Ryan v. Flowserve Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:03-cv-01769
District Judge Jane J Boyle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 8, 2016 at 11:34 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey W Lawrence

Toggle Switch Represented by BURKE HARVEY & FRANKOWSKI LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/26/2007 Peter H Burke +1 205 930 9091 +1 205 930 9054 pburke@burkeharvey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ex Kano S Sams, II +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 esams@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sanford Svetcov +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 sandys@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haskell Slaughter Young & Rediker, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G Douglas Jones +1 205 251 1000 +1 205 324 1133 tmf@hsy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kendall Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Kendall +1 214 744 3000 +1 214 744 3015 jkendall@kendalllawgroup.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hamilton Philip Lindley +1 214 744 3000 +1 214 744 3015 hlindley@kendalllawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan K. Alexander +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 SuziA@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Blasy +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 mblasy@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Louise Box +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 anneb@csgrr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joy Ann Bull +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 joyb@csgrr.com
Space Tamara J. Driscoll +1 206 749 5544 +1 206 749 9978 tdriscoll@lerachlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/07/2007 Kimberly C. Epstein +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 e_file_sf@csgrr.com
Space Dennis Jeremy Herman +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 dherman@lerachlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G Paul Howes +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 paulh@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shirley H. Huang +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 shirleyh@csgrr.com
Space Maria V Morris +1 415 288 4545
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Willow E. Radcliffe +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 willowr@rgrdlaw.com
TERMINATED: 07/26/2007 Shana Eve Scarlett +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 shanas@lerachlaw.com
TERMINATED: 07/26/2007 Daniel Brian Swerdlin +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 dswerdlin@rgrdlaw.com
Space Lesley E. Weaver +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 lesleyw@lerachlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn Anthony Williams +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 swilliams@rgrdlaw.com
Space Lauren M Winston +1 415 288 4545

Toggle Switch Represented by Whatley Drake & Kallas LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Clay Allen +1 205 328 9576 +1 205 328 9669 aallen@wdklaw.com
Space Richard Paul Rouco +1 205 328 9576 +1 205 328 9669 rrouco@whatleydrake.com
No Logo Jerry Ryan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill & Hill Attorneys and Counselors PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Hill +1 469 241 9355 +1 469 241 9356 rhill@hillandhill-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/07/2007 Kimberly C. Epstein +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 e_file_sf@csgrr.com
No Logo Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey W Lawrence

Toggle Switch Represented by BURKE HARVEY & FRANKOWSKI LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/26/2007 Peter H Burke +1 205 930 9091 +1 205 930 9054 pburke@burkeharvey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ex Kano S Sams, II +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 esams@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sanford Svetcov +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 sandys@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haskell Slaughter Young & Rediker, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G Douglas Jones +1 205 251 1000 +1 205 324 1133 tmf@hsy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kendall Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hamilton Philip Lindley +1 214 744 3000 +1 214 744 3015 hlindley@kendalllawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan K. Alexander +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 SuziA@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Blasy +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 mblasy@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Louise Box +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 anneb@csgrr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joy Ann Bull +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 joyb@csgrr.com
Space Tamara J. Driscoll +1 206 749 5544 +1 206 749 9978 tdriscoll@lerachlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/07/2007 Kimberly C. Epstein +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 e_file_sf@csgrr.com
Space Dennis Jeremy Herman +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 dherman@lerachlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G Paul Howes +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 paulh@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shirley H. Huang +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 shirleyh@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Willow E. Radcliffe +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 willowr@rgrdlaw.com
TERMINATED: 07/26/2007 Daniel Brian Swerdlin +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 dswerdlin@rgrdlaw.com
Space Lesley E. Weaver +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 lesleyw@lerachlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whatley Drake & Kallas LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Paul Rouco +1 205 328 9576 +1 205 328 9669 rrouco@whatleydrake.com
No Logo Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary K. Blasy +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 mblasy@rgrdlaw.com
Space Tamara J. Driscoll +1 206 749 5544 +1 206 749 9978 tdriscoll@lerachlaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/07/2007 Kimberly C. Epstein +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 e_file_sf@csgrr.com
Space Lesley E. Weaver +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 lesleyw@lerachlaw.com
v.
No Logo Banc Of America Securities LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodney Acker +1 214 855 7466 +1 214 855 8200 racker@fulbright.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen B Sessions +1 214 855 7465 + 214 855 8200 esessions@fulbright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Thaddeus Behrens +1 214 651 5668 +1 214 200 0886 thad.behrens@haynesboone.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Even +1 214 651 5000 nick.even@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2007 Melissa J Swindle +1 214 468 3385 +1 214 880 0011 mswindle@hunton.com
No Logo C Scott Greer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer E Morris +1 214 855 3044 + 214 855 1333 jmorris@ccsb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Andrew Murray +1 214 855 3000 +1 214 855 1333 tmurray@ccsb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A Rohan +1 214 855 3000 rrohan@ccsb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fletcher L. Yarbrough, Jr. +1 214 855 3025 +1 214 855 1333 fyarbrough@ccsb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cox Smith Matthews, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Everett Lindell New +1 214 698 7822 +1 214 698 7899 enew@coxsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Thaddeus Behrens +1 214 651 5668 +1 214 200 0886 thad.behrens@haynesboone.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Even +1 214 651 5000 nick.even@haynesboone.com
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/29/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen B Sessions +1 214 855 7465 + 214 855 8200 esessions@fulbright.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodney Acker +1 214 855 7466 +1 214 855 8200 racker@fulbright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen B Sessions +1 214 855 7465 + 214 855 8200 esessions@fulbright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Thaddeus Behrens +1 214 651 5668 +1 214 200 0886 thad.behrens@haynesboone.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Even +1 214 651 5000 nick.even@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/28/2007 Melissa J Swindle +1 214 468 3385 +1 214 880 0011 mswindle@hunton.com
No Logo Flowserve Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer E Morris +1 214 855 3044 + 214 855 1333 jmorris@ccsb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noel M B Hensley +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 200 0470 hensleyn@haynesboone.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Thaddeus Behrens +1 214 651 5668 +1 214 200 0886 thad.behrens@haynesboone.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Even +1 214 651 5000 nick.even@haynesboone.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carrie Lee Huff +1 214 651 5009 +1 214 651 5940 huffc@haynesboone.com
PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua P Martin +1 214 922 3413 +1 214 922 3899 josh.martin@alston.com
