Thomas v. Cox Communications, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00231

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 2:43 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barry W. Thomas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrington Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Harrington +1 704 315 5800 +1 704 625 9259 jharrington@harringtonlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 40

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Pate Harrelson +1 870 772 0300 +1 870 772 0302 steve@harrelsonfirm.com
No Logo Charter Communications, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Comcast Corporation Comcast Corporation, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Cox Communications, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, General Motors Co
Unknown Role, Panamsat Corp
No Logo Nextel Operations, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Onstar Corp., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Sprint Spectrum, LP, Counter-Claimant
No Logo TracFone Wireless, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Cellco Partnership, Defendant
No Logo Centennial Communications Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dow Lohnes Pllc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce T Wieder +1 202 776 2888 +1 202 776 2222 bwieder@dowlohnes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeleskey Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Stephen Roper +1 936 632 3381 +1 936 632 6545 sroper@zeleskey.com
No Logo Charter Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frederick Bufe +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 johnbufe@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Comcast Corporation Comcast Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven David Moore +1 415 273 4741 +1 415 651 8510 smoore@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frederick Bufe +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 johnbufe@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ludlam Higgins Taylor +1 919 420 1725 +1 919 510 6141 taludlam@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Cox Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven David Moore +1 415 273 4741 +1 415 651 8510 smoore@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frederick Bufe +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 johnbufe@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ludlam Higgins Taylor +1 919 420 1725 +1 919 510 6141 taludlam@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Cricket Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frederick Bufe +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 johnbufe@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
No Logo Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven David Moore +1 415 273 4741 +1 415 651 8510 smoore@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frederick Bufe +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 johnbufe@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McAfee & Taft

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/23/2008 John A Kenney +1 405 235 9621 +1 405 235 0439 john.kenney@mcafeetaft.com
TERMINATED: 01/23/2008 Michael J LaBrie +1 405 235 9621 +1 405 235 0439 michael.labrie@mcafeetaft.com
TERMINATED: 01/23/2008 Michael D. McClintock michael.mcclintock@mcafeetaft.com
TERMINATED: 01/23/2008 Charles L. McLawhorn +1 405 235 9621 +1 405 235 0439 chad.mclawhorn@mcafeetaft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ludlam Higgins Taylor +1 919 420 1725 +1 919 510 6141 taludlam@kilpatricktownsend.com
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, General Motors Co
Unknown Role, Panamsat Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven David Moore +1 415 273 4741 +1 415 651 8510 smoore@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frederick Bufe +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 johnbufe@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ludlam Higgins Taylor +1 919 420 1725 +1 919 510 6141 taludlam@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Metropcs, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sanford E Warren, Jr. +1 214 969 2877 +1 214 969 4343 swarren@akingump.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Glenn Thames +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 glennthames@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garreth A Sarosi +1 214 647 2489 garreth.sarosi@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Perez Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Francisco Perez +1 214 289 6659 +1 214 521 1128 dan@pereziplaw.com
No Logo Nextel Operations, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie J. Gogan +1 202 624 2859 +1 202 628 5116 lgogan@crowell.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael H. Jacobs +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 mjacobs@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John I Stewart Jr wsauers@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark M Supko +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 msupko@crowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Thomas Henson +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413 thenson@rameyflock.com
No Logo Onstar Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven David Moore +1 415 273 4741 +1 415 651 8510 smoore@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frederick Bufe +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 johnbufe@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ludlam Higgins Taylor +1 919 420 1725 +1 919 510 6141 taludlam@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Sprint Spectrum, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie J. Gogan +1 202 624 2859 +1 202 628 5116 lgogan@crowell.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael H. Jacobs +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 mjacobs@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John I Stewart Jr wsauers@crowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark M Supko +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 msupko@crowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Thomas Henson +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413 thenson@rameyflock.com
No Logo TracFone Wireless, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven David Moore +1 415 273 4741 +1 415 651 8510 smoore@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Frederick Bufe +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 johnbufe@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ludlam Higgins Taylor +1 919 420 1725 +1 919 510 6141 taludlam@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Barry W. Thomas, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrington Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Harrington +1 704 315 5800 +1 704 625 9259 jharrington@harringtonlawpc.com
  Entries (112) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER granting [111] Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this action against the dft's are hereby dismissed with prejudice, and all counterclaims asserted by dfts. All parties are to bear their own costs relating to the claims and counterclaims asserted. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/1/08. (ch, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 111 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008, Terminated: 7/2/2008 Motion to Dismiss
