Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Disk Doctors Labs, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-00471
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated August 28, 2016 at 3:43 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 2X Software, LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo CimQuest INGEAR, LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Componentone, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ccapshaw@capshawlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com
No Logo Makemusic, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lora Mitchell Friedemann +1 612 492 7185 +1 612 492 7077 lfriedemann@fredlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo Nitro PDF, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Solarwinds Worldwide, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James George Warriner +1 512 482 6800 +1 512 482 6859 jim.warriner@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roderick B Williams +1 512 482 6880 +1 512 482 6859 rick.williams@klgates.com
No Logo Solarwinds, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James George Warriner +1 512 482 6800 +1 512 482 6859 jim.warriner@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roderick B Williams +1 512 482 6880 +1 512 482 6859 rick.williams@klgates.com
No Logo Thursby Software Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by SCHEEF & STONE, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Ann Elkjer +1 214 706 4232 +1 214 706 4242 kim.elkjer@solidcounsel.com
No Logo Unity Technologies SF, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Hopkins & Carley ALC

No Logo Camera Bits, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Glenn Thames +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 glennthames@potterminton.com
No Logo Intego, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ccapshaw@capshawlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SCHEEF & STONE, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Ann Elkjer +1 214 706 4232 +1 214 706 4242 kim.elkjer@solidcounsel.com
No Logo Stat-Ease, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Huntsman Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Ames Huntsman +1 208 860 4379 +1 208 343 0181 bobh@huntsmanlg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SCHEEF & STONE, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Ann Elkjer +1 214 706 4232 +1 214 706 4242 kim.elkjer@solidcounsel.com
No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (290) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 290 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All Claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
    LREF
    Blank 289 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER that all claims between pltfs and deft Stat-Ease Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own atty's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE by ComponentOne, L.L.C., Intego, Inc. of Request for Termination of E-Notices (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial purposes only. The earliest filed civil action 6:10cv373 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. The model ESI Order, previously filed Discovery Order, and Protective Order (filed in Civil Action 6:10cv373) will govern the consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit a uniform Docket Control Order incorporating the dates designated in this Order. As the stay has been lifted, the parties may engage in discovery. However, the parties may not amend their infringement and invalidity contentions without leave of Court. The parties are further ORDERED to attend mediation before 5-21-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/04/13. cc:attys 3-05-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 2/25/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign in Sheet) (cwk) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER GRANTING 282 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Unity Technologies SF, Unity Technologies SF, Unity Technologies SF and Unity Technologies SF terminated. Plaintiffs complaint as to all other defendants is not impacted by this stipulation and dismissal. Any and all claims and/or counterclaims by both parties are dismissed with prejudice from the case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/26/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin E Weed on behalf of SolarWinds, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4018343. (Weed, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Bryan J Sinclair on behalf of SolarWinds, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4017599. (Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Unity Technologies SF by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                    Opposed MOTION to Join Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. as Plaintiff by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 277 Motion to Lift Stay and Set Case Management Conference. These cases are hereby set for a case management conference on 2-25-2013, at 2:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/13. cc:attys 1-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE in Support re 277 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE to Motion re 277 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Defendants' Response to Motion to Lift Stay filed by Unity Technologies SF. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Picone, John) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                            Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order dismissing California Action, # 2 Exhibit B - Markman Hearing transcript, # 3 Exhibit C - Claim Construction Order, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 274 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Any and all claims and/or counterclaims by pltfs and deft ComponentOne LLC are dismissed with prejudice from the case. Plaintiffs and Defendant ComponentOne, L.L.C. shall each bear their own attorneys fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/11/12. cc:attys 6-11-12(mll, ) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant ComponentOne, L.L.C. with prejudice by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 269 Motion to Stay. This civil action, including all discovery, is STAYED until further order of the Court, pending resolution of the California Action filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Corp. Pty, Ltd., and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to administratively close this case. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by ComponentOne, L.L.C. Defendant ComponentOne, LLC's Request to Stop Receiving Notices (Smith-Hill, Jay) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER. The Court advises the parties that it does not accept communications to the Court outside of CM/ECF filings. Any letters, faxes, or other communications that have not been specifically requested by the Court will be disregarded. All arguments and communications to the Court shall be made through formal CM/ECF filings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/11. cc:attys 11-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 10/19/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 91 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                            Joint MOTION to Stay all Above Actions by Unity Technologies SF. