Datatern, Inc. v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:08-cv-00070

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 20, 2016 at 11:34 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Datatern, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Edwin Satterthwaite +1 310 490 7436 +1 805 968 0504 satterthwaite@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patrick R. Anderson, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Rolf Anderson +1 810 275 0751 +1 248 928 9239 patrick@prapllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Weiss +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 aweiss@raklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Perez Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francisco Perez +1 214 289 6659 +1 214 521 1128 dan@pereziplaw.com
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitzpatrick, Hagood, Smith & Uhl LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Ralph Ritch Roberts, III +1 214 237 0900 +1 214 237 0901 rroberts@fhsulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Polsinelli PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen E Fox +1 214 661 5582 +1 214 397 0033 sfox@polsinelli.com
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Alemanni +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 jalemanni@kilpatricktownsend.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/11/2008 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Eric Baskin +1 202 508 5800 +1 202 508 5858 sbaskin@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sternquist, Daniel A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 223 0276 +1 903 223 0210 wlancelee@gmail.com
No Logo Expedia Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Seungtaik Michael Song +1 650 493 9300 msong@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Marvin Craig Tyler +1 512 338 5410 +1 512 338 5499 ctyler@wsgr.com
No Logo Hotels.com GP, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Seungtaik Michael Song +1 650 493 9300 msong@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Marvin Craig Tyler +1 512 338 5410 +1 512 338 5499 ctyler@wsgr.com
No Logo Hotels.com, LP, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Seungtaik Michael Song +1 650 493 9300 msong@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Marvin Craig Tyler +1 512 338 5410 +1 512 338 5499 ctyler@wsgr.com
No Logo Qvc, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M Jackson +1 214 953 6109 +1 214 661 6645 jjackson@jw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert P. Latham +1 214 953 6095 +1 214 661 6663 blatham@jw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Roberts, PLLC - Texarkana

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leisa B. Pearlman +1 903 334 7000 +1 903 334 7007 lpearlman@pattonroberts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyly - Rommel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Fletcher Rommel +1 903 334 8646 +1 903 334 8645 srommel@wylyrommel.com
No Logo Travelnow.com Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Seungtaik Michael Song +1 650 493 9300 msong@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Marvin Craig Tyler +1 512 338 5410 +1 512 338 5499 ctyler@wsgr.com
No Logo Tripadvisor LLC., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Seungtaik Michael Song +1 650 493 9300 msong@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Marvin Craig Tyler +1 512 338 5410 +1 512 338 5499 ctyler@wsgr.com
No Logo Visa U.s.a., Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Eugene Y. Mar +1 415 954 4927 +1 415 954 4480 emar@fbm.com
PRO HAC VICE Stephanie Powers Skaff +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 sskaff@fbm.com
PRO HAC VICE Roderick Manley Thompson +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 rthompson@fbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynn,Tillotson Pinker & Cox, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael P Lynn +1 214 981 3800 +1 214 981 3839 mlynn@lynnllp.com
Visa, Inc. Visa, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roderick Manley Thompson +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 rthompson@fbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynn,Tillotson Pinker & Cox, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael P Lynn +1 214 981 3800 +1 214 981 3839 mlynn@lynnllp.com
Wachovia Corporation Wachovia Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2008, PRO HAC VICE Christopher E Chalsen +1 212 530 5380 +1 212 822 5380 cchalsen@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 10/31/2008, PRO HAC VICE Lawrence Tucker Kass +1 212 530 5178 +1 212 822 5796 lkass@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 10/31/2008, PRO HAC VICE James Robert Klaiber +1 212 530 5219 +1 212 822 5019 jklaiber@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Roberts, PLLC - Texarkana

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2008 Leisa B. Pearlman +1 903 334 7000 +1 903 334 7007 lpearlman@pattonroberts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyly - Rommel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Sean Fletcher Rommel +1 903 334 8646 +1 903 334 8645 srommel@wylyrommel.com
v.
Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Howard Reger, II +1 214 292 4084 +1 214 747 2091 reger@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitzpatrick, Hagood, Smith & Uhl LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Ralph Ritch Roberts, III +1 214 237 0900 +1 214 237 0901 rroberts@fhsulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Polsinelli PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen E Fox +1 214 661 5582 +1 214 397 0033 sfox@polsinelli.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sternquist, Daniel A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lance Lee +1 903 223 0276 +1 903 223 0210 wlancelee@gmail.com
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Howard Reger, II +1 214 292 4084 +1 214 747 2091 reger@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitzpatrick, Hagood, Smith & Uhl LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Ralph Ritch Roberts, III +1 214 237 0900 +1 214 237 0901 rroberts@fhsulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Polsinelli PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen E Fox +1 214 661 5582 +1 214 397 0033 sfox@polsinelli.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sternquist, Daniel A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lance Lee +1 903 223 0276 +1 903 223 0210 wlancelee@gmail.com
No Logo Conrad Hospitality, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fischman & Lundwall PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Jason Fischman +1 832 209 4206 +1 713 877 1145 gfischman@fandlattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Charles Rooklidge +1 949 451 4009 +1 949 475 4752 wrooklidge@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/03/2009 TTAB Attorney Placeholder casagrandet@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Sheeks Wyde +1 713 651 2667 jwyde@winston.com
No Logo Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fischman & Lundwall PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Jason Fischman +1 832 209 4206 +1 713 877 1145 gfischman@fandlattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Charles Rooklidge +1 949 451 4009 +1 949 475 4752 wrooklidge@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/03/2009 TTAB Attorney Placeholder casagrandet@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Sheeks Wyde +1 713 651 2667 jwyde@winston.com
No Logo Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fischman & Lundwall PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Jason Fischman +1 832 209 4206 +1 713 877 1145 gfischman@fandlattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Charles Rooklidge +1 949 451 4009 +1 949 475 4752 wrooklidge@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/03/2009 TTAB Attorney Placeholder casagrandet@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Sheeks Wyde +1 713 651 2667 jwyde@winston.com
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Alemanni +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 jalemanni@kilpatricktownsend.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Robert Pierce +1 336 607 7503 +1 336 734 2638 jpierce@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/11/2008 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Eric Baskin +1 202 508 5800 +1 202 508 5858 sbaskin@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sternquist, Daniel A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 223 0276 +1 903 223 0210 wlancelee@gmail.com
No Logo Doubletree Hotels LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fischman & Lundwall PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Jason Fischman +1 832 209 4206 +1 713 877 1145 gfischman@fandlattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Charles Rooklidge +1 949 451 4009 +1 949 475 4752 wrooklidge@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/03/2009 TTAB Attorney Placeholder casagrandet@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Sheeks Wyde +1 713 651 2667 jwyde@winston.com
No Logo Doubletree Hotels, Corp, Defendant
No Logo Doubletree LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Charles Rooklidge +1 949 451 4009 +1 949 475 4752 wrooklidge@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Expedia Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Ronald E. Shulman +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 ron.shulman@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Tung-On Kong +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tkong@wsgr.com
PRO HAC VICE Seungtaik Michael Song +1 650 493 9300 msong@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Marvin Craig Tyler +1 512 338 5410 +1 512 338 5499 ctyler@wsgr.com
No Logo Hampton Inns LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fischman & Lundwall PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Jason Fischman +1 832 209 4206 +1 713 877 1145 gfischman@fandlattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Charles Rooklidge +1 949 451 4009 +1 949 475 4752 wrooklidge@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/03/2009 TTAB Attorney Placeholder casagrandet@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Sheeks Wyde +1 713 651 2667 jwyde@winston.com
No Logo Hampton Inns, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Charles Rooklidge +1 949 451 4009 +1 949 475 4752 wrooklidge@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Hilton Hospitality LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fischman & Lundwall PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Jason Fischman +1 832 209 4206 +1 713 877 1145 gfischman@fandlattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Charles Rooklidge +1 949 451 4009 +1 949 475 4752 wrooklidge@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/03/2009 TTAB Attorney Placeholder casagrandet@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Sheeks Wyde +1 713 651 2667 jwyde@winston.com
No Logo Hilton Hospitality, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Charles Rooklidge +1 949 451 4009 +1 949 475 4752 wrooklidge@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Hilton Hotels Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fischman & Lundwall PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Jason Fischman +1 832 209 4206 +1 713 877 1145 gfischman@fandlattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Charles Rooklidge +1 949 451 4009 +1 949 475 4752 wrooklidge@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/03/2009 TTAB Attorney Placeholder casagrandet@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Sheeks Wyde +1 713 651 2667 jwyde@winston.com
