FireStar Software, Inc. v. Red Hat, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:06-cv-00258

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 17, 2017 at 7:05 AM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Firestar Software, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J. McNamara +1 202 672 5416 +1 202 672 5399 PTOmailWashington@foley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clarence E. Polk, Jr. +1 202 295 4634 +1 202 672 5399 epolk@foleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gilberto, M. Villacorta yvillacorta@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patrick R. Anderson, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Rolf Anderson +1 810 275 0751 +1 248 928 9239 patrick@prapllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler Law P.C. - Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Perez Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francisco Perez +1 214 289 6659 +1 214 521 1128 dan@pereziplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvin R Wilcox, III +1 903 595 1133 +1 903 595 0191 mrw@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Red Hat Middleware LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008, PRO HAC VICE John C. Alemanni +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 jalemanni@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008, PRO HAC VICE William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 J. Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Steven David Moore +1 415 273 4741 +1 415 651 8510 smoore@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Jon Robert Pierce +1 336 607 7503 +1 336 734 2638 jpierce@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams +1 704 350 7790 +1 704 350 7800 dwilliams@winston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008, PRO HAC VICE John C. Alemanni +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 jalemanni@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008, PRO HAC VICE William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 J. Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Steven David Moore +1 415 273 4741 +1 415 651 8510 smoore@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Jon Robert Pierce +1 336 607 7503 +1 336 734 2638 jpierce@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams +1 704 350 7790 +1 704 350 7800 dwilliams@winston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
v.
No Logo DaVinci-Mattehron LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Robert Pierce +1 336 607 7503 +1 336 734 2638 jpierce@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams +1 704 350 7790 +1 704 350 7800 dwilliams@winston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Jboss, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Robert Pierce +1 336 607 7503 +1 336 734 2638 jpierce@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams +1 704 350 7790 +1 704 350 7800 dwilliams@winston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Red Hat Middleware LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008, PRO HAC VICE John C. Alemanni +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 jalemanni@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008, PRO HAC VICE William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 J. Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Steven David Moore +1 415 273 4741 +1 415 651 8510 smoore@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Jon Robert Pierce +1 336 607 7503 +1 336 734 2638 jpierce@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams +1 704 350 7790 +1 704 350 7800 dwilliams@winston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008, PRO HAC VICE John C. Alemanni +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 jalemanni@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008, PRO HAC VICE William Henry Boice +1 404 815 6464 +1 404 541 3134 bboice@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 J. Steven Gardner +1 336 607 7300 +1 336 607 7500 sgardner@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Steven David Moore +1 415 273 4741 +1 415 651 8510 smoore@kilpatricktownsend.com
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Jon Robert Pierce +1 336 607 7503 +1 336 734 2638 jpierce@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Elizabeth Danielle Thompson Williams +1 704 350 7790 +1 704 350 7800 dwilliams@winston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/20/2008 Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Firestar Software, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J. McNamara +1 202 672 5416 +1 202 672 5399 PTOmailWashington@foley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J. McNamara +1 202 672 5416 +1 202 672 5399 PTOmailWashington@foley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J. McNamara +1 202 672 5416 +1 202 672 5399 PTOmailWashington@foley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J. McNamara +1 202 672 5416 +1 202 672 5399 PTOmailWashington@foley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clarence E. Polk, Jr. +1 202 295 4634 +1 202 672 5399 epolk@foleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clarence E. Polk, Jr. +1 202 295 4634 +1 202 672 5399 epolk@foleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gilberto, M. Villacorta yvillacorta@foley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gilberto, M. Villacorta yvillacorta@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patrick R. Anderson, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Rolf Anderson +1 810 275 0751 +1 248 928 9239 patrick@prapllc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Rolf Anderson +1 810 275 0751 +1 248 928 9239 patrick@prapllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Perez Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francisco Perez +1 214 289 6659 +1 214 521 1128 dan@pereziplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Francisco Perez +1 214 289 6659 +1 214 521 1128 dan@pereziplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvin R Wilcox, III +1 903 595 1133 +1 903 595 0191 mrw@yw-lawfirm.com
TERMINATED: 05/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvin R Wilcox, III +1 903 595 1133 +1 903 595 0191 mrw@yw-lawfirm.com
TERMINATED: 05/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvin R Wilcox, III +1 903 595 1133 +1 903 595 0191 mrw@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Robert W Faulkner, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert W Faulkner +1 214 744 5267 +1 214 720 6010 rfaulkner@jamsadr.com
  Entries (86) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 85 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs claims against Dft Da Vinci-Matterhorn LLC and JBoss Inc. Are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/12/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss by FireStar Software, Inc., JBoss, Inc., DaVinci-Mattehron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 83 Motion to Dismiss defts Red Hat Inc and Red Hat Middleware LLC without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/20/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/20/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION to Dismiss Red Hat, Inc. and Red Hat Middleware, LLC by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, FireStar Software, Inc., Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
