Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Cyberlink.com Corp et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-00069
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alt-n Technologies, Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda S. Debruin +1 312 862 2378 +1 312 862 2200 ldebruin@kirkland.com
Space Meredith Zinanni +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 meredith.zinanni@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo Brooks Internet Software, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net
No Logo Cyberlink.com Corp, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lei Howard Chen +1 415 882 8200 howard.chen@klgates.com
No Logo Informatics Holdings, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Paraben Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
No Logo Pixologic, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY R. WHITNEY WINSTON +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331
No Logo Teklynx International Company, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Teklynx International Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by zanadaclothing.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Guy N Harrison +1 903 758 7361 +1 903 753 9557 guy@gnhlaw.com
No Logo Absolute Software, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Russ August & Kabat

No Logo Bluebeam Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257
No Logo Diskeeper Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Stuart Cordrey +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 cordreyg@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Martin Gibson +1 310 201 3548 +1 310 203 0567 sgibson@jmbm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua S Hodas +1 310 203 8080 +1 310 203 0567 jsh@jmbm.com

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

No Logo Keil Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin P. Anderson +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7049 kanderson@wileyrein.com
No Logo Marware, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Stevens Love

No Logo Tops Software Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Klemchuk Kubasta LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirby Blair Drake +1 214 367 6000 +1 214 367 6001 kirby.drake@kk-llp.com
No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited"

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Honorable Robert Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (212) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED as moot. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in this case are DISMISSED in their entirety. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/17/10. cc:attys 11-17-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 206 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims by pltfs against deft TOPS Software Corporation and all counterclaims by deft against pltfs are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own atty's fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/15/10. cc:attys 11-16-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 207 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims by pltfs against deft Alt-N Technologies Ltd and all counterclaims asserted by deft against pltf are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own atty's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/15/10. cc:attys 11-16-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
        NOTICE by Marware, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 205 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between pltfs and deft TekLynx International Co are dismissed without prejudice. Parties shall each bear their on attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/01/10. cc:attys 11-02-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Alt-N Technologies, Ltd. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
              STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant TOPS Software Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant TekLynx International Co. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 200 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims by pltfs against deft Keil Software Inc are dismissed with prejudice; all counterclaims by deft against pltfs are dismissed without prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/10. cc:attys 10-26-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 202 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/18/2010. The deadline to comply with P.R. 4-2 is October 29, 2010. (gsg) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                      Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Diskeeper Corporation of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Keil Software, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 196 Motion to Stay. All deadlines are STAYED specific to the claims between pltfs and deft Alt-N for 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/12/10. cc:attys 10-12-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 195 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 165 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, 150 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Alt-N Technologies, Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/12/10. cc;attys 10-12-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/12/10. cc:attys 10-12-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Alt-N Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 165 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, 150 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Alt-N Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER denying as moot 64 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/01/10. cc:attys 10-01-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 191 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Any and all claims by pltfs against deft Diskeeper Corporation are dismissed with prejudice; any and all counterclaims by deft Diskeeper Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/01/10. cc:attys 10-01-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 143 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/30/10. cc:Pattys 10-01-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Diskeeper Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 189 Motion to Extend the Mediation Deadline. The deadline for pltfs and deft TOPS Software Corp to complete the first mediation is extended to 10-13-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/28/10. cc:attys 9-28-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                Agreed MOTION Stipulated Motion to Extend Mediation Deadline by TOPS Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drake, Kirby) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 186 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Frederick Bufe terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/27/10. cc:attys 9-27-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 179 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims between pltfs and deft Cyberlink.com Corp are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/27/10. cc:attys 9-27-10(mll, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney [JOHN F. BUFE'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT PARABEN CORPORATION] by Paraben Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bufe, John) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010 Stipulation
