McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 09-42778
District Judge Brenda T. Rhoades, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 9:16 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc., Debtor

Represented by Munsch Hardt Kopf Harr & Dinah PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Rochelle McCullough L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen M. Patrick +1 214 953 0182 +1 214 953 0185
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "US Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Vardeman +1 903 590 1461 john.m.vardeman@usdoj.gov
  Entries (84) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Blank 95
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                Certificate of Service Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 74 First Amended Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. filed by Debtor McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc., 75 Disclosure Statement In Support of Debtor's First Amended Plan of Reorganization Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. filed by Debtor McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc.). (Patrick, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                  Order and Notice of Hearing (RE: related document(s) 75 Disclosure Statement In Support of Debtor's First Amended Plan of Reorganization Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Debtor's First Amended Plan of Reorganization# 2 Exhibit B- Liquidation Analysis# 3 Exhibit C- Debtor's Monthly Operating Report for November, 2009# 4 Exhibit D- Schedule of Sources and Uses)(Patrick, Kathleen) filed by Debtor McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc.). Hearing scheduled for 2/3/2010 at 09:30 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (sr) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                    Disclosure Statement In Support of Debtor's First Amended Plan of Reorganization Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Debtor's First Amended Plan of Reorganization# 2 Exhibit B- Liquidation Analysis# 3 Exhibit C- Debtor's Monthly Operating Report for November, 2009# 4 Exhibit D- Schedule of Sources and Uses)(Patrick, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
                      First Amended Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 56 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. filed by Debtor McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc.). (Patrick, Kathleen) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                        Operating Report for Filing Period November 1, 2009 through November 30, 2009 Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 72 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                          TDIndustries, Inc.s' Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay to Join in Arbitration, WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Filed by TDIndustries, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kennedy, Jason) Modified on 12/18/2009 (slt). (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                            H.C. Beck's Reply to Debtor's Objection to HCB's Motion to Convert Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 58 Objection Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. filed by Debtor McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc.). 45 H.C. Beck LTD's Motion to Convert Debtor's Case to Chapter 7 Case Pursuant to Section 1112 of the Bankruptcy Code With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd.. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3) (Lim, Lloyd) Modified on 12/15/2009 (slt). (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/13/2009, Entered: None
                              Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 68 Agreed Order on (1) Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief Fromthe Automatic Stay, Without Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement, and Request for Hearing in Plano, Texas ;(2) Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief From the Automatic Stay to Allow Arbitration to Proceed, Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement, and Request for Hearing in Plano, Texas; (3) Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. to Stay the Adversary Proceeding (RE: related document(s) 42 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To To Allow Arbitration to Proceed Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Releif From Stay to Allow Arbitration to Proceed) (Lim, Lloyd) filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (slt)). Service Date 12/13/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/13/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/13/2009, Entered: None
                                Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 67 Agreed Order on (1) Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief Fromthe Automatic Stay, Without Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement, and Request for Hearing in Plano, Texas ;(2) Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief From the Automatic Stay to Allow Arbitration to Proceed, Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement, and Request for Hearing in Plano, Texas; (3) Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. to Stay the Adversary Proceeding (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (slt) Modified on 12/11/2009 (slt).). Service Date 12/13/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/13/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                  Agreed Order on (1) Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief Fromthe Automatic Stay, Without Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement, and Request for Hearing in Plano, Texas ;(2) Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief From the Automatic Stay to Allow Arbitration to Proceed, Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement, and Request for Hearing in Plano, Texas; (3) Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. to Stay the Adversary Proceeding (RE: related document(s) 42 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To To Allow Arbitration to Proceed Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Releif From Stay to Allow Arbitration to Proceed) (Lim, Lloyd) filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (slt) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                    Agreed Order on (1) Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief Fromthe Automatic Stay, Without Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement, and Request for Hearing in Plano, Texas ;(2) Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief From the Automatic Stay to Allow Arbitration to Proceed, Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement, and Request for Hearing in Plano, Texas; (3) Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. to Stay the Adversary Proceeding (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (slt) Modified on 12/11/2009 (slt). (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                      Joinder in Support Filed by TDIndustries, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                        Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s) 45 H.C. Beck LTD's Motion to Convert Debtor's Case to Chapter 7 Case Pursuant to Section 1112 of the Bankruptcy Code