Quark Images LLC v. Adidas AG et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00293
District Judge T. John Ward, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge T. John Ward
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 9:10 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
Adidas America, Inc. Adidas America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey Kirkland Gavin +1 404 815 6046 +1 404 815 6555 ggavin@kilpatrickstockton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bonnie Marie Grant +1 415 576 0200 +1 404 541 3230 bgrant@kilpatricktownsend.com
Adidas International, Inc. Adidas International, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey Kirkland Gavin +1 404 815 6046 +1 404 815 6555 ggavin@kilpatrickstockton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bonnie Marie Grant +1 415 576 0200 +1 404 541 3230 bgrant@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo BMW Bank of North America, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ccapshaw@capshawlaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com
BMW Financial Services NA, LLC BMW Financial Services NA, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ccapshaw@capshawlaw.com
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com
No Logo Discover Financial Services LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 909 934 8450 +1 909 934 9257
No Logo Mars, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Nike, Inc. Nike, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Kent Pratt +1 312 463 5000 +1 312 715 1234 tpratt@bannerwitcoff.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher James Renk +1 312 463 5000 +1 312 715 1000 crenk@bannerwitcoff.com
No Logo Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Polo Ralph Lauren Polo Ralph Lauren, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Ralph Lauren Media, LLC"
No Logo Reebok International, Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey Kirkland Gavin +1 404 815 6046 +1 404 815 6555 ggavin@kilpatrickstockton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bonnie Marie Grant +1 415 576 0200 +1 404 541 3230 bgrant@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo The Topps Company Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanne C. Curtis +1 212 596 9049 +1 212 596 9090 JCurtis@fishneave.com

Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie M Spencer +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 lspencer@willkie.com
v.
No Logo AMERICA FIRST FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, Defendant

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 David M. Stein +1 949 851 0633 dstein@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.a., Defendant

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 David M. Stein +1 949 851 0633 dstein@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, Defendant
No Logo Bbva Compass Bancshares, Inc., Defendant

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 David M. Stein +1 949 851 0633 dstein@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo BBVA USA Bancshares, Inc., Defendant

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 David M. Stein +1 949 851 0633 dstein@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Capital One Financial Corporation Capital One Financial Corporation, Defendant
Officer/Director, JAMES E. DANIEL
Officer/Director, Vapotherm, Inc.
Officer/Director, Agile Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Maxcyte, Inc.

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 James Rodney Gilstrap +1 903 938 8321 +1 903 938 8331 gilstrap1957@yahoo.com

Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010, PRO HAC VICE Daniel G Vivarelli, Jr. +1 202 778 2269 +1 202 778 2201 dvivarelli@hunton.com
Capital One Services, LLC Capital One Services, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 James Rodney Gilstrap +1 903 938 8321 +1 903 938 8331 gilstrap1957@yahoo.com

Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010, PRO HAC VICE Daniel G Vivarelli, Jr. +1 202 778 2269 +1 202 778 2201 dvivarelli@hunton.com
Capital One, NA Capital One, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Capital One, National Association"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 James Rodney Gilstrap +1 903 938 8321 +1 903 938 8331 gilstrap1957@yahoo.com

Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010, PRO HAC VICE Daniel G Vivarelli, Jr. +1 202 778 2269 +1 202 778 2201 dvivarelli@hunton.com
No Logo Cardlab, Inc., Defendant

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 David M. Stein +1 949 851 0633 dstein@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Hallmark Cards, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Crown Media Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, H C Crown Corp
Officer/Director, H.a., Inc.