                                                        ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR*** STIPULATION Stipulated Motion to Extend Mediation Deadline by TOPS Software Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drake, Kirby) Modified on 9/27/2010 (kls, ). (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 183 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for complying with Local Patent Rule 4-1 is 9-28-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/20/10. cc:attys 9-20-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Extend Certain Deadlines of P.R. 4-1 to September 28, 2010 by Diskeeper Corporation, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Teklynx International Co. of Defendant Brady Worldwide, Inc. d/b/a TEKLYNX International's Disclosure Pursuant to P.R. 4-1(a) (Snyder, Martha) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by TOPS Software Corporation (Drake, Kirby) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                  NOTICE by Informatics Holdings, Inc. Termination of Electronic Notices (Haynes, Bryan) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Cyberlink.com Corp. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 171 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between pltfs and deft Informatics Holdings Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/14/10. cc:attys 9-15-10(mll, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 174 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for complying with the Local Patent Rule 3-3 and 3-4 is extended to 9-28-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/09/10. cc:attys 9-10-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by TOPS Software Corporation (Drake, Kirby) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Keil Software, Inc Pursuant to PR 3-3 and PR 3-4 (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File 3-3 and 3-4's by Diskeeper Corporation, Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Teklynx International Co. of Defendant Brady Worldwide, Inc. d/b/a TEKLYNX International's Invalidity Contentions and Document Production Pursuant to P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Snyder, Martha) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 170 Motion to Stay. All deadlines are stayed to the claims between pltfs and deft Alt-N for 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/07/10. cc:attys 9-07-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Informatics Holdings, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Motion to Stay
                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Alt-N Technologies, Ltd., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 166 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft Paraben Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/30/10. cc:attys 8-30-10(mll, ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Winston Oliver Huff on behalf of Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Diskeeper Corporation of Additional Disclosures (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Paraben Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: 8/13/2010 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 130 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order)Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order) filed by Alt-N Technologies, Ltd.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirby Blair Drake on behalf of TOPS Software Corporation (Drake, Kirby) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: 8/10/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Paragraph 2(c) (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 130 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order)Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order) filed by Diskeeper Corporation. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 152 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Any and all claims and counterclaims by pltfs and deft Marware Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own atty's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/10. cc:attys 8-06-10(mll, ) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 130 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order)Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order) filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Helen Chae MacLeod for Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 130 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order)Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order) filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James L. Etheridge, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***REPLY to Response to Motion re 130 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order)Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order) filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Maynard, Scott) Modified on 7/30/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Marware, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Lei Howard Chen on behalf of Cyberlink.com Corp (Chen, Lei) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lei Howard Chen on behalf of Cyberlink.com Corp (Chen, Lei) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Marware, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Alt-N Technologies, Ltd. (Additional Disclosures) (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 130 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order)Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order) filed by Alt-N Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Additional Disclosures) (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Diskeeper Corporation Objection to Production of Sales Data in the Absence of a Protective Order (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 141 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims by pltfs and deft Brooks Internet Software Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/21/10. cc:attys 7-22-10(mll, ) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Elizabeth A Nemo for Alt-N Technologies, Ltd. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition to Alt-Ns Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order (Document Number 143) filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James L. Etheridge, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of James L. Etheridge, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 130 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order)Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order) filed by Diskeeper Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stanley Gibson, # 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit B - Redlines of Proposed Protective Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order)Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order) by Alt-N Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Kevin P Anderson on behalf of Keil Software, Inc (Anderson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Brooks Internet Software, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: 7/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Paraben Corporation [DEFENDANT PARABEN CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES] (Bufe, John) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Cyberlink.com Corp of Initial Disclosures (Chen, Lei) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Alt-N Technologies, Ltd. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Diskeeper Corporation Initial Disclosures (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by TOPS Software Corporation (Griffith, Casey) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Keil Software, Inc (Initial Disclosures) (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Teklynx International Co. Initial Disclosures (Snyder, Martha) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 64 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Protective Order (Partially Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order) by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2010: # 2 REVISED PROTECTIVE ORDER) (sm, ). (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 64 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Diskeeper Corporation. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Harold H Davis, Jr for Cyberlink.com Corp (mll, ) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/23/10. cc:attys 6-24-10(mll, ) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/23/10. cc:attys 6-24-10(mll, ) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Order Referring Case to MediatorCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Robert Faulkner added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/23/10. cc:attys 6-24-10(mll, ) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Entry of Discovery and Docket Control Orders by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ORDER. The parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 6/21/2010. Markman Hearing set for 2/3/2011 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Selection set for 11/7/2011 at 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/14/2011 at 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2011 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/17/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 64 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Maynard, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 120 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended by a period of three weeks pending entry of a docket control order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/15/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/10/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that the Court dates listed on this Order be incorporated into the proposed Docket Control Order which is due by 6-21-2010. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 6-21-2010 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus plaintiffs PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 6-14-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/09/10. cc:attys 6-10-10(mll, ) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: 6/10/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martha Jahn Snyder on behalf of Teklynx International Co. (Snyder, Martha) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Status Conference held on 6/7/2010. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, ) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/10. cc:attys 6-08-10(mll, ) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 88 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Cyberlink.com Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 112 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims by pltfs against deft Pixologic Inc and all counterclaims asserted are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attys' fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/04/10. cc:attys 6-04-10(mll, ) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Guy N Harrison on behalf of Teklynx International Co. (Harrison, Guy) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Pixologic, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Paraben Corporation (Bufe, John) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jared L Cherry for Brooks Internet Software, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew D Thayne for Brooks Internet Software, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 70 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of TOPS Software Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 83 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Alt-N Technologies, Ltd. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 77 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Paraben Corporation by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer to Counterclaim 62 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Brooks Internet Software by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 51 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Brady Worldwide, Inc., d/b/a/ TekLynx International Co. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 50 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Informatics Holdings, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Absolute Software, Inc. re Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 6/7/2010 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/19/10. cc:attys 5-20-10(mll, ) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 95 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 64 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim; Responses due by 6/16/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/18/10. cc:attys 5-18-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 94 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Uniloc USA and Uniloc Private Limited have to 6-21-2010 to respond to Pixologic Inc's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/18/10. cc:attys 5-18-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Bluebeam Software, Inc Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Karin Hessler for Keil Software, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin P Anderson for Keil Software, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 64 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 55 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Pixologic, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 90 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc., and dismissing defendant Absolute Software Inc without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/10. cc:attys 5-13-10(mll, ) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frank W Compagni for Paraben Corporation. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. re 57 Order, of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cyberlink.com Corp identifying Corporate Parent Cyberlink Corporation for Cyberlink.com Corp. (Chen, Lei) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CyberLink.com's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, First COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief of Non-Infringement and Patent Invalidity against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Cyberlink.com Corp.(Chen, Lei) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 86 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Bluebeam Software Inc is dismissed with prejudice from this case. Parties shall bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/10/10. cc:attys 5-10-10(mll, ) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Bluebeam Software, Inc; by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Absolute Software, Inc..( Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alt-N Technologies, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Research In Motion Limited for Alt-N Technologies, Ltd.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Alt-N Technologies, Ltd..(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Paraben Corporation (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 69 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Defendant BinaryNow Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Pltfs and deft shall each bear their own atty's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/06/10. cc:attys 5-07-10(mll, ) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Paraben Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for Paraben Corporation. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 68 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Defendant Bynari Inc is dismissed with prejudice from this case. Pltfs and deft shall each bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/06/10. cc:attys 5-07-10(mll, ) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Paraben Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for Paraben Corporation. (Gardner, Allen) Incorrect pdf sealed by Court. Modified on 5/7/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc USA, Inc. by Paraben Corporation.(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darrell Glyn Dotson on behalf of Marware, Inc. (Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Joseph Nelson on behalf of Marware, Inc. (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Marware, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Marware, Inc.. (Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant Marware, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Marware, Inc..(Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott English Stevens on behalf of Marware, Inc. (Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TOPS Software Corporation (Griffith, Casey) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against TOPS Software Corporation by TOPS Software Corporation.