No Logo Hotels.com, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Ronald E. Shulman +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 ron.shulman@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Tung-On Kong +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tkong@wsgr.com
PRO HAC VICE Seungtaik Michael Song +1 650 493 9300 msong@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Marvin Craig Tyler +1 512 338 5410 +1 512 338 5499 ctyler@wsgr.com
No Logo Hotels.com GP, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Ronald E. Shulman +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 ron.shulman@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Tung-On Kong +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tkong@wsgr.com
PRO HAC VICE Seungtaik Michael Song +1 650 493 9300 msong@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Marvin Craig Tyler +1 512 338 5410 +1 512 338 5499 ctyler@wsgr.com
No Logo Hotels.com, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Ronald E. Shulman +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 ron.shulman@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Tung-On Kong +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tkong@wsgr.com
PRO HAC VICE Seungtaik Michael Song +1 650 493 9300 msong@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Marvin Craig Tyler +1 512 338 5410 +1 512 338 5499 ctyler@wsgr.com
No Logo Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Lisa Hayes Meyerhoff +1 214 978 3035 +1 214 978 3099 Lisa.Meyerhoff@Bakernet.com
No Logo Qvc, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M Jackson +1 214 953 6109 +1 214 661 6645 jjackson@jw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert P. Latham +1 214 953 6095 +1 214 661 6663 blatham@jw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Roberts, PLLC - Texarkana

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leisa B. Pearlman +1 903 334 7000 +1 903 334 7007 lpearlman@pattonroberts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyly - Rommel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Fletcher Rommel +1 903 334 8646 +1 903 334 8645 srommel@wylyrommel.com
No Logo Red Hat Middleware LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams +1 336 749 7952 +1 404 892 5002 dwilliams@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE John C. Alemanni +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 jalemanni@kilpatricktownsend.com
PRO HAC VICE William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Jon Robert Pierce +1 336 607 7503 +1 336 734 2638 jpierce@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reebok International, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatricktownsend.com
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams +1 336 749 7952 +1 404 892 5002 dwilliams@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE John C. Alemanni +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 jalemanni@kilpatricktownsend.com
PRO HAC VICE William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
Space Jon Robert Pierce +1 336 607 7503 +1 336 734 2638 jpierce@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reebok International, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Sharp Electronics Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mullis, Jerry D.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 317 634 3456 +1 317 637 7561 judy@uspatent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon & Vanderhye PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/29/2009 Robert Walker Adams +1 703 816 4000 +1 703 816 4100 RWA@nixonvan.com
TERMINATED: 01/29/2009, PRO HAC VICE Updeep S. Gill +1 703 816 4000 +1 703 816 4100 usg@nixonvan.com
TERMINATED: 01/29/2009, PRO HAC VICE Jonathan A Roberts +1 703 816 4000 +1 703 816 4100 JR@nixonvan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodard, Emhardt, Moriarty, McNett & Henry LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Lisa A. Hiday +1 317 634 3456 lhiday@uspatent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvin R Wilcox, III +1 903 595 1133 +1 903 595 0191 mrw@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Travelnow.com Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Ronald E. Shulman +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 ron.shulman@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Tung-On Kong +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tkong@wsgr.com
PRO HAC VICE Seungtaik Michael Song +1 650 493 9300 msong@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Marvin Craig Tyler +1 512 338 5410 +1 512 338 5499 ctyler@wsgr.com
No Logo Tripadvisor LLC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Ronald E. Shulman +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 ron.shulman@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Tung-On Kong +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 tkong@wsgr.com
PRO HAC VICE Seungtaik Michael Song +1 650 493 9300 msong@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Marvin Craig Tyler +1 512 338 5410 +1 512 338 5499 ctyler@wsgr.com
No Logo Visa U.s.a., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Eugene Y. Mar +1 415 954 4927 +1 415 954 4480 emar@fbm.com
PRO HAC VICE Stephanie Powers Skaff +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 sskaff@fbm.com
PRO HAC VICE Roderick Manley Thompson +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 rthompson@fbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynn,Tillotson Pinker & Cox, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael P Lynn +1 214 981 3800 +1 214 981 3839 mlynn@lynnllp.com
Visa, Inc. Visa, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Roderick Manley Thompson +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 rthompson@fbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynn,Tillotson Pinker & Cox, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael P Lynn +1 214 981 3800 +1 214 981 3839 mlynn@lynnllp.com
Wachovia Corporation Wachovia Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Alemanni +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 jalemanni@kilpatricktownsend.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Robert Pierce +1 336 607 7503 +1 336 734 2638 jpierce@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Eric Baskin +1 202 508 5800 +1 202 508 5858 sbaskin@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2008, PRO HAC VICE Christopher E Chalsen +1 212 530 5380 +1 212 822 5380 cchalsen@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 10/31/2008, PRO HAC VICE Lawrence Tucker Kass +1 212 530 5178 +1 212 822 5796 lkass@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 10/31/2008, PRO HAC VICE James Robert Klaiber +1 212 530 5219 +1 212 822 5019 jklaiber@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Roberts, PLLC - Texarkana

