Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. BMC Software, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-00636
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 7:26 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Autodesk, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Moldflow Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erika Lin Yawger +1 650 813 4218 +1 650 494 0792 eyawger@mofo.com
No Logo Bmc Software, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Bladelogic, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Healey +1 713 877 1515
No Logo Digital River, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Louis Germer +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 llgermer@germer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com
Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Churchill +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 rchurchill@ldlkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Thomas Henson +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413 thenson@rameyflock.com
Intuit, Inc. Intuit, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Uniloc Singapore Private Limited"

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (205) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Autodesk, Inc., of Request for Termination of E-Notices (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial purposes only. The earliest filed civil action 6:10cv373 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. The model ESI Order, previously filed Discovery Order, and Protective Order (filed in Civil Action 6:10cv373) will govern the consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit a uniform Docket Control Order incorporating the dates designated in this Order. As the stay has been lifted, the parties may engage in discovery. However, the parties may not amend their infringement and invalidity contentions without leave of Court. The parties are further ORDERED to attend mediation before 5-21-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/04/13. cc:attys 3-05-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 2/25/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign in Sheet) (cwk) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
          Opposed MOTION to Join Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. as Plaintiff by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 191 Motion to Lift Stay and Set Case Management Conference. These cases are hereby set for a case management conference on 2-25-2013, at 2:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/13. cc:attys 1-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE by BMC Software, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE in Support re 191 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE to Motion re 191 Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Digital River, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                      Opposed MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND NOTICE OF READINESS FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Order dismissing California Action, # 2 Exhibit B - Markman Hearing transcript, # 3 Exhibit C - Claim Construction Order, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 189 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Any and all claims and/or counterclaims between pltfs and deft Autodesk Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs and Defendant Autodesk, Inc. shall each bear their own attorneys fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/17/12. cc:attys 1-18-12(mll, ) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Blank 189 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Autodesk, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                              LREF
                              Blank 189
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 181 Motion to Stay. This civil action, including all discovery, is STAYED until further order of the Court, pending resolution of the California Action filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Corp. Pty, Ltd., and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to administratively close this case. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/11. cc:attys 12-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER. The Court advises the parties that it does not accept communications to the Court outside of CM/ECF filings. Any letters, faxes, or other communications that have not been specifically requested by the Court will be disregarded. All arguments and communications to the Court shall be made through formal CM/ECF filings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/11. cc:attys 11-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 185 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims in this action by pltfs against deft Intuit Inc are dismissed with prejudice. All counter-claims by deft against pltfs are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/11. cc:attys 11-28-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Intuit Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 10/19/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 91 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 183 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                            SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 182 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Infringement Contentions for Defendant Digital River, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Leave to File Amended Infringement Contentions for Defendant Digital River, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                Joint MOTION to Stay All Above Actions (and on Behalf of and Permission with All Defendants) by Autodesk, Inc.,, Digital River, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit, Inc., Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 179 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter between Uniloc and Defendant Autodesk are stayed through and including 12-12-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/08/11. cc:attys 11-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Agreed MOTION to Stay of All Deadlines for Defendant Autodesk, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER. This provisional claim construction Order sets forth the Courts initial constructions for the disputed claim terms in U.S. Patent No. 5,490,216. The Court will issue a Memorandum Opinion, including a full analysis of the disputed claim terms, at a later date. The Court may modify these provisional constructions when it issues the Memorandum Opinion. ThisOrder is intended to serve as a guideline and framework with which the parties may proceed at an earlier point in the litigation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/11. cc:attys 11-04-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 176 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft BMC Software Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/31/11. cc:attys 11-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant BMC Software, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $14,850.00 to Michael T. McLemore for services rendered and expenses incurred through 10-19-2011 as Technical Advisor to the Court, for a total amount of $29,700.