Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC v. Autozone, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00031
District Judge T. John Ward, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Autozone, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/16/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason Woodard Cook +1 214 922 3407 +1 214 922 3837 jason.cook@alston.com
TERMINATED: 12/16/2010 Holly S Hawkins +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 holly.hawkins@alston.com
TERMINATED: 12/16/2010 Robert Luckett Lee +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 bob.lee@alston.com
TERMINATED: 12/16/2010 Derek Scott Neilson +1 214 922 3409 +1 214 922 3839 derek.neilson@alston.com
No Logo Michaels Stores, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/27/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason Woodard Cook +1 214 922 3407 +1 214 922 3837 jason.cook@alston.com
TERMINATED: 09/27/2010 Holly S Hawkins +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 holly.hawkins@alston.com
TERMINATED: 09/27/2010 Robert Luckett Lee +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 bob.lee@alston.com
TERMINATED: 09/27/2010 Derek Scott Neilson +1 214 922 3409 +1 214 922 3839 derek.neilson@alston.com
No Logo O'reilly Automotive, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/27/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason Woodard Cook +1 214 922 3407 +1 214 922 3837 jason.cook@alston.com
TERMINATED: 09/27/2010 Holly S Hawkins +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 holly.hawkins@alston.com
TERMINATED: 09/27/2010 Robert Luckett Lee +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 bob.lee@alston.com
TERMINATED: 09/27/2010 Derek Scott Neilson +1 214 922 3409 +1 214 922 3839 derek.neilson@alston.com
No Logo The Kroger Co, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/01/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Jason Woodard Cook +1 214 922 3407 +1 214 922 3837 jason.cook@alston.com
TERMINATED: 11/01/2010 Holly S Hawkins +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 holly.hawkins@alston.com
TERMINATED: 11/01/2010 Robert Luckett Lee +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 bob.lee@alston.com
TERMINATED: 11/01/2010 Derek Scott Neilson +1 214 922 3409 +1 214 922 3839 derek.neilson@alston.com
No Logo Autozone, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Classmates Media Corp, Defendant
No Logo Classmates Media Corp., Defendant
No Logo Imeem, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lowe's Companies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/15/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Theodore George Baroody +1 214 651 5108 +1 214 200 0831 baroodyt@haynesboone.com
Lowes Lowes, Defendant
Officially listed as "Lowes Home Centers Inc"

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/28/2010 Theodore George Baroody +1 214 651 5108 +1 214 200 0831 baroodyt@haynesboone.com
No Logo Michaels Stores, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mylife.com, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Clyde Moody Siebman +1 903 870 0070 +1 903 870 0066 siebman@siebman.com
No Logo O'reilly Automotive, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Container Store, Inc., Defendant
The Home Depot, Inc. The Home Depot, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/18/2010 Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ccapshaw@capshawlaw.com
TERMINATED: 05/18/2010 Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com
No Logo The Kroger Co.,, Defendant
No Logo Theladders.com, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 79 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between theGildersleeve Holdings AG LLC and AutoZone Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/16/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant AutoZone, Inc. With Prejudice by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 77 Motion to Dismiss The Kroger Co. All claims dismissed without prejudice, all attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/1/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION to Dismiss The Kroger Co. Without Prejudice by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders due on October 27, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on October 14, 2010. (jml) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Orders by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 72 Motion to Dismiss. All claims are asserted by plaintiff and dft O'Reilly Automotive Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/27/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 71 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between plaintiff and dft Michaels Stores Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/27/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION to Dismiss Defendant O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. With Prejudice by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc. With Prejudice by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 69 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for the parties to submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the Court is extended by thirty (30) days, up to and including October 13, 2010, and the deadlines in the Local Patent Rules are stayed pending the parties submission of their proposed docket control and discovery orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/14/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Orders and Comply with Local Patent Rules by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derek Scott Neilson on behalf of AutoZone Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Inc, The Kroger Co (Neilson, Derek) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER - This case is set for a status conference in Marshall, Texas, on August 30, 2010, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable T. John Ward and the Honorable Chad Everingham. The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim construction hearing date and a trial setting. The parties shall be prepared to inform the Court whether they will consent to trial before the Magistrate Judge. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on September 13, 2010. If the parties are unable to resolve their disagreements concerning these orders, the parties shall submit to the court their competing proposals along with a summary of their disagreements. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the court deems September 29, 2010 to be the date of the initial case management conference. As a result, the Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on September 17, 2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/21/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly S Hawkins on behalf of AutoZone Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Inc, The Kroger Co (Hawkins, Holly) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to deft MyLife.com Inc. All claims dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs and all rights of appeal are waived. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/17/140. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal by MyLife.