Saxon Innovations, LLC v. Palm, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:09-cv-00272

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 2:17 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Saxon Innovations, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by One Financial Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Timothy Renaud +1 617 348 1870 +1 617 542 2241 mtrenaud@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 607 204 5150 belangew@pepperlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
Palm Inc. Palm Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Palmsource, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Fountain +1 512 457 7190 +1 512 721 2390 aaron.fountain@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Fountain +1 512 457 7190 +1 512 721 2390 aaron.fountain@dlapiper.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM GOLDMAN +1 650 833 2000 bill.goldman@dlapiper.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM GOLDMAN +1 650 833 2000 bill.goldman@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent S Lam +1 650 833 2000 vincent.lam@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent S Lam +1 650 833 2000 vincent.lam@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Elizabeth Day +1 650 618 4363 +1 650 618 4368 eday@feinday.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Elizabeth Day +1 650 618 4363 +1 650 618 4368 eday@feinday.com
No Logo Research In Motion Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter John Chassman +1 713 469 3885 +1 713 469 3899 PChassman@ReedSmith.com
Research In Motion Ltd. Research In Motion Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter John Chassman +1 713 469 3885 +1 713 469 3899 PChassman@ReedSmith.com
v.
Palm Inc. Palm Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Palmsource, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Fountain +1 512 457 7190 +1 512 721 2390 aaron.fountain@dlapiper.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM GOLDMAN +1 650 833 2000 bill.goldman@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent S Lam +1 650 833 2000 vincent.lam@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Elizabeth Day +1 650 618 4363 +1 650 618 4368 eday@feinday.com
No Logo Research In Motion Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP - East Palo Alto

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Y Piatnicia +1 650 798 3540 +1 650 798 3600 piatniciaa@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter John Chassman +1 713 469 3885 +1 713 469 3899 PChassman@ReedSmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dustin J Edwards +1 713 651 2627 +1 713 651 2700 dedwards@winston.com
Space Tyler T. VanHoutan +1 713 651 2600 +1 713 651 2700 tvanhoutan@winston.com
Research In Motion Ltd. Research In Motion Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP - East Palo Alto