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Oakley Direct Inc, Defendant

Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

No Logo Oakley Inc., Defendant

Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

No Logo Payjr, Inc., Defendant

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 David M. Stein +1 949 851 0633 dstein@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Serverside Group Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Serverside Group, Limited"

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 David M. Stein +1 949 851 0633 dstein@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Shoreline Busines Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 David M. Stein +1 949 851 0633 dstein@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Sole Technology, Defendant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Wescom Credit Union, Defendant

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010 David M. Stein +1 949 851 0633 dstein@mwe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Zions Bancorporation, Defendant

Represented by Connolly Bove Lodge & Hutz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Anthony H. Son +1 202 331 7111 ason@cblh.com
No Logo Zions First National Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Zions First National Bank"

Represented by Connolly Bove Lodge & Hutz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/19/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Anthony H. Son +1 202 331 7111 ason@cblh.com
No Logo Quark Images LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Spangler, Andrew Wesley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Y Brandt +1 903 753 9300 +1 903 553 0403 brandt@spanglerlawpc.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (181) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 181 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this action between Plaintiff Quark Images and Defendant Polo are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs in this action are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/11/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Stipulated) by Quark Images LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 179 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, Quark Images LLC, and defendant, Nike, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/2/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice as to Nike, Inc. by Quark Images LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 177 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit by plaintiff, Quark Images LLC against defendant, Sole Technology, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, If is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/1/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Sole Technology by Quark Images LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE by Discover Financial Services, L.L.C. - Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 169 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit by plaintiff, Quark Images LLC against defendant, Hallmark Cards, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice, If is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/20/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 170 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff, Quark Images LLC, and Defendant Discover Financial Services,L.L.C. are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled PATENTS IN SUIT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and dated December 30,2010. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/20/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 168 Motion to Dismiss defendant Mars, Inc. All claims and counterclaims dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and cousts are to be borne by the party that incurred the same. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/20/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 171 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Sole Technology, Inc.s deadline is extended to 1/24/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/19/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond, by Sole Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Discover Financial Services, L.L.C., Quark Images LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Hallmark Cards, Inc. by Quark Images LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Quark Images LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 165 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, Quark Images, LLC, and defendant, The Topps Company, are dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled LICENSE AND SETTLEMENTAGREEMENT and dated December 20, 2010. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/3/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 164 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, Quark Images, LLC, and defendants, Adidas Ag, Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International, Inc., and Reebok International, are dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/3/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice as to The Topps Company by Quark Images LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice as to Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International, Inc., and Reebok International by Quark Images LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 162 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Hallmark Cards, Inc.s time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to January 17, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/14/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond, by Sole Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond, by Hallmark Cards, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 153 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, Quark Images LLC, and defendant, Oakley Direct, Inc., are dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled PATENTS IN SUIT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and dated November 9, 2010 It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/10/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 150 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of The Topps Company, Inc. by Quark Images LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 156 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Sole Technology, Inc.s time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to December 15, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/8/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 155 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Hallmark Cards, Inc.s time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to December 15, 2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/8/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond, by Sole Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond, by Hallmark Cards, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 139 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation and Ralph Lauren Media, LLC by Quark Images LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Quark Images LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 126 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Mars, Inc. by Quark Images LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Topps Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for The Topps Company, Inc.. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Quark Images LLC by The Topps Company, Inc..