Fowler Woods LLC v. Internet Radio, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00035
District Judge T. John Ward, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fowler Woods LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler, Andrew Wesley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Y Brandt +1 903 753 9300 +1 903 553 0403 brandt@spanglerlawpc.com
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
v.
No Logo Backflip Studios, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Blastro Inc, Defendant
No Logo Blastro, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fluent Mobile, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BECK REDDEN & SECREST LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Ernest Richardson +1 713 951 6284 +1 713 951 3720 mrichardson@brsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/31/2010, PRO HAC VICE Mark G. Matuschak +1 617 526 6559 +1 617 526 5000 mark.matuschak@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Internet Radio Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Cheng

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Internet Radio Inc +1 214 731 9208 +1 214 731 9600
No Logo Internet Radio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo MySimbook.com LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Ernest Richardson +1 713 951 6284 +1 713 951 3720 mrichardson@brsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MySimbook.com LLC
No Logo MySimbook.com, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Onecast Inc, Defendant
No Logo Onecast, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pandora Media, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Popcap Games, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/15/2010 Brian K Erickson +1 512 457 7059 +1 512 457 7001 brian.erickson@dlapiper.com
TERMINATED: 03/15/2010 John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com
No Logo Slacker, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY James Patrick Brogan +1 720 566 4190 +1 720 566 4099 jbrogan@cooley.com
TERMINATED: 03/24/2010 Carolyn Valerie Juarez +1 720 566 4000 cjuarez@cooley.com
No Logo Ulocate Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Worcester, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/29/2010, PRO HAC VICE Christopher T McWhinney +1 202 264 2789 +1 202 628 5116 cmcwhinney@sandw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 54 Motion to Dismiss. Dft MySimBook.com, LLC is hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/6/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Fowler Woods LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Y Brandt on behalf of Fowler Woods LLC (Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
        Defendant MySimBook.com, LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Original Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by MySimbook.com LLC.(Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 50 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Fowler Woods against Fluent Mobile, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/31/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
            Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Fluent Mobile, Inc. by Fowler Woods LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 47 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Fowler Woods against uLocate Communications Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/29/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Fluent Mobile Inc deadline is extended to 4/5/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/29/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss uLocate Communications, Inc. by Fowler Woods LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Fowler Woods LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Deficiency (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Fluent Mobile Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                        Dft MySimbook.com LLC ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to 1 Original Complaint for Patent Infringement by MySimbook.com LLC.(ch, ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 42 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Fowler Woods against Slacker, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/24/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                            Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Slacker, Inc. by Fowler Woods LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss as to deft Blastro Inc. All claims are dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/18/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fowler Woods LLC. MySimbook.com LLC personally served on 3/1/2010 by Process Server Andrea Mitchell, answer due 3/22/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                  Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Blastro, Inc. by Fowler Woods LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 35 Motion to Dismiss as to deft Blastro Inc. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/16/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 34 Motion to Dismiss deft Popcap Games Inc with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/12/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 33 Motion to Dismiss deft Internet Radio Inc without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/12/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                          Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Blastro, Inc. by Fowler Woods LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                            Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Popcap Games, Inc. by Fowler Woods LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                              Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Internet Radio, Inc. by Fowler Woods LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Fowler Woods against Backflip Studios, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/8/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fowler Woods LLC. as to deft Pandora Media Inc. served on 2/9/10 by CM RRR on Registered Agent Joy Ignacio-Yip. Deft dismissed on 3/2/10, no answer deadline set. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fowler Woods LLC. as to deft Onecast Inc. deft served on 2/9/10 by CM RRR on DWTR&J Corp.. Deft dismissed from case on 3/2/10. No answer deadline set. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fowler Woods LLC. Blastro Inc served on 2/5/2010 by CM RRR on Fletcher Lee, answer due 2/26/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fowler Woods LLC. Fluent Mobile Inc served on 2/9/2010 by CM RRR on The Corporation Trust Co, answer due 3/25/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fowler Woods LLC. BackFlip Studios Inc served on 2/9/2010 by CM RRR on The Corporation Trust Co, answer due 3/2/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fowler Woods LLC. Internet Radio Inc served on 2/4/2010 by CM RRR on LE Creel, answer due 2/25/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fowler Woods LLC. uLocate Communications Inc served on 2/9/2010 by CM RRR on The Corporation Trust Co, answer due 4/1/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fowler Woods LLC. Popcap Games Inc served on 3/5/2010 by CM RRR on DWTR&J Corp, answer due 3/31/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fowler Woods LLC. Slacker Inc served on 2/8/2010 by CM RRR on Corporation Service Co, answer due 3/18/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carolyn Valerie Juarez on behalf of Slacker Inc (Juarez, Carolyn) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Slacker Inc.( Brogan, James) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Patrick Brogan on behalf of Slacker Inc (Brogan, James) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Backflip Studios, Inc. by Fowler Woods LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark G Matuschak for Fluent Mobile Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5221 (ch, ) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss all claims asserted by Fowler Woods against Onecast, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/1/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss all claims asserted by Fowler Woods against Pandora are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/1/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Popcap Games Inc.( Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Onecast, Inc. by Fowler Woods LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Pandora Media Inc. by Fowler Woods LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE by Fowler Woods LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Deficiency (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re uLocate Communications Inc.( McWhinney, Christopher) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Guaragna on behalf of Popcap Games Inc (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Erickson on behalf of Popcap Games Inc (Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Paul Cheng d/b/a Internet Radio Inc.(ehs, ) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fluent Mobile Inc.( Richardson, Michael) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher T McWhinney for uLocate Communications Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5213 (ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2010: # 1 Confidential Information) (ch, ). (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Fowler Woods LLC (ch, ) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to BackFlip Studios, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Blastro, Inc., # 2 Fluent Mobile, Inc., # 3 Internet Radio, Inc., # 4 MySimBook.com, LLC., # 5 OneCast, Inc., # 6 Pandora Media, Inc., # 7 PopCap Games, Inc., # 8 Slacker, Inc., # 9 Ulocate Communications, Inc.)(ch, ) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fowler Woods LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against uLocate Communications, Inc., Onecast, Inc., PopCap Games, Inc., MySimbook.com, LLC, Slacker, Inc., Pandora Media, Inc., Internet Radio, Inc., Blastro, Inc., BackFlip Studios, Inc., Fluent Mobile, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002337815.), filed by Fowler Woods LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 231 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?