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2008 Leisa B. Pearlman +1 903 334 7000 +1 903 334 7007 lpearlman@pattonroberts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sternquist, Daniel A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 223 0276 +1 903 223 0210 wlancelee@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyly - Rommel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/31/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Sean Fletcher Rommel +1 903 334 8646 +1 903 334 8645 srommel@wylyrommel.com
No Logo Datatern, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Edwin Satterthwaite +1 310 490 7436 +1 805 968 0504 satterthwaite@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patrick R. Anderson, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Rolf Anderson +1 810 275 0751 +1 248 928 9239 patrick@prapllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Rolf Anderson +1 810 275 0751 +1 248 928 9239 patrick@prapllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Rolf Anderson +1 810 275 0751 +1 248 928 9239 patrick@prapllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Rolf Anderson +1 810 275 0751 +1 248 928 9239 patrick@prapllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Rolf Anderson +1 810 275 0751 +1 248 928 9239 patrick@prapllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Rolf Anderson +1 810 275 0751 +1 248 928 9239 patrick@prapllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Weiss +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 aweiss@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Weiss +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 aweiss@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Weiss +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 aweiss@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Weiss +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 aweiss@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Weiss +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 aweiss@raklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Perez Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francisco Perez +1 214 289 6659 +1 214 521 1128 dan@pereziplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francisco Perez +1 214 289 6659 +1 214 521 1128 dan@pereziplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francisco Perez +1 214 289 6659 +1 214 521 1128 dan@pereziplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francisco Perez +1 214 289 6659 +1 214 521 1128 dan@pereziplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francisco Perez +1 214 289 6659 +1 214 521 1128 dan@pereziplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francisco Perez +1 214 289 6659 +1 214 521 1128 dan@pereziplaw.com
No Logo Lou Brucculeri, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis Brucculeri +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 lbrucculeri@blankrome.com
  Entries (200) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER; It is further ORDERED that this case is closed on the Courts Docket. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/17/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, granting 196 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Delta filed by Datatern, Inc.., Delta Air Lines, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/17/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, granting 195 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Wachovia filed by Datatern, Inc.., Wachovia Corporation terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/17/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
        ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Datatern, Inc. of Dismissal of All Named Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick) Modified on 7/17/2009 (sm, ). (Entered: 07/16/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
          Consent MOTION to Dismiss Delta by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
            Consent MOTION to Dismiss Wachovia by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 193 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/8/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (P.R. 4-1) by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 190 Motion to Dismiss Dft QVC WITH PREJUDICE.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/25/2009. (sm, ) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 189 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Expedia dfts. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/23/2009. (sm, ) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
                      Consent MOTION to Dismiss QVC, Inc. by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Dismiss Expedia Defendants by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Sean Fletcher Rommel (Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; re 186 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Doubletree Hotels LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Hampton Inns LLC, Conrad Hospitality LLC, Hilton Hospitality LLC, Datatern, Inc.; Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC; Doubletree Hotels LLC; Hampton Inns LLC; Hilton Hospitality LLC; Hilton Hotels Corporation; Conrad Hospitality LLC and Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/20/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hilton Hospitality LLC, Hampton Inns LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Datatern, Inc., Doubletree Hotels LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 184 Motion to Dismiss Dft Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/16/2009. (sm, ) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                  Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                    DataTern's ANSWER to 170 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of QVC, Inc. by Datatern, Inc..