(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 144 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, Quark Images LLC, on the one hand, and defendants Serverside Group Ltd., America First Federal Credit Union, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria SA, BBVA USA Bancshares, Inc., Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, BMW Bank Of North America, BMW Financial Services NA, L.L.C., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, National Association, Capital One Services, L.L.C., Cardlab, Inc., PayJr, Inc., Shoreline Business Solutions, Inc., Wescom Credit Union, Zions Bancorporation, and Zions First National Bank, on the other, are dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/19/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Vincent, Bobby) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ralph Lauren Media, L.L.C. (Vincent, Bobby) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 119 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Nike, Inc. by Quark Images LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 121 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Discover Financial Service, L.L.C. by Quark Images LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Quark Images LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 138 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants, Zions Bancorporation and Zions First National Bank, time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to December 8, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/9/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 137 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Hallmark Cards, Inc.s time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to December 8, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/9/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Sole Technology, Inc.s time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to December 8, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/9/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 135 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants, Serverside Group, Ltd., America First Federal Credit Union, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria S.A., BBVA USA Bancshares, Inc., CardLab, Inc., PayJr, Inc., Shoreline Business Solutions, Inc. and Wescom Credit Union time to answer is extended to December 8, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/9/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Quark Images LLC by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Ralph Lauren Media, L.L.C..(Vincent, Bobby) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond by Zions Bancorporation, Zions First National Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Son, Anthony) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond, by Hallmark Cards, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond, by Sole Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond, by America First Federal Credit Union, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA USA Bancshares, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., CardLab, Inc., PAYjr, Inc., Serverside Group, Limited, Shoreline Busines Solutions, Inc., Wescom Credit Union. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 133 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Topps has until November 22, 2010 to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/5/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, (Second) by The Topps Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Oakley Direct, Inc. deadline is extended to 12/9/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/4/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Oakley Direct Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John G Bisbikis on behalf of Mars, Inc. (Bisbikis, John) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth J Jurek on behalf of Mars, Inc. (Jurek, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 93 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of adidas America, Inc. and Reebok International Ltd. by Quark Images LLC. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mars, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Mars, Inc.. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Quark Images LLC by Mars, Inc..(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nike, Inc. (Pratt, Thomas) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 123 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Polo Ralph Lauren Corp. and R.L. Media LLC deadline is extended to 11/9/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/26/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (14 day extension) by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Ralph Lauren Media, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vincent, Bobby) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Discover Financial Services, L.L.C. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
Discover Financial Services, L.L.C.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Quark Images LLC by Discover Financial Services, L.L.C..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
****FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Disclosure by Nike, Inc. (Pratt, Thomas) Modified on 10/26/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 10/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Quark Images LLC by Nike, Inc..(Pratt, Thomas) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that Topps has until and through November 8, 2010 to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/25/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Capital One, National Association identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One, National Association. (Gilstrap, James) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Capital One, National Association.(Gilstrap, James) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Capital One Services, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One, National Association for Capital One Services, L.L.C.. (Gilstrap, James) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Capital One Services, L.L.C..(Gilstrap, James) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Capital One Financial Corporation (Gilstrap, James) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Capital One Financial Corporation.(Gilstrap, James) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BMW Bank of North America, BMW Financial Services NA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent BMW A.G. for BMW Bank of North America, BMW Bank of North America, BMW Financial Services NA, LLC, BMW Financial Services NA, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Quark Images LLC by BMW Financial Services NA, LLC.(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Quark Images LLC by BMW Bank of North America.(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by The Topps Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel G Vivarelli, Jr for Capital One Financial Corporation,Daniel G Vivarelli, Jr for Capital One Services, L.L.C.,Daniel G Vivarelli, Jr for Capital One, National Association. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-40)(ehs, ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Justin T Arbes for Capital One Financial Corporation,Justin T Arbes for Capital One Services, L.L.C.,Justin T Arbes for Capital One, National Association. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-40) (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 105 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 102 Unopposed Motion to Change Name of Defendant. ORDERED, That Oakley Direct, Inc. is hereby substituted in the above entitled action as the real party in interest in place of Defendant Oakley, Inc and shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Original Complaint on or before 11/9/2010 The caption in this action is reformed to match the caption on this order. It is further Ordered that All claims against Oakley, Inc. are dismissed withoutprejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/15/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 101 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dftg BMW Bank of North America and BMW Financial Services NA LLC deadline is extended to 10/21/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/15/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian M Buroker on behalf of Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Services, L.L.C., Capital One, National Association (Buroker, Brian) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION to Change the Name of Defendant Oakley, Inc. by Quark Images LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by BMW Bank of North America, BMW Financial Services NA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Services, L.L.C., Capital One, National Association.