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Picone, John) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER denying as moot 203 Motion to Compel Defendant Intego Inc to Produce Sales Data. This provisional claim construction Order sets forth the Courts initial constructions for the disputed claim terms in U.S. Patent No. 5,490,216. The Court will issue a Memorandum Opinion, including a full analysis of the disputed claim terms, at a later date. The Court may modify these provisional constructions when it issues the Memorandum Opinion. ThisOrder is intended to serve as a guideline and framework with which the parties may proceed at an earlier point in the litigation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/11. cc:attys 11-04-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $14,850.00 to Michael T. McLemore for services rendered and expenses incurred through 10-19-2011 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $29,700.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/11. cc:attys 10-26-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 265 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Intego, Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/21/11. cc:attys 10-24-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Intego, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 10/19/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE by Nitro PDF, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER that as time allows, the Court will hear argument on all currently pending motions at the Markman hearing scheduled for 10-19-2011 at 9 a.m.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/12/11. cc:attys 10-13-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Estimated Amount of Time Required for Markman Hearing (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY to 255 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit G)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER appointing Michael T. McLemore, 10333 Richmond Ave., Suite 1100, Houston, Texas 77042, to the position of technical advisor in this case with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/4/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE by Intego, Inc. re 255 Claim Construction Brief, of Joinder (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Unity Technologies SF. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Picone, John) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 251 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft ComponentOne, LLC are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-23-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER. The Court intends to appoint Michael T. McLemore to the position of technical advisor in this case. Any objection to the appointment shall be presented to the Court for in camera review within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-23-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER denying 170 Notice of Joinder to Motion to Change Venue (filed in related case 6:10cv373) filed by SolarWinds, Inc., Nitro PDF, Inc., SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/20/11. cc:attys 9-21-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant ComponentOne, L.L.C. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 246 Motion to withdraw; withdrawing 239 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/13/11. cc:attys 9-13-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Additional Attachments to Main Document: 247 Claim Construction Brief.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D7 - part 1, # 2 Exhibit D7 - part 2, # 3 Exhibit D8, # 4 Exhibit D9, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Hill, Jack) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2011: # 7 Exhibit E Searchable, # 8 Exhibit F Searchable) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document: 247 Claim Construction Brief.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D1, # 2 Exhibit D2, # 3 Exhibit D3, # 4 Exhibit D4, # 5 Exhibit D5, # 6 Exhibit D6)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steve W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION and Joint Stipulation to Address Issues in Markman Proceeding and to Withdraw Docket No. 239 re 239 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising From the Recent Reexamination, in the Upcoming Claim Construction Proceedings by Intego, Inc., SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc., Stat-Ease, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warriner, James) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 203 MOTION to Compel Defendant Intego, Inc. to Produce Sales Data for the Accused Products Identified in Plaintiffs' Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosures filed by Intego, Inc.. (Krebs, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 242 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 234 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot 211 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 234 MOTION to Strike PREVIOUSLY CONSTRUED CLAIM TERMS FROM THE PARTIES P.R. 4-3 STATEMENT by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 240 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendant ComponentOne, L.L.C. are hereby stayed 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/11. cc:attys 9-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay DEFENDANT COMPONENTONE, LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY DEADLINES FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by ComponentOne, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Staying Deadlines)(Legaard, Brenna) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Leave to File Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising From the Recent Reexamination, in the Upcoming Claim Construction Proceedings by Intego, Inc., SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc., Stat-Ease, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Claim Construction Letter, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Alternate Order)(Warriner, James) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION to Stay DEFENDANT COMPONENTONE, LLC'S UNOPPOSSED MOTION TO STAY DEADLINES FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by ComponentOne, L.L.C.. (Legaard, Brenna) Modified on 8/31/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc. (Warriner, James) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 230 Motion for Protective Order and entering Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/30/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER withdrawing 210 Motion for Protective Order; granting 231 Motion to Withdraw 210 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/30/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike PREVIOUSLY CONSTRUED CLAIM TERMS FROM THE PARTIES P.R. 4-3 STATEMENT by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. P. R. 4-3 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PRE-HEARING STATEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Unilocs proposed construction for each disputed claim term, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants proposed construction or position for each disputed claim term)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 228 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of James L. Etheridge, # 2 Exhibit A - press release obtained from Intego, Inc.s website, # 3 Exhibit B - press release obtained from Intego, Inc.s website)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION to Withdraw 210 MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Intego, Inc. re PR 4-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 203 MOTION to Compel Defendant Intego, Inc. to Produce