Personal Audio, LLC v. Apple Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00531
District Judge Ron Clark, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 8:16 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Personal Audio LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Louis Germer +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 llgermer@germer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 4 Joint Motion for judgment of dismissal. All claims by pltf Personal Audio LLC against deft Apple Inc are dismissed with prejudice. All counterclaims by deft against pltf are dismissed without prejudice. Attorney's fees, costs of court, and expenses will be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/21/11. (tkd, ) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Judgment of Dismissal Between Plaintiff, Personal Audio, LLC and Defendant, Apple, Inc. by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goehringer, Charles) Modified on 12/21/2011 (tkd, ). (Entered: 12/21/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc. and emailed to pla's atty for service (aam, ) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Personal Audio, LLC (Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
          COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,509,178 against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3274565.), filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goehringer, Charles) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 179 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?