TERMINATED: 02/08/2006 Jon G Shepherd +1 214 922 3400 +1 214 922 3899 jon.shepherd@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas M. Fuchs +1 213 229 7000 +1 213 229 7520 dfuchs@gibsondunn.com
Space Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samantha A Lunn , +1 214 698 3193 +1 214 571 2901 SLunn@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M Byron Wilder +1 214 698 3231 + 214 698 3400 bwilder@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Even +1 214 651 5000 nick.even@haynesboone.com
No Logo Renee J Hornbaker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer E Morris +1 214 855 3044 + 214 855 1333 jmorris@ccsb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Thaddeus Behrens +1 214 651 5668 +1 214 200 0886 thad.behrens@haynesboone.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Even +1 214 651 5000 nick.even@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Watts Flynn +1 214 740 8000 + 214 740 8800 cwflynn@lockelord.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weitzman Law Offices, LLC (NJ)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Wayne Klaudt +1 214 740 8000 +1 214 740 8800 dklaudt@lockeliddell.com
No Logo Kathy Giddings, Respondent

Represented by Bracewell LLP

No Logo Aaron J Enrico, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey Weinstein PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L Weinstein +1 212 693 3737 +1 212 693 2020 j.weinstein@jlwlawoffices.com
No Logo Donald A Insul, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey Weinstein PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L Weinstein +1 212 693 3737 +1 212 693 2020 j.weinstein@jlwlawoffices.com
No Logo J. Russell Rueff, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey Weinstein PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L Weinstein +1 212 693 3737 +1 212 693 2020 j.weinstein@jlwlawoffices.com
No Logo Kathryn H Jordan, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey Weinstein PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L Weinstein +1 212 693 3737 +1 212 693 2020 j.weinstein@jlwlawoffices.com
No Logo Kenneth P. Horsbourgh, Jr., Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey Weinstein PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L Weinstein +1 212 693 3737 +1 212 693 2020 j.weinstein@jlwlawoffices.com
No Logo New Juno, LP, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey Weinstein PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L Weinstein +1 212 693 3737 +1 212 693 2020 j.weinstein@jlwlawoffices.com
No Logo Patricia Rueff, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey Weinstein PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L Weinstein +1 212 693 3737 +1 212 693 2020 j.weinstein@jlwlawoffices.com
No Logo Sally D Hickman, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey Weinstein PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey L Weinstein +1 212 693 3737 +1 212 693 2020 j.weinstein@jlwlawoffices.com
No Logo ADR Provider, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Weinstein +1 415 982 5267 +1 415 982 5287 sschreiber@jamsadr.com
No Logo Deloitte & Touche LLP, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Curtis Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd C Donohue +1 214 752 2222 +1 214 752 0709 tdonohue@curtislaw.net
No Logo Joseph Verga, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill & Hill Attorneys and Counselors PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Hill +1 469 241 9355 +1 469 241 9356 rhill@hillandhill-law.com
No Logo Robert K Finnell, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc R Stanley +1 214 443 4301 +1 214 443 0358 marcstanley@mac.com
No Logo Harold Klagsbald, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218
No Logo Robert K Finnell, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lackey Hershman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger L Mandel +1 214 560 2232 +1 214 560 2203 rlm@lhlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc R Stanley +1 214 443 4301 +1 214 443 0358 marcstanley@mac.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Woodward +1 214 443 4304 +1 214 443 0358 mwoodward@stanleyiola.com
No Logo Thomas Butterworth, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (720) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 944
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Blank 940
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 936
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 931 Unopposed MOTION to Reschedule Scheduling Conference. Accordingly, the mandatory scheduling conference is re-set for Tuesday, October 20, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (see order for specifics) (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 9/4/09) (tln) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Change of Address by G Douglas Jones, counsel for Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. New address is: Haskell Slaughter Young & Rediker, LLC 1400 Park Place Tower, 2001 Park Place North Birmingham, AL 35203 (Jones, G) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                    Unopposed MOTION to Reschedule Scheduling Conference filed by Flowserve Corporation (Hensley, Noel) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STATUS REPORT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING CONFERENCE. Status Report due by 9/8/2009. Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2009 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1306, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX, 75242-1310 before Judge Jane J Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/24/09) (jrb) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 929 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                        JUDGMENT/MANDATE of USCA as to 893 , 911 Notice of Appeal filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund. Case remanded to the district court for further proceedings. Issued as Mandate: 7/27/2009. (axm) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 928 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                          Opinion of USCA (certified copy) in accordance with USCA judgment re 893 , 911 Notice of Appeal filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund. We REVERSE the district court's grant of summary judgment on Alaska's Exchange Act claims, VACATE the district court's denial of class certification and the remainder of its grant of summary judgment, and REMAND this case for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. (axm) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Change of Address by R Thaddeus Behrens, counsel for Flowserve Corporation. New address is: 2323 Victory Avenue, Suite 700, Dallas, TX 75219 (Behrens, R) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Firm Name Change filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Kendall, Joe) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Transfer of the Appellate Record to USCA5; re: 893 Notice of Appeal, 911 Notice of Appeal. (jmr) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Receipt of the Transfer of the Appellate Record to Sanford Svetcov, by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 893 Notice of Appeal, 911 Notice of Appeal, (jmr) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting in part 918 Motion to Stay Costs; Further Objections to Defendants' Applications for Taxable Costs and Motion to Retax Costs. The Court finds it most efficient to stay its award of costs and its consideration of Plaintiffs' specific objections to Defendants' Bills for Costs pending resolution by the Fifth Circuit of Plaintiffs' various appeals in this matter. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 03/10/08) (lmp) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                      REPLY filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 918 MOTION to Stay Costs; Further Objections to Defendants' Applications for Taxable Costs and Motion to Retax Costs Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Costs; Further Objections to Defendants' Applications for Taxable Costs and Motion to Retax Costs (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 918 MOTION to Stay Costs; Further Objections to Defendants' Applications for Taxable Costs and Motion to Retax Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Behrens, R) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSE in Opposition filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 918 MOTION to Stay Costs; Further Objections to Defendants' Applications for Taxable Costs and Motion to Retax Costs (Ferris, Samantha) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund for proceedings held on 9/7/06 Class Certification Hearing before Judge Boyle, Court Reporter: Shawnie Archuleta. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Supplement) (jmr) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Stay Costs; Further Objections to Defendants' Applications for Taxable Costs and Motion to Retax Costs by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                OBJECTION filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund to Taxing of Costs (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 1/23/2008 (jrb). (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Costs Taxed in amount of $220,417.91 against Plaintiffs. (as to doc#910) (lmp) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Costs Taxed in amount of $1,216,442.56 against Jerry Ryan. (as to doc#909) (lmp) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Costs Taxed in amount of $92,793.17 against Plaintiffs. (as to doc#908) (lmp) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                        Costs Taxed in amount of $93,159.50 against Plaintiffs. (as to doc#907) (lmp) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Amended Costs Taxed in amount of $104,381.41 against Plaintiffs. (as to doc#906) (lmp) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Fifth Circuit by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. Filing fee $455, receipt number 05390000000002039502. T.O. form to appellant electronically at Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Svetcov, Sanford) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                              BILL OF COSTS by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Attachment, # 4 Attachment) (lmp) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                BILL OF COSTS by Flowserve Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Declaration of R. Thaddeus Behrens# 2 Exhibit A to Behrens Declaration# 3 Exhibit B to Behrens Declaration# 4 Exhibit C to Behrens Declaration# 5 Exhibit D to Behrens Declaration# 6 Exhibit E to Behrens Declaration# 7 Exhibit F to Behrens Declaration# 8 Exhibit G to Behrens Declaration# 9 Exhibit H to Behrens Declaration# 10 Exhibit I to Behrens Declaration# 11 Exhibit J to Behrens Declaration) (Behrens, R) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  BILL OF COSTS by Renee J Hornbaker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B-1# 4 Exhibit B-2# 5 Exhibit C & D) (Klaudt, David) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    BILL OF COSTS by C Scott Greer. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3) (Morris, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      BILL OF COSTS AMENDED by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A to Sessions Declaration# 2 Exhibit Exh. B1 to Sessions Declaration# 3 Exhibit Exh. B2 to Sessions Declaration# 4 Exhibit Exh. C to Sessions Declaration# 5 Exhibit Exh. D to Sessions Declaration) (Sessions, Ellen) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        BILL OF COSTS by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh.A to Sessions Declaration# 2 Exhibit Exb. B1 to Sessions Declaration# 3 Exhibit Exb. B2 to Sessions Declaration# 4 Exhibit Exh. C to Sessions Declaration# 5 Exhibit Exh. D to Sessions Declaration) (Sessions, Ellen) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER denying 897 Motion to Vacate Judgment and Vacate Order Granting Entry of Judgment for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d)(2). The final judgment in favor of Defendants remains in place. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 01/11/08) (lmp) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            ORDER of USCA5 as to 893 Notice of Appeal, filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund. It is Ordered that the joint motion to view sealed documents, including documents 253-254, 374-375, 405-408, 418, 439-440, 463-464, 481-483, 491, 495-496, 501-502, 554-555, 559-560, 566-569, 578-580, 606-643, 674-711, 715-716, 727-730, 760-786, 800-868, (except for documents 801 and 867), 874, and 879-886, is granted. (skt) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 897 MOTION to Vacate Judgment and Vacate Order Granting Entry of Judgment. (Hensley, Noel) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 897 MOTION to Vacate Judgment and Vacate Order Granting Entry of Judgment for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d)(2). (Ferris, Samantha) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ***DUPLICATE OF #898 PER CHAMBERS***ORDER as to 897 Motion to Vacate Judgment and Vacate Order Granting Entry of Judgment. Responses due by noon on Thursday, 1/10/2008. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/8/08) (npk) Modified on 1/9/2008 (jb). (Entered: 01/09/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER: Having received Plaintiffs Motion to Vacate Judgment and Vacate Order Granting Entry of Judgment (doc. 897), the Court now sets an expedited briefing schedule. Defendants response shall be filed by noon on Thursday, January 10, 2008. No reply is permitted. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 01/08/08) (Boyle, Jane) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Vacate Judgment and Vacate Order Granting Entry of Judgment for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d)(2) by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund for proceedings held on 9/7/06 before Judge Boyle, re 893 Notice of Appeal. (skt) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 895 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          JUDGMENT: This action is dismissed on the merits and Plaintiffs shall take nothing by way of their complaint filed in this matter; and Defendants Flowserve Corporation, C. Scott Greer, Renee J. Hornbaker, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Banc of America Securities LLC, and Credit Suisse First Boston LLC shall recover costs from Plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/4/08) (klm) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 889 Defendants' Motion for Entry of Judgment. The Court also denied the parties' summary judgment motions, to the extent they addressed the Securities Exchange Act claims, as moot. (see order for specifics) (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/4/08) (klm) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              ORDER Of USCA5...Order filed granting petition for permission to appeal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23 (f) to the Fifth Circuit as to 888 Order by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. T.O. form to appellant electronically at Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Attachments: # 1) (svc) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 889 MOTION for Entry of Judgment in Favor of Defendants and Supporting Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Hensley, Noel) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund to 889 MOTION for Entry of Judgment in Favor of Defendants and Supporting Brief (Lawrence, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/18/2007 (skt). (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Deadlines as to 889 Defendants' Motion for Entry of Judgment. Responses due by 12/17/2007. Replies due by 12/21/2007. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/10/07) (klm) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION for Entry of Judgment in Favor of Defendants and Supporting Brief by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Hensley, Noel) Modified on 12/10/2007 (skt). (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 888 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER: For the reasons set forth in this Court's Order, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs motion to certify the instant case as a class action and GRANTS Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLPs Motion for Summary Judgment in its entirety and GRANTS in part the summary judgment motions of Defendants BofA, CSFB, Flowserve, Greer, and Hornbaker as to Plaintiffs claims under §§ 11 and 15 of the Securities Act. All other dispositive motions are DENIED as moot. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 11/13/07) (Boyle, Jane) Modified on 11/14/2007 (skt). (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Radcliffe, Willow) Modified on 9/12/2007 (npk). (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Notice of Manual Filing of Reply Brief and Second Supplemental Appendix by Flowserve Corporation, Renee J Hornbaker (Behrens, R) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Notice of Manual Filing of Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Supplemental Appendix of Confidential Evidence in Support by Defendant C. Scott Greer (Morris, Jennifer) Modified on 8/30/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Notice of Manual Filing of Reply Brief and Appendix in Support Thereof by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 590 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Wilder, M) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Notice of Manual Filing of Confidential Reply Brief and Confidential Appendix by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 588 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX OF NON-CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO (1) FLOWSERVE CORPORATION AND RENEE J. HORNBAKERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND (2) C. SCOTT GREERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 872 Notice of Manual Filing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 540) (Lawrence, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/23/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice of Manual Filing of Corrected Consolidated Opposition by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 869 Emergency Motion to Stay the Trial and All Pretrial Proceedings and Deadlines. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 08/22/07) (Boyle, Jane) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Appendix of Non-Confidential Exhibits in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 869 Emergency MOTION to Stay the Trial and All Pretrial Proceedings and Deadlines (Hensley, Noel) Modified on 8/28/2007 (jyg). (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Emergency MOTION to Stay the Trial and All Pretrial Proceedings and Deadlines by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Hensley, Noel) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Order Unfiling 801 Sealed Document, filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Jerry Ryan, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund due to the following deficiency: The signature of the attorney of record or the party proceeding pro se is required on each document filed. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 08/15/07) (lmp) (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                APPENDIX OF NON-CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO (1) FLOWSERVE CORPORATION AND RENEE J. HORNBAKERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND (2) C. SCOTT GREERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 430 part 1# 2 Exhibit 430 Part 2# 3 Exhibit 430 Part 3# 4 Exhibit 430 Part 4# 5 Exhibit 430 part 5# 6 Exhibit 430 part 6# 7 Exhibit 430 part 7# 8 Exhibit 433 Part 1# 9 Exhibit 433 Part 2# 10 Exhibit Part 3# 11 Exhibit 433 Part 4# 12 Exhibit 433 Part 5# 13 Exhibit 433 Part 7# 14 Exhibit 433 Part 7# 15 Exhibit 434# 16 Exhibit 435# 17 Exhibit 436# 18 Exhibit 437# 19 Exhibit 438# 20 Exhibit 439# 21 Exhibit 404 Part 1# 22 Exhibit 404 Part 2# 23 Exhibit 404 Part 3# 24 Exhibit 404 Part 4# 25 Exhibit 414# 26 Exhibit 415# 27 Exhibit 426 part 1# 28 Exhibit 426 Part 2# 29 Exhibit 426 Part 3# 30 Exhibit 429# 31 Exhibit 440 Part 1# 32 Exhibit 440 Part 2# 33 Exhibit 441# 34 Exhibit 442# 35 Exhibit 444) (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 8/16/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Appendix OF NON-CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO (1) FLOWSERVE CORPORATION AND RENEE J. HORNBAKERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND (2) C. SCOTT GREERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 430 part 1# 2 Exhibit 430 Part 2# 3 Exhibit 430 Part 3# 4 Exhibit 430 Part 4# 5 Exhibit 430 part 5# 6 Exhibit 430 part 6# 7 Exhibit 430 part 7# 8 Exhibit 433 Part 1# 9 Exhibit 433 Part 2# 10 Exhibit Part 3# 11 Exhibit 433 Part 4# 12 Exhibit 433 Part 5# 13 Exhibit 433 Part 7# 14 Exhibit 433 Part 7# 15 Exhibit 434# 16 Exhibit 435# 17 Exhibit 436# 18 Exhibit 437# 19 Exhibit 438# 20 Exhibit 439# 21 Exhibit 404 Part 1# 22 Exhibit 404 Part 2# 23 Exhibit 404 Part 3# 24 Exhibit 404 Part 4# 25 Exhibit 414# 26 Exhibit 415# 27 Exhibit 426 part 1# 28 Exhibit 426 Part 2# 29 Exhibit 426 Part 3# 30 Exhibit 429# 31 Exhibit 440 Part 1# 32 Exhibit 440 Part 2# 33 Exhibit 441# 34 Exhibit 442# 35 Exhibit 444) (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 8/16/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Appendix of Non-Confidential Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to (1) Flowserve Corporation and Renee J. Hornbaker's Motion for Summary Judgment and (2) C. Scott Greer's Motion for Summary Judgmentfiled by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 150# 2 Exhibit 151# 3 Exhibit 171# 4 Exhibit 195# 5 Exhibit 196# 6 Exhibit 202# 7 Exhibit 209# 8 Exhibit 210# 9 Exhibit 234-1# 10 Exhibit 234-2# 11 Exhibit 260# 12 Exhibit 262# 13 Exhibit 265# 14 Exhibit 277# 15 Exhibit 286# 16 Exhibit 288-1# 17 Exhibit 288-2# 18 Exhibit 291# 19 Exhibit 294# 20 Exhibit 296# 21 Exhibit 298# 22 Exhibit 332# 23 Exhibit 333# 24 Exhibit 334# 25 Exhibit 361# 26 Exhibit 362# 27 Exhibit 363# 28 Exhibit 364# 29 Exhibit 365# 30 Exhibit 366# 31 Exhibit 367# 32 Exhibit 368# 33 Exhibit 369# 34 Exhibit 377-1# 35 Exhibit 377-2# 36 Exhibit 377-3# 37 Exhibit 383-1# 38 Exhibit 383-2# 39 Exhibit 383-3# 40 Exhibit 404-1# 41 Exhibit 404-2# 42 Exhibit 404-3# 43 Exhibit 404-4# 44 Exhibit 414# 45 Exhibit 415# 46 Exhibit 426-1# 47 Exhibit 426-2# 48 Exhibit 426-3# 49 Exhibit 429) (Lawrence, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/16/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Appendix of Non-Confidential Documents in Support OF PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO (1) FLOWSERVE CORPORATION AND RENEE J. HORNBAKERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND (2) C. SCOTT GREERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 127 part 1# 2 Exhibit Part 2# 3 Exhibit 127 Part 3# 4 Exhibit 125 Part 4# 5 Exhibit 149) (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 8/16/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Appendix of Non-Confidential Documents in Support of OF PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO (1) FLOWSERVE CORPORATION AND RENEE J. HORNBAKERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND (2) C. SCOTT GREERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7# 2 Exhibit 9# 3 Exhibit 10# 4 Exhibit 13# 5 Exhibit 27# 6 Exhibit 36 Part 1# 7 Exhibit 36 Part 2# 8 Exhibit 55 Part 1# 9 Exhibit 55 Part 2# 10 Exhibit 55 Part 3# 11 Exhibit 110# 12 Exhibit 116# 13 Exhibit 125 Part 1# 14 Exhibit 125 Part 2# 15 Exhibit 125 Part 3) (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 8/16/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund of Non-Confidential Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' 790 Opposition to Defendant PricewaterhouseCooopers LLP's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9# 2 Exhibit 10# 3 Exhibit 11# 4 Exhibit 12# 5 Exhibit 13# 6 Exhibit 14# 7 Exhibit 15# 8 Exhibit 16# 9 Exhibit 17# 10 Exhibit 18# 11 Exhibit 19# 12 Exhibit 20# 13 Exhibit 21# 14 Exhibit 22# 15 Exhibit 23-1# 16 Exhibit 23-2# 17 Exhibit 28-1# 18 Exhibit 28-2# 19 Exhibit 29# 20 Exhibit 30-1# 21 Exhibit 30-2# 22 Exhibit 30-3# 23 Exhibit 31-1# 24 Exhibit 31-2# 25 Exhibit 31-3# 26 Exhibit 32# 27 Exhibit 34-1# 28 Exhibit 34-2# 29 Exhibit 34-3# 30 Exhibit 35# 31 Exhibit 37# 32 Exhibit 38# 33 Exhibit 39# 34 Exhibit 42# 35 Exhibit 43# 36 Exhibit 44# 37 Exhibit 48# 38 Exhibit 54-1# 39 Exhibit 54-2# 40 Exhibit 58# 41 Exhibit 59) (Lawrence, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/15/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Manual Filing by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 8/15/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Appendix of Non-Confidential Documents in Support of 789 Response in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 47) (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 8/15/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Appendix of Non-Confidential Documents in Support of 789 Response in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 34# 2 Exhibit 35- part 1# 3 Exhibit 35 part 2# 4 Exhibit 35 part 3# 5 Exhibit 35 part 4# 6 Exhibit 35 part 5# 7 Exhibit 35 part 6# 8 Exhibit 36 part 1# 9 Exhibit 36 part 2# 10 Exhibit 37# 11 Exhibit 38# 12 Exhibit 39# 13 Exhibit 40# 14 Exhibit 41 part 1# 15 Exhibit 41 part 2# 16 Exhibit 42 part 1# 17 Exhibit 42 part 2# 18 Exhibit 42 part 3# 19 Exhibit 43# 20 Exhibit 44# 21 Exhibit 45# 22 Exhibit 46# 23 Exhibit 48 part 1# 24 Exhibit 48 part 2# 25 Exhibit 48 part 3# 26 Exhibit part 4# 27 Exhibit 49 part 1# 28 Exhibit part 2# 29 Exhibit 49 part 3# 30 Exhibit 49 part 4# 31 Exhibit 50# 32 Exhibit 51 part 1# 33 Exhibit 51 part 2# 34 Exhibit 52 part 1# 35 Exhibit 52 part 2# 36 Exhibit 52 part 3# 37 Exhibit 53# 38 Exhibit 54# 39 Exhibit 55) (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 8/15/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund to Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's 590 Motion for Summary Judgment (Lawrence, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/15/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re Banc of America Securities LLC and Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's 588 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 8/15/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Appendix of Non-Confidential Documents in Support of 787 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6) (Lawrence, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/15/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 584 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMENTS OF FALSITY AND MATERIALITY AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS FOR SECTION 11 CLAIM, AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, C. SCOTT GREER AND RENEE J. HORNBAKER FOR SECTION 10(b) CLAIM OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 (Lawrence, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/15/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 756 Response in Opposition Flowserve Defendants', Banc of America Securities LLC's and Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Motion to Exclude Reports and Testimony of Bjorn I. Steinholt (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A# 2 Exhibit 1B# 3 Exhibit 1C# 4 Exhibit 2# 5 Exhibit 3) (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 662 MOTION to Strike and Exclude Reports and Testimony of Bjorn I. Steinholt (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 754 Response in Opposition To Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Bjorn I. Steinholt (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A# 2 Exhibit 1B# 3 Exhibit 1C# 4 Exhibit 2A# 5 Exhibit 2B# 6 Exhibit 3A# 7 Exhibit 3B# 8 Exhibit 3C# 9 Exhibit 3D# 10 Exhibit 3E) (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 646 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Bjorn I. Steinholt (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 752 Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Reports and Testimony of Marc I. Steinberg (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6) (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 651 MOTION to Strike Reports and Testimony of Marc I. Steinberg (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund APPENDIX OF NON-CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' 749 OPPOSITION TO FLOWSERVE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED EXPERT, HARRIS