( Gilstrap, James) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 92 Zions Bancorporation and Zions First National Bank's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on October 8, 2010.(jml) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 91 Defendants', Serverside Group, Ltd., America First Federal Credit Union, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria S.A., BBVA USA Bancshares, Inc., CardLab, Inc., PayJr, Inc., Shoreline Business Solutions, Inc. and Wescom Credit Union, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on October 8, 2010. (jml) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 90 Sole Technology, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on October 8, 2010. (jml) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 89 Hallmark Cards, Inc.'s Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on October 8, 2010. (jml) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 84 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. BMW Bank of North America and BMW Financial Services NA, LLC. Answers due October 14, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on October 8, 2010. (jml) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International, Inc., Reebok International Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Adidas North America Inc, Corporate Parent Adidas AG, Corporate Parent adidas International BV for Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International, Inc., Reebok International Ltd.. (Grant, Bonnie) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
adidas America, Inc., adidas International, Inc. and Reebok International Ltd's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Quark Images LLC by Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International, Inc., Reebok International Ltd..(Grant, Bonnie) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by Zions Bancorporation, Zions First National Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Son, Anthony) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by Serverside Group, Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by Sole Technology. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by Hallmark Cards, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Shoreline Busines Solutions, Inc. served on 8/23/2010 by CM RRR, answer due 10/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed 2nd Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Ralph Lauren Media, L.L.C..( Vincent, Bobby) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeanne C Curtis for The Topps Company, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Leslie M Spencer for The Topps Company, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by BMW Bank of North America, BMW Financial Services NA, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Services, L.L.C., Capital One, National Association.( Gilstrap, James) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Topps Company, Inc. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nike, Inc..( Pratt, Thomas) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bonnie M Grant on behalf of Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International, Inc., Reebok International Ltd. (Grant, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Discover Financial Services, L.L.C.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Wescom Credit Union served on 9/15/2010 by CMRRR through Registered Agent, answer due 10/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to CardLab, Inc., PAYjr, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 PAYjr)(ehs, ) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher J Renk for Nike, Inc..(APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-5640) (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Y Brandt on behalf of Quark Images LLC (Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darrell Glyn Dotson on behalf of Quark Images LLC (Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer L Dzwonczyk for BMW Bank of North America,Jennifer L Dzwonczyk for BMW Financial Services NA, LLC,Jennifer L Dzwonczyk for Bayerische Motoren Werke AG.(APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-5627) (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Wescom Credit Union. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter C McCabe, III for Discover Financial Services, L.L.C. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5621. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David S Bloch for Discover Financial Services, L.L.C. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5621. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nicole M Norris for Discover Financial Services, L.L.C. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5621. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sole Technology.( Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hallmark Cards, Inc..( Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nike, Inc..( Pratt, Thomas) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
Defendants' First Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Services, L.L.C., Capital One, National Association.( Gilstrap, James) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Rodney Gilstrap on behalf of Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Services, L.L.C., Capital One, National Association (Gilstrap, James) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of BMW Bank of North America, BMW Financial Services NA, LLC (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BMW Financial Services NA, LLC.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BMW Bank of North America.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of BMW Bank of North America, BMW Financial Services NA, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed 1st Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Oakley, Inc..( Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wescom Credit Union.( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Shoreline Busines Solutions, Inc..( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PAYjr, Inc..( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CardLab, Inc..( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Topps Company, Inc. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Discover Financial Services, L.L.C. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Zions First National Bank.( Son, Anthony) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Zions Bancorporation.( Son, Anthony) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Hyeok Son on behalf of Zions Bancorporation, Zions First National Bank (Son, Anthony) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Discover Financial Services, L.L.C..