American Video Graphics, L.P. v. Sony Corporation of America et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:04-cv-00399

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 1:31 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Video Graphics, LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam Baxter +1 903 927 2111 +1 903 927 2622 sbaxter@mckoolsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mike McKool mmckool@mckoolsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T. Gordon White +1 512 692 8700 gwhite@mckoolsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Carter jcarter@mckoolsmith.com
No Logo American Video Graphics, LP, Counter-Claimant
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, Visiocorp
Unknown Role, Immersion Corp
Unknown Role, Avanade Inc.
v.
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, Visiocorp
Unknown Role, Immersion Corp
Unknown Role, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Healey , +1 713 654 5310 +1 713 652 0154 healey@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael B Eisenberg +1 212 506 1780 +1 212 506 1800 meisenberg@kosowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy Marie Allen +1 903 597 8311 +90359304 903 359 3046 cmallen@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2850

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Norma N Bennett +1 713 590 9333 +1 713 590 9399 nbennett@mcfall-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garland T. Stephens +1 212 310 8976 +1 212 310 8007 garland.stephens@weil.com
Nintendo of America, Inc. Nintendo of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Brigham +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 857 0663 mbrigham@cooley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Friel, Jr. +1 415 693 2000 +1 415 693 2222 tfriel@cooley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Scott Teter +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 849 7400 teterts@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melvin R Wilcox, III +1 903 595 1133 +1 903 595 0191 mrw@yw-lawfirm.com
Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Flock +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 jflock@kenyon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dalia S Grimberg +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 dgrimberg@kenyon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Greg A Paradise +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 gparadise@kenyon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lupco +1 212 336 2610 +1 212 336 1265 lpopovski@pbwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melvin R Wilcox, III +1 903 595 1133 +1 903 595 0191 mrw@yw-lawfirm.com
Sony Corporation of America Sony Corporation of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE John Flock +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 jflock@kenyon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Richard S. Gresalfi +1 212 908 6213 +1 212 425 5288 rgresalfi@kenyon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Dalia S Grimberg +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 dgrimberg@kenyon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Greg A Paradise +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 gparadise@kenyon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jane Marie Metcalf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Lupco +1 212 336 2610 +1 212 336 1265 lpopovski@pbwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melvin R Wilcox, III +1 903 595 1133 +1 903 595 0191 mrw@yw-lawfirm.com
Sony Online Entertainment Inc. Sony Online Entertainment Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Flock +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 jflock@kenyon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S. Gresalfi +1 212 908 6213 +1 212 425 5288 rgresalfi@kenyon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dalia S Grimberg +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 dgrimberg@kenyon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Greg A Paradise +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 gparadise@kenyon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lupco +1 212 336 2610 +1 212 336 1265 lpopovski@pbwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melvin R Wilcox, III +1 903 595 1133 +1 903 595 0191 mrw@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo American Video Graphics, LP, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Ati Technologies Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
NVIDIA Corporation NVIDIA Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Ati Technologies Inc., Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virgil Bryan Medlock, Jr. +1 312 463 5000 +1 312 463 5001 bmedlock@bannerwitcoff.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tung Thanh Nguyen +1 214 981 3300 +1 214 981 3400 tnguyen@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sterne Kessler Goldstein & Fox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael B Ray +1 202 772 8569 +1 202 371 2540 mray@skgf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine Isabelle Casey Rajwani +1 508 842 9244 +1 508 842 9311 crajwani@harborlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Gale R. Peterson, Technical Advisor
NVIDIA Corporation NVIDIA Corporation, Intervenor Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Intel Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Robert Hulse +1 408 653 6570 +1 408 218 4284 matthew.hulse@intel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Collin Michael Maloney +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2005 Marilee S Chan mschan@townsend.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J Furniss +1 650 326 2400 +1 650 326 2422 djfurniss@townsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Susan S Soussan, Mediator
  Entries (203) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying all pending motions and closing case per Notice of Settlement; re 202 Notice (Other), Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/29/06. (mjc ) (Entered: 12/29/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
    NOTICE: The Court, having been advised that this case has settled, puts the parties on notice that unless a Motion and Proposed Order for Dismissal is filed within 30 days of the date of this Notice, the Court will DISMISS this case with prejudice on its own motion. (rlf, ) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
      NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Withdrawal of Cindy M. Allen (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
