # 10 Exhibit C, Part 2, # 11 Exhibit C, Part 3, # 12 Exhibit C, Part 4, # 13 Exhibit D, # 14 Exhibit E, # 15 Exhibit F, Part 3, # 16 Exhibit G, Part 1, # 17 Exhibit G, Part 2, # 18 Exhibit H, Part 1, # 19 Exhibit H, Part 2)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting (357) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 5/16/2008. Associated Cases: 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp et al.(Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 352 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 5/16/2008. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Trig R. Smith, # 3 Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Sealed Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Sealed Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit 24, # 28 Sealed Exhibit 25, # 29 Exhibit 26, # 30 Exhibit 27, # 31 Exhibit 28, # 32 Exhibit 29, # 33 Exhibit 30, # 34 Exhibit 31, # 35 Exhibit 32, # 36 Exhibit 33, # 37 Exhibit 34, # 38 Exhibit 35, # 39 Exhibit 36, # 40 Exhibit 37, # 41 Exhibit 38, # 42 Exhibit 39, # 43 Exhibit 40, # 44 Exhibit 41, # 45 Exhibit 42, # 46 Exhibit 43, # 47 Exhibit 44, # 48 Exhibit 45, # 49 Exhibit 46, # 50 Exhibit 47, # 51 Exhibit 48, # 52 Exhibit 49, # 53 Exhibit 50, # 54 Exhibit 51, # 55 Exhibit 52, # 56 Exhibit 53, # 57 Exhibit 54, # 58 Exhibit 55, # 59 Exhibit 56, # 60 Exhibit 57, # 61 Exhibit 58, # 62 Exhibit 59, # 63 Exhibit 60, # 64 Exhibit 61, # 65 Exhibit 62, # 66 Exhibit 63, # 67 Exhibit 64, # 68 Exhibit 65, # 69 Exhibit 66, # 70 Exhibit 67, # 71 Exhibit 68, # 72 Exhibit 69, # 73 Exhibit 70, # 74 Exhibit 71, # 75 Sealed Exhibit 72, # 76 Exhibit 73, # 77 Exhibit 74, # 78 Exhibit 75)(Wade, B.) Modified on 6/3/2008 (jml, )as to text only----certain documents modified per order #380. (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 352 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting (356) Motion for Leave to File in case 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 5/7/2008. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct the Briefing Schedule for Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment (Proposed Order Submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Lead Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Proposed Order Submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting re 354 Joint Motion to Amend the July 8, 2005 Protective Order 346 Response in Opposition to Motion 349 Reply to Response to Motion 341 Amended MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 4/17/08. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/17/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 145 Protective Order (proposed order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 352 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Proposed Order Submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 341 : Motion Hearing reset for 4/15/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham. (wmw, ) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 341 : Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2008 01:30 PM (cst) in Courtroom 6 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham. (wmw, ) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 341 Amended MOTION for Protective Order To Enforce the Protective Order and Withdraw Defendants' Improper Confidentiality Designations [proposed order submitted]Amended MOTION for Protective Order To Enforce the Protective Order and Withdraw Defendants' Improper Confidentiality Designations [proposed order submitted] filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Bear, Nathan) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting (345) Joint Motion to Set the Briefing For Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 3/11/2008. Associated Cases: 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp et al. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 347 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 341 Amended MOTION for Protective Order To Enforce the Protective Order and Withdraw Defendants' Improper Confidentiality Designations [proposed order submitted]Amended MOTION for Protective Order To Enforce the Protective Order and Withdraw Defendants' Improper Confidentiality Designations [proposed order submitted] filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Set the Briefing Schedule for Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment, proposed order submitted via email by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Bear, Nathan) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLEASE DISREGARD THIS NOTICE....COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 342 Sealed Document,,, has been filed. For future reference, please note that exhibit 2 does not reflect an image(not sure if filed as another one of the exhibits). If you need to resubmit that exhibit only, please go under notice then 'notice of correction' and resubmit that exhibit only. Thanks and if you have questions please call 901-495-1505.. (jml, ) Modified on 2/21/2008 (jml, )as to text only----exhibit 2 is ok per converation with atty(atty spoke with EG/qu). (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Nadeem Faruqi. (vjm, ) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 342 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended MOTION for Protective Order To Enforce the Protective Order and Withdraw Defendants' Improper Confidentiality Designations [proposed order submitted] by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation, # 2 Memorandum)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO SCHEDULE DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENFORCE THE PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENFORCE PROTECTIVE ORDER 306 339 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 2/8/08. (wmw, ) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION schedule defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motion to enforce the protective order and for leave to file a reply memorandum Proposed Order Submitted by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 337 Joint Motion to Schedule Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce the Protective Order and for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum. (1) Defendants will have until on or before Friday,February 8, 2008 to file an Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion; (2) Plaintiffs will have leave to file a Reply Memorandum to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion if Plaintiffs believe it will assist the Court in resolving the Motion; and (3) Plaintiffs will have until on or before Friday, February 22, 2008 to file the Reply Memorandum referenced in point two above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 12/20/07. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Schedule Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce the Protective Order and for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum (Proposed Order Submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting (335) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 12/10/2007. Associated Cases: 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp et al.(Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew P. Jubenville by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System....PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED.... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation # 2 Certificate of Good Standing# 3 Declaration# 4)(jml, ) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER in case 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp; granting (13) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 2:03-cv-02225-BBD; granting (15) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 2:03-cv-02226-BBD; granting (9) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 2:03-cv-02276-BBD; granting (11) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 2:03-cv-02321-BBD; granting (9) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 2:03-cv-02346-BBD-tmp; granting (6) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 2:03-cv-02365-BBD-dkv; granting (13) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 2:03-cv-02435-BBD-dkv. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 11/29/2007. Associated Cases: 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp et al.(Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting (326) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey A. Kershaw terminated in case 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 11/29/2007. Associated Cases: 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp et al.(Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Ernst & Young of Name Change (Ferguson, Amy) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 10/20/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge Bernice B. Donald; Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2008 08:45 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge Bernice B. Donald; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/15/2008. Associated Cases: 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp et al.(tlh, ) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 329 Second Joint Motion to Amend the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b)Scheduling Order. Disclosure of Expert Reports ddl 12/20/07; Disclosure of Rebuttal Expert Reports ddl 2/15/08; Expert Discovery Closes 3/21/08. All other provisions of the 4/16/07 Joint Case Management Statement, as amended on 10/2/07 are unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 11/5/07. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION to Amend/Correct the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Bear, Nathan) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 327 Third Joint Unopposed Motion to Schedule Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce the Protective Order and for Leave to File A Reply Memorandum. Defendants shall have up to and including 12/20/07 to file an opposition to plaintiffs' motion and plaintiffs shall have up to and including 1/4/08 to file a reply memorandum. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 10/31/07. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Schedule Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce the Protective Order and for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum Proposed Order Submitted by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record of Jeffrey A. Kershaw (Proposed Order Submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 323 Second Joint Motion to Schedule Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce the Protective Order and for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum. Defendants have up to and including 10/31/07 within which to file an opposition to plaintiffs' motion and plaintiffs have up to and including 11/7/07 within which to file a reply memorandum in response to defendants' opposition. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 10/2/07. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 318 Joint Motion to Amend the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Disclosure of experts due 9/27/07; Factural discovery due 10/26/07; Disclosure of expert reports due 11/21/07; Disclosure of rebuttal expert reports due 12/21/07; and expert discovery closes 2/15/08. All other provisions of the 4/16/07 JCMS regarding depositions are unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 10/2/07. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second MOTION Second Joint Motion to Schedule Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce the Protective Order and for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum Proposed Order Submitted by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum # 2 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 318 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order (Proposed Order Submitted)Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, Debra Swiman, 319 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, Debra Swiman has been filed. For future reference, please note that the memorandumn should have been submitted as an attached document to the motion receiving only one docket entry number. Thank you.. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jml, ) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 320 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Granting Admission to Mark D. Trainer as Counsel for Defendants. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 09/20/2007. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David D. Stevens. PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED.... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing# 2 Declaration# 3 Receipt of PAID FILING FEE)Associated Cases: 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp et al.(jml, ) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re (13 in 2:03-cv-02435-BBD-dkv, 318 in 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp, 9 in 2:03-cv-02276-BBD, 15 in 2:03-cv-02226-BBD, 11 in 2:03-cv-02321-BBD, 6 in 2:03-cv-02365-BBD-dkv, 13 in 2:03-cv-02225-BBD, 9 in 2:03-cv-02346-BBD-tmp) MOTION to Amend/Correct the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. Associated Cases: 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp et al.(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. Associated Cases: 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp et al.(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 316 Joint Motion to Schedule Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce the Protective Order and for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum 306 . Defendants shall have up to and including 10/3/07 to file an Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion. Plaintiffs will have leave to file a reply memorandum to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion if Plaintiffs believe it will assist the Court in resolving the motion, and Plaintiffs will have up to and including 10/10/07 to file the reply memorandum. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 9/13/07. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Schedule Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce the Protective Order and for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum Proposed Order Submitted by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum # 2 Certificate of Consultation of Scott N. Sherman)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System OF FIRM NAME CHANGE Associated Cases: 2:03-cv-02216-BBD-tmp et al.(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham : Motions Hearing held on 9/6/2007. Parties appeared for hearing on pending motions ( 254 , 255 , 258 , 288 , 290 , 306 ). At the beginning of the hearing counsel for all parties and for non-party Randall Noel announced that they met and conferred regarding all issues raised in the pending motions as instructed in the court's notice of setting letter. The parties jointly moved to withdraw their respective motions with the exception of docket entry #306 which the parties will continue discussing. The court therefore denies as moot without prejudice the motions at docket entry 254, 255, 258, 288, & 290. The court will set a hearing on the motion at docket entry #306, if appropriate, in the event the parties are unable to resolve that motion. Motions terminated: re 254 , 255 , 258 , 288 , 290 (Court Reporter Lynn Dudley.) (wmw, ) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REVISED NOTICE of Hearing on Motions 254 , 255 , 258 , 288 , 290 , 306 : Motions Hearing set for 9/6/2007 01:30 PM (cst) in Courtroom 6 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham. (wmw, ) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 288 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting 298 Combined Motion and Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition ot Defendants' Motion to Amend the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. For good cause shown, and no objections thereto, the motion to file a reply brief is granted. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - no image attached). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 8/31/07. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 273 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel fo Record by Erin P. McDaniel. For good cause shown, and no objections thereto, the motion to withdraw is GRANTED. Attorney Erin P. McDaniel terminated. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - no image attached). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 8/31/07. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 274 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by David A. Thorpe. For good cause shown, and no objections thereto, the motion is GRANTED. Attorney David A. Thorpe terminated . Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 8/31/07. (Pham, Tu) (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE WITH THE DOCKET ENTRY). (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 305 Motion for Admission for Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 08/30/2007. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 307 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P part 1# 17 Exhibit P part 2# 18 Exhibit P part 3# 19 Exhibit Q# 20 Exhibit R# 21 Exhibit S# 22 Exhibit T# 23 Exhibit U part 1# 24 Exhibit U part 2# 25 Exhibit U part 3# 26 Exhibit V part 1# 27 Exhibit V part 2# 28 Exhibit V part 3# 29 Exhibit V part 4# 30 Exhibit V part 5# 31 Exhibit V part 6# 32 Exhibit W# 33 Exhibit X)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order and Withdraw Defendants' Improper Confidentiality Designations (Proposed Order Submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum # 2 Certificate of Consultation)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nathan W. Bear as to Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED (Attachments: # 1 Declaration along with Certificate of Good Standing# 2 Certificate of Consultation # 3 Filing Fee Received)(jml, ) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing on Motions 254 , 255 , 258 , 288 , 290 , : Motions Hearing set for 9/6/2007 01:30 PM (cst) in Courtroom 6 - Memphis before Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham. (wmw, ) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 290 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting 301 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - No Document Attached) Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 8/17/07. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (Proposed Order Submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Certificate of Consultation of Scott N. Sherman)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 300 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15)(Smith, Trig) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 290 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (Proposed Order Submitted) (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M)(Smith, Trig) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief, proposed order submitted, by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Amend the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order# 2 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number M108686. Motion Pro Hac Vice paid as to Brett Middleton. (jml, ) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Accredo Health, Incorporated of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham : Telephonic hearing held on 8/2/2007. All parties present. Expedited telephonic hearing held on discovery dispute relating to depositions of witnesses in Memphis and Nashville. The court ruled that with respect to the five witnesses who will be deposed in Memphis, those depositions shall take place at a location designated by plaintiffs. With respect to the three witnesses depositions in Nashville, those depositions shall take place at a location designated by defendants. (Tape #FTR.) (wmw, ) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System re 293 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Attachment of Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 288 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 288 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order (Proposed Order Submitted) (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 289 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 07/31/07. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (Proposed Order Submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum # 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum# 3 Exhibit B to Memorandum# 4 Certificate of Consultation of Kelly C. Wilcove)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brett M. Middleton by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. Proposed order submitted and FILING FEE PAID.... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of consultation# 2 Declaration)(jml, ) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order (Proposed Order Submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum # 2 Certificate of Consultation of Kelly C. Wilcove)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham : Telephone Conference held on 7/5/2007. Magistrate judge held expedited telephone conference with the parties regarding the upcoming depositions of E&Y witnesses Carney, Drummond and Harding. With respect to Ms Carney, the parties agreed that plaintiff will limit her deposition to five hours and defendant will limit his deposition to two hours. With respect to Drummond & Harding, the court ruled that plaintiff may have up to seven hours for each witness and defendant up to two hours for each witness. The court will not extend the deposition times absent of showing of good cause. (Tape #FTR.) (wmw, ) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re 258 MOTION to Compel (1) The Production of Improperly Withheld Documents; and (2) Responses to Lead Plaintiffs? Second Set of Interrogatories (proposed Order submitted) Lead Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Compel filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 283 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated, has been filed. For future reference, please note that the proper category for your selection was under the 'replies and responses' category, which is 'reply to response'. Thank you.. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jml, ) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 278 MOTION for Leave to File Lead Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce (1) Improperly Withheld Documents and (2) Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories (proposed order submitted) filed by Debra Swiman,, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System,, 279 Certificate of Service, filed by Debra Swiman,, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, has been filed. For future reference, please note that the certificate of service page #279 should have been submitted as an attached document to the motion #278 receiving only only docket entry number.. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jml, ) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 255 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum to Randall Noel (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 275 Defendants' Unopposed Motion and Memorandum for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum to Randall D. Noel or, in the Alternative, for a Protective Order. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 6/12/07. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 278 Unopposed Motion of Lead Plaintiffs for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce (1) Improperly Withheld Documents and (2) Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories. Lead plaintiffs to file their reply brief NLT 6/22/07. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 6/12/07. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to David Thorpe. (agj, ) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System re 278 MOTION for Leave to File Lead Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce (1) Improperly Withheld Documents and (2) Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories (proposed order submitted) (DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Lead Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce (1) Improperly Withheld Documents and (2) Responses to Second Set of Interrogatories (proposed order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(DeLange, Timothy) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 258 MOTION to Compel (1) The Production of Improperly Withheld Documents; and (2) Responses to Lead Plaintiffs? Second Set of Interrogatories (proposed Order submitted) filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable in re 257 . Mail sent to Mark Solomon. (agj, ) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum (Proposed Order Submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Exhibit A - Memorandum# 2 Exhibit 1 to Reply Memorandum# 3 Exhibit 2 to Reply Brief# 4 Exhibit 3 to Reply Brief# 5 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by David A. Thorpe (proposed order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Wade, B.) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Erin P. McDaniel (proposed order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Wade, B.) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by B. J. Wade for Ramzi Abadou, William Lerach and Mark Solomon at Lerach, Coughlin, Stoia, Geller, Rudman & Robbins (Wade, B.) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 267 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 258 MOTION to Compel (1) The Production of Improperly Withheld Documents; and (2) Responses to Lead Plaintiffs? Second Set of Interrogatories (proposed Order submitted) filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated, has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Electronic signature and filer do not match. Also, Certificate of Consultation, Certificate of Compliance, and Certificate of Service should each be filed as attachments to the motion, not submitted as part of the motion. You would have had the main document (motion) and three attachments (giving brief description to each attachment). (jae, ) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Correction to 265 Notice (Other) of Filing Original Certificates of Service. (Kershaw, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Correction to 266 Notice (Other) of Filing Original Certificates of Service. (Kershaw, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 267 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time re 258 MOTION to Compel (1) The Production of Improperly Withheld Documents; and (2) Responses to Lead Plaintiffs? Second Set of Interrogatories (proposed Order submitted). Defendants Accredo Health Inc., David Stevens, and Joel Kimbrough's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time is granted and defendants shall have up to and including 6/8/07 to file its opposition to the Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 5/23/07. (Pham, Tu) (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY). (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 258 MOTION to Compel (1) The Production of Improperly Withheld Documents; and (2) Responses to Lead Plaintiffs? Second Set of Interrogatories (proposed Order submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Kershaw, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Accredo Health, Incorporated of Filing Original Certificates of Service (Kershaw, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Accredo Health, Incorporated of Filing Original Certificates of Service (Kershaw, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ramzi Abadou. (agj, ) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Lerach. (agj, ) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System re 259 Response in Opposition to Motion, Compendium of Unreported Cases Related to Lead Plaintiffs' Opposition to Randall D. Noel's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena and Defendants' Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum to Randall D. Noel or, in the Alternative, for Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Unreported Case 1# 2 Unreported Case 2# 3 Unreported Case 3# 4 Unreported Case 4)(Wade, B.) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 256 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 254 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena, 255 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum to Randall Noel (Proposed Order Submitted) Proposed Order Submitted filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, has been filed. For future reference, please note that proposed orders are submitted only to the Judge for approval. It is not necessary to send to the clerk office as well. Thank you.. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jml, ) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 254 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena, 255 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum to Randall Noel (Proposed Order Submitted) filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 254 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena, 255 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum to Randall Noel (Proposed Order Submitted) Proposed Order Submitted filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/23/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel (1) The Production of Improperly Withheld Documents; and (2) Responses to Lead Plaintiffs? Second Set of Interrogatories (proposed Order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Timothy A. DeLange# 2 Exhibit A through C# 3 Exhibit D# 4 Exhibit E# 5 Exhibit F through J# 6 Exhibit K through S# 7 Memorandum # 8 Unreported Case 1# 9 Unreported Case 2# 10 Certificate of Consultation)(Wade, B.) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER (TEXT ORDER NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED) Granting 256 Joint Motion to Schedule Lead Plaintiffs' Opposition to Randall D. Noel's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena and Defendants' Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum to Randall D. Noel or, in the Alternative, for a Protective Order. Lead Plaintiffs response is due by 5/14/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 5/9/07. (Pham, Tu) Modified on 5/9/2007 (wbe, ). (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 254 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena, 255 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum to Randall Noel (Proposed Order Submitted) Proposed Order Submitted by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gronborg, Tor) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum to Randall Noel (Proposed Order Submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum # 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum# 3 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena by Randall D. Noel. (Wannamaker, Allison) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Wannamaker on behalf of Randall D. Noel (Wannamaker, Allison) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 250 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Richard Rodelli and Niki O'Neel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 4/16/07. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting 249 Joint Motion to Amend the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 04/16/07. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw and Combined Memorandum for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Richard Rodelli and Niki O'Neel (proposed order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Wade, B.) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order (Proposed Order Submitted) by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 04/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Correction to 246 Notice (Other), 247 Notice of Correction to Response in Opposition to Exception to Order Regarding Consolidation. (Ferguson, Amy) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    **Corrected document filed at entry # 248** Notice of Correction to 246 Notice (Other) to Response in Opposition to Exception to Order Regarding Consolidation. (Ferguson, Amy) Modified on 4/6/2007 (jae, ). (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **Corrected notice filed at docket entry # 247** NOTICE by Ernst & Young Response in Opposition to Exceptions to Magistrate Judge Pham's Order Regarding Consolidation (Ferguson, Amy) Modified on 4/6/2007 (jae, ). (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough re 244 Notice (Other) of Defendants' Response to Lead Plaintiffs' Exceptions to Magistrate's Order Regarding Consolidation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System re 239 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Lead Plaintiffs' Exceptions to Magistrate's Order Regarding Consolidation (Wade, B.) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Niki O'Neel regarding docket entry #238 (cas) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Samuel Rudman regarding docket entry #238 (cas) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to David Rosenfeld regarding docket entry #238 (cas) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Richard Rodelli regarding docket entry #238 (cas) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Denying 202 Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 3/9/07. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 202 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) and the Court's June 18, 2003 Consolidation Order - proposed order submitted filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 3/8/06. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Richard Rodelli regarding docket entry #235 (cas) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Niki O'Neel regarding docket entry #235 (cas) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 234 Joint Motion to Amend the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 2/1/2007. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order (proposed order submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Wade, B.) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc Topaz regarding docket entry #231. (cas) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 232 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Notice of Returned Mail. Mail sent to Alan Schulman regarding docket entry #228 (cas) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 230 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as counsel of Record by Alan Schulman. Attorney Alan Schulman terminated. The law firm of Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann will continue to represent Lead Plaintiff in this matter. Signed by Judge Tu M. Pham on 11/28/06. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney proposed order submitted by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Wade, B.) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 229 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Notice of Returned Mail. Mail sent to Marc Topaz regarding docket entry #228 (cas) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc Topaz regarding docket entry #210. (cas) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp regarding docket entry #217. (cas) (Entered: 07/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc Topaz regarding docket entry #214. (cas) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp regarding docket entry #214. (cas) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp regarding docket entry #215 (cas) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp regarding docket entry #210 (cas) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc Topaz regarding docket entry #208. (cas) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp regarding docket entry #208. (cas) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ramzi Abadou regarding docket entry #208. (cas) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 216 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Consolidate Pursuant to Rule 42(a) and the Court's June 18, 2003 Consolidation Order (proposed order submitted) (proposed reply brief submitted) filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Wade, B.) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 216 Motion for Leave to File . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 6/16/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Consolidate Pursuant to Rule 42(a) and the Court's June 18, 2003 Consolidation Order (proposed order submitted) (proposed reply brief submitted) by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Wade, B.) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 212 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Oni A. Holley terminated . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 6/14/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 211 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John H. Goselin terminated . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 6/14/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 202 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) and the Court?s June 18, 2003 Consolidation Order - proposed order submitted Defendants' Memorandum in Response to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Proposed Order Submitted by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Proposed Order Submitted by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 209 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 6/12/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 132 Scheduling Order, Proposed Order Submitted by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law and Fact in Support of Joint Motion to Amend the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 206 Scheduling Publication of Class Notice . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 6/7/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 202 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) and the Court?s June 18, 2003 Consolidation Order - proposed order submitted Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate filed by Ernst & Young. (Ferguson, Amy) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Unopposed Motion Regarding a Schedule for Publication of Class Notice proposed order submitted by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation # 2 Memorandum)(Wade, B.) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp regarding docket entry #201 (cas) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc Topaz regarding docket entry #201 (cas) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Oni Holley regarding docket entry #197 (cas) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Consolidate Cases Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) and the Court?s June 18, 2003 Consolidation Order - proposed order submitted by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Consultation # 2 Memorandum)(Wade, B.) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 199 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel for Ernst & Young, LLP . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 5/23/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 05/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp regarding docket entry #197 (cas) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Substitute Attorney proposed order submitted by Ernst & Young. (Ferguson, Amy) (Entered: 05/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp regarding docket entry #191 (cas) (Entered: 05/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulated Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 5/4/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc Topaz regarding docket entry #191. (cas) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp regarding docket entry #190 (cas) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp regarding docket entry #189 (cas) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc Topaz regarding docket entries 188, 189 and 190. (cas) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp regarding docket entries 188, 189 and 190. (cas) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification is Granted. It is further ordered that Lead Plaintiffs LSERS and Debra Swiman are certified as class representatives. The Court futher orders that the law firm of Bernstein, Litowitz, Berger and Grossman LLP and Lerach, Coughlin, Stoia, Geller, Rudman and Robbins LLP are appointed as Co-Lead Class Counsel. Finally, the Court orders that the law firm of Glassman, Edwards, Wade, and Wyatt, P.C. are named Liaison Class Counsel . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 4/19/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 187 Motion for Leave for Scott N. Sherman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendants, Accredo Health, Inc., David Stevens and Joel Kimbrough . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 4/11/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 186 Motion for Leave for Jeffrey A. Kershaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendants, Accredo Health, Inc., David Stevens and Joel Kimbrough. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 4/11/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 185 Motion for Leave for Kelly C. Wilcove to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendants, Accredo Health, Inc., David Stevens and Joel Kimbrough . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 4/11/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Scott Sherman and Proposed Order Submitted by Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey Kershaw and Proposed Order Submitted by Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kelly C. Wilcove and Proposed Order Submitted by Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Halijan, Douglas) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp regarding docket entry #180. (cas) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc Topaz. Mail was regarding docket entry number 180. (cas) (Entered: 03/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc Topaz re: Document number 176. (cas) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp. (cas) (Entered: 03/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 147 MOTION for class cerification filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. Court recommends that ptf's motion be granted. Objections to R&R due by 3/17/2006. Signed by Judge Tu M. Pham on 3/7/06. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc Topaz. (cas) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp. (cas) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tu M. Pham : Motion Hearing held on 3/2/2006 re 147 Plaintiff's Motion for class cerification; MATTER TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT; pla cnsl: B. Nicholas, T. DeLange, T. Smith, B. J. Wade & W. Ponder; dft cnsl: P. Bassett, A. Ferguson & J. Feibelman (Tape #FTR.) (wmw, ) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 175 Joint Motion for scheduling order governing electronic discovery . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 3/1/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order Governing Electronic Discovery Proposed Order submitted by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support of Joint Motion for a Scheduling Order Governing Electronic Discovery)(Wade, B.) (Entered: 02/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System Lead Plaintiffs' Statement of Recent Authority in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Wade, B.) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of ORAL ARGUMENT re: 147 MOTION for class cerification:re-set for Thurs., 3/2/2006 @ 10:00 AM (CST)in Courtroom 6 - Memphis before Tu M. Pham. (wmw, ) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING LEAD PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION... to Magistrate Judge for a Report and Recommendation . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 2/27/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          "AMENDED" NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 147 MOTION for class cerification: hrg set for Thurs., 3/2/06 @ 1:30 pm (CST) (wmw, ) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 147 MOTION for class cerification: Motion Hearing set for Thurs., 3/2/2006 01:30 PM (CST) in Courtroom 6 - Memphis before Tu M. Pham. (wmw, ) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System Statement of Recent Authority in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Case Law# 2 Case law)(Wade, B.) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document 166 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice admission of Russell F.A. Riviere filed by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: ***FYI....The motion is to documented as an attachment to the motion(just as the declaration was submitted)....*** (jml, ) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 166 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald on 1/23/2006. (Donald, Bernice) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice admission of Russell F.A. Riviere by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Wade, B.) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting re 162 Joint MOTION to Amend Joint Case Management Statement, Permit Additional Depositions in Accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 and Reset Trial Date--and Motions terminated: Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2006. Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2006. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (jml, ) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Tor Gronborg, William S. Lerach, David W. Mitchell, Trig R. Smith, Mark Solomon (jml, ) (Entered: 12/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 162 Joint MOTION to Amend Joint Case Management Statement, Permit Additional Depositions in Accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 and Reset Trial Date. (jml, ) (Entered: 12/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend Joint Case Management Statement, Permit Additional Depositions in Accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 and Reset Trial Date. (jml, ) (Entered: 12/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support re 147 MOTION for class cerification filed by Lead Plaintiffs Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (jae, ) (Entered: 10/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition re 147 Lead Plantiff's Notice MOTION for class cerification by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough. (Document placed in separate folder) (jml, ) (Entered: 09/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Firm Address by Tor Gronborg, William S. Lerach, David W. Mitchell, Trig R. Smith, Mark Solomon (jml, ) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail 155 Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Mary-Helen Perry (jae, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail 155 Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Heather Walser (jae, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail 155 Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp (jae, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Erin P. McDaniel as Counsel for Plantiff Debra Swinman re 116 Motion of B.J. Wade for Admission of Erin P. McDaniel . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (jml, ) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REVISING THE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER. Dft shall file opposition to motion for class certification by 9/23/05. Lead pltfs shall file reply memorandum by 10/13/05. Any hearing on the motion for class certification shall be set consistent with any local rules and at the court's convenience. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (jae, ) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of re 152 Joint MOTION to Revise the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order . (jml, ) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Revise the Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order . (jml, ) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail(Protective Order) sent to Heather Walser (ldc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Original Signature Page to Declaration of Jane D. Nettesheim by Ken Altschuld, Debra Swiman, Raphael Mbouwe, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, Joan Ferrari, James Miles, David Stein, Vincent R. Angichiodo, John Andrew Hokenson, Stanley Sved (jml, ) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Jane D. Netteshem in support of Plantiff's Motion for Class Certification by Debra Swiman.