(Griffith, Casey) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant BinaryNow, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Bynari Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Bluebeam Software Inc has to 5-10-2010 to answer pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/29/10. cc:attys 4-30-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Alt-N Technologies Ltd has to 5-07-2010 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/29/10. cc:attys 4-30-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: 4/28/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Diskeeper Corporation (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: 4/28/2010, Terminated: 5/18/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Diskeeper Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: 4/28/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Brooks Internet Software, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Brooks Internet Software, Inc.. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: 4/28/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Brooks Internet Software, Inc..(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory S Cordrey for Diskeeper Corporation. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stanley M Gibson for Diskeeper Corporation. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua S Hodas for Diskeeper Corporation. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Informatics Holdings, Inc. (Haynes, Bryan) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/26/10. cc:attys 4-27-10(mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pixologic, Inc. (Caracappa, John) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Pixologic, Inc..(Caracappa, John) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R Whitney Winston on behalf of Pixologic, Inc. (Winston, R) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Caracappa on behalf of Pixologic, Inc. (Caracappa, John) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Teklynx International Co. (Tomaselli, Anthony) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Teklynx International Co..(Tomaselli, Anthony) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Informatics Holdings, Inc..(Haynes, Bryan) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Absolute Software, Inc..( Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Bluebeam Software, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Keil Software, Inc identifying Corporate Parent ARM Holdings plc for Keil Software, Inc. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Keil Software, Inc.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Alt-N Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Meredith Zinanni for Alt-N Technologies, Ltd.. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Linda S DeBruin for Alt-N Technologies, Ltd.. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bhaveeni D Parmar on behalf of TOPS Software Corporation (Parmar, Bhaveeni) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darin Michael Klemchuk on behalf of TOPS Software Corporation (Klemchuk, Darin) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Casey Lee Griffith on behalf of TOPS Software Corporation (Griffith, Casey) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 3/30/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TOPS Software Corporation.( Griffith, Casey) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to James Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cyberlink.com Corp.( Davis, Harold) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Brooks Internet Software, Inc.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Diskeeper Corporation.( Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed Amended First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Informatics Holdings, Inc..( Haynes, Bryan) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 34 FOR CORRECT PLEADING*** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Informatics Holdings, Inc..( Haynes, Bryan) Modified on 3/23/2010 (mll, ). (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Keil Software, Inc.( Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Bluebeam Software, Inc (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Teklynx International Co.(Tomaselli, Anthony) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Absolute Software, Inc..( Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alt-N Technologies, Ltd.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Pixologic, Inc..( Winston, R) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bluebeam Software, Inc.( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..( Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to TOPS Software Corporation on 3/12/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 4/2/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/16/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Brooks Internet Software, Inc. on 3/8/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/29/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/16/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott R Maynard for Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, and Uniloc USA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Diskeeper Corporation on 3/8/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/29/2010. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2010: # 1 Track & Confirm) (mll, ). (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Cyberlink.com Corp on 3/4/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/25/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Informatics Holdings, Inc. on 3/4/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/25/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Keil Software, Inc on 3/3/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/24/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Bynari Inc. on 3/3/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/24/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Alt-N Technologies, Ltd. on 3/3/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/24/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Absolute Software, Inc. on 3/5/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/26/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to BinaryNow, Inc. on 3/5/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/26/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Bluebeam Software, Inc on 3/5/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/26/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Paraben Corporation on 3/5/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/26/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Marware, Inc. on 3/5/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/26/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Pixologic, Inc. on 3/5/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/26/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Return of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Teklynx International Co. on 3/5/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 3/26/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to TOPS Software Corporation, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James Etheridge for Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Absolute Software, Inc., TOPS Software Corporation, Diskeeper Corporation, Brooks Internet Software, Inc., BinaryNow, Inc., Bluebeam Software, Inc, Paraben Corporation, Marware, Inc., Pixologic, Inc., Teklynx International Co., Cyberlink.com Corp, Informatics Holdings, Inc., Keil Software, Inc, Bynari Inc., Alt-N Technologies, Ltd., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Absolute Software, Inc., TOPS Software Corporation, Diskeeper Corporation, Brooks Internet Software, Inc., BinaryNow, Inc., Bluebeam Software, Inc, Paraben Corporation, Marware, Inc., Pixologic, Inc., Teklynx International Co., Cyberlink.com Corp, Informatics Holdings, Inc., Keil Software, Inc, Bynari Inc., Alt-N Technologies, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002378256.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 273 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?