Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Engrasp, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-00591
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 10:53 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Uniloc Singapore Private Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
No Logo ApexSQL, LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Articulate Global, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Automatic Duck, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Cakewalk, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Eeye, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo GeoSpatial Experts Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo LegalPRO Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Markzware, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Seagull Scientific, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Wildpackets, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Dameware Development LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sanford E Warren, Jr. +1 214 969 2877 +1 214 969 4343 swarren@akingump.com
No Logo Freedom Scientific Blv Group, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Freedom Scientific Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kurt L. Glitzenstein +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 glitzenstein@fr.com
Space Steven R Katz +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 katz@fr.com
Space Frank Everett Scherkenbach +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 scherkenbach@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo Manifold Net Limited, Defendant
No Logo Onone Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Myers Bigel Sibley & Sajovec, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce Edward Owens, Jr. +1 919 854 1400 +1 919 854 1401 bowens@wt-ip.com
Space Richard P Vitek +1 919 854 1400 +1 919 854 1401 rvitek@myersbigel.com
No Logo Wave Arts, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James G. Snell +1 650 838 4367 +1 650 838 4567 jsnell@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Uniloc Singapore Private Limited"
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Engrasp, Inc., Cross Claimant
No Logo Honorable Robert Faulkner, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert W Faulkner +1 214 744 5267 +1 214 720 6010 rfaulkner@jamsadr.com
No Logo Michael T McLemore, Technical Advisor
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (290) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial purposes only. The earliest filed civil action 6:10cv373 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. The model ESI Order, previously filed Discovery Order, and Protective Order (filed in Civil Action 6:10cv373) will govern the consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit a uniform Docket Control Order incorporating the dates designated in this Order. As the stay has been lifted, the parties may engage in discovery. However, the parties may not amend their infringement and invalidity contentions without leave of Court. The parties are further ORDERED to attend mediation before 5-21-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/04/13. cc:attys 3-05-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 2/25/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign in Sheet) (cwk) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
        Opposed MOTION to Join Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. as Plaintiff by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 282 Motion to Lift Stay and Set Case Management Conference. These cases are hereby set for a case management conference on 2-25- 2013, at 2:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/13. cc:attys 1-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE by Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
              RESPONSE in Support re 282 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                RESPONSE in Opposition re 282 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Wildpackets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                  Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order dismissing California Action, # 2 Exhibit B - Markman Hearing transcript, # 3 Exhibit C - Claim Construction Order, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 278 Motion to Stay. This civil action, including all discovery, is STAYED until further order of the Court, pending resolution of the California Action filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Corp. Pty, Ltd., and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to administratively close this case. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER. The Court advises the parties that it does not accept communications to the Court outside of CM/ECF filings. Any letters, faxes, or other communications that have not been specifically requested by the Court will be disregarded. All arguments and communications to the Court shall be made through formal CM/ECF filings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/11. cc:attys 11-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                          Joint MOTION to Stay All Above Actions by Wildpackets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER. This provisional claim construction Order sets forth the Courts initial constructions for the disputed claim terms in U.S. Patent No. 5,490,216. The Court will issue a Memorandum Opinion, including a full analysis of the disputed claim terms, at a later date. The Court may modify these provisional constructions when it issues the Memorandum Opinion. ThisOrder is intended to serve as a guideline and framework with which the parties may proceed at an earlier point in the litigation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/11. cc:attys 11-04-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $14,850.00 to Michael T. McLemore for services rendered and expenses incurred through 10-19-2011 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $29,700.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/11. cc:attys 10-26-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 274 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and defts Freedom Scientific Inc and Freedom Scientific BLV Group LLC are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/24/11. cc:attys 10-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                  Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Freedom Scientific, Inc. and Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 10/19/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Markzware Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER that as time allows, the Court will hear argument on all currently pending motions at the Markman hearing scheduled for 10-19-2011 at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/12/11. cc:attys 10-13-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by eEye, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Tiller, Donald) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 10/10/2011, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE by eEye, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Parker, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Estimated Amount of Time Required for Markman Hearing (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE to 260 Reply to Claim Construction Brief by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit G)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER appointing Michael T. McLemore, 10333 Richmond Ave., Suite 1100, Houston, Texas 77042, to the position of technical advisor in this case with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/4/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 262 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter are stayed for Freedom Scientific, Inc. and Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC. through and including 11-07-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/03/11. cc:attys 10-03-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 261 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft ApexSQL LLC are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/30/11. cc:attys 9-30-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Agreed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines with Defendants Freedom Scientific, Inc. and Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant ApexSQL, LLC by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY to 251 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Wildpackets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 256 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Markzware are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-23-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 255 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter are stayed to 9-30-2011 for Freedom Scientific, Inc. and Freedom Scientific BLVGroup, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER. The Court intends to appoint Michael T. McLemore to the position of technical advisor in this case. Any objection to the appointment shall be presented to the Court for in camera review within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-23-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Markzware by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Agreed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines with Defendants Freedom Scientific. and Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 249 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft eEye Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/13/11. cc:attys 9-13-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 250 Motion to withdraw; withdrawing 238 Motion for Leave. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/13/11. cc:attys 9-13-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Additional Attachments to Main Document: 251 Claim Construction Brief,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D7 - part 1, # 2 Exhibit D7 - part 2, # 3 Exhibit D8, # 4 Exhibit D9, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Hill, Jack) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2011: # 7 Exhibit E Searchable, # 8 Exhibit F Searchable) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D1, # 6 Exhibit D2, # 7 Exhibit D3, # 8 Exhibit D4, # 9 Exhibit D5, # 10 Exhibit D6)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Approve the Joint Stipulation to Address Issues in Markman Proceedings and to Withdraw Docket No. 238 re 238 MOTION for Leave to Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising from the Recent Reexamination, in the Upcoming Claim Construction Proceedings by Wildpackets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant eEye, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 245 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 237 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot 207 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 217 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft LegalPro Systems Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/11. cc:attys 9-02-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 237 MOTION to Strike PREVIOUSLY CONSTRUED CLAIM TERMS FROM THE PARTIES P.R. 4-3 STATEMENT by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 242 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 206 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/11. cc:attys 9-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/11. cc:attys 9-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION to Withdraw 206 MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 235 Motion for Extension of Time. Defts shall have to 9-16-2011 to comply with PR 3-3 and 3-4. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/30/11. cc:attys 8-31-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 209 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendant Markzware are hereby stayed 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/30/11. cc:attys 8-31-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising from the Recent Reexamination, in the Upcoming Claim Construction Proceedings by Wildpackets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Claim Construction Letter, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Alternate Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike PREVIOUSLY CONSTRUED CLAIM TERMS FROM THE PARTIES P.R. 4-3 STATEMENT by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. P.R. 4-3 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PRE-HEARING STATEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Uniloc's proposed construction or position for each disputed claim term, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants proposed construction or position for each disputed claim term)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Patent Rule 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures by Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Steven) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 231 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Articulate Global Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/24/11. cc:attys 8-25-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc. REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Denkenberger, John) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Articulate Global, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 225 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and defts Seagull Scientific Inc, Seagull Scientific Europe Inc, and Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/11. cc:attys 8-18-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 227 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendant Markzware are hereby stayed 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/11. cc:attys 8-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER denying without prejudice 120 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/16/11. cc:attys 8-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Stay Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement with Defendant Markzware by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc. re Proposed Claim Terms (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Seagull Scientific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., and Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 222 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Wildpackets, Inc. to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 to 8/26/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/16/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot 117 Motion to Stay pending resolution of a patent examination before the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/15/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Patent Rule 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures by Wildpackets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marton, Ryan) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan J Marton on behalf of Wildpackets, Inc. (Marton, Ryan) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc. re 133 Notice (Other) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT eEYE'S MOTION TO STAY (Denkenberger, John) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 212 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Automatic Duck Inc are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/11/11. cc:attys 8-12-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. regarding Technical Advisor (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant LegalPRO Systems, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of United States Patent Office's Notice of Intent to Issue Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate for Patent-In-Suit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent Office notice)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 211 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall have to 8-26-2011 to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/11. cc:attys 8-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 210 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendant eEye, Inc. are hereby stayed fourteen 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/11. cc:attys 8-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by LegalPRO Systems, Inc. re 128 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Joinder (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Automatic Duck, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Patent Rule 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures by Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Steven) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement regarding Defendant eEye, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by eEye, Inc. (Tiller, Donald) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 199 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiffs and Defendants Seagull Scientific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., and Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc. are hereby stayed 