(Document placed in separate folder) (jml, ) Modified on 7/25/2005 (jml, ). (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Lead Plantiff's MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re 147 MOTION for class cerification filed by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (jml, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Lead Plantiff's Notice MOTION for class cerification by Debra Swiman, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (jml, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Declaration of Warren D. Ponder and Debra Swiman in Support of Motion for Class Certification. (jml, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (ehg, ) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re 143 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order . (jml, ) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order . (jml, ) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address for Linda F Burnsed, Stanley M Chernau, counsel for David Stein. (jae, ) (Entered: 06/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail [132, 133, 134] Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp (jae, ) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail 135 Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Heather Walser (jae, ) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail [132, 133, 134] Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Heather Walser (jae, ) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail 135 Returned as Undeliverable/insufficient address. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp (jae, ) (Entered: 06/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 136 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Richard Nicholas Rodelli). Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (jae, ) (Entered: 06/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Richard Nicholas Rodelli) by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (jae, ) (Entered: 06/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 2/20/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Bernice B. Donald. Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2007 08:45 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Bernice B. Donald. Proposed Joint Pretrial Orer due 1/22/04.(jae, ) (Entered: 06/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 131 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (David W. Mitchell as counsel for lead plaintiffs). Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (jae, ) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting 130 Motion For Entry of Joint Case Management Statement and Proposed Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order . Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (jae, ) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None Joint Case Management StatementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Disclosures due by 6/15/05. Expert disclosures due 4/21/06. Factual discovery due by 5/12/06. Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2005. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2005. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (jae, ) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (David W. Mitchell) to appear for lead plaintiffsKen Altschuld, Debra Swiman, Raphael Mbouwe, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, James Miles, David Stein, Vincent R. Angichiodo, John Andrew Hokenson, Stanley Sved. (jae, ) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION For Entry of the Joint Case Management Statement and [Proposed] Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order by Ken Altschuld, Debra Swiman, Raphael Mbouwe, Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System, Ernst & Young, Joan Ferrari, Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough, James Miles, David Stein, Vincent R. Angichiodo, John Andrew Hokenson, Stanley Sved. (jae, ) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail 125 Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp (jae, ) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail 125 Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marc Topaz (jae, ) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint For Violation of Federal Securities Law with Jury Demand by Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough.(jae, ) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Martin D. Chitwood to: Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP. (jae, ) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 124 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Timonty A. DeLange). Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (jae, ) (Entered: 05/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Timothy A. DeLange) by Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System. (jae, ) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail 122 Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp (jae, ) (Entered: 05/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 120 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Dfts shall have until 5/16/06 to file answer. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (jae, ) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Consultation re 120 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Douglas F. Halijan on behalf of Accredo Health, Incorporated (ehg, ) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION and Memorandum for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (ehg, ) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 105 Motion of Defendants to Dismiss The Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (jae, ) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of their 105 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough. (tlh, ) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Erin P. McDaniel in Support of 116 MOTION of B.J. Wade Requesting Admission of Erin P. McDaniel Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Debra Swiman, David Stein. (tlh, ) (Entered: 01/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/19/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION of B.J. Wade Requesting Admission of Erin P. McDaniel Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Debra Swiman, David Stein. (tlh, ) (Entered: 01/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF RAMZI ABADOU AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF DEBRA SWIMAN. Granting 85 Motion for attorney Ramzi Abadou to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (tlh, ) (Entered: 12/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER VACATING DECEMBER 14, 2004 ORDER re 109 Order for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss. The Court hereby vacates the Order. the 8/2/2004 Scheduling Order remains in effect. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (tlh, ) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION to Defendants' 105 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lead Plaintiffs. (document placed in separate folder) (tlh, ) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 110 Motion Exceed Page Limitation. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (tlh, ) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re 110 Unopposed Motion of Lead Plaintiffs to Exceed Page Limitation by B. J. Wade on behalf of Debra Swiman. (tlh, ) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION and MEMORANDUM of Lead Plaintiffs to Exceed Page Limitation by Debra Swiman. (tlh, ) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Plaintiff is hereby Ordered to file a written response to the motion to dismiss on or before 12/30/2004. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (tlh, ) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of their 105 Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough. (w/Appendix attached; document placed in separate folder) (tlh, ) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 103 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (tlh, ) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Emily C. Komlossy. Goodkind Labaton Rudoff Sucharow, LLP, 3595 Sheridan St., Ste. 206, Hollywood, FL 33021. (tlh, ) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws by Accredo Health, Incorporated, David D. Stevens, Joel Kimbrough. (tlh, ) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION re 103 Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Douglas F. Halijan on behalf of Accredo Health, Incorporated. (tlh, ) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION and MEMORANDUM of Accredo Health, Inc. to Exceed Page Limitation by Accredo Health, Incorporated. (tlh, ) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Tor Gronborg re 98 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (tlh, ) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Trig R. Smith re 97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (tlh, ) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Errata by Plaintiffs re 99 Consolidated Complaint. (tlh, ) (Entered: 09/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS against all defendants filed by plaintiffs. (w/exhibits)(document placed in separate folder)(tlh, ) (Entered: 09/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION of B.J. Wade Requesting Admission of Tor Gronborg Pro Hac Vice to represent Lead Plaintiffs. (tlh, ) (Entered: 09/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION of B.J. Wade Requesting Admission of Trig R. Smith Pro Hac Vice to represent Lead Plaintiffs. (tlh, ) (Entered: 09/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME Filed by William S. Lerach, advising new firm name: Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP. (tlh, ) (Entered: 08/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Approving 92 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Blair A. Nicholas and Niki L. O'Neel. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (tlh, ) (Entered: 08/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION Of Niki L. O'Neel In Support Of 92 MOTION Of B.J. Wade Requesting Admission Pro Hac Vice Of Niki L. O'Neel. (tlh, ) (Entered: 08/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION Of Blair A. Nicholas In Support Of 92 MOTION Of B.J. Wade Requesting Admission Pro Hac Vice Of Blair A. Nicholas. (tlh, ) (Entered: 08/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION of B.J. Wade Requesting Admission Pro Hac Vice Of Blair A. Nicholas And Niki L. O'Neel. (tlh, ) (Entered: 08/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Schedule For Filing Consolidated Complaint And Briefing Anticipated Motion(s) To Dismiss re 90 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (tlh, ) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Setting Schedule For Filing Consolidated Complaint And Briefing Anticipated Motion(s) To Dismiss. (tlh, ) (Entered: 07/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kevin Sharp (document # 88) (cc: cm) (jae, ) (Entered: 07/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND CO-LEAD COUNSEL re 87 . Louisiana Scholls' Retirement System and Debra Swiman are hereby appointed as Co-Lead Plaintiffs in the consolidated action. Law firms of Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP and Lerach Coughlin Stoia & Robbins LLP are appinted as Co-Lead Counsel for the class and the law firm of Glassman, Edwards, Wade & Wyatt, P.C. is hereby appointed as Liaison Counsel for the Class. Signed by Judge Bernice B. Donald. (jae, ) (Entered: 06/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVAL OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL by Debra Swiman and Louisiana Schools. (jae, ) (Entered: 06/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by plaintiff David Stein, plaintiff Debra Swiman of change of address/firm affiliation of counsel William S. Lerach (JAE) (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by plaintiff Debra Swiman in 2:03-cv-02216 for attorney Ramzi Abadou to appear pro hac vice (JAE) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION by B J Wade IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED LEAD PLAINTIFF DEBRA SWIMAN'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 201 [83-1] (JAE) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST by proposed lead plaintiff Debra Swiman for JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 201 (JAE) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney Ronald B. Hauben to appear pro hac vice [73-1] for dft Ernst & Young (cc: all counsel) (JAE) (Entered: 12/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney Steven J. Brogan to appear pro hac vice [74-1] for dft Ernst & Young (cc: all counsel) (JAE) (Entered: 12/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney James E. Gauch to appear pro hac vice [75-1] for dft Ernst & Young (cc: all counsel) (JAE) (Entered: 12/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney Mary Helen Perry to appear pro hac vice [76-1] for dft, Ernst & Young (cc: all counsel) (JAE) (Entered: 12/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney Heather Guilette Walser to appear pro hac vice for Ernst & Young [77-1] (cc: all counsel) (JAE) (Entered: 12/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant Ernst & Young in 2:03-cv-02216 for attorney Heather Guilette Walser to appear pro hac vice (JAE) (Entered: 12/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant Ernst & Young in 2:03-cv-02216 for attorney Mary Helen Perry to appear pro hac vice (JAE) (Entered: 12/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Ernst & Young in 2:03-cv-02216 for attorney James E. Gauch to appear pro hac vice (JAE) (Entered: 12/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Ernst & Young in 2:03-cv-02216 for attorney Steven J. Brogan to appear pro hac vice (JAE) (Entered: 12/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant Ernst & Young in 2:03-cv-02216 for attorney Ronald B. Hauben to appear pro hac vice (JAE) (Entered: 12/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY by Louisiana Retirement Fund in 2:03-cv-02216 re [71-1] to recent authority submitted by Debra Swiman (JAE) (Entered: 12/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by plaintiff Debra Swiman in 2:03-cv-02216 re [70-1] To the Louisiana Retirement Funds' Response to Recent Authority Submitted By Debra Swiman (JAE) (Entered: 11/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Louisiana Retirement Fund in 2:03-cv-02216 to Recent Authority Submitted by Debra Swiman [65-1] (JAE) (Entered: 11/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF RECENT AUTHORITY FILE ON BEHALF OF PROPOSED LEAD plaintiff Debra Swiman: exhibits "a" and "b" attached (JAE) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney Mark Solomon to appear pro hac vice [45-1] for plaintiff David Stein (cc: all counsel) (JAE) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney Darren J Robbins to appear pro hac vice [46-1] for plaintiff David Stein (cc: all counsel) (JAE) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana in 2:03-cv-02216, and LA School Employee's Retirement System in 2:03-cv-02216, to [65-1] (Debra Swiman's submission of recent Supplemental Authority) (JAE) (Entered: 09/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF RECENT AUTHORITY FILED ON BEHALF OF PROPOSED LEAD PLAINTIFF DEBRA SWIMAN by plaintiff Debra Swiman (JAE) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RECENT SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY FILED ON BEHALF OF LEAD PLAINTIFF MOVANTS THE LOUISIANA RETIREMENT FUNDS citing opinion issued by the Honorable Dennis H. Inman, US Magistrate Judge, Eastern District of Tennessee, (attached) (JAE) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney Javier Bleichmar to appear pro hac vice [54-1] for Plaintiffs Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana and Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System (cc: all counsel) (JAE) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney Eitan Misulovin to appear pro hac vice [55-1] for Plaintiffs Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana and Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System (cc: all counsel) (JAE) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney Douglas M McKeige to appear pro hac vice [56-1] for Plaintiffs Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana and Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System (cc: all counsel) (JAE) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney Linda F Burnsed to appear pro hac vice [57-1] for Plaintiff's Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana and Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System (cc: all counsel) (JAE) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney Stanley M Chernau to appear pro hac vice [58-1] for plaintiffs Teachers' retirement system of Louisiana and Louisiana School employees' retirement system (cc: all counsel) (JAE) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Henry L Klein in 2:03-cv-02216 for attorney Stanley M Chernau to appear pro hac vice (JAE) (Entered: 07/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Henry L Klein in 2:03-cv-02216 for attorney Linda F Burnsed to appear pro hac vice (JAE) (Entered: 07/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Henry L Klein in 2:03-cv-02216 for attorney Douglas M McKeige to appear pro hac vice (JAE) (Entered: 07/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Henry L Klein in 2:03-cv-02216 for attorney Eitan Misulovin to appear pro hac vice (JAE) (Entered: 07/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Henry L Klein in 2:03-cv-02216 for attorney Javier Bleichmar to appear pro hac vice (JAE) (Entered: 07/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE IN FURTHER SUPPORT by plaintiff Debra Swiman in 2:03-cv-02216 to her motion to be appointed lead plaintiff and for approval of her selection of lead counsel [24-2] with appendix of unreported authority in support of her surreply in further support of her motion to be appointed lead plaintiff and for approval of her selection of lead counsel (JAE) (Entered: 07/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by non parties The Louisiana Retirement Fund in further support of motion for order of appointment to lead counsel [19-1], of motion for order approving their selection of lead counsel [19-2] (JAE) (Entered: 07/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in opposition to motion for reconsideration of the court's June 20, 2003 Lead plaintiff order [42-1], to motion for reconsideration of the courts order appointing lead plaintiff and request for hearing [40-1] (JAE) (Entered: 07/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for System of Louisiana Teacher's Retirment, LA School Emp. Retirement System, by Henry L Klein (JAE) (Entered: 07/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of B.J. Wade re [48-1] in support of Debra Swiman's reply in further support of her motion to be appointed lead plaintiff and for approval of her selection of lead counsel (JAE) (Entered: 07/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by plaintiff Debra Swiman in further support her motion to be appointed lead plaintiff and for approval of her selection of lead counsel (JAE) (Entered: 07/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for reconsideration of the courts order appointing lead plaintiff and request for hearing [40-1] setting aside order [36-2] (cc: all counsel) (JAE) (Entered: 07/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by plaintiff David Stein's attorney B.J. Wade in 2:03-cv-02216 for attorney Darren J Robbins to appear