(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER, granting 174 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Thomas L. Casagrande]Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Thomas L. Casagrande] filed by Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Hilton Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hospitality LLC, Doubletree Hotels LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc.., Attorney Thomas L Casagrande terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/3/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Sharp Electronics Corp. of Withdrawal from Electronic Service (Hiday, Lisa) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                          ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION to Withdraw From Electronic Notice by Sharp Electronics Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hiday, Lisa) Modified on 3/3/2009 (sm, ). (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by Wachovia Corporation of Compliance Pursuant to Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE by Delta Air Lines, Inc. of Compliance Pursuant to Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE by Hilton Hospitality LLC, Hampton Inns LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Doubletree Hotels LLC of Compliance Pursuant to Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by Hotels.com GP, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, Hotels.com, Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com, LP of Compliance with Local Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by QVC, Inc. of Compliance with Local Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Jackson, John) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [Thomas L. Casagrande] by Hilton Hospitality LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Doubletree Hotels LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER, granting 172 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss filed by Datatern, Inc.., Sharp Electronics Corp. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/26/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Datatern, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amphion Innovations PLC for Datatern, Inc.. (Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                              First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Datatern, Inc. by QVC, Inc..(Latham, Robert) (Entered: 02/16/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney S Michael Song for Hotels.com GP, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, Hotels.com, Hotels.com GP, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Expedia, Inc. and Hotels.com, LP.RECEIPT 5-1-1614 (rml, ) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER, granting 167 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Nixon & Vanderhye, PC) filed by Sharp Electronics Corp.., Attorney Jonathan A Roberts; Robert W Adams and Updeep S Gill terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/29/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Nixon & Vanderhye, PC) by Sharp Electronics Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 165 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order; Defendants Invalidity Contentions and accompanying document production are due February 27, 2009. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/28/09. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 139 Scheduling Order, by Hotels.com GP, LLC, Hilton Hospitality LLC, Hampton Inns LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc., QVC, Inc., Sharp Electronics Corp., Wachovia Corporation, Hotels.com, Delta Air Lines, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rooklidge, William) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Wachovia Corporation (Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Hotels.com GP, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, Hotels.com, Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com, LP Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Datatern, Inc. re Initial Disclosure (Weiss, Andrew) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Hilton Hospitality LLC, Hampton Inns LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Doubletree Hotels LLC Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) (Rooklidge, William) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by QVC, Inc. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Jackson, John) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Sharp Electronics Corp. of P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Hiday, Lisa) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew D Weiss on behalf of Datatern, Inc. (Weiss, Andrew) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Spiro Bereveskos (main doc) for Sharp Electronics Corp., Lisa A Hiday for Sharp Electronics Corp. RECEIPT 5-1-1576. (Attachments: # 1 PHV Lisa Hiday)(rml, ) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 154 Motion to Dismiss all claims and counterclaims with prejudice asserted between plaintiff and Defendants Bank of America. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/16/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A. by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Edwin Satterthwaite on behalf of Datatern, Inc. (Satterthwaite, Robert) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER, Lou Brucculeri added as technical advisor.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/3/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Datatern, Inc. of P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AMEND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER; granting 149 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/13/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 146 Motion to Withdraw Chalsen, Kass and Klaiber of Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy as counsel for Wachovia.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/31/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 145 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Leisa Beaty Pearlman and Sean Fletcher Rommel terminated as attys for Wachovia.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/31/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Counsel by Wachovia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klaiber, James) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Wachovia Corp. - Sean F. Rommel, Leisa B. Pearlman by Wachovia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of Datatern, Inc. (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Wachovia Corporation (Lee, Lance) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct 139 Scheduling Order, by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on October 23, 2008. (rml, ) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 135 Motion for discovery order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on October 23, 2008. (rml, ) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2010 10:00 AM before Judge David Folsom. Amended Pleadings due by 6/8/2009. Discovery due by 9/21/2009. Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2009. Jury Selection set for 9/8/2010 10:00AM before Judge David Folsom. Motions due by 6/23/2010.