Bender v. Burr-Brown et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:06-cv-00221
District Judge David Folsom, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge David Folsom
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Gregory Bender, Plaintiff

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. SCOTT HEMINGWAY +1 214 220 3939
Texas Instruments, Inc. Texas Instruments, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Micron Technology, Inc.

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark John Ziegelbein +1 214 969 3648 mjziegelbein@jonesday.com
v.
Texas Instruments, Inc. Texas Instruments, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Micron Technology, Inc.

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/13/2007 Steven Mark Geiszler +1 214 259 0951 +1 214 259 0910 steven.geiszler@dentons.com

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark John Ziegelbein +1 214 969 3648 mjziegelbein@jonesday.com

Represented by Kajeer Yar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/08/2007 Kajeer Yar +1 918 292 8158 +1 918 292 8158 kyar@yarlawfirm.com

Represented by The Roth Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl R Roth +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 cr@rothfirm.com

Represented by The Stafford Davis Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis +1 903 593 7000 +1 903 705 7369 sdavis@stafforddavisfirm.com
No Logo Gregory Bender, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. SCOTT HEMINGWAY +1 214 220 3939
Other Parties
No Logo Arnold White & Durkee, Technical Advisor
Officially listed as "Michael T McLemore"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Mclemore +1 210 598 8563
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
*** ENTERED IN WRONG CASE PLEASE IGNORE***ORDER granting 76 Motion to Amend Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/5/08. (ehs, ) Modified on 6/5/2008 (ehs, ). (Entered: 06/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - granting 105 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims asserted by Bender against TI are dismissed with prejudice, and all counterclaims asserted by TI against Bender are dismissed without prejudice subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. All attorney fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/28/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER dismissing without prejudice 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/5/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 102 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer filed by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 69 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents and Memorandum in Support, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness : Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2008 01:30 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side shall have 30 minutes for argument.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/17/08. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Gregory Bender of filing Rule 4-5(d) Claim Construction Proposals as Presented in the Plaintiff's Markman Hearing Materials (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE by Gregory Bender of filing the Revised Rule 4-5(d) Joint Claim Construction Proposals (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 69 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents and Memorandum in Support filed by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9)(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom : Markman Hearing held on 12/20/2007. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, ) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom : Tutorial held on 12/19/2007. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, ) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING TI'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE CORRECTED EXHIBIT TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF; granting 85 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/18/07. (mrm, ) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SUR-REPLY BRIEF filed by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 91 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 76 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - the court previously set the technical tutorial for the above captioned cased for 12/19/07 at 2:00 pm. See Case No. 2:06-cv-192 at Dkt. Nos. 14 & 16; Case No. 2:06-cv-221 at Dkt. Nos. 18 & 27. The court hereby orders that each side shall have one hour for presentation of their tutorial. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/17/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 82 Motion for Leave to File A Claim Construction Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/17/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 69 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents and Memorandum in Support filed by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Gregory Bender of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Rule 4-5(d) Claim Construction Chart)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Texas Instruments Inc. of Rule 4-5(d) Claim Construction Chart (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION to Amend/Correct Exhibit to TI's Claim Construction Brief by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Corrected Version of Exhibit 3 to TI's Claim Construction Brief)# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Gregory Bender Non-Opposition for Relief Requested in Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File the Rule 4-6 Chart (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 73 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Claim Construction Sur-Reply by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Sur-Reply Brief)(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 4-6 Chart by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 69 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents and Memorandum in Support filed by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF filed in Reply to Support Its Claim Construction by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/1/2007, Entered: None
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Texas Instruments Inc. re 67 Claim Construction Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1# 2 Exhibit #2 (Part 1 of 4)# 3 Exhibit #2 (Part 2 of 4)# 4 Exhibit #2 (Part 3 of 4)# 5 Exhibit #2 (Part 4 of 4)# 6 Exhibit #3 (Part 1 of 2)# 7 Exhibit #3 (Part 2 of 2)# 8 Exhibit #4# 9 Exhibit #5# 10 Exhibit #6# 11 Exhibit #7# 12 Exhibit #8# 13 Exhibit #9# 14 Exhibit #10# 15 Exhibit #11# 16 Exhibit #12# 17 Exhibit #13# 18 Exhibit #14# 19 Exhibit #15# 20 Exhibit #16# 21 Exhibit #17# 22 Exhibit #18# 23 Exhibit #19# 24 Exhibit #20)(Ziegelbein, Mark) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2007 (mrm, ). (Entered: 12/01/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING TI'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT granting 74 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; (As per Local Rule CV 7(j) the movant shall immediately re-file the permitted document in the court's CM/ECF database.). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/30/07. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION to Amend/Correct the Preliminary Infringement Contentions by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Hemingway, D) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2007 (sm, ). (Entered: 11/29/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF; granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to File the Reply to Claim Construction Brief; Brief due 12/5/07. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/29/07. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Claim Construction by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 1# 3 Exhibit 1 Part 2# 4 Exhibit 1 Part 3# 5 Exhibit 1 Part 4# 6 Exhibit 1 Part 5# 7 Exhibit 1 Part 6)(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in its Reply Claim Construction Brief by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Claim Construction Brief by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/27/07. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Brief by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None Motion to Compel
MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents and Memorandum in Support by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Hemingway, D) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2007 (sm, ). (Entered: 11/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 65 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/9/07. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5# 2 Exhibit 6-7# 3 Appendix part 1# 4 Appendix part 2# 5 Appendix part 3# 6 Appendix part 4# 7 Appendix part 5)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Parties Joint Disclosures Pursuant to Patent Rule 4-3 and Court's Scheduling Order by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit B part 2# 4 Exhibit C)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Gregory Bender of Compliance with Court's Order of November 5, 2007 (Hemingway, D) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Statement. Deadline extended to 11/9/07. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/5/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 60 Motion to modify asserted claims. The Plaintiff will have three (3) days to identify the modifiedasserted claims to the Defendants, and notify the Court of compliance with this Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/5/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Asserted Claims by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT; granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/26/07. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Statement by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/19/2007. (sm, ) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT; granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to File . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/16/07. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Statement by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Gregory Bender of Certificate of Compliance (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Texas Instruments Inc. Compliance with Certain Patent Rules (Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Gregory Bender of Certificate of Compliance with Court's Scheduling Order of July 24, 2007 (Hemingway, D) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 42 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for the parties to exchange proposed claim terms and elements for construction is reset to 9/21/07, and the deadline for the parties to meet and confer to discuss the claim terms is reset to 9/28/07 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/17/07. (mpv, ) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Identify Claim Terms for Construction by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF filed Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order by Gregory Bender. (Hemingway, D) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Texas Instruments Inc. of Compliance with Local Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 42 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 09/04/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 41 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 41 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Gregory Bender. (Hemingway, D) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Protective Order by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C (Proposed Protective Order))(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None
Plaintiff's Response and ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Defendant Texas Instruments Inc. (D.E. No. 25, July 23, 2007), by Gregory Bender.(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR; DOCKETED INCORRECTLY; PLEASE IGNORE; REPLACED BY # 39 ***STIPULATION re 25 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Response to Texas Instruments, Inc.'s Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by Gregory Bender. (Hemingway, D) Modified on 8/15/2007 (mpv, ). (Entered: 08/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/14/07. (mrm, ) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR; DEFICIENT DOCUMENT; PLEASE IGNORE***BRIEF filed in Support of Motion to Strike Texas Instruments, Inc.'s Amended Answer and Counterclaims by Gregory Bender. (Hemingway, D) Modified on 8/14/2007 (mpv, ). (Entered: 08/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR; DEFICIENT DOCUMENT; PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION to Strike Texas Instruments, Inc.'s Amended Answer and Counterclaims by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemingway, D) Modified on 8/14/2007 (mpv, ). (Entered: 08/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time and resets the Protective Order ddl for 8/13/07. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/13/07. (mrm, ) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Protective Order by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER AMENDING re 31 Order to correct an error in the last paragraph. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/8/2007. (sm, ) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 29 Notice Joint Submission Regarding Technical Advisors; filed by Gregory Bender,, Michael T McLemore, Technical Advisor added. . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/6/07. (mrm, ) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Agreed Protective Order by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Gregory Bender Joint Submission Regarding Technical Advisors (Hemingway, D) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by Texas Instruments Inc.. Responses due by 8/16/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2008 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2007. Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2007. Jury instructions due by 9/8/2008 Mediation Completion due by 10/15/2007. Motions due by 7/9/2008. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/8/2008. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/24/07. (mpv, ) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
Amended ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Gregory Bender by Texas Instruments Inc..(Ziegelbein, Mark) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Texas Instruments Inc. of compliance with disclosure requirements for initial disclosures (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by Gregory Bender of Compliance with Disclosure Requirements for Initial Disclosures and Local PR 3-1 and 3-2 (Hemingway, D) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of Texas Instruments Inc. (Davis, Stafford) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
STIPULATION for Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order and Discovery Order by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemingway, D) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 19 Motion to Withdraw atty Steven Geisler as counsel of record . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/13/2007. (sm, ) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw Steven Geiszler as Counsel by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom : Scheduling Conference held on 7/5/2007. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, ) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
***REPLACES #16***REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Galvan, Hilda) Modified on 7/3/2007 (mpv, ). (Entered: 07/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR; INCORRECT DOCUMENT; PER ATTY; PLEASE IGNORE***REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Galvan, Hilda) Modified on 7/3/2007 (mpv, ). (Entered: 07/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference reset for 7/5/2007 01:30 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hilda Contreras Galvan on behalf of Texas Instruments Inc. (Galvan, Hilda) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE,PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ANDDISCOVERY ORDER; Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2007 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/22/07. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Texas Instruments Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl R Roth on behalf of Texas Instruments Inc. (Roth, Carl) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Texas Instruments Inc. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the docket of Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/4/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Texas Instruments. Attorney Kajeer Yar terminated. . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/8/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Mark Geiszler on behalf of Texas Instruments Inc. (Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Yar, Kajeer) Proposed Order added on 2/7/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 2/7/2007 (mpv, ). (Entered: 02/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Texas Instruments Inc..(Yar, Kajeer) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline is extended to 11/27/06. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/6/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yar, Kajeer) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
ORIGINAL COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Burr-Brown, Texas Instruments Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by Gregory Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 133 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?