        NOTICE by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, FireStar Software, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. of Joint Claim Construction Chart (PR 4-5(d)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Chart)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 79 Motion for Leave to File sur-reply brief regarding claim construction. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
            CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF Surreply filed by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc.. (Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
              Consent MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief regarding Claim Construction by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF filed by FireStar Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1# 2 Exhibit Ex 2# 3 Exhibit Ex 3)(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 74 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Melvin R Wilcox, III terminated as counsel for Firestar Software, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 5/12/08. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                    Additional Attachments to Main Document: 75 Claim Construction Brief,,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit TOPLink 4.0# 2 Exhibit 544 Patent# 3 Exhibit PC Dictionary# 4 Exhibit Database Design# 5 Exhibit Infobase# 6 Exhibit Answers to Interrogatories# 7 Exhibit 006 Patent# 8 Exhibit 967 Patent through column 2# 9 Exhibit 967 Patent - cloumns 3 - 8# 10 Exhibit Software Engineering - part 1# 11 Exhibit Software Engineering - part 2# 12 Exhibit Random House Dictionary)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits# 2 Exhibit 979 Patent# 3 Exhibit Oxford Dictionary part 1# 4 Exhibit Oxford Dictionary - part 2# 5 Exhibit 515 Patent# 6 Exhibit 411 Patent to column 4# 7 Exhibit 411 Patent - columns 5 - 12# 8 Exhibit 411 Patent - columns 13 - 16# 9 Exhibit Computer Encyclopedia# 10 Exhibit Computing Dictionary - part 1# 11 Exhibit Computing Dictionary - part 2# 12 Exhibit Computing Dictionary - part 1# 13 Exhibit Computing Dictionary - part 2)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                        Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by FireStar Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by FireStar Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1# 2 Exhibit Ex 2# 3 Exhibit Ex 3# 4 Exhibit Ex 4# 5 Exhibit Ex 5# 6 Exhibit Ex 6# 7 Exhibit Ex 7)(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Wesley Spangler on behalf of FireStar Software, Inc. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to Counterclaim by FireStar Software, Inc..(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to Counterclaim by FireStar Software, Inc..(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None
                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against FireStar Software, Inc. by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc..(Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc., filed by FireStar Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Copy of US Pat 6,101,502)(Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc. Joint Claim Construction & Prehearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
                                        AMENDED ANSWER to FireStar's Third Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against FireStar Software, Inc. by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc.. (Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 64 Motion to Amend docket control order. Deadline extended for Joint Claim Construction and pre-hearing statement 3/13/08. Amended pleadings extended to 3/13/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 3/12/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                                            Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 35 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, FireStar Software, Inc., Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 62 Motion to Amend docket control order. Deadline extended for parties to comply with PR 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing statement extended to 3/11/08, deadline extended to amend pleading 3/11/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 3/5/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 35 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, FireStar Software, Inc., Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Pridham on behalf of FireStar Software, Inc. (Pridham, David) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Francisco Perez on behalf of FireStar Software, Inc. (Perez, Daniel) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Rolf Anderson on behalf of FireStar Software, Inc. (Anderson, Patrick) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 56 Motion for leave to supplement Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 2/7/08. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by FireStar Software, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct - Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc. of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 4-2 (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Robert Pierce on behalf of all defendants (Pierce, Jon) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Danielle Thompson Williams on behalf of all defendants (Williams, E Danielle) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE by FireStar Software, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Polk, Clarence) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc. Notice of Compliance Pursuant to P.R. 4-1 (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clarence Edward Polk, Jr on behalf of FireStar Software, Inc. (Polk, Clarence) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gilberto M Villacorta for FireStar Software, Inc.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3311. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 47 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Docket Control is amended to extend the time to 12/20/07. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 12/3/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 35 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Unopposed Motion to Modify Docket Control Order (privilege logs) by FireStar Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 11/29/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Entry of Protective Order by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, FireStar Software, Inc., Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File joint protective order. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 11/16/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Protective Order (or Competing Versions Thereof) by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, FireStar Software, Inc., Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by FireStar Software, Inc. Plaintiff Firestar Software, Inc.'s Notice of Initial Disclosures (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 38 Joint Motion for an extension of time to submit the Joint Protective Order (or Competing Versions Thereof). Deadline for submitting the Joint Protective Order is 11/12/07. