Triton IP, LLC. v. Infor Global Solutions (Chicago), Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:07-cv-00248
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Leonard Davis
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Triton IP, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Represented by Collins Edmonds & Pogorzelski PLLC

Represented by Kajeer Yar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kajeer Yar +1 918 292 8158 +1 918 292 8158 kyar@yarlawfirm.com

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@wsfirm.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss. Case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/11/2007. (rvw, ) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss by Triton IP, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Triton IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Case transferred in from Marshall Division. Case Number 2:07cv172. Case assigned to Judge Leonard Davis., filed by Triton IP, LLC..(fnt, ) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - transfering case to the Tyler Division of the District of Texas. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/1/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Triton IP, LLC. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Pridham on behalf of Triton IP, LLC. (Pridham, David) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kajeer Yar on behalf of Triton IP, LLC. (Yar, Kajeer) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J. Edmonds on behalf of Triton IP, LLC. (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Infor Global Solutions (Chicago), Inc., Infor Global Solutions (Michigan), Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
ORIGINAL COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Infor Global Solutions (Chicago), Inc., Infor Global Solutions (Michigan), Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by Triton IP, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, ) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 83 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?