Sales Data for the Accused Products Identified in Plaintiffs' Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosures filed by Intego, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeff Erwin)(Krebs, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). ( (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER denying without prejudice 130 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/16/11. cc:attys 8-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying as moot 122 MOTION to Stay filed by Intego, Inc., Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc., Thursby Software Systems, Inc., Nitro PDF, Inc., Stat-Ease, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/15/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 219 Motion to Stay Deadlines Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/16/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 218 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/16/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Intego, Inc. re PR 3-3, 3-4, 4-1 and Additional Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 216 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc., dismissing claims between Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, and Defendant Thursby Software Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/15/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 214 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice all claims for relief asserted by and between Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (SINGAPORE) Private Limited, and Defendant Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/15/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 213 Motion to Withdraw 213 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Pending Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of United States Patent No. 5,490,216 and Brief in Support (Dkt. No. 122)Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Pending Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of United States Patent No. 5,490,216 and Brief in Support (Dkt. No. 122). Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/15/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement regarding Defendant ComponentOne, L.L.C. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re: Additional Disclosures by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Warriner, James) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    REPORT of Mediation by Harlan Martin. Mediation result: Settled as to Defendant Thursby Software(Martin, Harlan) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Thursby Software Systems, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. regarding Technical Advisor (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Pending Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of United States Patent No. 5,490,216 and Brief in Support (Dkt. No. 122) by Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of United States Patent Office's Notice of Intent to Issue Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate for Patent-In-Suit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent Office notice)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Unity Technologies SF re Initial Disclosures (Picone, John) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Warriner, James) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Intego, Inc. re Initial Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Thursby Software Systems, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Parker, Greg) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ComponentOne, L.L.C. re Initial Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Defendant Intego, Inc. to Produce Sales Data for the Accused Products Identified in Plaintiffs' Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosures by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of James L. Etheridge, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration - relevant portions of Plaintiffs Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosures for Intego, Inc., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 201 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for first mediation for Uniloc and Thursby is extended to 8-15-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/29/11. cc:attys 7-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for an Extension of Time to Conduct First Mediation by Thursby Software Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re: Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Parker, Greg) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 197 Motion to withdraw Motion to Stay; withdrawing 122 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/26/11. cc:attys 7-26-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 198 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Nitro PDF, Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/25/11. cc:attys 7-25-11(mll, ) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Nitro PDF, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Withdrawal from Pending Motions re 122 MOTION to Stay, 170 Notice (Other) by Nitro PDF, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion and Status Proceedings held on 4/26/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 51 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc. re Accused Product Sales Data (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Thursby Software Systems, Inc. (Source Code Disclosure) (Parker, Greg) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Greg Harlan Parker on behalf of Thursby Software Systems, Inc. (Parker, Greg) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 188 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/28/11. cc:attys 6-28-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc. (Source Code Disclosure) (Warriner, James) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Unity Technologies SF of Compliance re Production of Sales Data (Picone, John) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Thursby Software Systems, Inc. of Compliance re Production of Sales Data (Elkjer, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order Deadline by Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ComponentOne, L.L.C. re Accused Product Sales Data (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc. Notice of Compliance re Production of Sales Data (Warriner, James) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Nitro PDF, Inc. Notice of Compliance re Production of Sales Data (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/11. cc:attys 6-09-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 169 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Make Music Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/07/11. cc:attys 6-08-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by MakeMusic, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notice (Fairbairn, Grant) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/07/11. cc:attys 6-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 176 Motion for Extension of Time to File the proposed Docket Control Order. Deadline is 6/2/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/3/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (PARTIALLY AGREED) by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Courts Order of May 20, 2011, # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Ex B - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Plaintiffs positions), # 3 Text of Proposed Order (Ex C - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Defendants positions))(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The parties shall submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 5-31-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/20/11. cc:attys 5-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 122 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/11. cc:attys 5-16-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c). Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/11. cc:attys 5-16-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 170 Notice (Other) Uniloc's Opposition to Solarwind's and Nitro PDF's Joinder to Sony's Motion to Transfer by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott R. Maynard, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Scott R. Maynard, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Scott R. Maynard, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Scott R. Maynard, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Scott R. Maynard, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Thursby Software Systems, Inc. of Vacation of Kimberly A. Elkjer (Elkjer, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Nitro PDF, Inc., SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc. Notice of joinder in motion to transfer venue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Warriner, James) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant MakeMusic, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      4.26.11 Minute Entry - Status Conf: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 4/26/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 122 MOTION to Stay filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Robert E Krebs on behalf of Intego, Inc. (Krebs, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Thursby Software Systems, Inc. re 53 Notice of Attorney Appearance Defendants' Response to Uniloc's Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Elkjer, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Brenna K Legaard on behalf of ComponentOne, L.L.C. (Legaard, Brenna) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by MakeMusic, Inc. Designating Eric H. Findlay as Lead Counsel (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. re 160 Order, Set Hearings,, of In Camera Submission (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 4/26/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. By 4-25-2011 at 9:00 a.m., pltfs shall submit, for in camera review, a table summarizing the licenses or settlements reached in the instant or prior cases involving the patents-in-suit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/20/11. cc:attys 4-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 122 MOTION to Stay filed by Intego, Inc., Nitro PDF, Inc., Stat-Ease, Inc., Thursby Software Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1)(Elkjer, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 152 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. James Davis shall no longer be counsel of record for deft 2X Software LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/07/11. cc:attys 4-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 122 MOTION to Stay filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Scott R. Maynard, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Hill, Jack) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2011: # 7 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 153 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. The Court has considered Plaintiffs' Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant 2X Software LLC, (Stipulation) and it is of the opinion that the Stipulation should be APPROVED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/4/2011. (kls, ) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 154 .***NOTICE by Thursby Software Systems, Inc. of Error in Attorney/Client Affiliation [docket no. 154 filed in error] (Elkjer, Kimberly) Modified on 4/4/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 155 .***NOTICE by Thursby Software Systems, Inc. of Error in Attorney/Client Affiliation (Elkjer, Kimberly) Modified on 4/4/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant 2X Software, LLC by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by 2X Software, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, James) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Amended Notice that case is ready for Status Conference (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Support re 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brenna K Legaard for ComponentOne, L.L.C. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jay R Smith-Hill for ComponentOne, L.L.C. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Nitro PDF, Inc., Stat-Ease, Inc., Thursby Software Systems, Inc., Unity Technologies SF. (Elkjer, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by MakeMusic, Inc. Designating Lora Mitchell Friedemann as Lead Counsel (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Nitro PDF, Inc. of Designation of Lead Attorney - Michael Page (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 143 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 122 MOTION to Stay; Responses due by 4/6/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 122 MOTION to Stay (SECOND) by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 137 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) ; Responses due by 3/18/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) ; Responses due by 3/18/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 135 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) ; Responses due by 3/18/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 134 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c); Responses due by 3/18/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 132 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c); Responses due by 3/18/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Stat-Ease, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huntsman, Robert) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Unity Technologies SF. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Picone, John) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by ComponentOne, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Intego, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Stat-Ease, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huntsman, Robert) Modified on 3/8/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Nitro PDF, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Thursby Software Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elkjer, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/9/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Affidavit of Bradley C. Davis in Support of Motion, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    2.7.11 Minute Entry - Status Conference: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 2/7/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 122 MOTION to Stay by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 121 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Any and all claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft CimQuest Ingear LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/09/11. cc:attys 2-10-11(mll, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by ComponentOne, L.L.C. re 122 MOTION to Stay of Joinder (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION for Joinder in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings by ComponentOne, L.L.C.