With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. Hearing scheduled for 1/11/2010 at 10:00 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (th)). Service Date 12/09/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                          Amended Designation of Witnesses and Exhibits Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd., 62 Designation of Witnesses and Exhibits Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. . filed by Debtor McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc.). (Patrick, Kathleen) Modified on 12/10/2009 (slt). (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                            Second Amended Witness and Exhibit List Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Lim, Lloyd) Modified on 12/10/2009 (slt). (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                              Designation of Witnesses and Exhibits Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Morris, E.) Modified on 12/9/2009 (slt). (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                Amended Witness and Exhibit List Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Lim, Lloyd) Modified on 12/9/2009 (slt). (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Affidavit Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1") (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Objection Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 45 H.C. Beck LTD's Motion to Convert Debtor's Case to Chapter 7 Case Pursuant to Section 1112 of the Bankruptcy Code With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd.. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: W. Kyle Gooch and Robert Shapiro) Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: David L. Campbell) Filed by Prism Electric, Inc. (Campbell, David) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: David L. Campbell) Filed by Rodman, L.L.C. (Campbell, David) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Reply to Debtors Objection to Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay to Allow Arbitration to Proceed Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 49 Amended Objection Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. filed by Debtor McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc.). (Lim, Lloyd) Modified on 11/30/2009 (slt). (Entered: 11/29/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  Joinder of Mesa Design Associates, Inc. to Alpha Testing, Inc.s' Response to Motion for Relief from Stay to Allow Arbitration Filed by Mesa Design Associates, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 47 Objection filed by Creditor Alpha Testing, Inc.). (Shriro, Michelle) Modified on 11/30/2009 (slt). (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Operating Report for Filing Period 10/1/2009 through 10/31/2009 Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) Final Hearing Set (RE: related document(s) 42 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement To Allow Arbitration to Proceed Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2009 at 10:00 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (th)). Service Date 11/19/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Amended Objection Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 42 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To To Allow Arbitration to Proceed Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Error: Wrong PDF filed see Document #49 for Correction: Objection Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 42 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To To Allow Arbitration to Proceed Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Marshall, Joe) Modified on 11/17/2009 (slt). (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Objection Filed by Alpha Testing, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 42 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To To Allow Arbitration to Proceed Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Shriro, Michelle) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) FINAL HEARING Rescheduled by the Court (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. Final Hearing rescheduled for 12/11/2009 at 10:00 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (sr)). Service Date 11/15/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                H.C. Beck LTD's Motion to Convert Debtor's Case to Chapter 7 Case Pursuant to Section 1112 of the Bankruptcy Code With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (Lim, Lloyd) Modified on 11/16/2009 (slt). (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Michelle E. Shriro) Filed by Alpha Testing, Inc. (Shriro, Michelle) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 41 Order On Emergency Motion to shorten discovery periods in connection with the motion of H.C. Beck, LTD, for relief from the automatic stay (RE: related document(s) 27 Motion Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1"# 2 Proposed Order) (Lim, Lloyd) filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (jc)). Service Date 10/30/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/31/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay With Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To To Allow Arbitration to Proceed Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Releif From Stay to Allow Arbitration to Proceed) (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        Order On Emergency Motion to shorten discovery periods in connection with the motion of H.C. Beck, LTD, for relief from the automatic stay (RE: related document(s) 27 Motion Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1"# 2 Proposed Order) (Lim, Lloyd) filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (jc) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Jason R. Kennedy) Filed by TDIndustries, Ltd. (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 32 Order Granting Request for Emergency Hearing on Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay (RE: related document(s) 28 Request for Emergency Hearing on Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 27 Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd . (slt)). Service Date 10/22/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) Hearing Set RE: related document(s) 27 Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2009 at 10:30 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (sr)). Service Date 10/22/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                Amended Exhibit List Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 27 Motion Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Lim, Lloyd) Modified on 10/23/2009 (slt). (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 27 Motion Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4) (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Operating Report for Filing Period 9/1/09 through 9/30/09 Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Amended Notice of Hearing Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 33 Notice of Hearing Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Notice of Hearing Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 27 Motion Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Order Granting Request for Emergency Hearing on Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay (RE: related document(s) 28 Request for Emergency Hearing on Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 27 Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd . (slt) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT: Notice of Removal (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)): filed by Michael P. Massad Jr. on behalf of HCBeck LTD against Alpha Testing, Inc. , Barbara, Inc. , Kimley-Horn and Associates, Inc. , MCDC , McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. , Mesa Design Associates, Inc. , PDPM , Three Architecture, Inc. . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - K to Notice of Removal) (lc) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ERROR: FILED IN WRONG CASE - SEE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING 09-04180 FOR CORRECTION: Notice of Removal (H.C. Beck, Ltd. v. McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc., et al.) by H.C. Beck, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - K to Notice of Removal) (Lim, Lloyd) Modified on 10/20/2009 (lc). (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Objection Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 27 Motion Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Request for Emergency Hearing on Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 27 Motion Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Emergency Hearing) (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Motion Emergency Motion to Shorten Discovery Periods in Connection with the Motion of H.C. Beck, Ltd. for Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1"# 2 Proposed Order) (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Responding Affidavit of Gary M. Safady in Support of Debtor's Objection to Motion of H.C. Beck, LTD. for Relief for the Automatic Stay Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Marshall, Joe) Modified on 10/14/2009 (slt). (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Karen Muyskens Fuller in Support of Motion of H.C. Beck, LTD. for Relief for the Automatic StayFiled by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1"# 2 Exhibit "2") (Lim, Lloyd) Modified on 10/14/2009 (slt). (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Affidavit Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1"# 2 Exhibit "2"# 3 Exhibit "3-1"# 4 Exhibit "3-2"# 5 Exhibit 3-3# 6 Exhibit "4") (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/12/2009)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Alpha Testing, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Shriro, Michelle) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) Preliminary Hearing Set (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2009 at 09:30 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (th)). Service Date 10/08/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Objection Filed by Alpha Testing, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Shriro, Michelle) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Objection Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 15 Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. filed by Creditor H.C. Beck, Ltd.). (Attachments: # 1 Service List) (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 17 Order Authorizing Employment of Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. as Counsel forMcKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 16 Application to Employ Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. as Counsel for McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc.). (slt)). Service Date 10/03/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Order Authorizing Employment of Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. as Counsel forMcKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (RE: related document(s) 16 Application to Employ Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. as Counsel for McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc.). (slt) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Application to Employ Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C. as Counsel for McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Service List) (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay WITHOUT Waiver of 30-Day Hearing Requirement As To Real Property located at 1900 Gateway Boulevard, McKinney, Collin County, Texas Filed by H.C. Beck, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Proposed Order Granting Releif from Stay) (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Filing and Claim Form) (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: William Shurtleff) Filed by Rodman, L.L.C. (Shurtleff, William) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: William Shurtleff) Filed by Prism Electric, Inc. (Shurtleff, William) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) 6 Order Setting 8-Day Dismissal Deadline For Filing Declarations for Electronic Filing (RE: related document(s) 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements and Other Required Documents.Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. Document Due 09/8/2009.(Marshall, Joe) filed by Debtor McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc., Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. Document Due 09/8/2009. (Marshall, Joe) filed by Debtor McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc.). Declaration due on 9/22/2009. (slt)). Service Date 09/16/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (Marshall, Joe) Modified on 9/16/2009 (slt). (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Amended Creditor Matrix, Adding Creditors Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. Document Due 09/21/2009. (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. Document Due 09/21/2009. (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Original Schedules: Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H,. Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. Document Due 09/21/2009. (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Order Setting 8-Day Dismissal Deadline For Filing Declarations for Electronic Filing (RE: related document(s) 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements and Other Required Documents.Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. Document Due 09/8/2009.(Marshall, Joe) filed by Debtor McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc., Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. Document Due 09/8/2009. (Marshall, Joe) filed by Debtor McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc.). Declaration due on 9/22/2009. (slt) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Mike P. Massad, Jr. and Lloyd A. Lim) Mike P. Massad, Jr. and Lloyd A. Lim Filed by The Beck Group (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (RE: related document(s) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/2/2009 at 11:30 AM at Plano Centre. Proofs of Claims due by 12/31/2009. Government Proof of Claim due by 3/1/2010. (lc)). Service Date 09/04/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Mike P. Massad, Jr. and Lloyd A. Lim) Mike P. Massad, Jr. and Lloyd A. Lim Filed by The Beck Group (Lim, Lloyd) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. (Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements and Other Required Documents.Filed by McKinney Shores Hotel Partners, Inc. Document Due 09/8/2009.(Marshall, Joe) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                          Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 155 times.

                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?