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/02/11. cc:attys 8-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc. of Compliance of Service of Initial Disclosures (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Wildpackets, Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Automatic Duck, Inc. re 126 Notice (Other) Withdrawal of its Joinder in EEye's Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Markzware regarding Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Stay Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement with Defendants Seagull Scientific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., and Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frank E Scherkenbach for Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion and Status Proceedings held on 4/26/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 51 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 186 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between pltfs and deft Engrasp Inc are stayed for 14 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/15/11. cc:attys 7-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc. of Source Code (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by ApexSQL, LLC of Voluntary Early Disclosure of Source Code (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 187 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Engrasp Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/29/11. cc:attys 6-30-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by eEye, Inc. regarding sales data (Tiller, Donald) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott R Maynard for Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2011: # 1 Exhibit) (mll, ). (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION FED. R. CIV. P. 29 STIPUATION BETWEEN UNILOC AND eEYE, INC. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc., eEye, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Nondisclosure Agreement)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc. (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Markzware regarding Sales Data (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Engrasp, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines Following Settlement and Notice of Settlement with Defendant Engrasp, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kurt L Glitzenstein for Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven R Katz for Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Wildpackets, Inc. of Disclosure of Sales Data (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by LegalPRO Systems, Inc. Notice of Voluntary Early Disclosure of Source Code (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Automatic Duck, Inc. Notice of Voluntary Early Disclosure of Source Code (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Articulate Global, Inc. Notice of Voluntary Early Disclosure of Source Code (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Articulate Global, Inc. Notice of Disclosure of Sales Data (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc. Notice of Disclosure of Sales Data (Denkenberger, John) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by ApexSQL, LLC, Automatic Duck, Inc., LegalPRO Systems, Inc. Notice of Disclosure of Sales Data (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Cakewalk, Inc. re: Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Gaff, Brian) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by DameWare Development LLC DameWare Development LLC's Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Warren, Sanford) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Engrasp, Inc. Notice of Disclosure of Sales Data (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by GeoSpatial Experts Inc. of Request for Termination of CM/ECF Notices (Maxwell, Caroline) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/11. cc:attys 6-09-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 168 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft GeoSpatial Experts Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/07/11. cc:attys 6-08-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/07/11. cc:attys 6-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant GeoSpatial Experts, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 164 Motion for Extension of Time to File the proposed Docket Control Order. Deadline is 6/2/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/3/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (PARTIALLY AGREED) by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Courts Order of May 20, 2011, # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Ex B - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Plaintiffs positions), # 3 Text of Proposed Order (Ex C - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Defendants positions))(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The parties shall submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 5-31-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/20/11. cc:attys 5-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 157 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Cakewalk Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/11. cc:attys 5-16-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 120 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c). Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/11. cc:attys 5-16-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 137 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 120 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c). Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/11. cc:attys 5-16-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 134 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 120 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c). Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/11. cc:attys 5-16-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 117 MOTION to Stay filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Cakewalk, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              4.26.11 Minute Entry - Status Conf: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 4/26/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 149 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltfs and deft DameWare Development LLC are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/27/11. cc:attys 4-27-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Kenneth Gerald Parker on behalf of eEye, Inc. (Parker, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of Wildpackets, Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Michael E Jones on behalf of Markzware (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. re 148 Order, Set Hearings,, of In Camera Submission (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to John David Denkenberger on behalf of Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc. (Denkenberger, John) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant DameWare Development LLC by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 4/26/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. By 4-25-2011 at 9:00 a.m., pltfs shall submit, for in camera review, a table summarizing the licenses or settlements reached in the instant or prior cases involving the patents-in-suit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/20/11. cc:attys 4-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 117 MOTION to Stay filed by eEye, Inc.. (Tiller, Donald) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 147 .***REPLY to Response to Motion re 117 MOTION to Stay filed by eEye, Inc.. (Tiller, Donald) Modified on 4/21/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by ApexSQL, LLC, Articulate Global, Inc., Automatic Duck, Inc., Engrasp, Inc., LegalPRO Systems, Inc.. (Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 117 MOTION to Stay filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Scott R. Maynard, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Hill, Jack) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2011: # 8 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Amended Notice that case is ready for Status Conference (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Support re 120 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caroline Cook Maxwell on behalf of GeoSpatial Experts Inc. (Maxwell, Caroline) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Halina S Dziewit on behalf of GeoSpatial Experts Inc. (Dziewit, Halina) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc. re 132 Response to Motion, Notice of Joinder (Denkenberger, John) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Wildpackets, Inc. re 132 Response to Motion, 120 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) Joinder in Defendants' Joint Response (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 132 Response to Motion, by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by eEye, Inc. re 132 Response to Motion, 120 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) - Joinder With Engrasp's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Parties (Tiller, Donald) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Markzware re 132 Response to Motion, of Joinder (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 120 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE 220 .