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 58 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Lowe's Home Centers Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Ordered that all attorney fees, expenses and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/28/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE to 52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE to 52 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc. by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSE to 50 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant The Kroger Co. by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE to 46 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant AutoZone, Inc. by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, Inc. with Prejudice by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. Lowes Companies Inc served on 3/19/2010 by serving Registered Agent, Corporation Service Co, answer due 4/9/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER - granting 55 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Dft The Home Depot Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party bearing their own cost and attorney fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/18/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft The Home Depot Inc deadline is extended to 6/21/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/6/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Michaels Stores Inc (Cook, Jason) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                          ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC by Michaels Stores Inc.(Cook, Jason) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Kroger Co (Cook, Jason) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                              ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC by The Kroger Co.(Cook, Jason) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by O'Reilly Automotive Inc (Cook, Jason) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC by O'Reilly Automotive Inc.(Cook, Jason) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AutoZone Inc (Cook, Jason) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC by AutoZone Inc.(Cook, Jason) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 14 Amended Complaint, by The Home Depot Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MyLife.com Inc.( Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 14 Amended Complaint, by The Home Depot Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/5/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lowe's Home Centers Inc.(Baroody, Theodore) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L Lee on behalf of AutoZone Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Inc, The Kroger Co (Lee, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss Lowe's Companies Inc and Substitute Lowe's Home Centers Inc. Lowe's Companies Inc are dismissed without prejudice and the style of the action shall be modified accordingly. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/15/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    Joint MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT LOWES COMPANIES, INC. AND SUBSTITUTE LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, INC. AS DEFENDANT by Lowes Companies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baroody, Theodore) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lowes Home Centers, Inc.(Baroody, Theodore) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***STIPULATION and Proposed Order Substituting Lowe's Home Centers, Inc. by Lowes Companies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Baroody, Theodore) Modified on 4/14/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MyLife.com Inc.( Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. O'Reilly Automotive Inc served on 2/15/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. AutoZone Inc served on 2/17/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. TheLadders.com Inc served on 2/16/2010, answer due 3/9/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. The Home Depot Inc served on 2/12/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. Lowes Companies Inc served on 2/16/2010, answer due 3/9/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Summons Returned Unexecuted by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC as to MyLife.com Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. Classmates Media Corp served on 2/11/2010, answer due 3/4/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. The Container Store Inc served on 2/3/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. Michaels Stores Inc served on 2/3/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Home Depot, Inc deadline is extended to 5/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/5/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 14 Amended Complaint, by The Home Depot Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to MyLife.com Inc. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss. Dft TheLadders.com Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitiled "NON-EXCLUSIVE LICENSE AGREEMENT" dated 3/12/2010. All attorney fees and cost are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/23/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re O'Reilly Automotive Inc.( Cook, Jason) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Kroger Co.( Cook, Jason) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AutoZone Inc.( Cook, Jason) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Michaels Stores Inc.( Cook, Jason) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Woodard Cook on behalf of AutoZone Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Inc, The Kroger Co (Cook, Jason) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss TheLadders.com, Inc. with Prejudice by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between Plaintiff and Dft are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/8/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss The Container Store, Inc. With Prejudice by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Amended Complaint against The Container Store Inc, Lowes Companies Inc, TheLadders.com Inc, AutoZone Inc, The Kroger Co, MyLife.com Inc, The Home Depot Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, filed by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, U.S. Patent No. 7,000,183)(Davis, William) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Michaels Stores Inc.( Latham, Robert) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of The Home Depot Inc (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Home Depot Inc.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of The Home Depot Inc (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Container Store Inc.( Ciccarelli, Massimo) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Imeem is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/8/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Imeem, Inc. without Prejudice by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to The Container Store, Inc., Lowes Companies, Inc.,, TheLadders.com, Inc., Autozone, Inc.,, The Kroger Co.,, Classmates Media Corp., MyLife.com, Inc., Imeem, Inc., The Home Depot, Inc., O'REILLY AUTOMOTIVE, INC., Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Classmates, # 2 Imeem Inc, # 3 Lowe's, # 4 Michaels, # 5 MyLife.com, # 6 O'Reilly, # 7 The Container Store, # 8 The Home Depot, # 9 The Kroger Co, # 10 TheLadders.com)(ehs, ) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC (ch, ) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/27/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC (Davis, William) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002330360.), filed by Gildersleeve Holdings AG LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,000,183, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 267 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?