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/9/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 124 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of ComponentOne, L.L.C. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Attachments to Main Document: 122 MOTION to Stay.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1.1 to Affidavit of Greg Parker, # 2 Exhibit A-1.2 to Affidavit of Greg Parker)(Elkjer, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/15/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay by Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc., Intego, Inc., Nitro PDF, Inc., Stat-Ease, Inc., Thursby Software Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Greg Parker, # 2 Exhibit A-2 to Affidavit of Greg Parker, # 3 Exhibit A-3 to Affidavit of Greg Parker, # 4 Exhibit A-4 to Affidavit of Greg Parker, # 5 Exhibit A-5 to Affidavit of Greg Parker, # 6 Exhibit A-6 to Affidavit of Greg Parker, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Elkjer, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant CimQuest INGEAR, L.L.C. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of MakeMusic, Inc. (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael H Page for Nitro PDF, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 2/7/2011 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/12/11. cc:attys 1-12-11(mll, ) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. re 103 Notice (Other) Amended Notice of Request for Status Conference (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lora Mitchell Friedemann for MakeMusic, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Grant Fairbairn for MakeMusic, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stat-Ease, Inc. (Huntsman, Robert) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Robert A Huntsman on behalf of Stat-Ease, Inc. (Huntsman, Robert) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Thursby Software Systems, Inc. (Elkjer, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Kimberly Ann Elkjer on behalf of Thursby Software Systems, Inc. (Elkjer, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James George Warriner on behalf of SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc. (Warriner, James) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas B Provencher on behalf of Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc. (Provencher, Douglas) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc. (Provencher, Douglas) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by 2X Software, LLC (Mallers, George) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc. (Provencher, Douglas) Modified on 11/19/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 91 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Camera Bits, Inc., Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft Camera Bits Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/17/10. cc:attys 11-17-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 90 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and or counterclaims by pltf and deft Disk Doctors Labs Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/17/10. cc:attys 11-17-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Status Conference (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 103 FOR CORRECTION.*** NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hill, Jack) Modified on 11/16/2010 (gsg). (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 96 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of MakeMusic, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 92 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of ComponentOne, L.L.C. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 88 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Thursby Software Systems, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 86 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Unity Technologies SF by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MakeMusic, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for MakeMusic, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant MakeMusic, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by MakeMusic, Inc..(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intego, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Intego SA (France) for Intego, Inc.. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Intego, Inc..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ComponentOne, L.L.C. (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by ComponentOne, L.L.C..(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) of Camera Bits, Inc. by Camera Bits, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Disk Doctors Labs, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 82 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Thursby Software Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Thursby Software Systems, Inc..(Elkjer, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Unity Technologies SF identifying Corporate Parent Unity Technologies, Inc. for Unity Technologies SF. (Picone, John) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant Unity Technologies SF's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Demand for Jury Trial, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Unity Technologies SF.(Picone, John) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to John V Picone, III on behalf of Unity Technologies SF (Picone, John) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to 76 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC and SolarWinds, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 73 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant CimQuest INGEAR L.L.C. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM s against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc..(Provencher, Douglas) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Douglas B Provencher for Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Camera Bits, Inc..( Thames, Earl) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Intego, Inc..( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC (Williams, Roderick) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SolarWinds, Inc. (Williams, Roderick) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, First COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc..(Williams, Roderick) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Stat-Ease, Inc..(Huntsman, Robert) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CimQuest INGEAR, L.L.C. (Elman, Gerry) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by CimQuest INGEAR, L.L.C..(Elman, Gerry) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MakeMusic, Inc.(Findlay, Eric). (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's ANSWER to 68 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Nitro PDF, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to 66 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant 2X Software LLC by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nitro PDF, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nitro PDF Pty Ltd. for Nitro PDF, Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Nitro PDF, Inc..(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Camera Bits, Inc..( Thames, Earl) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by 2X Software, LLC.