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Y Piatnicia +1 650 798 3540 +1 650 798 3600 piatniciaa@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter John Chassman +1 713 469 3885 +1 713 469 3899 PChassman@ReedSmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dustin J Edwards +1 713 651 2627 +1 713 651 2700 dedwards@winston.com
Space Tyler T. VanHoutan +1 713 651 2600 +1 713 651 2700 tvanhoutan@winston.com
No Logo Saxon Innovations, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by One Financial Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Timothy Renaud +1 617 348 1870 +1 617 542 2241 mtrenaud@mintz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Timothy Renaud +1 617 348 1870 +1 617 542 2241 mtrenaud@mintz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Timothy Renaud +1 617 348 1870 +1 617 542 2241 mtrenaud@mintz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Timothy Renaud +1 617 348 1870 +1 617 542 2241 mtrenaud@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 607 204 5150 belangew@pepperlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in the instant suit be DISMISSED in their entirety. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/1/10. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 62 Motion to Dismiss. Saxon's claims for relief against Palm Inc are dismissed with prejudice and Palm's counterclaims for relief against Saxon are dismissed without prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/10. cc:attys 2-01-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal of Claims With Prejudice and Counterclaims Without Prejudice)(Belanger, William) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 58 Motion for Leave to File Answer to Palm Inc's Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/21/10. cc:attys 1-21-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra C Fennell on behalf of Saxon Innovations, LLC (Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
            ANSWER to 56 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Palm, Inc. by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Palm, Inc.s Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaims by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                NOTICE by Palm, Inc. of Compliance with October 19, 2009 Docket Control Order (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                  ANSWER to 53 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Palm, Inc..(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Palm, Inc. of Compliance with October 19, 2009 Discovery Order (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by Saxon Innovations, LLC Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosures and Discovery Order Disclosures Pursuant to Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 (Renaud, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Palm, Inc., filed by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Renaud, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER denying 4 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/04/09. cc:attys 11-04-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/20/09. cc:attys 10-21-09(mll, ) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/20/09. cc:attys 10-21-09(mll, ) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 44 Motion to Dismiss. Saxon's claims for relief against Research in Motion Limited and Research in Motion Corporation and defts' counterclaims for relief against Saxon are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/09. cc:attys 10-20-09(mll, ) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                  ***CORRECTED ENTRY. REPLACES 46 .*** Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Renaud, Michael) Modified on 10/20/2009 (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                    ***CORRECTED ENTRY. REPLACES 45 .*** Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Renaud, Michael) Modified on 10/20/2009 (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED ENTRY 48 .*** Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Quish, Courtney) Modified on 10/20/2009 (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                        ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED ENTRY 47 .*** Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Quish, Courtney) Modified on 10/20/2009 (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss Research in Motion Limited and Research in Motion Corporation by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Renaud, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Saxon Innovations, LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/12/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER that the Court dates listed on this Order be incorporated into the proposed Docket Control Order which is due on 10-19-09. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/09/09. cc:attys 10-09-09(mll, ) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time for Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/09/09. cc:attys 10-09-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Extend Certain Patent Rule Deadlines by Saxon Innovations, LLC, Palm, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Minute Entry -- 10.05.09 Status Conference for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 10/5/2009. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, ) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/06/09. cc:attys 10-06-09(mll, ) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 35 Motion to Stay between Saxon and RIM. All deadlines in this case with respect to Research In Motion are stayed, pending a motion to dismiss. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/09. cc:attys 9-30-09(mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Gabriel Fountain on behalf of Palm, Inc. (Fountain, Aaron) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Saxon Innovations, LLC, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                              ANSWER to 17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Research In Motion Corporation by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                ANSWER to 16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Research In Motion Limited by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  ANSWER to 23 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Palm, Inc. by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 34 FOR CORRECT PLEADING ANSWER to 17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Research In Motion Corporation by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) Modified on 9/23/2009 (mll, ). (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 33 FOR CORRECT PLEADING ANSWER to 16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Research In Motion Limited by Saxon Innovations, LLC.(Ward, Thomas) Modified on 9/23/2009 (mll, ). (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William D Belanger for Saxon Innovations, LLC. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael T Renaud for Saxon Innovations, LLC. Receipt #6-1-19365 (gsg) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Gillam, Harry) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 10/5/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/09. cc:attys 9-10-09(mll, ) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE by Saxon Innovations, LLC re 3 Order of Request for Scheduling Conference (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Palm, Inc. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    Answer and Counterclaims of Defendant/Counterclaimant Palm, Inc. to Plaintiff Saxon Innovations, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Palm, Inc..(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Y Piatnicia on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Piatnicia, Andrew) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dustin James Edwards on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Edwards, Dustin) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler T. VanHoutan on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (VanHoutan, Tyler) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Research In Motion Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Research in Motion Ltd. for Research In Motion Corporation. (Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Research in Motion Ltd. (Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Research In Motion Corporation.(Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Innovations, LLC by Research in Motion Ltd..(Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter John Chassman on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Chassman, Peter) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Saxon Innovations, LLC. Palm, Inc. waiver sent on 7/6/2009, answer due 9/4/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Saxon Innovations, LLC. Research In Motion Corporation waiver sent on 7/1/2009, answer due 8/31/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Saxon Innovations, LLC. Research in Motion Ltd. waiver sent on 7/1/2009, answer due 8/31/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION to Stay Palm, Inc.'s Motion To Stay This Action filed by Palm, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Vincent S Lam for Palm, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William G Goldman for Palm, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney M Elizabeth Day for Palm, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 4 MOTION to Stay Palm, Inc.'s Motion To Stay This Action filed by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 - part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 - part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 - part 4, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3 - part 1, # 7 Exhibit 3 - part 2, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 5 Motion to Seal Document. Pltf may file its opposition and related confidential exhibits under seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/03/09. cc:attys 8-03-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Saxon Innovations, LLC's Memorandum in Opposition to Palm, Inc.'s Motion to Stay This Action by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay Palm, Inc.'s Motion To Stay This Action by Palm, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order, dated February 10, 2009, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Order, dated April 8, 2009, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Order No. 28, dated April 23, 2009, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER that pltf file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all defts have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/29/09. cc:pltf 6-29-09(mll, ) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Palm, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002042069.), filed by Saxon Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?