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 11/2/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Robert W Faulkner added as Mediator. Mediation to be completed 9/16/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 11/2/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Submit the Joint Protective Order (Or Competing Versions Thereof) by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, FireStar Software, Inc., Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, FireStar Software, Inc., Red Hat, Inc. Joint Notice of Selection of Mediators (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for submitting the Joint Protection Order and to identify potential mediators is extended to 10/31/07. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 10/18/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2008. Discovery due by 9/2/2008. Motions in Limine due by 12/15/2008. Pretrial Order due by 12/15/2008. Markman Hearing set for 6/4/08 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2008 01:30 PM before Judge T. John Ward. Jury Selection set for 1/5/2009 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 10/16/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        AMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER . Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 10/16/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Submit the Joint Protective Order (or Competing Versions Thereof) and Identify Potential Mediators by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, FireStar Software, Inc., Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles Everingham: Scheduling Conference held on 10/3/2007. Melvin Wilcox and Brian McNamara appeared as counsel for Plaintiffs. Allen Gardner and Steven Moore appeared as counsel for Defendant. The parties agreed to deadlines for a Scheduling Order and Discovery Order. The Court will issue the proposed Orders with the requested modifications. The parties will submit a proposed Protective Order and a name for a proposed mediator within 14 days. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons, CSR.)(jml) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham in accordance with the assignments made by General Order 07-03. The magistrate judge shall conduct pre-trial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 636. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/28/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE,PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDERAND DISCOVERY ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2007 01:30 PM before Judge T. John Ward. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/30/07. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2007 at 1:30 PM in Marshall before Judge T. John Ward. (shd, ) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian J McNamara on behalf of FireStar Software, Inc., FireStar Software, Inc.(a Delaware corporation), FireStar Software, Inc.(a Delaware corporation) (McNamara, Brian) (Entered: 08/11/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        FireStar Software, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaim by FireStar Software, Inc..(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 08/04/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply. Deadlines are set herein. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/19/07. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Third Amended Complaint), Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against FireStar Software, Inc. by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc..(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third Amended) against Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc., filed by FireStar Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 06/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 20 Motion to file Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/14/07. (kjr, ) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to File Third Amended Complaint by FireStar Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint# 2 Exhibit A to Third Amended Complaint# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third) against Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc., filed by FireStar Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 6/11/2007 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by FireStar Software, Inc. pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Asserted Claims and Patent Infringement Contentions) (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER that the Court sua sponte orders that any party claiming patent infringement shall comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 within 15 days from the date of this order; any party opposing a claim of patent infringement shall comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 in accordance with the deadline provided in those rules; parties may conduct discovery relevant to these disclosures subject to the following limitations herein; parties may also conduct discovery into any jurisdictional issues, subject to the above limitations, provisions of the Patent Rules including P.R. 2-2 will apply to discovery conducted pursuant to this order; and consistent with the Court's calendar the court will set this for a scheduling conference at a future date and time to address requests for additional discovery. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/23/07. (djh, ) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Red Hat, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Counterclaim PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS by FireStar Software, Inc..(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against FireStar Software, Inc. by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc..(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven D. Moore for Red Hat Middleware, LLC and Red Hat, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William H Boice for Red Hat Middleware, LLC and Red Hat, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John C. Alemanni for Red Hat Middleware, LLC and Red Hat, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John Steven Gardner for Red Hat Middleware, LLC and Red Hat, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dtfs Red Hat, Inc. and Red Hat Middleware LLC have until 12/8/06 to answer . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/16/06. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 6 Amended Complaint, by Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 5 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc., filed by FireStar Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 11/8/2006 (ch, ). (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR. EXHIBIT'S NOT ATTACHED. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 6 ***AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Red Hat Middleware, LLC, Red Hat, Inc., filed by FireStar Software, Inc..(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 11/8/2006 (ch, ). (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FireStar Software, Inc. identifying Firestar Software, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against all defendants, filed by FireStar Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Patent-in-Suit))(Wilcox, Melvin) (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Red Hat, Inc., JBoss, Inc., DaVinci-Mattehron LLC (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by FireStar Software, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit A1# 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ehs, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?