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on October 23, 2008. (rml, ) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 133 Motion to Dismiss ;ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendants Visa Inc. and Visa USA Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice and all counterclaims are dismissed as moot, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled SETTTLEMENT AGREEMENT dated October 13, 2008.It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge David Folsom on October 23, 2008. (rml, ) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Expedia, Inc. of Joint Submission Regarding Technical Advisor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Lou Brucculeri, # 2 Exhibit Richard Egan, # 3 Exhibit Brian Jackson, # 4 Exhibit Gaynell Methvin)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Expedia, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2008: # 2 Protective Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order by Expedia, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Discovery Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2008: # 2 Revised Discovery Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Expedia, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Docket Control Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2008: # 2 Revised Docket Control Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Dismiss Visa, Inc. and Visa USA, Inc. by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Daniel) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time to to submit discovery to October 22, 2008.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/21/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File & Extend Deadline to Submit Discovery Order, Protective Order, Technical Advisor, & Docket Control Order by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion & Extending Deadline)(Reger, Thomas) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Robert Pierce on behalf of Wachovia Corporation (Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C Alemanni on behalf of Wachovia Corporation (Alemanni, John) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen E Baskin on behalf of Wachovia Corporation (Baskin, Stephen) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William H Boice on behalf of Wachovia Corporation (Boice, William) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9-23-08, Scheduling Conference, 13 pages before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Libby Crawford,Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/3/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2009. (aec, ) (Entered: 10/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Updeep S Gill for Sharp Electronics Corp. RECEIPT 5-1-1469. (rml, ) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Scheduling Conference held on 9/23/2008. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (lfs, ) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER due to the large number of patent cases pending on courts docket ORDERS the following procedure regarding sum jgm motions; motions to strike expert testimony/daupert motions and motions in limine. For all of the above motions, the letter briefs shall be filed without exhibits. Any requests to submit letter briefs after deadlines outlined must show good cause.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/23/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan A Roberts for Sharp Electronics Corp., Robert W Adams for Sharp Electronics Corp. RECEIPT 5-1-1465. (Attachments: # 1 PHV Robert Adams)(rml, ) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leisa Beaty Pearlman on behalf of QVC, Inc. (Pearlman, Leisa) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Fletcher Rommel on behalf of QVC, Inc. (Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 97 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Visa by Datatern, Inc.. (Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 98 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Expedia Defendants by Datatern, Inc.. (Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 100 Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaim of Bank of America by Datatern, Inc.. (Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 95 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Wachovia by Datatern, Inc.. (Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, AND DISCOVERY ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2008 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/6/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 89 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Datatern, Inc..(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. (Meyerhoff, Lisa) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint by Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc..(Meyerhoff, Lisa) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ron E Shulman for Hotels.com GP, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, Hotels.com, Expedia, Inc. and Hotels.com, LP. APPROVED (Attachments: # 1 RECEIPT #5-1-1416, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(sealed by clerk)(mpv, ) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tung-On Kong for Hotels.com GP, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, Hotels.com, Expedia, Inc. and Hotels.com, LP. APPROVED (Attachments: # 1 RECEIPT #5-1-1417, # 2 Exhibit A)(mpv, ) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Robert Pierce on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. (Fox, Stephen) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tripadvisor LLC identifying Corporate Parent TripAdvisor Business Trust for Tripadvisor LLC. (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Bank of America, National Association's ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Datatern, Inc. by Bank of America, N.A..(Fox, Stephen) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Travelnow.com, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hotels.com for Travelnow.com, Inc.. (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hotels.com, LP identifying Other Affiliate Hotels.com GP LLC for Hotels.com, LP. (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hotels.com GP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hotels.com for Hotels.com GP, LLC. (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Visa, Inc., Visa U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Visa Inc. for Visa U.S.A., Inc.. (Thompson, Roderick) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Bank of America Corporation ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint by Bank of America Corporation.