L. DEVOR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 25# 2 Exhibit 26# 3 Exhibit 27A# 4 Exhibit 27B# 5 Exhibit 27C# 6 Exhibit 27D# 7 Exhibit 28) (Radcliffe, Willow) Modified on 8/6/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 649 MOTION to Strike and Exclude Testimony of Richard D. Puntillo (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 669 MOTION to Strike Expert Reports and Testimony of Harris L. Devor [REDACTED VERSION] (Radcliffe, Willow) Modified on 8/6/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 747 Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Reports and Testimony of Robert G. James (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6) (Huang, Shirley) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 666 MOTION to Strike Expert Reports and Testimony of Robert G. James (Huang, Shirley) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 745 Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Christopher J. Kelly (non-confidential) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6# 2 Exhibit 7# 3 Exhibit 8A# 4 Exhibit 8B# 5 Exhibit 9# 6 Exhibit 10) (Huang, Shirley) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Christopher J. Kelly (redacted) (Huang, Shirley) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Manual Filing of Memoranda and Appendices by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 657 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Allen Ferrell (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Manual Filing of Response in Opposition and Appendix of Confidential Exhibits by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 658 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS OF PROPOSED EXPERT GEORGE D. TONGRING (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 740 Notice of Manual Filing, Appendix of Non-Confidential Exhibits in Support of Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Philip J. Innes (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B# 2 Exhibit C# 3 Exhibit D# 4 Exhibit E# 5 Exhibit F) (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Manual Filing of Response in Opposition and Appendix of Confidential Exhibits by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 671 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Philip J. Innes (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 738 Notice of Manual Filing, Appendix of Non-Confidential Exhibits in Support of Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Marc S. Weinsweig (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Manual Filing of Response in Opposition and Appendix of Confidential Exhibits by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 655 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Marc S. Weinsweig (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 663 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS' TWENTY-EIGHT UNRETAINED DESIGNATED EXPERTS (Sessions, Ellen) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 653 Notice of Manual Filing re Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert John M. Lacey, which was only filed under seal by this notice and the confidential version does not have a Docket Number (Sessions, Ellen) Modified on 8/6/2007 (npk). (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 663 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS' TWENTY-EIGHT UNRETAINED DESIGNATED EXPERTS (Behrens, R) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 732 Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine To exclude The testimony And Opinions of Proposed Expert Edward Necarsulmer III (Sessions, Ellen) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Manual Filing of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Edward Necarsulmer III - Confidential, Filed Under Seal; Appendix of Confidential Documents in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Edward Necarsulmer III - Confidential, Filed Under Seal; Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert John M. Lacey - Confidential, Filed Under Seal; and Appendix in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert John M. Lacey - Confidential, Filed Under Seal. by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 656 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Edward Necarsulmer III (Sessions, Ellen) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 663 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS' TWENTY-EIGHT UNRETAINED DESIGNATED EXPERTS (Ferris, Samantha) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Appendix of Non-Confidential Exhibits in support filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 724 Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix V-1# 2 Exhibit V-2# 3 Exhibit V-3# 4 Exhibit V-4# 5 Exhibit V-5# 6 Exhibit V-6# 7 Exhibit V-7# 8 Exhibit V-8# 9 Exhibit V-9) (Behrens, R) Modified on 7/31/2007 (lmp). (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Manual Filing of Brief and Confidential Appendix by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 724 Response in Opposition. (Behrens, R) Modified on 7/31/2007 (lmp). (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 584 MOTION for Summary Judgment. PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMENT MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT.(Behrens, R) Modified on 7/31/2007 (lmp). (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 584 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMENT MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Acker, Rodney) Modified on 7/31/2007 (lmp). (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 721 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(Wilder, M) Modified on 7/30/2007 (lmp). (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 584 MOTION for Summary Judgment. PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMEN MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Wilder, M) Modified on 7/30/2007 (lmp). (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Manual Filing of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Wilder, M) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER for Pretrial Disclosures and Pretrial Materials: Pretrial Disclosures extended to 8/27/07 and Pretrial Materials due by 9/17/2007. See order for specifics. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on July 27, 2007) (jyg) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Pretrial Disclosures and Pretrial Materials. (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 712 Plaintiffs Expedited Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order Regarding the Filing Date for Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment. The responses are now due on August 14, 2007. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 07/23/07) (psm) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Manual Filing of Unredacted Motion and Confidential Appendix by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 713 Supplemental Document, Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Class Certification (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Document by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker as to 583 Order Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Class Certification. (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order Regarding the Filing Date for Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order Regarding the Filing Date for Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment) (Briscoe, Willie) (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 7/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 671 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Philip J. Innes (Non-Confidential) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-A# 2 Exhibit 1-B# 3 Exhibit 1-C# 4 Exhibit 2-A# 5 Exhibit 2-B# 6 Exhibit 3-A# 7 Exhibit 3-B# 8 Exhibit 4-A# 9 Exhibit 4-B# 10 Exhibit 5-A# 11 Exhibit 5-B# 12 Exhibit 6# 13 Exhibit 7-A# 14 Exhibit 7-B# 15 Exhibit 7-C# 16 Exhibit 8# 17 Exhibit 9-A# 18 Exhibit 9-B# 19 Exhibit 10-A-1# 20 Exhibit 10-A-2# 21 Exhibit 10-B-1# 22 Exhibit 10-B-2# 23 Exhibit 10-C) (Radcliffe, Willow) *** Access to this document has been restricted from Pacer because the document contains information deemed sensitive under the courts privacy policy. Modified on 7/31/2007 (axm). (Entered: 07/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 671 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Philip J. Innes (Non-Confidential) (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Philip J. Innes by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Manual Filing of Unredacted Motion and Confidential Appendix by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 669 MOTION to Strike Expert Reports and Testimony of Harris L. Devor (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Expert Reports and Testimony of Harris L. Devor by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker with Brief in Support. (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Manual Filing of Unredacted Motion and Confidential Appendix by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 666 MOTION to Strike Expert Reports and Testimony of Robert G. James (Behrens, R) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 666 MOTION to Strike Expert Reports and Testimony of Robert G. James (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G (Part One)# 8 Exhibit G (Part Two)# 9 Exhibit G (Part Three)# 10 Exhibit G (Part Four)# 11 Exhibit G (Part Five)# 12 Exhibit G (Part Six)# 13 Exhibit G-1 (Part One)# 14 Exhibit G-1 (Part Two)# 15 Exhibit G-1 (Part Three)# 16 Exhibit G-1 (Part Four)# 17 Exhibit G-1 (Part Five)# 18 Exhibit G-1 (Part Six)# 19 Exhibit G-1 (Part Seven)# 20 Exhibit G-1 (Part Eight)) (Behrens, R) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Expert Reports and Testimony of Robert G. James by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker with Brief in Support. (Behrens, R) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Manual Filing of Unredacted Motion and Confidential Appendix by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 662 MOTION to Strike and Exclude Reports and Testimony of Bjorn I. Steinholt (Behrens, R) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 662 MOTION to Strike and Exclude Reports and Testimony of Bjorn I. Steinholt Non-Confidential Appendix (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit D# 2 Exhibit Exhibit E# 3 Exhibit Exhibit F# 4 Exhibit Exhibit G# 5 Exhibit Exhibit H# 6 Exhibit Exhibit I# 7 Exhibit Exhibit J# 8 Exhibit Exhibit K) (Behrens, R) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS' TWENTY-EIGHT UNRETAINED DESIGNATED EXPERTS by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike and Exclude Reports and Testimony of Bjorn I. Steinholt by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker with Brief in Support. (Behrens, R) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 658 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS OF PROPOSED EXPERT GEORGE D. TONGRING NON-CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A# 2 Exhibit 1B# 3 Exhibit 1C# 4 Exhibit 1D# 5 Exhibit 1E# 6 Exhibit 1F# 7 Exhibit 1G# 8 Exhibit 2A# 9 Exhibit 2B# 10 Exhibit 2C# 11 Exhibit 2D# 12 Exhibit 2E# 13 Exhibit 2F# 14 Exhibit 2G# 15 Exhibit 2H) (Huang, Shirley) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Manual Filing by Defendants .(Behrens, R) Modified on 7/16/2007 (npk). (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Expert Report and Testimony of Christopher J. Kelly by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker with Brief in Support. (Behrens, R) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS OF PROPOSED EXPERT GEORGE D. TONGRING by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Huang, Shirley) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Allen Ferrell by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Edward Necarsulmer III by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of Proposed Expert Marc S. Weinsweig by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Join in Section IV.B.3 of 649 MOTION to Strike and Exclude Testimony of Richard D. Puntillo by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker (Klaudt, David) Modified on 7/16/2007 (npk). (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Manual Filing of Notice by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Manual Filing by Defendants . (Even, Nicholas) Modified on 7/16/2007 (npk). (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (Redacted) MOTION to Strike Reports and Testimony of Marc I. Steinberg by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker with Brief in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix # 2 Exhibit A) (Even, Nicholas) Modified on 7/16/2007 (npk). (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 649 MOTION to Strike and Exclude Testimony of Richard D. Puntillo (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit C# 2 Appendix Exhibit D# 3 Appendix Exhibit E# 4 Appendix Exhibit F) (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike and Exclude Testimony of Richard D. Puntillo by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC with and Supporting Memorandum of Law. (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 646 MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Bjorn I. Steinholt (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Part I# 2 Appendix Part II# 3 Appendix Part III) (Ferris, Samantha) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Manual Filing of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Richard D. Puntillo and Appendix in Support by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC Confidential Portions filed Under Seal (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Expert Testimony of Bjorn I. Steinholt by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP with Brief in Support. (Ferris, Samantha) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Manual Filing of Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Bjorn I. Steinholt and Appendix in Support Thereof by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Ferris, Samantha) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 571 Emergency MOTION to Compel Further Testimony From Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Marc I. Steinberg, Or, Alternatively To Strike (Attachments: # 1 Appendix # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N) (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Manual Filing of Motion for Summary Judgment, Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Appendix of Confidential Exhibits by Flowserve Corporation, Renee J Hornbaker (Behrens, R) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation, Renee J Hornbaker Appendix of Non-Confidential Exhibits in Support of Flowserve Corporation and Renee J. Hornbaker's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to 3# 2 Exhibit 4# 3 Exhibit 5 to 6# 4 Exhibit 7 - part one# 5 Exhibit 7 - part two# 6 Exhibit 7 - part three# 7 Exhibit 8 - part one# 8 Exhibit 8 - part two# 9 Exhibit 8 - part three# 10 Exhibit 8 - part four# 11 Exhibit 9 - part one# 12 Exhibit 9 - part two# 13 Exhibit 9 - part three# 14 Exhibit 9 - part four# 15 Exhibit 10# 16 Exhibit 11 to 20# 17 Exhibit 21 to 35) (Behrens, R) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 602 Response in Opposition, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 4 - Part 2# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8) (Briscoe, Willie) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 571 Emergency MOTION to Compel Further Testimony From Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Marc I. Steinberg, Or, Alternatively To Strike (Briscoe, Willie) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 600 Supplemental Document (Non-Confidential Documents) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3# 2 Exhibit 29 part 1 of 3# 3 Exhibit 29 part 2 of 3# 4 Exhibit 29 part 3 of 3# 5 Exhibit 65) (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Document by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund as to 239 MOTION to Certify Class. (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Manual Filing for Defendant C Scott Greer (Murray, Todd) Modified on 7/10/2007 (Gardner, Jo). (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Manual Filing by Plaintitffs Alaska Electrical Pension Fund and Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund (Lawrence, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/10/2007 (Gardner, Jo). (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment by C Scott Greer Redacted Version. (Murray, Todd) Modified on 7/10/2007 (Gardner, Jo). (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by C Scott Greer (Murray, Todd) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 588 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs, 589 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cover and Exhs 6, 7 and 8# 2 Exhibit Exhs 9, 10 and 11# 3 Exhibit Exhs 12, 13, 14 and 15) (Sessions, Ellen) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 593 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 590 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Wilder, M) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 590 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Wilder, M) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Manual Filing of Brief and Appendix for Summary Judgement by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 589 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Sessions, Ellen) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Manual Filing of Brief and Appendix in Support by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 590 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Wilder, M) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Wilder, M) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 588 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs (Sessions, Ellen) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (Sessions, Ellen) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Manual Filing of Unredacted Motion and Confidential Appendix by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 584 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMEN MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMEN MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMEN (Huang, Shirley) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 584 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMEN MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMEN MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMEN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7A# 8 Exhibit 7B# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10A# 12 Exhibit 10B# 13 Exhibit 10C# 14 Exhibit 11# 15 Exhibit 12# 16 Exhibit 13# 17 Exhibit 14# 18 Exhibit 15# 19 Exhibit 16# 20 Exhibit 17# 21 Exhibit 18# 22 Exhibit 19# 23 Exhibit 20) (Huang, Shirley) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 584 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMEN MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMEN MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMEN (Huang, Shirley) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO (1) LIABILITY AGAINST FLOWSERVE CORPORATION UNDER SECTION 11 OF THE SECURITIES ACT OF 1933; AND (2) THE ELEMENTS OF FALSITY AND MATERIALITY AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS FOR SECTION 11 CLAIM, AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, C. SCOTT GREER AND RENEE J. HORNBAKER FOR SECTION 10(b) CLAIM OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Huang, Shirley) Modified on 7/10/2007 (Gardner, Jo). (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Permitting limited additional briefing on class certification issue. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 06/28/07) (Boyle, Jane) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION and Opposition to Plaintiffs' 581 Letter Motion to Re-Open Class Certification Record and Delay Final Class Certification Decision filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker (Behrens, R) Modified on 6/28/2007 (npk). (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ltr to Judge Boyle regarding mediation and going forward by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund(Kendall, Joe) Modified on 6/27/2007 (npk). (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Court has received Defendants' Expedited Motion to Compel Further Testimony from Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Marc I. Steinberg, or, Alternatively to Strike 571 , filed June 18, 2007. Having reviewed the motion, the Court declines to set an expedited briefing schedule for this motion. Thus, the parties remain subject to the briefing deadlines set forth in Local Rule 7.1. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on June 19, 2007) (jyg) (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Manual Filing of Notice by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 574 Reply to Response to Motion, (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 574 Reply to Response to Motion, TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS TWENTY-EIGHT UNRETAINED EXPERTS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, COMPEL EXPERT REPORTS AND DEPOSITIONS OF SAID EXPERTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6) (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 551 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' TWENTY-EIGHT UNRETAINED EXPERTS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, COMPEL EXPERT REPORTS AND DEPOSITIONS OF SAID EXPERTS (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Manual Filing of Confidential Exhibits by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 572 Appendix in Support, 571 Emergency MOTION to Compel Further Testimony From Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Marc I. Steinberg, Or, Alternatively To Strike (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 571 Emergency MOTION to Compel Further Testimony From Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Marc I. Steinberg, Or, Alternatively To Strike (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 5# 5 Exhibit 5) (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION to Compel Further Testimony From Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Marc I. Steinberg, Or, Alternatively To Strike by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Designation of Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Experts by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Radcliffe, Willow) Modified on 6/7/2007 (Gardner, Jo). (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 551 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' TWENTY-EIGHT UNRETAINED EXPERTS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, COMPEL EXPERT REPORTS AND DEPOSITIONS OF SAID EXPERTS (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Manual Filing of Response and Appendix by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 551 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' TWENTY-EIGHT UNRETAINED EXPERTS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, COMPEL EXPERT REPORTS AND DEPOSITIONS OF SAID EXPERTS (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Manual filing by Dfts Flowserve Corp, C. Scott Greer, and Renee Hornbaker (Morris, Jennifer) Modified on 6/7/2007 (Gardner, Jo). (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 551 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' TWENTY-EIGHT UNRETAINED EXPERTS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, COMPEL EXPERT REPORTS AND DEPOSITIONS OF SAID EXPERTS (Attachments: # 1 Appendix to Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike# 2 Appendix to Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike) (Morris, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Manual Filing of Response in Opposition by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 558 Response in Opposition, (Martin, Joshua) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP re 551 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' TWENTY-EIGHT UNRETAINED EXPERTS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, COMPEL EXPERT REPORTS AND DEPOSITIONS OF SAID EXPERTS (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (Martin, Joshua) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Compel Proceedings held on 03/23/2007 before Judge Irma C Ramirez. Court Reporter Name/Phone Number: Betty Tate at 972/596-9442. District Clerk Phone Number: 214/753-2200. ***The Official Record of the transcript is on file with the clerk's office. Contact either the clerk's office or the court reporter at phone numbers listed above to obtain a copy of the Official Record.*** (axm) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' April 16, 2007 Submission Pursuant to March 26, 2007 Order. by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker as to 544 Response in Opposition, 531 Supplemental Document, 521 Order on Motion to Certify Class,(Even, Nicholas) Modified on 5/22/2007 (npk). (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Manual Filing of Portions of Motion to Strike and Supporting Confidential Appendix by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 551 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' TWENTY-EIGHT UNRETAINED EXPERTS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, COMPEL EXPERT REPORTS AND DEPOSITIONS OF SAID EXPERTS (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 551 MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' TWENTY-EIGHT UNRETAINED EXPERTS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, COMPEL EXPERT REPORTS AND DEPOSITIONS OF SAID EXPERTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I) (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' TWENTY-EIGHT UNRETAINED EXPERTS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, COMPEL EXPERT REPORTS AND DEPOSITIONS OF SAID EXPERTS by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Document by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund as to 540 Order on Motion to Compel, Plaintiff Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund's Final Amended Answers to Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs. (Kendall, Joe) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Document by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund as to 540 Order on Motion to Compel, Plaintiff Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund's Final Amended Answers to Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs. (Kendall, Joe) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Document by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund as to 540 Order on Motion to Compel, Plaintiff Alaska Electrical Pension Fund's Final Amended Answers to Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs. (Kendall, Joe) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Document by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund as to 540 Order on Motion to Compel, Plaintiff Alaska Electrical Pension Fund's Final Amended Answers to Defendant Banc of America Securities LLC's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs. (Kendall, Joe) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Document by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund as to 540 Order on Motion to Compel, Plaintiffs' final Amended Answers to Banc of America Securities LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories ot Plaintiffs. (Kendall, Joe) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Document by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund as to 540 Order on Motion to Compel, Plaintiffs' Final Amended Answers to Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Second set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff. (Kendall, Joe) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 531 Supplemental Document, PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' APRIL 16, 2007 SUBMISSION PURSUANT TO MARCH 26, 2007 ORDER DENYING CLASS CERTIFICATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Designation of Experts by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker. (Behrens, R) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC of Expert Designation (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Designation of Experts by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Ferris, Samantha) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 518 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Answers. No later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, May 14, 2007, Plaintiffs shall file final amended answers to all interrogatories represented in the parties Joint Submission, filed April 16, 2007. All relief not