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Stipulation with Prejudice by Cox Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Ludlam, Taylor)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [109] Motion to Amend discovery order to extend deadlines. Deadline for Rule 26 disclosures reset for 6/30/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/20/08. (ehs, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [96] Order Discovery Order to Extend Deadlines by Cox Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Ludlam, Taylor)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct [97] Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, [96] Order by Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel Operations, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Metropcs Inc., General Motors Corporation, Onstar Corp., Barry W. Thomas, Cox Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Cricket Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., Charter Communications, Inc.. (Jones, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2008 (sm, ).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [106] Motion to Amend the Discovery Order to extend deadlines. Discovery deadline for parties to make their Rule 26 disclosure 4/15/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 4/1/08. (ehs, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008, Terminated: 4/1/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Discovery Order and Extend Deadlines by Cox Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order Granting the Joint Motion to Amend the Discovery Order to Extend Deadlines)(Ludlam, Taylor)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE by Tracfone Wireless, Inc., General Motors Corporation, Onstar Corp., Cox Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Cricket Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., Charter Communications, Inc. Notice of Developments in Related Cases (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Jones, Michael)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of Metropcs Inc. (Thames, Earl)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Amended Answer to Complaint
                    AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Original Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Cricket Communications, Inc.. (Gardner, Allen)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [101] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel Francisco Perez terminated as counsel for MetroPCS. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/31/08. (ch, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008, Terminated: 2/1/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Daniel F. Perez by Metropcs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Warren, Sanford) Additional attachment(s)Corrected Proposed Order Needed added on 1/30/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/30/2008 (mpv, ).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [99] Motion to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order. Deadlines are amended as follows herein. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/29/08. (ch, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008, Terminated: 1/29/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                            ***REPLACES #98***Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Cox Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order)(Ludlam, Taylor) Modified on 1/28/2008 (mpv, ).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                              ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Deficiency, re: Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Cox Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Parties' Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order)(Ludlam, Taylor) Modified on 1/28/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/28/2008 (mpv, ).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2008.,Discovery due by 9/15/2009.,Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2008., Claim Construction Hearing set for 6/25/2009 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.,Motions due by 10/20/2009.,Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/20/2009., Jury Selection set for 11/2/2009 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward., Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2009 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Mediation deadline is 9/30/09. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/24/08. (ch, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                  DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/24/08. (ehs, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                    ***REPLACES #93***Joint MOTION Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order by Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel Operations, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Metropcs Inc., General Motors Corporation, Onstar Corp., Barry W. Thomas, Cox Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Cricket Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 1/24/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/28/2008 (mpv, ).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [92] Motion to Withdraw. John A. Kenney, Michael J. LaBrie, Michael D. McClintock, Charles L. McLawhorn, III., and McAffe & Taft A Professional Corporation are withdrawn and no longer counsel of record for said Dft Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/23/08. (ch, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                        **FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ludlam, Taylor) Modified on 1/23/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 1/23/2008 (mpv, ).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/21/2008, Entered: 1/21/2008, Terminated: 1/23/2008 Motion to Withdraw
                                          MOTION to Withdraw of Counsel for John Kenney, Michael Labrie, Michael McClintock and Charles L. McLawhorn III of McAfee & Taft A Professional Corporation by Dobson Cellular Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(McClintock, Michael)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Higgins Ludlam on behalf of Dobson Cellular Systems Inc. (Ludlam, Taylor)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven D Moore on behalf of Dobson Cellular Systems Inc. (Moore, Steven)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William J Sauers for Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Nextel Operations, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3389. (ch, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER - parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court of January 22, 2007. Deadlines under the local patent rules, the court deems February 5, 2007 to be the date of the initial case management conference. Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on February 19, 2007.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/9/08. (ch, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 1/8/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. The Court further instructed the parties that the time for complying with P.R. 3-1 would be 10 days after the date of the parties filing their proposed orders. Court Adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons) (jml)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Tracfone Wireless, Inc., General Motors Corporation, Onstar Corp., Cox Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Cricket Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., Charter Communications, Inc. (Bufe, John)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER setting status conference. Status Conference set for 1/8/2008 09:45 AM before Judge T. John Ward and Magistrate Judge Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/11/07. (ehs, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Sanford E Warren, Jr on behalf of Metropcs Inc. (Warren, Sanford)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark M Supko for Sprint Spectrum L.P..(APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-3034 (ch, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael H Jacobs for Sprint Spectrum L.P. (APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-3034. (ch, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Leslie J Gogan for Sprint Spectrum L.P. and Nextel Operations, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3033. (ch, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [53] Joint MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support filed by Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel Operations, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., General Motors Corporation, Onstar Corp., Cox Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Cricket Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Gardner, Allen)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [77] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [53] Joint MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support Responses due by 9/11/2007. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 9/11/07. (ch, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [53] Joint MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support filed by Barry W. Thomas. (Harrington, James)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007, Terminated: 9/11/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [53] Joint MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support by Barry W. Thomas. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Harrington, James)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce Terrill Wieder on behalf of Centennial Communications Corp. (Wieder, Bruce)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dobson Cellular Systems Inc. identifying Dobson Communications Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Jones, Michael)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Answer
                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Cricket Communications, Inc. (counterclaims denominated as affirmative defenses) by Barry W. Thomas.(Harrington, James)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                ANSWER to Counterclaim of Dobson Cellular Systems, Inc. by Barry W. Thomas.(Harrington, James)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                  ANSWER to Counterclaim of Nextel Operations, Inc. by Barry W. Thomas.(Harrington, James)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                    ANSWER to Counterclaim of Sprint Spectrum L.P. by Barry W. Thomas.(Harrington, James)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                      ANSWER to Counterclaim of Tracfone Wireless, Inc. by Barry W. Thomas.(Harrington, James)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                        ANSWER to Counterclaim of OnStar Corporation by Barry W. Thomas.(Harrington, James)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                          ANSWER to Counterclaim of Charter Communications, Inc. by Barry W. Thomas.(Harrington, James)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                            ANSWER to Counterclaim of Comcast Corporation by Barry W. Thomas.(Harrington, James)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                              ANSWER to Counterclaim of General Motors Corporation by Barry W. Thomas.(Harrington, James)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                ANSWER to Counterclaim of Cox Communications, Inc. by Barry W. Thomas.(Harrington, James)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Answer
                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Barry W. Thomas by Dobson Cellular Systems Inc..(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tracfone Wireless, Inc. identifying America Movil as Corporate Parent. (Gardner, Allen)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Onstar Corp. identifying General Motors Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Gardner, Allen)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by General Motors Corporation identifying State Street Bank & Trust as Corporate Parent. (Gardner, Allen)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cricket Communications, Inc. identifying Leap Wireless International, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Gardner, Allen)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cox Communications, Inc. identifying Cox Enterprises, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Gardner, Allen)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Comcast Corporation identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Gardner, Allen)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Charter Communications, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Gardner, Allen)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [54] Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this case relating to Centennial are hereby stayed. Centennial shall not be obligated to file an answer, pltf to notify the court when the appeal in the North Carolina case is resolved . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/22/07. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Tracfone Wireless, Inc., General Motors Corporation, Onstar Corp., Cox Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Cricket Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007, Terminated: 8/22/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                      ***REPLACES #49***MOTION to Stay by Barry W. Thomas. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Stay)(Harrelson, Steven) Modified on 8/22/2007 (mpv, ).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay and Brief in Support by Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel Operations, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., General Motors Corporation, Onstar Corp., Cox Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Cricket Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A part 1# (2) Exhibit A part 2# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit C# (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nextel Operations, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Henson, Walter)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Barry W. Thomas by Nextel Operations, Inc..(Henson, Walter)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sprint Spectrum L.P. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Henson, Walter)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR; DEFICIENT DOCUMENT; PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION to Stay by Barry W. Thomas. (Harrelson, Steven) Proposed Order added on 8/20/2007 (mpv, ). Modified to add proposed order on 8/20/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 8/21/2007 (mpv, ).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Barry W. Thomas by Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Henson, Walter)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Barry W. Thomas by Tracfone Wireless, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cricket Communications, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Barry W. Thomas by Onstar Corp..(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Barry W. Thomas by Charter Communications, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Barry W. Thomas by General Motors Corporation.(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Barry W. Thomas by Comcast Corporation.(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Barry W. Thomas by Cox Communications, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                                  Defendant MetroPCS, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Metropcs Inc..(Perez, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [38] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to 8/20/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/10/07. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007, Terminated: 8/10/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant MetroPCS, Inc. to Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff Barry W. Thomas's Complaint by Metropcs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sarosi, Garreth)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [34] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Cox Communications, Inc. Comcast Corporation, Cricket Communications, Inc., General Motors Corp., Tracfone Wireless, Inc., and OnStar Corp. deadline extended to 8/20/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/8/07. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [35] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Charter Communications, Inc. deadline is extended to 8/20/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 8/8/07. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007, Terminated: 8/8/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint [Unopposed] by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007, Terminated: 8/8/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint [Unopposed] by Tracfone Wireless, Inc., General Motors Corporation, Onstar Corp., Cox Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Cricket Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Taylor Higgins Ludlam for Tracfone Wireless, Inc. and General Motors Corporation., Cox Cummunications, Comcast, OnStar (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-10531 (ch, ) Modified on 8/1/2007 (ch, ).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [29] Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Cellco Partnership is hereby dismissed without prejudice . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/30/07. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven D Moore on behalf of Tracfone Wireless, Inc., General Motors Corporation, Onstar Corp., Cox Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation (Moore, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to 8/6/07 for deft Cricket Communications . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/27/07. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007, Terminated: 7/31/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                        ***REPLACES #24; MODIFIED BY CLERK TO ADD CORRECTED PROPOSED ORDER*** MOTION to Dismiss Cellco Partnership by Barry W. Thomas. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order to Dismiss Cellco Partnership)(Harrelson, Steven) Modified on 7/25/2007 (mpv, ). Corrected Proposed Order added on 7/25/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 7/25/2007 (mpv, ).
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles L McLawhorn, II for Dobson Cellular Systems Inc.(APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 6-1-10428. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael D McClintock for Dobson Cellular Systems Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-10428. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael J LaBrie for Dobson Cellular Systems Inc.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-10428. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John A Kenney for Dobson Cellular Systems Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-10428. (ch, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2007 (ch, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION to Dismiss Cellco Partnership by Barry W. Thomas. (Harrelson, Steven) Modified on 7/23/2007 (mpv, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [17] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Charter Communications deadline is 8/10/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/07. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [18] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dobson Cellular Systems Inc. deadline is 8/31/07. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/07. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [16] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sprint Spectum LP deadline is 8/20/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/07. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael H Jacobs for Nextel Operations, Inc. (APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-2793. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark M Supko for Nextel Operations, Inc.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-2793 (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007, Terminated: 7/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint [unopposed] by Dobson Cellular Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007, Terminated: 7/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint [unopposed] by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007, Terminated: 7/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint or Otherwise Respond (Agreed) by Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: # (1))(Henson, Walter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended for deft Centennial Communications Corp to 8/20/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/12/07. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended for Nextel Operations Inc to answer is extended to 8/20/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/12/07. (ehs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dfts. Cox Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, General Motors Corporation, Tracfone Wireless, Inc., and OnStar Corporation deadline is extended to 8/10/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/11/07. (ch, ) Modified on 7/12/2007 (ch, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007, Terminated: 7/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint Unopposed by Centennial Communications Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Roper, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007, Terminated: 7/11/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint Unopposed by Tracfone Wireless, Inc., General Motors Corporation, Onstar Corp., Cox Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007, Terminated: 7/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint (or Otherwise Respond) (Agreed) by Nextel Operations, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Walter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. MetroPCS, Inc. deadline is extended to 8/10/07 . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 7/5/07. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007, Terminated: 7/27/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cricket Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Neukom, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007, Terminated: 7/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant MetroPCS, Inc. to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff by Metropcs Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James M Harrington for Barry W. Thomas.APPROVED (FEE PAID) Rec 5-1-1026 (poa, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sprint Spectrum L.P., Nextel Operations, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Tracfone Wireless, Inc., Metropcs Inc., General Motors Corporation, Onstar Corp., Cox Communications, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Centennial Communications Corp., Cricket Communications, Inc., Dobson Cellular Systems Inc., Charter Communications, Inc.. (ch, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James M. Harrington by Barry W. Thomas. (Harrelson, Steven) Modified on 6/12/2007 (mpv, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document: [1] Complaint.. (Harrelson, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Barry W. Thomas AO-120 Report on filing of action re: patent (Harrelson, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1150853.), filed by Barry W. Thomas. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrelson, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?