(Davis, James) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert A Huntsman for Stat-Ease, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Nitro PDF, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant Intego, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft ComponentOne LLC's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 11-08-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/12/10. cc:attys 10-12-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Thursby Software Systems Inc's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 11-11-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/12/10. cc:attys 10-12-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft Disk Doctors Labs Inc's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 11-08-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/12/10. cc:attys 10-12-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, on behalf of Defendant ComponentOne, L.L.C. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MakeMusic, Inc.(Findlay, Eric). (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CimQuest INGEAR, L.L.C..( Elman, Gerry) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, on behalf of Defendant Thursby Software Systems, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, on behalf of Defendant Disk Doctors Labs, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc..( Williams, Roderick) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roderick B Williams on behalf of SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc. (Williams, Roderick) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Unity Technologies SF.( Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re 2X Software, LLC.( Mallers, George) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Winston Oliver Huff on behalf of Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 10/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Camera Bits, Inc..( Thames, Earl) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc. on 9/20/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/12/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Disk Doctors Labs, Inc. on 9/16/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/7/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Unity Technologies SF on 9/20/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/12/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nitro PDF, Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gerry J Elman for CimQuest INGEAR, L.L.C.. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to James Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Nitro PDF, Inc. on 9/17/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/8/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Sunbelt Software Distribution, Inc. on 9/17/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2010: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ). (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Sunbelt Software, Inc. on 9/17/2010 by cert mail. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2010: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ). (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to 2X Software, LLC on 9/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/6/2010. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2010: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ). (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Stat-Ease, Inc. on 9/17/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/8/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC on 9/16/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/7/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to SolarWinds, Inc. on 9/16/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/7/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Vipre Software, Inc. on 9/17/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2010: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ). (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Thursby Software Systems, Inc. on 9/20/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/12/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to ComponentOne, L.L.C. on 9/17/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/8/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Camera Bits, Inc. on 9/16/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/7/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to CimQuest INGEAR, L.L.C. on 9/17/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/8/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Intego, Inc. on 9/17/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/8/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to MakeMusic, Inc. on 9/17/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 10/8/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 23 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and/or counterclaims by pltfs and deft Vipre Software Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/10. cc:attys 9-21-10(mll, ) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 22 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Any and all claims and/or counterclaims between pltfs and deft Sunbelt Software Distribution Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/10. cc:attys 9-21-10(mll, ) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 21 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Any and all claims and/or counterclaims by pltf and deft Sunbelt Software Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own atty's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/10. cc:attys 9-21-10(mll, ) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott R Maynard for Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2010: # 1 Exhibit) (mll, ). (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James Etheridge for Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Vipre Software, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Sunbelt Software Distribution, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Sunbelt Software, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Vipre Software, Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Unity Technologies SF. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Thursby Software Systems, Inc. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sunbelt Software, Inc. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Stat-Ease, Inc. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to SolarWinds, Inc. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Nitro PDF, Inc. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to MakeMusic, Inc. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Intego, Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Disk Doctors Labs, Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to ComponentOne, L.L.C.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to CimQuest INGEAR, L.L.C.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Camera Bits, Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc.. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Uniloc USA, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) Modified on 9/15/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to 2X Software, LLC. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against 2X Software, LLC, Berkley Integrated Audio Software, Inc., Camera Bits, Inc., CimQuest INGEAR, L.L.C., ComponentOne, L.L.C., Disk Doctors Labs, Inc., Intego, Inc., MakeMusic, Inc., Nitro PDF, Inc., SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc., Stat-Ease, Inc., Sunbelt Software Distribution, Inc., Sunbelt Software, Inc., Thursby Software Systems, Inc., Unity Technologies SF, Vipre Software, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2666748.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 269 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?