State of Texas, et al v. Alabama-Coushatta, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 9:01-cv-00299

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 25, 2021 at 5:29 PM DT (1.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo State of Texas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/16/2016 Joseph Virgil Crawford +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 463 2063

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Texas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Raphael Abrams +1 512 475 4103 +1 512 320 0667 Michael.Abrams@texasattorneygeneral.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Terrell Deane +1 512 463 2120 +1 512 320 0667 bill.deane@oag.state.tx.us
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Marie Mackin +1 512 475 4074 +1 512 320 0667 anna.mackin@oag.texas.gov
No Logo State of Texas, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/16/2016 Joseph Virgil Crawford +1 512 936 1400 +1 512 463 2063
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Terrell Deane +1 512 463 2120 +1 512 320 0667 bill.deane@oag.state.tx.us
v.
No Logo Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott D Crowell +1 509 474 1265 scottcrowell@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R Lundgren +1 541 347 1432 +1 541 347 9528

Toggle Switch Represented by General Counsel Alabama Coushatta Tribe of Texas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris Allen Rule +1 936 563 1100 +1 936 563 1139

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danny S Ashby +1 214 466 4118 +1 214 466 4001 danny.ashby@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ingram Monteiro +1 214 466 4000 +1 214 466 4001 david.monteiro@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Roel Chapa +1 214 466 4000 +1 214 466 4001 justin.chapa@morganlewis.com
No Logo John Cornyn, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Alabama-Coushatta Tribal Council, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott D Crowell +1 509 474 1265 scottcrowell@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by General Counsel Alabama Coushatta Tribe of Texas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris Allen Rule +1 936 563 1100 +1 936 563 1139

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danny S Ashby +1 214 466 4118 +1 214 466 4001 danny.ashby@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ingram Monteiro +1 214 466 4000 +1 214 466 4001 david.monteiro@morganlewis.com
No Logo Joe Bergen, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Kevin Battise, Counter-Defendant
  Entries (186) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Trial Brief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/14/2021, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None Admitted Exhibits List
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Admitted Exhibits List
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Transcript/Digital Audio Recording Request
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Witness List
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Bench Trial - Completed
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Transcript/Digital Audio Recording Request
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Witness List
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Continue
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Stipulation
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Witness List
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Show Cause
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/18/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 129 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Report of Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Order of Reference (Title 28 U.S.C. 636(c))
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ron Clark for all further proceedings. Judge Michael H. Schneider no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 9/13/2016. (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Set Aside Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 68 Tribe's Consent Motion to Amend the Caption. The Court instructs the Clerk of Court to amend the caption to change the name of Defendant "Alabama-Coushatta Tribes of Texas" to "Alabama-Coushatta Tribe of Texas". Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 8/18/16. (ljw, ) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION to Amend the Caption by Alabama-Coushatta Tribes of Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ashby, Danny) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/3/2016. (bjc, ) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order by The State of Texas and by Alabama-Coushatta Tribes of Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ashby, Danny) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 56 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney William T. DeaneOpposed MOTION to Realign the Parties Stating Tribe's Non-Opposition to Realignment of Parties filed by Alabama-Coushatta Tribes of Texas. (Ashby, Danny) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Realign the Parties by the State of Texas and by Alabama-Coushatta Tribes of Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ashby, Danny) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 56 Opposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney William T. DeaneOpposed MOTION to Realign the Parties Stating Tribe's Non-Opposition to State's Substitution of Counsel filed by Alabama-Coushatta Tribes of Texas. (Ashby, Danny) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Danny Scot Ashby on behalf of Alabama-Coushatta Tribes of Texas (Ashby, Danny) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Roel Chapa on behalf of Alabama-Coushatta Tribes of Texas (Chapa, Justin) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Ingram Monteiro on behalf of Alabama-Coushatta Tribes of Texas (Monteiro, David) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Scot Ashby on behalf of Alabama-Coushatta Tribes of Texas (Ashby, Danny) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Raphael Abrams on behalf of State of Texas (Abrams, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anne Marie Mackin on behalf of State of Texas (Mackin, Anne) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposed MOTION to Withdraw Counsel and Designation of Attorney in Charge, And to Realign the Parties by State of Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deane, William) Modified on 6/27/2016 (ljw, ). (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Bill of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002 Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 4,082 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?