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Stein on behalf of America First Federal Credit Union, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA USA Bancshares, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., CardLab, Inc., PAYjr, Inc., Serverside Group, Limited, Shoreline Busines Solutions, Inc., Wescom Credit Union (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of America First Federal Credit Union, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA USA Bancshares, Inc., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., CardLab, Inc., Mars, Inc., PAYjr, Inc., Serverside Group, Limited, Shoreline Busines Solutions, Inc., Wescom Credit Union (Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., CardLab, Inc., PAYjr, Inc., Shoreline Busines Solutions, Inc., Wescom Credit Union (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BBVA USA Bancshares, Inc..( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc..( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re America First Federal Credit Union.( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Serverside Group, Limited.( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Adidas International, Inc..( Gavin, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey K Gavin on behalf of Adidas International, Inc. (Gavin, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Ralph Lauren Media, L.L.C..( Vincent, Bobby) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Zions First National Bank served on 8/18/2010 by CM RRR through its Officer or Manager, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Zions Bancorporation served on 8/18/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. The Topps Company, Inc. served on 8/18/2010 by CM RRR through its Officer/Manager, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Sole Technology served on 8/18/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Pierre Andre Senizergues, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Serverside Group, Limited served on 8/19/2010 by CM RRR through its Officer/Manager, answer due 9/9/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Reebok International Ltd. served on 8/18/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 10/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Ralph Lauren Media, L.L.C. served on 8/19/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 9/9/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation served on 8/18/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Oakley, Inc. served on 8/18/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent National Registered Agents Inc, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Nike, Inc. served on 8/18/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent National Registered Agents Inc, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Mars, Inc. served on 8/17/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation System, answer due 11/1/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Hallmark Cards, Inc. served on 8/18/2010 by CMRRR through Registered Agent Vickie Young, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Discover Financial Services, L.L.C. served on 8/17/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation System, answer due 9/7/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Capital One, National Association served on 8/18/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Capital One Services, L.L.C. served on 8/18/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Capital One Financial Corporation served on 8/20/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 9/10/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. BMW Financial Services NA, LLC served on 8/17/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation, answer due 9/7/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. BMW Bank of North America served on 8/18/2010 by CM RRR through its Officer/Manager, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. BBVA USA Bancshares, Inc. served on 8/17/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation System, answer due 9/7/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc. served on 8/19/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Jerry W Powell, answer due 9/9/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. America First Federal Credit Union served on 8/18/2010 by CM RRR through its Officer/Manager, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Adidas International, Inc. served on 8/18/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent DWT Oregon Corp, answer due 9/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quark Images LLC. Adidas America, Inc. served on 8/17/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation, answer due 10/8/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mars, Inc.s time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to November 1, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/31/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond, by Mars, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Reebok International Ltd..( Gavin, Geoffrey) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Adidas America, Inc..( Gavin, Geoffrey) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey K Gavin on behalf of Adidas America, Inc., Reebok International Ltd. (Gavin, Geoffrey) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Serverside Group, Limited (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Shoreline Busines Solutions, Inc.. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/13/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Mars, Inc., Nike, Inc., Oakley, Inc., PAYjr, Inc., Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Ralph Lauren Media, L.L.C., Reebok International Ltd., Serverside Group, Limited, Sole Technology, The Topps Company, Inc., Wescom Credit Union, Zions Bancorporation, Zions First National Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Nike, # 2 Oakley, # 3 RAYjr, # 4 Polo Ralph Lauren Corp, # 5 Ralph Lauren Media, # 6 Reebok International, # 7 Severside Group, # 8 Sole Technology, # 9 The Topps Co, # 10 Wescom Cr Un, # 11 Zions First National Bk, # 12 Zion Bancorporation)(ehs, ) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None
E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International, Inc., America First Federal Credit Union, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA USA Bancshares, Inc., BMW Bank of North America, BMW Financial Services NA, LLC, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Services, L.L.C., Capital One, National Association, CardLab, Inc., Discover Financial Services, L.L.C., Hallmark Cards, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Adidas International, # 2 America First Fed Cr Un, # 3 BBVA Compass Bancshres, # 4 BBVA USA Bancshares, # 5 BMW Bk of N Am, # 6 BMW Financial Svc NA, # 7 Capital One Financial Corp, # 8 Capital One Svc, # 9 Capital One National Assoc, # 10 CardLab, # 11 Discover Financial Svc, # 12 Hallmark Cards)(ehs, ) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott English Stevens on behalf of Quark Images LLC (Stevens, Scott) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of Quark Images LLC (Love, Gregory) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/8/2010
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International, Inc., America First Federal Credit Union, BBVA Compass Bancshares, Inc., BBVA USA Bancshares, Inc., BMW Bank of North America, BMW Financial Services NA, LLC, Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Bayerische Motoren Werke AG, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Services, L.L.C., Capital One, National Association, CardLab, Inc., Discover Financial Services, L.L.C., Hallmark Cards, Inc., Mars, Inc., Nike, Inc., Oakley, Inc., PAYjr, Inc., Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Ralph Lauren Media, L.L.C., Reebok International Ltd., Serverside Group, Limited, Shoreline Busines Solutions, Inc., Sole Technology, The Topps Company, Inc., Wescom Credit Union, Zions Bancorporation, Zions First National Bank ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2620378.), filed by Quark Images LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 220 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?