***NOTICE by Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc. re 117 MOTION to Stay Notice of Joinder (Denkenberger, John) Modified on 8/15/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by ApexSQL, LLC, Articulate Global, Inc., Automatic Duck, Inc., Engrasp, Inc., LegalPRO Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 120 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Wildpackets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant WildPackets, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James William Anable on behalf of Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc. (Anable, James) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John David Denkenberger on behalf of Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc. (Denkenberger, John) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE 213 .***NOTICE by LegalPRO Systems, Inc. re 117 MOTION to Stay [Joinder in Defendant eEye, Inc.'s Motion to Stay] (Collins, Michael) Modified on 8/10/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Engrasp, Inc. re 117 MOTION to Stay [Joinder in Defendant eEye, Inc.'s Motion to Stay] (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Automatic Duck, Inc. re 117 MOTION to Stay [Joinder in Defendant eEye, Inc.'s Motion to Stay] (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Articulate Global, Inc. re 117 MOTION to Stay [Joinder in Defendant eEye, Inc.'s Motion to Stay] (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by ApexSQL, LLC re 117 MOTION to Stay [Joinder in Defendant eEye, Inc.'s Motion to Stay] (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 119 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 117 MOTION to Stay; Responses due by 4/6/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/23/11. cc:attys 2-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by OnOne Software, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Vitek, Richard) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Markzware re 117 MOTION to Stay --- Notice of Joinder (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Affidavit of Bradley C. Davis in Support of Motion, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 117 MOTION to Stay by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Wildpackets, Inc. re 117 MOTION to Stay [Joinder in Defendant eEye, Inc.'s Motion to Stay] (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay by eEye, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Tiller, Donald) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 115 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III, Daymon Jeffrey Rambin, and Elizabeth DeRieux for Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc.. Attorney Darren Anthony Feider terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/09/11. cc:attys 2-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. that Case is Ready for Status Conference (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kenneth Gerald Parker for eEye, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DameWare Development LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for DameWare Development LLC. (Warren, Sanford) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GeoSpatial Experts Inc. (Henry, David) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 103 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Markzware by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 99 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Defendants Seagull Scientific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc. and Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 98 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Cakewalk, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 96 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Defendant Engrasp, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 95 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Geospatial Experts, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 93 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant eEye, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Markzware identifying Corporate Parent None for Markzware. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Markzware.(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc. (Feider, Darren) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc. (Feider, Darren) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Seagull Scientific, Inc. (Feider, Darren) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Seagull Scientific's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc..(Feider, Darren) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant Cakewalk, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Cakewalk, Inc..(Gaff, Brian) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Engrasp, Inc. (Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant Engrasp, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and, CROSSCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Engrasp, Inc..(Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by GeoSpatial Experts Inc..(Henry, David) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by eEye, Inc. (Tiller, Donald) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM and Request for Jury Trial against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by eEye, Inc..(Tiller, Donald) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Freedom Scientific, Inc. for Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Freedom Scientific, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant Freedom Scientific, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Freedom Scientific, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, DameWare Development LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement by DameWare Development LLC.(Warren, Sanford) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 85 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant ApexSQL LLC by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ApexSQL, LLC (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant ApexSQL, LLC's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by ApexSQL, LLC.(Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Wave Arts, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notice (Snell, James) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eEye, Inc..( Tiller, Donald) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. ORDERED that the Freedom Scientific Defendants have until and through January 21, 2011 in which to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/7/2011. (gsg) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ApexSQL, LLC.( Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Engrasp, Inc..( Collins, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 74 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant LegalPRO Systems, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 72 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Articulate Global, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 70 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Automatic Duck, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 67 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of WildPackets, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LegalPRO Systems, Inc. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by LegalPRO Systems, Inc..(Collins, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Articulate Global, Inc. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Articulate Global, Inc..(Collins, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Automatic Duck, Inc. (Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Automatic Duck, Inc..(Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cakewalk, Inc..