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/11. cc:attys 10-26-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 10/19/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER that as time allows, the Court will hear argument on all currently pending motions at the Markman hearing scheduled for 10-19-2011 at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/12/11. cc:attys 10-13-11(mll, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE by Intuit, Inc. NOTICE OF TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL (Ribera, Hector) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Estimated Amount of Time Required for Markman Hearing (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        REPLY to 156 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit G)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER appointing Michael T. McLemore, 10333 Richmond Ave., Suite 1100, Houston, Texas 77042, to the position of technical advisor in this case with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/4/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 166 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter between Uniloc and BMC are stayed through 11-07-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/04/11. cc:attys 10-04-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Agreed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines with Defendant BMC Software, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Autodesk, Inc.'s Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Autodesk, Inc.,.(Tangri, Ragesh) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 164 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 163 Reply to Claim Construction Brief,. (Attachments: # 1 DECL OF HECTOR RIBERA AND EXHIBIT "A" TO RIBERA DECLARATION)(Mewes, Heather) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    REPLY to 156 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by Autodesk, Inc.,, Digital River, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Mewes, Heather) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 158 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines in this matter are stayed to 9-30-2011 for BMC Software Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER. The Court intends to appoint Michael T. McLemore to the position of technical advisor in this case. Any objection to the appointment shall be presented to the Court for in camera review within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-23-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eugene Novikov for Autodesk, Inc., (mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER denying 51 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/20/11. cc:attys 9-21-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Agreed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines with Defendant BMC Software, Inc. by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 155 Motion to withdraw; withdrawing 146 Motion for Leave. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/13/11. cc:attys 9-13-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D1, # 6 Exhibit D2, # 7 Exhibit D3, # 8 Exhibit D4, # 9 Exhibit D5, # 10 Exhibit D6, # 11 Exhibit D7, part 1, # 12 Exhibit D7, part 2, # 13 Exhibit D8, # 14 Exhibit D9, # 15 Exhibit E, # 16 Exhibit F)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/15/2011: # 17 Exhibit E Searchable, # 18 Exhibit F Searchable) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Approve the Joint Stipulation to Address Issues in Markman Proceedings and to Withdraw Docket No. 146 re 146 MOTION for Leave to Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising form the Recent Reexamination, in the Upcoming Claim Construction Proceedings by Intuit, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 149 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 145 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot 111 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ragesh K Tangri for Autodesk, Inc., (mll, ) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Clement S Roberts for Autodesk, Inc., (mll, ) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael H Page for Autodesk, Inc., (mll, ) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 145 MOTION to Strike Previously Construed Claim Terms From the Parties' P.R. 4-3 Statement by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 147 Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Mediation. The mediation deadline is extended to 9-15-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/11. cc:attys 9-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Conduct Mediation by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Address File History Disclaimer Issues, Arising form the Recent Reexamination, in the Upcoming Claim Construction Proceedings by Intuit, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Claim Construction Letter, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Alternate Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Previously Construed Claim Terms From the Parties' P.R. 4-3 Statement by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of Filing of Patent Rule 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 140 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 110 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/29/11. cc:attys 8-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/29/11. cc:attys 8-29-11(mll, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 138 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defts shall have to 9-16-2011 to comply with PR 3-3 and 3-4. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/29/11. cc:attys 8-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION to Withdraw 110 MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Patent Rule 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures by BMC Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Steven) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Autodesk, Inc., re P.R. 4-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Amended Infringement Contentions for Defendant Autodesk, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 132 Motion for Extension of Time. Deft Digital River, Inc shall have to 8-26-2011 to file its Opposition to pltfs' Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time. Deft Autodesk, Inc shall have to 8-26-2011 to file its Opposition to pltfs' Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 129 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 110 MOTION for Protective Order; Responses due by 8/26/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/11. cc:attys 8-23-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order by Digital River, Inc.. (Yang, Mathew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (mll, ). (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order by Autodesk, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Rudolph) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Digital River, Inc. of Patent Rule 3-3, 3-4, 4-1, and Additional Disclosures (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 124 Motion for Extension of Time. The first mediation deadline for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, and Defendants Aspyr Media, Inc., Digital River, Inc., GEAR Software, Inc. and GEAR Software Holdings, Inc. is extended to 9-01-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/11. cc:attys 8-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying without prejudice 45 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/16/11. cc:attys 8-18-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Amended Infringement Contentions for Defendant Intuit, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BMC Software, Inc. re Proposed Claim Terms (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Extend the First Mediation Deadline by Digital River, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Electronic Arts, Inc. re PR 3-3, 3-4, 4-1 and Additional Disclosures (Henson, Walter) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Intuit, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Ribera, Hector) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Autodesk, Inc., re PR 3-3, 3-4, 4-1 and Additional Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 118 Motion for Appointment of Additional Mediator. Harlan A. Martin of JAMS is appointed as mediator for purposes of mediation between plaintiffs and Autodesk only. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/15/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Amended Infringement Contentions for Defendant BMC Software, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION For Appointment of Additional Mediator by Autodesk, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Technical Advisor (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Mediation by Harlan Martin. Mediation result: The mediator will continue to work with the parties to reach a resolution(Martin, Harlan) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. of United States Patent Office's Notice of Intent to Issue Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate for Patent-in-Suit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 113 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall have to 8-26-2011 to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/11. cc:attys 8-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Patent Rule 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures by BMC Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Steven) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Digital River, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/22/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time. The first mediation deadline for Digital River, Inc. is extended 14 days to 8-13-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/02/11. cc:attys 8-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline by which Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. must conduct first mediation is hereby extended to 8-11-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/02/11. cc:attys 8-02-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Electronic Arts, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Henson, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 104 .***NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Intuit, Inc. Re: Initial Disclosure (Ribera, Hector) Modified on 8/2/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BMC Software, Inc. of Compliance of Service of Initial Disclosures (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 106 .***NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Intuit, Inc. re: Initial Disclosures (Ribera, Hector) Document sealed by court. Modified on 8/2/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Digital River, Inc. of Compliance of Initial Disclosures (Yang, Mathew) Modified on 8/2/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Autodesk, Inc., re Initial Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Conduct First Mediation) by Digital River, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 97 Motion to Extend Time. The new deadline for Uniloc and Autodesk Inc's first mediation is 8-13-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/29/11. cc:attys 7-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Conduct First Mediation) by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension to Conduct First Mediation by Autodesk, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frank E Scherkenbach for BMC Software, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion and Status Proceedings held on 4/26/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 51 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2011. (sms, ) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Brannon Latimer on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Latimer, Steven) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 91 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Edward R Nelson, III (Lead), Barry Bumgardner, and Steven Wayne Hartsell for Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Attorney Dean G Bostock and Paul J Hayes terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/11. cc:attys 7-08-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Electronic Arts, Inc. of Voluntary Source Code Disclosure Pursuant to Court's Docket Control Order (Dkt. 134) (Henson, Walter) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Intuit, Inc. of Source Code (Ribera, Hector) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Autodesk, Inc., re Source Code (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BMC Software, Inc. of Source Code (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Gregory S Gewirtz on behalf of Electronic Arts, Inc. (Gewirtz, Gregory) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Lewis Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Electronic Arts, Inc. (of Accused Product Sales Data) (Henson, Walter) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BMC Software, Inc. (Katz, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Autodesk, Inc., re Accused Product Sales Data (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Intuit, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (Ribera, Hector) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Digital River, Inc. Production of Accused Product Sales Data (Yang, Mathew) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Autodesk, Inc., (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/11. cc:attys 6-09-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/07/11. cc:attys 6-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order. Deadline is extended to 6/2/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/3/11. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (PARTIALLY AGREED) by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Courts Order of May 20, 2011, # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Ex B - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Plaintiffs positions), # 3 Text of Proposed Order (Ex C - Proposed Docket Control Order incorporating the Defendants positions))(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Christopher Kenneth Larus on behalf of Digital River, Inc. (Larus, Christopher) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION ENTRY OF DISCOVERY ORDER by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Charles W Goehringer, Jr on behalf of Digital River, Inc. (Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 5/31/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The parties shall submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 5-31-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/20/11. cc:attys 5-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 51 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Support re 51 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Autodesk, Inc.,, BMC Software, Inc., Digital River, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit BMC Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Digital River Declaration, # 3 Affidavit EA Declaration, # 4 Affidavit Intuit Declaration, # 5 Affidavit Autodesk Declaration)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      4.26.11 Minute Entry - Status Conf: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 4/26/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 51 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) ; Replies due by 4/29/2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/27/11. cc:attys 4-27-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kurt L Glitzenstein for BMC Software, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven R Katz for BMC Software, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. re 58 Order, Set Hearings,, of In Camera Submission (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by BMC Software, Inc. re 53 Notice (Other) Response to Uniloc's Notice That Case Is Ready For Status Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Healey, David) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Autodesk, Inc.,, BMC Software, Inc., Digital River, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul J Hayes (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 4/26/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. By 4-25-2011 at 9:00 a.m., pltfs shall submit, for in camera review, a table summarizing the licenses or settlements reached in the instant or prior cases involving the patents-in-suit. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/20/11. cc:attys 4-20-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 51 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) of Michael Lin filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 51 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) of Dean G. Bostock filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 51 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - G)(Hayes, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD*** ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/01/11. cc:attys 4-04-11(mll, ) Modified on 4/4/2011 (mll, ). (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Uniloc USA, Inc. that Case is Ready for Status Conference (Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Support re 45 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/27/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Change Venue Under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Autodesk, Inc.,, BMC Software, Inc., Digital River, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Sony motion to transfer, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Sony reply ISO motion to transfer, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Sony response to sur-reply ISO motion to transfer, # 4 Exhibit 4 - BMC Software, Inc. declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Digital River, Inc. declaration, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Electronic Arts Inc. declaration, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Intuit Inc. declaration, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Autodesk, Inc. declaration, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 49 Motion to Dismiss. All claims in this action against deft CrypKey (Canada) Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/23/11. cc:attys 3-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss CrypKey (Canada), Inc. Without Prejudice by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) filed by Autodesk, Inc.,, BMC Software, Inc., Digital River, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time. Defts shall have to 3-18-2011 to file opposition to pltf's Motion to Substitute. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/11. cc:attys 3-10-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion To Substitute Parties Pursuant To Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(c) by Intuit, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mewes, Heather) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2011: # 2 Text of Proposed Order Corrected) (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Substitute Party Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(c) by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Affidavit of Bradley C. Davis in Support of Motion, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Louis Germer on behalf of Digital River, Inc. (Germer, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mathew J Yang for Digital River, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher K Larus for Digital River, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited's ANSWER to 38 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Digital River, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited's ANSWER to 29 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant BMC Software, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Digital River, Inc. (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant Digital River, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Digital River, Inc..(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited's ANSWER to 34 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Autodesk, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited's ANSWER to 28 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Intuit, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Singapore Private Limited's ANSWER to 24 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc..(Bostock, Dean) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Autodesk, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Autodesk, Inc.,.(Kim, Rudolph) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Autodesk, Inc., Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Kim, Rudolph) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rudolph Y Kim on behalf of Autodesk, Inc., (Kim, Rudolph) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erika L Yawger on behalf of Autodesk, Inc., (Yawger, Erika) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BMC Software, Inc. (Healey, David) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BMC SOFTWARE, INC. ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by BMC Software, Inc..(Healey, David) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Intuit Inc's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Intuit, Inc..(Ribera, Hector) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A Jacobs on behalf of Autodesk, Inc., (Jacobs, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Fahd K Majiduddin for Electronic Arts, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Henson, Walter) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by Electronic Arts, Inc..(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Digital River, Inc..( Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Intuit, Inc. on 12/6/2010, by cert mail. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Raymond Churchill for Electronic Arts, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory S Gewirtz for Electronic Arts, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Autodesk, Inc.,.( Jeu, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice shall be filed within five days of the last remaining defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/21/10. cc:attys 12-21-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Electronic Arts, Inc..( Henson, Walter) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intuit, Inc. (Ribera, Hector) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of Intuit, Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather Nicole Mewes on behalf of Intuit, Inc. (Mewes, Heather) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hector Ribera on behalf of Intuit, Inc. (Ribera, Hector) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Intuit, Inc..( Ribera, Hector) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE ENTRY 12 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT. *** Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Intuit, Inc..( Ribera, Hector) Modified on 12/17/2010 (gsg). (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BMC Software, Inc..( Healey, David) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to BMC Software, Inc. on 12/6/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/27/2010. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2010: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ). (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Autodesk, Inc., on 12/6/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/27/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to Electronic Arts, Inc. on 12/6/2010, by cert mail; answer due: 12/27/2010. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Autodesk, Inc.,, BMC Software, Inc., Crypkey (Canada), Inc., Digital River, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Autodesk, Inc.,, BMC Software, Inc., Crypkey (Canada), Inc., Digital River, Inc., Electronic Arts, Inc., Intuit, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2782637.), filed by Uniloc Singapore Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 356 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?