(Fox, Stephen) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Expedia, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Media Corporation for Expedia, Inc.. (Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Datatern, Inc. by Hotels.com GP, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com, LP.(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendants Visa U.S.A. Inc. and Visa Inc.'s ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Datatern, Inc. by Visa, Inc., Visa U.S.A., Inc..(Thompson, Roderick) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wachovia Corporation (Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM S against Datatern, Inc. by Wachovia Corporation.(Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by QVC, Inc. (Latham, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant QVC, Inc.'s ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by QVC, Inc..(Latham, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sharp Electronics Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Sharp Corporation for Sharp Electronics Corp.. (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint (First Amended Complaint) by Sharp Electronics Corp..(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Lee, Lance) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Datatern, Inc. by Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Lee, Lance) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John C Alemanni (Main Document) for Delta Air Lines, Inc., Stephen E Baskin for Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 PHV Stephen Baskin, # 2 RECEIPT 5-1-1402 for Alemanni & Baskin)(rml, ) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 86 Motion for Michael Jones and Potter Minton law firm to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Edwin Jones terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/11/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. (Lee, Lance) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Lee, Lance) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William H Boice for Delta Air Lines, Inc.(RECEIPT 5-1-1390). (rml, ) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc..( Meyerhoff, Lisa) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas L Casagrande on behalf of Hilton Hospitality LLC, Hampton Inns LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Doubletree Hotels LLC (Casagrande, Thomas) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 79 Motion to Dismiss Dfts Red Hat, Inc and Red Hat Middleware LLC with prejudice.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/17/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION to Dismiss by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Visa, Inc., Visa U.S.A., Inc..( Schwegmann, Christopher) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A. shall have until July 18, 2008 to answer or otherwise respond to DataTern, Inc.'s Amended Complaint.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/12/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 69 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant DELTA AIR LINES, INC. has until and through July 16, 2008 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/12/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Defendant Sharp have until and through July 18, 2008 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/12/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant QVC, Inc. shall have up to and including Friday, July 18, 2008 to file an Answer. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/12/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 65 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant Wachovia Corp. shall have up to and including July 18, 2008, in which to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/12/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hilton Hospitality LLC, Hampton Inns LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Doubletree Hotels LLC identifying Blackstone Group L.P. as Corporate Parent. (Rooklidge, William) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint and Additional Defenses by Hilton Hospitality, Inc., Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hampton Inns, Inc., Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Doubletree Hotels LLC, Doubletree LLC.(Rooklidge, William) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to DataTern, Inc.'s Amended Complaint by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roberts, Ralph) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's, Sharp Electronics Corp., Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Sharp Electronics Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time for Dfts Expedia, Hotels.Com, Travel Now and Tripadvisor to Answer amended complaint until July 18, 2008.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/10/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint by QVC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, John) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wachovia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint (Unopposed) by Hotels.com GP, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, Hotels.com, Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc..( Meyerhoff, Lisa) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William H Boice for Red Hat, Inc. and Red Hat Middleware LLC. RECEIPT, 6-1-13893. (mpv, ) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven Gardner for Red Hat, Inc. and Red Hat Middleware LLC. APPROVED, RECEIPT # 6-1-13893. (mpv, ) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John C Alemanni for Red Hat, Inc. and Red Hat Middleware LLC. APPROVED; RECEIPT #6-1-13893. (mpv, ) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Red Hat, Inc., Red Hat Middleware LLC (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Robert Pierce on behalf of Red Hat, Inc., Red Hat Middleware LLC (Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Danielle Thompson Williams on behalf of Red Hat, Inc., Red Hat Middleware LLC (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lawrence T Kass (main document) for Wachovia Corporation, Christopher E Chalsen for Wachovia Corporation, James Robert Klaiber for Wachovia Corporation.(RECEIPT 5-1-1359) (Attachments: # 1 PHV Christopher Chalsen, # 2 PHV James Klaiber)(rml, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Wachovia Corp answer due 6/18/2008. Signed by Judge Judge David Folsom on 5/19/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wachovia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leisa Beaty Pearlman on behalf of Wachovia Corporation (Pearlman, Leisa) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Fletcher Rommel on behalf of Wachovia Corporation (Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Visa, Inc., Visa U.S.A., Inc..