        NOTICE by American Video Graphics, L.P. REPORT OF GLOBAL SETTLEMENT STATUS (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
          STIPULATION AND ORDER WITH PREJUDICE OF CLAIMS BETWEEN PLAINITFF AND DEFENDANT SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT AMERICA INC, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2): All claims brought by AVG against Sony and all claims brought by Sony against AVG, in this civil action are dismissed with prejudice; Each settling party, AVG and Sony, shall bear its own expenses, costs of court, and attorneys' fees; All other claims, counterclaims, and other causes of action brought by either AVG or Sony against any other party in this case are not affected by this ORDER. Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/7/06. (fnt, ) (Entered: 02/07/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: None
            STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/06/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER re 196 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by American Video Graphics, L.P., Nintendo of America, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2): All claims brought by AVG against Nintendo and all claims brought by Nintendo against AVG, in this civil action are dismissed with prejudice; Each party, AVG and Nintendo, shall bear its own expenses, costs of court, and attorney's fees; All other claims, counterclaims, and other causes of action brought by either AVG or Nintendo against any other party in this case are not affected by this ORDER. Nintendo of America, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/23/06. (fnt, ) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 196 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: None
                STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by American Video Graphics, L.P., Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER re 194 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by American Video Graphics, L.P.,ATI Technologies Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2): All claims brought by AVG against ATI Technologies Inc and all claims brought by ATI Technologies, Inc against AVG, in this civil action are dismissed with prejudice; Each party settling party, AVG and ATI Technologies, Inc, shall bear its own expenses, costs of court, and attorney's fees; All other claims, counterclaims, and other causes of action brought by either AVG or ATI Technologies Inc against any other party in this case are not affected by this ORDER. ATI Technologies Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/13/06. (fnt, ) Modified on 1/17/2006 (fnt, ). (Entered: 01/17/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by ATI Technologies Inc., American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER re 192 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Microsoft Corporation,, American Video Graphics, L.P.,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2): All claims brought by AVG against Microsoft Corporation and all claims brought by Microsoft Corporation against AVG, in this civil action are dismissed with prejudice; Each party settling party, AVG and Microsoft Corporation, shall bear its own expenses, costs of court, and attorney's fees; All other claims, counterclaims, and other causes of action brought by either AVG or Microsoft Corporation against any other party in this case are not affected by this ORDER. Microsoft Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/10/06. (fnt, ) Modified on 1/17/2006 (fnt, ). (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by American Video Graphics, L.P., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER re 190 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by American Video Graphics, L.P.,, nVidia Corporation,, nVidia Corporation; nVidia Corporation and nVidia Corporation terminated. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2): All claims brought by AVG against NVIDIA and all claims brought by NVIDIA against AVG, in this civil action are dismissed with prejudice; Each party settling party, AVG and NVIDIA, shall bear its own expenses, costs of court, and attorney's fees; All other claims, counterclaims,and other causes of action brought by either AVG or NVIDIA against any other party in this case are not affected by this ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/9/06. (fnt, ) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by nVidia Corporation, American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 188 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. Opening Brief and Evidence for AVG's Claim Construction pursuant to PR 4-5(a) due 12/19/05; Comply with PR 4-5(b)- Responsive brief and supporting evidence due 1/9/06; AVG's Reply brief and evidence re: Claim Construction response due 1/17/06; Deadline for parties, if they desire, to provide Court with tutorials concerning technology involved in patent due 1/10/06; Privilege Logs to be produced, or a letter to the Court outlining any claims of disputes or that there are no disputes as to privilege logs due 1/12/06; Defendants will produce their respective financial information by 1/18/06; Parties to submit an agenda with Markman hearing time estimates by 1/19/06; Comply with PR 3-8 furnishing documents and privilege logs pertaining to willful infringement by 5/5/06. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/8/05. (fnt, ) Modified on 11/8/2005 (fnt, ). (Entered: 11/08/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: None
                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Certain Deadlines in this Case Pending the Outcome of Settlement Negotiations Between Certain of the Parties by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 11/04/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 186 Motion to Amend/Correct . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/2/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                    Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Set Deadlines/Hearings UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY THE AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING DEADLINES FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING AND FOR CONSOLIDATED BRIEFING by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: None
                                      BRIEF filed JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/23/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
