Condatis LLC v. Audi of America, Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00184
District Judge T. John Ward, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge T. John Ward
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 1:15 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
Audi of America, Inc. Audi of America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Lennon +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 mlennon@kenyon.com

Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

v.
Audi AG Audi AG, Defendant

Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Lennon +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 mlennon@kenyon.com
No Logo Condatis LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Stevens Love

Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between plaintiff and dft Volkswagen Group of America Inc and Audi AG are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/28/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Audi AG, Audi of America, Inc., Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: to file its Sur-reply to Dft Volksvagen Group of America Incs Reply in Support of its motion to transfer 26 Responses due by 12/13/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/1/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 Reply to Response to Motion, Sur-Reply to Volkwagen of America, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-reply re Deft Volkswagen Group of America Inc Opposed motion to transfer # 19 and Reply in support of its motion to transfer # 26 . Pltf has until 11/29/10 to file a Responsive pleading due by 11/29/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/12/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 Reply to Response to Motion, Sur-Reply to Volkwagen of America, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Mighigan Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Mighigan Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. filed by Audi of America, Inc.. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File reply in support of its motion to transfer venue. Responses due by 11/4/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/13/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 19 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Mighigan Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Mighigan Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Audi of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Mighigan Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Mighigan Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) filed by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Love, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2010: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). (Entered: 10/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiffs unopposed motion requesting a 14-day extension to file its response to Defendant, AUDI OF AMERICA, INC,S Motion to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Michigan Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) shall be and is hereby GRANTED in all respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/21/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 19 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Mighigan Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Mighigan Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Volkswagon Group of America, Inc. by Condatis LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Mighigan Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1404(a) by Audi of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Stephanie Goeller, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Audi of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Audi of America, Inc.. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Condatis LLC by Audi of America, Inc..(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Susan A Smith for Audi AG,Susan A Smith for Audi of America, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-23173. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael J Lennon for Audi AG,Michael J Lennon for Audi of America, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-23150) (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. as to Audi of America Inc served by CM RRR on 6/8/10 through Registered Agent CT Corporation, Callas, Texas (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Audi of America, Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Summons Returned Executed
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Condatis LLC. Audi of America, Inc. served on 6/21/2010 by CM RRR, answer due 7/12/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of Condatis LLC (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Summons Reissued
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Audi of America, Inc.. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: 6/10/2010 Summons Returned Unexecuted
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Condatis LLC as to Audi of America, Inc.. CT Corporation states that Audi of America Inc is not listed in their records or on the records of the State of Texas (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Summons Reissued
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Audi of America, Inc.. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed
Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Condatis LLC (ch, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/2/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Summons Issued
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Audi of America, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Joseph Nelson on behalf of Condatis LLC (Nelson, Kyle) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott English Stevens on behalf of Condatis LLC (Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Complaint
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Audi AG, Audi of America, Inc., filed by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 377 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?