( Skaff, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Delta Air Lines, Inc. up to and including June 16, 2008.( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Red Hat, Inc., Red Hat Middleware LLC. up to and including June 18, 2008.( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephanie Powers Skaff for Visa U.S.A., Inc. (PAID RECEIPT #5-1-001343). (sm, ) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Roderick M Thompson for Visa U.S.A., Inc. (PAID RECEIPT #5-1-001341). (sm, ) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eugene Y Mar for Visa U.S.A., Inc. (PAID BY RECEIPT #5-1-001342). (sm, ) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A..( Roberts, Ralph) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sharp Electronics Corp..( Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hilton Hospitality LLC, Hampton Inns LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Doubletree Hotels LLC.( Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Sheeks Wyde on behalf of Hilton Hospitality LLC, Hampton Inns LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Doubletree Hotels LLC (Wyde, Joshua) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Jason Fischman on behalf of Hilton Hospitality LLC, Hampton Inns LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Doubletree Hotels LLC (Fischman, Gary) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Expedia, Inc..( Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hotels.com.( Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hotels.com GP, LLC.( Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hotels.com, LP.( Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Tripadvisor LLC.( Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Travelnow.com, Inc..( Tyler, Marvin) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William C Rooklidge on behalf of Hilton Hospitality LLC, Hampton Inns LLC, Hilton Hotels Corporation, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Doubletree Hotels LLC (Rooklidge, William) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Wachovia Corporation served on 4/28/2008, answer due 5/19/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Visa U.S.A., Inc. served on 4/22/2008, answer due 5/12/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Sharp Electronics Corp. served on 4/22/2008, answer due 5/12/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc. served on 4/24/2008, answer due 5/14/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Hampton Inns, Inc. served on 4/24/2008, answer due 5/14/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Hilton Hotels Corporation served on 4/24/2008, answer due 5/14/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Travelnow.com, Inc. served on 4/24/2008, answer due 5/14/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Bank of America, N.A. served on 4/22/2008, answer due 5/12/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Conrad Hospitality LLC served on 4/24/2008, answer due 5/14/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC served on 4/24/2008, answer due 5/14/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Bank of America Corporation served on 4/22/2008, answer due 5/12/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Hotels.com served on 4/24/2008, answer due 5/14/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Hilton Hospitality, Inc. served on 4/25/2008, answer due 5/15/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc. served on 4/28/2008, answer due 5/19/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Visa, Inc. served on 4/28/2008, answer due 5/19/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Doubletree Hotels, Corp served on 4/25/2008, answer due 5/15/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Delta Air Lines, Inc. served on 4/25/2008, answer due 5/15/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Expedia, Inc. served on 4/30/2008, answer due 5/20/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Hotels.com GP, LLC served on 4/30/2008, answer due 5/20/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Hotels.com served on 4/30/2008, answer due 5/20/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Red Hat Middleware LLC served on 4/28/2008, answer due 5/19/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Tripadvisor LLC served on 4/25/2008, answer due 5/15/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datatern, Inc.. Red Hat, Inc. served on 4/28/2008, answer due 5/19/2008. (sm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re QVC, Inc..( Jackson, John) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Jackson on behalf of QVC, Inc. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Parke Latham on behalf of QVC, Inc. (Latham, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Doubletree Hotels LLC. (sm, ) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Doubletree LLC. (amd cmp filed) (sm, ) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Hotels.com GP, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, Hilton Hospitality, Inc., Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hampton Inns, Inc., Doubletree Hotels, Corp, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc., QVC, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Red Hat Middleware LLC, Sharp Electronics Corp., Visa, Inc., Visa U.S.A., Inc., Wachovia Corporation, Hotels.com, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Delta Air Lines, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com, LP. (sm, ) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by plaintiff). (sm, ) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PATENT INFRINGEMENT COMPLAINT against Hotels.com, Hotels.com GP, LLC, Travelnow.com, Inc., Tripadvisor LLC, Hilton Hospitality, Inc., Hilton Hotels Corporation, Hampton Inns, Inc., Doubletree Hotels, Corp, Conrad Hotels Usa, Inc., Conrad Hospitality LLC, Conrad Hotels Worldwide, LLC, Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc., QVC, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Red Hat Middleware LLC, Sharp Electronics Corp., Visa, Inc., Visa U.S.A., Inc., Wachovia Corporation, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Delta Air Lines, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Hotels.com, LP (Filing fee $ 350. paid in Marshall, Receipt #2-1-003718), filed by Datatern, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sm, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2008 (sm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?