( Gaff, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wildpackets, Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant WildPackets, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Wildpackets, Inc..(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc..( Feider, Darren) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re DameWare Development LLC.( Warren, Sanford) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GeoSpatial Experts Inc.(Henry, David) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 60 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims against deft Manifold Net Limited are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/03/11. cc:attys 1-03-11(mll, ) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Markzware.( Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 56 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between pltfs and deft OnOne Software Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/29/10. cc:attys 12-29-10(mll, ) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 55 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between pltfs and deft Wave Arts Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/29/10. cc:attus 12-29-10(mll, ) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/21/10. cc:pltf 12-21-10(mll, ) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant OnOne Software, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Wave Arts, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***REPLACES ENTRY 11 *** Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Articulate Global, Inc..( Collins, Michael) Modified on 12/14/2010 (gsg). (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc.(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re eEye, Inc..( Tiller, Donald) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Markzware (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LegalPRO Systems, Inc..( Collins, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ApexSQL, LLC.( Collins, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Automatic Duck, Inc..( Collins, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re OnOne Software, Inc..( Vitek, Richard) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GeoSpatial Experts Inc.(Henry, David) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Greer Henry, Sr on behalf of GeoSpatial Experts Inc. (Henry, David) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wildpackets, Inc..( Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc..( Feider, Darren) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wave Arts, Inc.( Snell, James) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cakewalk, Inc..( Gaff, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Cakewalk, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Gaff, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian M Gaff on behalf of Cakewalk, Inc. (Gaff, Brian) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard P Vitek for OnOne Software, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bruce E Owens, Jr for OnOne Software, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Patrick Tower on behalf of Automatic Duck, Inc. (Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by ApexSQL, LLC. (Collins, Michael) Modified on 12/2/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Automatic Duck, Inc.. (Collins, Michael) Modified on 12/2/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by LegalPRO Systems, Inc.. (Collins, Michael) Modified on 12/2/2010 (sm, ). (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Edmonds on behalf of Articulate Global, Inc., Engrasp, Inc. (Edmonds, John) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to ApexSQL, LLC on 11/16/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/7/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Articulate Global, Inc. on 11/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/6/2010. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2010: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Automatic Duck, Inc. on 11/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/6/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Cakewalk, Inc. on 11/16/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/7/2010. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2010: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to DameWare Development LLC on 11/15/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to eEye, Inc. on 11/16/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/7/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC on 11/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/6/2010. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2010: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Freedom Scientific, Inc. on 11/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/6/2010. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2010: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to GeoSpatial Experts Inc. on 11/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/6/2010. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2010: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to LegalPRO Systems, Inc. on 11/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/6/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Manifold Net Limited on 11/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/6/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Markzware on 11/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/6/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as toOnOne Software, Inc. on 11/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/6/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc. on 11/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/6/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc. on 11/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/6/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Seagull Scientific, Inc. on 11/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/6/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Wave Arts, Inc. on 11/18/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/9/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Wildpackets, Inc. on 11/15/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/6/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Markzware (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint up to and including January 3, 2011 re Markzware. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 54 FOR CORRECTION.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Articulate Global, Inc.. (Collins, Michael) Modified on 12/14/2010 (gsg). (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Mark Pogorzelski on behalf of Articulate Global, Inc., Engrasp, Inc. (Pogorzelski, Henry) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Patrick Tower on behalf of Articulate Global, Inc., Engrasp, Inc. (Tower, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Collins on behalf of Articulate Global, Inc., Engrasp, Inc. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re DameWare Development LLC.( Warren, Sanford) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to ApexSQL, LLC, Articulate Global, Inc., Automatic Duck, Inc., Cakewalk, Inc., DameWare Development LLC, Engrasp, Inc., Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc., GeoSpatial Experts Inc., LegalPRO Systems, Inc., Manifold Net Limited, Markzware, OnOne Software, Inc., Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Wave Arts, Inc., Wildpackets, Inc., eEye, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es), # 3 Summons(es), # 4 Summons(es), # 5 Summons(es), # 6 Summons(es), # 7 Summons(es), # 8 Summons(es), # 9 Summons(es), # 10 Summons(es), # 11 Summons(es), # 12 Summons(es), # 13 Summons(es), # 14 Summons(es), # 15 Summons(es), # 16 Summons(es), # 17 Summons(es), # 18 Summons(es))(kls, ) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Winston Oliver Huff on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Lewis Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against ApexSQL, LLC, Articulate Global, Inc., Automatic Duck, Inc., Cakewalk, Inc., DameWare Development LLC, Engrasp, Inc., Freedom Scientific BLV Group, LLC, Freedom Scientific, Inc., GeoSpatial Experts Inc., LegalPRO Systems, Inc., Manifold Net Limited, Markzware, OnOne Software, Inc., Seagull Scientific Asia-Pacific, Inc., Seagull Scientific Europe, Inc., Seagull Scientific, Inc., Wave Arts, Inc., Wildpackets, Inc., eEye, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2751323.), filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 213 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?