pro hac vice (JAE) (Entered: 07/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by plaintiff David Stein's attorney B.J. Wade in 2:03-cv-02216 for attorney Mark Solomon to appear pro hac vice (JAE) (Entered: 07/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION by Eitan Misulovin in support of re [42-1] (JAE) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Teacher's Retirement in 2:03-cv-02216, Louisiana School in 2:03-cv-02216 in support of motion for reconsideration of the court's June 20, 2003 Lead plaintiff order [42-1] (JAE) (Entered: 07/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by Teacher's Retirement in 2:03-cv-02216, Louisiana School in 2:03-cv-02216 for reconsideration of the court's June 20, 2003 Lead plaintiff order (JAE) (Entered: 07/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Ernst & Young, by Saul C Belz, Amy E Ferguson (JAE) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by proposed lead plaintiff Debra Swiman in 2:03-cv-02216 for reconsideration of the courts order appointing lead plaintiff and request for hearing (JAE) (Entered: 07/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION by B.J. Wade, attorney for plaintiff James Miles, plaintiff David Stein in support of Debra Swiman's consolidated opposition to all other motions for appointment as lead plaintiff re [38-1] (JAE) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Debra Swiman in opposition to the motions for appointment as lead plaintiff 03-2310 w/03-2216 [36-1] (JAE) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THE MOTION OF THE TEACHER'S RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF LOUISIANA AND THE LOUISIANA SCHOOL EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM AND IN OPPOSITION TO COMPETING MOTIONS by plaintiff Joan Ferrari in 2:03-cv-02216 (JAE) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Consolidating Actions Appointing Lead Plaintiffs Approving Lead Plaintiffs' Selection Of Lead Counsel And Liaison Counsel by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion(s) for order appointing lead plaintiffs [27-2], [27-3], [24-1], [24-2], [19-1], [19-2] in 2:03-cv-02216; It is ORDERED that: A Master File is established for this proceeding; Master file shall be civil no. 03-2216; Clerk shall file all pleadings in Master File and note such filings on Master Docket; An original shall be filed by Clerk in Master File; Clerk shall mail a copy of this Order to counsel in consolidated action; Every pleading shall have following caption: In Re Accredo Health, Inc. Seurities Litigation; Class members William H. Champion, Jr., James W. Rieck, Francis W. Moersdorf and Frontier Capital Mgmt., Inc. are appointed as lead plas... pursuant to 15 USC 78u-4(a)(3)(B); Law firms of Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP and Cauley Geller Bowman & Rudman, LLP are approved as lead counsel for the class; The law firm of Borod & Kramer, P.C. approved as liaison counsel for the Class; consolidating cases 03-2310 w/03-2216 (cc: all counsel) (BAG) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT CONSOLIDATION/SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Bernice B. Donald: granting motion to consolidate cases for violations of the Securities and Exchange Act of 1934 [28-1] 2:03-cv-2216 with member cases 2:03-cv-2225, 2:03-cv-2226, 2:03-cv-2276, 2:03-cv-2321, 2:03-cv-2346, 2:03-cv-2365, 2:03-cv-2435, granting motion(s) to consolidate cases [27-1], [19-3], [13-1]; Clerk shall maintain a master file under caption "In re Accredo Health, Inc. Securities Litigation" No. 03-cv-2216-BA; Any and all other cases that have been or will be filed against any of dfts arising out of same nucleus of operative facts as those alleged... shall until further Order of this Court be consolidated ... as one action before Judge Donald; Not later than 45 days after entry of Order Appointing Lead Plaintiff ... pla shall serve and file a consolidated complaint; If any dfts move to dismiss, plas shall have 45 days to file a response to that motion and the moving dfts shall have 30 days to file a reply brief if any in further support of respective motions; (cc: all counsel) (BAG) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF by plaintiff Joan Ferrari (JAE) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION by defendants have consulted with counsel for all of the plaintiffs in the case (CCP) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of DARREN J. CHECK re [27-1], re [27-2], re [27-3]; placed in separate folder (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF THE AFFIDAVIT OF DARREN CHECK by The Champion Group (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by The Champion Group in support of motion to consolidate cases [27-1], of motion for order appointing lead plaintiffs [27-2], of motion for order approving lead plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liason counsel [27-3]; placed in separate folder (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Debra Swiman in support of motion to consolidate cases for violations of the Securities and Exchange Act of 1934 [28-1] (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Debra Swiman to consolidate cases for violations of the Securities and Exchange Act of 1934 (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by The Champion Group to consolidate cases , and for order appointing lead plaintiffs , and for order approving lead plaintiffs' selection of lead counsel and liason counsel (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [24-1], re [24-2] by B.J. Wade (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in support of motion for order appointing lead plaintiff [24-1], of motion for order approving her selection of lead counsel [24-2] by non-party Debra Seiman (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Debra Swiman for order appointing lead plaintiff , and for order approving her selection of lead counsel (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION regarding entry of the consent consolidation/ scheduling order by defendant (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re: documents 19, 20 & 21 (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION OF JAVIER BLEICHMAR in support re [19-1], re [19-2], re [19-3] (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Teacher's Retirement, Louisiana School in support of motion for order of appointment to lead counsel [19-1], of motion for order approvingg their selection of lead counsel [19-2], of motion to consolidate cases [19-3] (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for order of appointment to lead counsel , and for order approvingg their selection of lead counsel , and to consolidate cases by non parties Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana and Louisiana School Employees' Retirement System (WBE) (Entered: 06/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Approving Motion For Pro Hac Vice On Behalf Of Defendant Accredo Health, Inc. by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney Peter Q. Bassett to appear pro hac vice [7-1], as counsel for defendant; (cc: all counsel) (BAG) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Approving Motion For Pro Hac Vice On Behalf Of Defendant Accredo Health, Inc. by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney John H. Goselin to appear pro hac vice [9-1], as counsel for defendant; (cc: all counsel) (BAG) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Approving Motion For Pro Hac Vice On Behalf Of Defendant Accredo Health, Inc by Judge Bernice B. Donald granting motion for attorney Oni A. Holley to appear pro hac vice [11-1], as counsel for defendant; (cc: all counsel) (BAG) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Of Recusal by Judge J. D. Breen; The undersigned recuses himself from all proceedings; Case reassigned to Judge Bernice B. Donald (cc: all counsel) (BAG) (Entered: 05/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE Of Consultation by defendants re [13-1] (BAG) (Entered: 05/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendants for entry of consent consolidation/ scheduling order (BAG) (Entered: 05/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Oni A. Holley re [11-1] (BAG) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/23/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant Accredo Health, Inc. for attorney Oni A. Holley to appear pro hac vice (BAG) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of John H. Goselin, II re [9-1] (BAG) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/23/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant Accredo Health, Inc. for attorney John H. Goselin to appear pro hac vice (BAG) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Peter Q. Bassett re [7-1] (BAG) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/23/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant Accredo Health, Inc. for attorney Peter Q. Bassett to appear pro hac vice (BAG) (Entered: 04/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Jon P. McCalla Case transferred to Judge J. D. Breen in exchange for an equivalent case. (cc: all counsel) (EHG) (Entered: 04/23/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant David D. Stevens on 4/16/03 (BAG) (Entered: 04/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Accredo Health, Inc. on 4/16/03 (BAG) (Entered: 04/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Joel Kimbrough on 4/16/03 (BAG) (Entered: 04/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Accredo Health, Inc. by Jef Feibelman, Douglas F. Halijan (EHG) (Entered: 04/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT (Summonses issued) Receipt #: 079173; Filing fee $ 150.00 (AGJ) (Entered: 04/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 237 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?