                                        First Amended ANSWER to Counterclaim by ATI Technologies Inc..(Rajwani, Catherine) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 182 Motion to modify the deadline. The Court hereby adopts the modification proposed by the Parties and amends the Amended Docket Control Order as follows: September 23, 2005: Comply with P.R. 4-3 - Filing of joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/12/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None
                                            Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 157 Scheduling Order,, JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING THE DATE FOR SUBMITTING THE JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., ATI Technologies Inc., nVidia Corporation, American Video Graphics, L.P., Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/09/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 180 Joint Motion to Amend Discovery Schedule. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/1/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 09/02/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                Joint MOTION for Discovery Joint Motion to Amend Discovery Schedule by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by American Video Graphics, L.P. American Video Graphics, L.P.'s Notice of Compliance With P.R. 4-2 (Carter, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/26/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., ATI Technologies Inc., nVidia Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc. Under Local Patent Rule 4-2 (Medlock, Virgil) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 175 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. The Court hereby adopts the modification proposed by the Parties and amends the Amended Docket Control Order for Privilege logs to be produced 12/1/05 by the Game Console Dfts . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/19/005. (fnt, ) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 174 Motion to Amend Deadline in the Docket Control Order for Complying with Patent Rule 4-2. The date for complying with Patent Rule 4-2 is hereby moved from August 18, 2005 to August 25, 2005. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/19/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 08/19/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 157 Scheduling Order,, JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER REGARDING THE DATE FOR EXCHANGING PRIVILEGE LOGS OR INFORMING THE COURT REGARDING PRIVILEGE DISPUTES by American Video Graphics, L.P., Sony Corporation of America, Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                            Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct MOTION TO AMEND THE DEADLINE IN THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER FOR COMPLYING WITH PATENT RULE 4-2 by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 5/17/05 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: RM. (fnt, ) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tung Thanh Nguyen on behalf of ATI Technologies Inc. (Nguyen, Tung) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER denying 162 Sealed Motion . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/27/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 07/27/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew R Hulse for nVidia Corporation. Approved 7/22/05 by F Thompson(fnt, ) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 169 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                      Sealed Document. Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc's Reply to American Video Graphics, L.P Oppositon (fnt, ) Modified on 7/19/2005 (fnt, ). (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 168 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        Sealed Document. AVG, LP's Opposition to Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc Motion for Reconsideration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit A - B# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(fnt, ) Modified on 7/11/2005 (fnt, ). (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 158 Motion to Overrule ATI's Objections to AVG's Experts without prejudice to ATI raising specific objections to any of AVG's experts within three days of this Order . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/28/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., nVidia Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc. Intervenors and Defendants' Notice of Disclosure Under Local Patent Rule 4-1 (Nguyen, Tung) (Entered: 06/28/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by ATI Technologies Inc. Intervenors and Defendants' Notice of Disclosure under Local Patent Rule 4-1 (Medlock, Virgil) (Entered: 06/28/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by American Video Graphics, L.P. PLAINTIFF AMERICAN VIDEO GRAPHICS, L.P.'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 4-1 (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 06/28/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 158 MOTION AVG's Motion to Overrule ATI's Objections to AVG's Experts filed by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 162 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                    SEALED MOTION For Reconsideration by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rvw, ) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 158 MOTION AVG's Motion to Overrule ATI's Objections to AVG's Experts filed by ATI Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Medlock, Virgil) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Summary Judgment Proceedings held on 4/26/05, at 1:34 PM, before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: SS. (fnt, ) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 159 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on docket #75 and #140. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/9/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 06/09/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION AVG's Motion to Overrule ATI's Objections to AVG's Experts by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas G. Fasone III# 2 Exhibit A-E4# 3 Exhibit E5-E11# 4 Exhibit E12-E18# 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL/SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2006 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Amended Pleadings due by 7/28/2006 (after Markman hearing).Discovery due by 6/30/2006. Expert Witness List due by 5/1/2006. Identify trial witnesses by 7/28/2006 Jury instructions due by 9/11/2006 Jury Selection set for 11/27/2006 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Mediation Completion due by 8/1/2005. Motions due by 8/11/2006.Proposed Findings of Fact due by 9/11/2006 Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/11/2006. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/2/05. (fnt, ) Modified on 6/2/2005 (fnt, ). (Entered: 06/02/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER the parties to mediate this case no later than August 1, 2005. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/31/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER the Court APPOINTS Pete Peterson as technical consultant to the Court in these actions, with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/23/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael B Eisenberg for Microsoft Corporation. Approved 5/19/05 (fnt, ) (Entered: 05/19/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER denying 139 Motion for Leave to File, denying 142 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Court grants the Intervenors in the in the 6:04cv399 case . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/19/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 05/19/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis on 5/17/2005: Motion Hearing re 142 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 6:04-CV-399 and 2:05-CV-120 filed by Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., ATI Technologies Inc., nVidia Corporation,, 139 MOTION for Leave to File nVidia Corporation's and ATI Technologies Inc.'s Motion to File First Amended Complaints in Intervention filed by ATI Technologies Inc., nVidia Corporation, and Status Conference. (Court Reporter Ron Mason.) (rlf, ) Modified on 5/18/2005 to correct file date (rlf, ). (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Garland T Stephens for Microsoft Corporation. Approved 5/16/05 (fnt, ) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 139 MOTION for Leave to File nVidia Corporation's and ATI Technologies Inc.'s Motion to File First Amended Complaints in Intervention filed by nVidia Corporation. (Artuz, Robert) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 142 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 6:04-CV-399 and 2:05-CV-120 filed by Sony Online Entertainment, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., ATI Technologies Inc., nVidia Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Healey, David) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE by American Video Graphics, L.P. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 139 MOTION for Leave to File nVidia Corporation's and ATI Technologies Inc.'s Motion to File First Amended Complaints in Intervention filed by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 142 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 6:04-CV-399 and 2:05-CV-120 American Video Graphics, L.P.'s Opposition to Defendants' and Intervenors' Motion to Consolidate filed by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Dowling# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER Status Conference set for 5/17/2005 02:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/6/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by American Video Graphics, L.P. Notice of Damage Computation Disclosure (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis : Motion Hearing held on 4/26/2005 re 75 SEALED MOTION (for Summary Judgment) filed by Sony Online Entertainment, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Consolidate Cases 6:04-CV-399 and 2:05-CV-120 by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., ATI Technologies Inc., nVidia Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 141 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY BRIEF in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.. (fnt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2011: # 1 Sealed Brief) (dlk, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2011: # 2 Declaration; Exhibit "A", # 4 Exhibits "B" through "G", # 5 Exhibit "H", # 6 Exhibits "I" through "O") (dlk, ). (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 140 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.. (fnt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2011: # 1 Sealed Motion) (dlk, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2011: # 2 Declaration; Exhibits "A" through "H", # 3 Exhibits "I" through "M", # 4 Exhibits "N" through "R") (dlk, ). (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File nVidia Corporation's and ATI Technologies Inc.'s Motion to File First Amended Complaints in Intervention by ATI Technologies Inc., nVidia Corporation, ATI Technologies Inc., ATI Technologies Inc., nVidia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 135 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/22/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 136 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/22/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Sony's MSJ by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed-in Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Sony's MSJ by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDERS Sony to refile its Motions for Summary Judgment by Friday, April 22, 2005. The Court Furhter ORDERS Sony to provide the Court with hearing notebooks, as described in the Court's Docket Control Order, when Sony files its replies to AVG's responses by 5 PM, on Friday, April 22, 2005. Because the patents overlap, Sony is excused from providing the Court notebooks in the 6:04cv399 case. Motions due by 4/22/2005. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/19/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 04/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              (SEALED) RESPONSE in Opposition re 75 SEALED MOTION filed by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(fnt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2011: # 2 Sealed Response) (dlk, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2011: # 3 Exhibits A, B, B1 and B2, # 4 Exhibit B.3, # 5 Exhibits B.4 - B.17, # 6 Exhibits B.18 - B.23, # 7 Exhibit B.24) (dlk, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2011: # 8 Exhibits B.25 - B.33, # 9 Exhibits B.34 - B.51) (dlk, ). (Entered: 04/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER CLARIFYING AND AMENDING THE DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/18/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  AGREED ORDER TO AMEND THE DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/18/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Discovery Joint Motion to Clarify and Amend the Discovery Order by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Discovery Joint Motion to Amend the Discovery Order by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Norma N Bennett for Microsoft Corporation. (fnt, ) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey A Carter on behalf of American Video Graphics, L.P. (Carter, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis : Status Conference held on 4/7/2005. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of American Video Graphics, L.P. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF filed Agreed Proposed Agenda for April 7, 2005 Status Conference by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael B Ray for ATI Technologies Inc.. Approved 3/15/05 (fnt, ) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., ATI Technologies Inc., nVidia Corporation, Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc. of Joint Preliminary Invalidity Contentions Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 3-3 (Tarnay, Thomas) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by ATI Technologies Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Medlock, Virgil) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by nVidia Corporation, nVidia Corporation (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 116 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, granting 116 Motion to Take Deposition from Sony Corp, Counsel for Sony Computer Entertainment of America, Inc . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/7/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference Proceedings held on 1/10/05 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Ron Mason. (fnt, ) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, MOTION to Take Deposition in Japan of Sony Corporation by an Official of the Consulate General of the United States by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corporation (Healey, David) (Entered: 03/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Counterclaim to Second Amended Complaint by American Video Graphics, L.P..(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan S Soussan. (fnt, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 80 Motion for Hearing, denying 104 Motion for Hearing, denying 107 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as MOOT. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/23/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 91 Sealed Motion. The Courts GRANTS AVG a 45-day continuance for the parties to complete discovery related to the summary judgment motions. The Court ORDERS AVG to respond to Sony's motion for summary judgment by 5 PM on Monday, April 18, 2005. Sony may reply to AVG's response by 12 PM on Monday, April 25, 2005. The Court will hear arguments regarding Sony's motions at 10 AM on Wednesday, April 27, 2005 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/18/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against American Video Graphics, L.P. by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '520 Patent)(Healey, David) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, by Nintendo of America, Inc..(Friel, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint Second by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc..(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Reply in Support of Motion for Continuance by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.. (fnt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2011: # 1 Sealed Response) (dlk, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2011: # 2 Sealed Declaration, Exhibits A and B) (dlk, ). (Entered: 02/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark S Raskin for Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. Approved 2/15/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Hearing on AVG's Motion for Continuance by Sony Online Entertainment, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.. (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 103 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER, dismissing without prejudice Sony Online Entertainment, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/15/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 101 Motion for Leave to File under seal its response to plaintiff, AVG's Motion for a Continuance . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/15/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Their Response to AVG's Motion for a Continuance by Sony Online Entertainment, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.. (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 02/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Sony Online Entertainment, Inc., American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Nintendo of America, Inc. Notice of Initial Disclosures (Friel, Thomas) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/9/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Protective Order by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Susan S Soussan added as Mediator. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/7/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 02/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Sony Online Entertainment, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc., filed by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 92 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Protective Order. The parties request an additional week, or until Monday, February 7, 2005, in which to submit the proposed order or any disputed terms. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/2/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 02/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by American Video Graphics, L.P. and Sony Corporation of America, et al. of Agreed Proposed Mediator (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 91 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION by American Video Graphics, L.P. (fnt, ) (dlk, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2011: # 1 Proposed Order) (dlk, ). (Entered: 01/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 88 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Motion for Continuance Under Fed R Civ P 56(f) for Response to Sony's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/27/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/05 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Leonard Davis (fnt, ) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Motion for Continuance Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(F) For Response to Sony's Motion for Summary Judgment by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DISMISSING THE '690 CLAIMS IN THE PC CASE CONSOLIDATING THE '690 CLAIMS IN THE GAME CONSOLE CASE INTO THE GAME PUBLISHER CASE, AND DISMISSING THE '690 CLAIMS IN THE GAME CONSOLE CASE. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/21/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melvin R Wilcox, III on behalf of Sony Online Entertainment, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by American Video Graphics, L.P. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 83 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Sony's Motion for Summary Judgment Responses due by 1/27/2005. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/20/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Sony's Motion for Summary Judgment by Sony Online Entertainment, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis : Scheduling Conference held on 1/10/2005. (Court Reporter Ron Mason.) (rlf, ) (Entered: 01/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      nVidia Corporation's ANSWER to Counterclaim AVG's Counterclaims by nVidia Corporation, nVidia Corporation.(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Hearing on Summary Judgment Under Seal by Sony Online Entertainment, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.. (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of American Video Graphics, L.P. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 65 Answer to Intervenor Complaint, Counterclaim REPLY TO AVG'S COUNTERCLAIMS by ATI Technologies Inc.. (Medlock, Virgil) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 70 Motion for Leave to File . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/10/05. (fnt, ) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 75 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION by Sony Online Entertainment, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.. (fnt, ) (dlk, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2011: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Sealed Declaration, Exhibits A - I, # 3 Sealed Exhibits "J" through "P") (dlk, ). (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Online Entertainment, Inc. (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Sony Online Entertainment, Inc..(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc..(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 01/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal by Sony Online Entertainment, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 01/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by American Video Graphics, L.P., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Counterclaim of Microsoft by American Video Graphics, L.P..(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 01/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marilee S Chan for nVidia Corporation. (fnt, ) (Entered: 12/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against nVidia Corporation by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against ATI Technologies Inc. by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***ANSWER to Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against ATI Technologies Inc. by American Video Graphics, L.P..(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 12/20/2004 (fal, ). (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ATI Technologies Inc. (Medlock, Virgil) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by nVidia Corporation (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 55 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of deft Sony Corporation of America filed by American Video Graphics, L.P.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nintendo of America, Inc. (Friel, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Nintendo of America, Inc..(Friel, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas J Friel Jr on behalf of Nintendo of America, Inc. (Friel, Thomas) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against American Video Graphics, L.P. by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 5109520# 2 Exhibit B - US 4734690# 3 Exhibit C - US 4761642# 4 Exhibit D - US 4694286# 5 Exhibit E - Complaint v PC Makers)(Healey, David) (Entered: 12/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cindy Marie Allen on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Allen, Cindy) (Entered: 12/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Video Graphics, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Greg A Paradise for Sony Corporation of America. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dalia S Grimberg for Sony Corporation of America. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll Jr on behalf of nVidia Corporation (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll Jr on behalf of nVidia Corporation (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Edwin Jones on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Notice of Scheduling Conference - Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2005 03:00 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/3/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Video Graphics, L.P.. Deft Sony Online Entertainment, Inc. personally served Mary Messina, Business Agent on 11/17/2004 by process server William Galt, answer due 12/7/2004. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Video Graphics, L.P.. Deft Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. personally served Mary Messina, Business Agent served on 11/17/2004 by process server William Golt, answer due 12/7/2004. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Deft Microsoft Corporation answer due 12/15/2004. . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/2/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by ATI Technologies Inc..(Medlock, Virgil) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 27 Amended Complaint, by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Intervenor COMPLAINT INTERVENOR DEFENDANT NVIDIA CORPORATION'S COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION, filed by nVidia Corporation.(Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Nintendo of America, Inc. answer due 12/15/2004; Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. answer due 12/15/2004; Sony Corporation of America answer due 12/15/2004; Sony Online Entertainment, Inc. answer due 12/15/2004., granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Nintendo of America, Inc. answer due 12/15/2004; Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. answer due 12/15/2004; Sony Corporation of America answer due 12/15/2004; Sony Online Entertainment, Inc. answer due 12/15/2004., granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Nintendo of America, Inc. answer due 12/15/2004; Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. answer due 12/15/2004; Sony Corporation of America answer due 12/15/2004; Sony Online Entertainment, Inc. answer due 12/15/2004. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/24/04. (fnt, ) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DATES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, AND DISCOVERY ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/05 at 3:20 PM (fnt, ) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 29 Motion to Intervene by NVIDIA Corp. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/24/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 28 Motion to Intervene by ATI Technologies Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/24/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 30 Motion . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/23/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 27 Amended Complaint, by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 27 Amended Complaint, by Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Sony Online Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 27 Amended Complaint, by Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel J Furniss for nVidia Corporation. (ehs, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/23/2004 (ehs, ). (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll Jr on behalf of nVidia Corporation (Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION to Intervene filed by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 29 MOTION to Intervene filed by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Cawley, Douglas) (Entered: 11/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Request for Oral Hearing for Nvidia Corp.'s Motion to Intervene re 29 MOTION to Intervene by nVidia Corporation. (Maloney, Collin) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Intervene by nVidia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Richard Domingo Declaration# 2 Exhibit Complaint in Intervention# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Otis) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Intervene by ATI Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - ATI's Proposed Complaint in Intervention# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Medlock, Virgil) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sony Online Entertainment, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, filed by American Video Graphics, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Microsoft Corporation answer due 11/29/2004. . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/8/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE IGNORE - DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2005 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 2/14/2005 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 2/14/2005 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis.. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/4/04. (ehs, ) Modified on 11/4/2004 (ehs, ). (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Nintendo of America, Inc. answer due 11/29/2004. . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/4/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Sony Corporation of America answer due 11/29/2004. . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/4/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILED IN ERROR PLEASE DISREGARD - ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL - ordered that the claims against Nurse Jaremy Jones are dismissed without prejudice for failure to obey an order of the Court. Ordered that the statute of limitations for the claims against Jones is suspended for thirty days after the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/4/04. (ehs, ) Modified on 11/4/2004 (ehs, ). (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Timothy S Teter for Nintendo of America, Inc. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew J Brigham for Nintendo of America, Inc. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas J Friel for Nintendo of America, Inc. (ehs, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2004 (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Microsoft Corporation answer due 11/8/2004. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/13/04. cc:attys 10-14-04(mll, ) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lewis V Popovski for Sony Corporation of America. (approved) (mjc ) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard S Gresalfi for Sony Corporation of America. (approved) (mjc ) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John Flock for Sony Corporation of America. (approved) (mjc ) (Entered: 10/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Sony Corporation of America answer due 11/8/2004. . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/1/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Video Graphics, L.P. Sony Corporation of America served on 9/9/2004, answer due 9/29/2004. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Microsoft Corporation answer due 10/19/2004. . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/27/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Nintendo of America, Inc. answer due 11/8/2004. . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/21/04. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David) (Entered: 09/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 09/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 09/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Video Graphics, L.P.. Microsoft Corporation served on 8/30/2004, answer due 9/19/2004. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Video Graphics, L.P.. Nintendo of America, Inc. served on 8/30/2004, answer due 9/19/2004. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc., Sony Corporation of America (Filing fee $ 150.) , filed by American Video Graphics, L.P.(ehs, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2004 (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 53 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?