expressly awarded herein is hereby denied. See order for specifics (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on 5/2/07) (svc) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Appendix by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC as to 534 Appendix in Support to Motion to Compel Joint Submission (USC-not imaged because of size and double sided pages) (jyg) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Manual Filing of Supplemental Appendix [Redlined Version] by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 536 Supplemental Document (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 535 Response to Motion, APPENDIX OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL OF CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON LLC AND BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Exhibit 1B# 3 Exhibit 1C# 4 Exhibit 1D# 5 Exhibit 1E# 6 Exhibit 1F# 7 Exhibit 1G# 8 Exhibit 2A# 9 Exhibit 2B# 10 Exhibit 2C# 11 Exhibit 2D# 12 Exhibit 2E# 13 Exhibit 2F# 14 Exhibit 2G# 15 Exhibit 3A# 16 Exhibit 3B# 17 Exhibit 3C# 18 Exhibit 3D# 19 Exhibit 4A# 20 Exhibit 4B# 21 Exhibit 4C# 22 Exhibit 4D# 23 Exhibit 4E# 24 Exhibit 4F# 25 Exhibit 4G# 26 Exhibit 5A# 27 Exhibit 5B# 28 Exhibit 5C# 29 Exhibit 5D# 30 Exhibit 5E# 31 Exhibit 5F# 32 Exhibit 5G# 33 Exhibit 6A# 34 Exhibit 6B# 35 Exhibit 6C# 36 Exhibit 6D# 37 Exhibit 6E) (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Document by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC as to 529 Response to Order, Defendants' Supplemental Submission. (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 518 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Answers PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL OF CREDIT SUISSE FIRST BOSTON LLC AND BANC OF AMERICA SECURITIES LLC (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 518 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Answers, 520 Order,, Set Hearings, Supplemental Appendix (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit 1# 2 Appendix Exhibit 2# 3 Appendix Exhibit 3# 4 Appendix Exhibit 4# 5 Appendix Exhibit 5# 6 Appendix Exhibit 6) (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 532 Motion for Leave to File. The Court already is familiar with the Fifth Circuit's decision in Regents of the University of California v. Credit Suisse First Boston (USA), Inc., 2007 WL 816518 (5th Cir. Mar. 19, 2007) and does not require additional briefing on that subject. Therefore, Defendants' motion is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 04/18/07) (psm) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Supplement in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Hensley, Noel) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Document by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker as to 521 Order on Motion to Certify Class, (Defendants' April 16, 2007 Submission Pursuant to March 26, 2007 Order). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Hensley, Noel) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 529 Response to Order, JOINT SUBMISSION of the Parties (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Joint Submission# 2 Appendix Joint Submission# 3 Appendix Joint Submission (Tab 1 - 3 of 3)# 4 Appendix Joint Submission - Tab 2 (1 of 2)# 5 Appendix Joint Submission - Tab 2 (2 of 2)# 6 Appendix Joint Submission - Tab 3# 7 Appendix Joint Submission - Tab 4# 8 Appendix Joint Submission - Tab 5# 9 Appendix Joint Submission - Tab 7# 10 Appendix Joint Submission - Tab 8 (1 of 5)# 11 Appendix Joint Submission - Tab 8 (2 of 5)# 12 Appendix Joint Submission - Tab 8 (3 of 5)# 13 Appendix Joint Submission - Tab 8 (4 of 5)# 14 Appendix Joint Submission - Tab 8 (5 of 5)# 15 Appendix Joint Submission - Tab 9) (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 518 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Answers, 520 Order,, Set Hearings, JOINT SUBMISSION of Parties pursuant to Magistrate Judge Ramirez March 26, 2007 Order (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Reset Deadlines as to 518 Motion to Compel Interrogatory Answers. Motion Hearing reset for 4/26/2007 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma C Ramirez. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on April 16, 2007) (jyg) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The Court will address the items in the Motion to Compel Interrogatory Answers 518 not agreed to by parties in a separate order after further hearing. See order for details. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on April 13, 2007) (jyg) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter/RESPONSE re Motion to Compel Interrogatory Answers filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Harold Klagsbald, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Jerry Ryan, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Thomas Butterworth, Robert K Finnell re 520 Order (jyg) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 518 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Answers, 520 Order,, Set Hearings, of Parties Meet and Confer pursuant to Magistrate Judge Ramirez 3/26/07 Order (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 4/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Designation of Experts by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 04/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Order denying 259 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by C Scott Greer, Flowserve Corporation, Renee J Hornbaker, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Banc of America Securities LLC. For the reasons stated, the Court GRANTS Plumbers & Pipefitterss Motion for Leave to Withdraw as a Named Plaintiff and DENIES Defendants Motion to Dismiss in its entirety. Plumbers & Pipefitters will become an absent class member in this suit if a class is certified. See order for details. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on March 26, 2007) (jyg) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 357 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. In the event that a class is certified, Mr. Federman and his firm may renew their motion to withdraw as counsel. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on March 26, 2007) (jyg) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 239 Motion to Certify Class without prejudice but will resume consideration of the Motion after it has received the requested briefing. Parties are directed to submit supplemental briefing on the sole issue identified in the Court's order. See order for details. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 03/26/07) (Boyle, Jane) Modified on 3/28/2007 (Gardner, Jo). (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2007 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma C Ramirez on Motion to Compel Interrogatory Answers. This motion will be held in abeyance until Friday, April 13, 2007. No later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, April 13, 2007, the parties must notify the Court of the results of the conference in writing. See order for details. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on March 26, 2007) (jyg) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: 518 Motion to Compel Interrogatory Answers, filed by Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Banc of America Securities LLC. Motions referred to Irma C Ramirez. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on March 23, 2007) (jyg) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Answers by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (Attachments: # 1 Appendix # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N) (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Harold Klagsbald, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Jerry Ryan, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Thomas Butterworth, Robert K Finnell. (klm) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker. (klm) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Shirley H Huang for Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund and Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Mailed copy to Ms. Huang. Notice turned off - no email address.) (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 3/14/07) (klm) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 513 Agreed MOTION REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF JENNIFER MOORE, CEES VERMONDEN, C. SCOTT GREER, RENEE J. HORNBAKER AND MODIFICATION OF THE DATES FOR THE PARTIES' EXPERT DESIGNATIONS AND REPORTS. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that:(a) Plaintiffs may take the depositions of Jennifer Moore and Cees Vermondenon dates in March 2007 after the March 2, 2007 fact discovery deadline. Mr. Vermondens deposition will occur on March 23, 2007 in the offices of the undersigned counsel for Flowserve Corporation; (b) Ms. Hornbakers deposition will commence on March 28, 2007 in her counsels office, and Mr. Greers deposition will commence on March 29, 2007 in his counsels office; (c) The deadline in the Scheduling Order for Plaintiffs expert designations andreports, currently March 30, 2007, shall be extended to April 8, 2007, and the deadline for Defendants expert designations and reports, currently April 27, 2007, shall be extended to May 7, 2007. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on March 13, 2007) (mfw) (Entered: 03/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF JENNIFER MOORE, CEES VERMONDEN, C. SCOTT GREER, RENEE J. HORNBAKER AND MODIFICATION OF THE DATES FOR THE PARTIES' EXPERT DESIGNATIONS AND REPORTS by all parties. (Radcliffe, Willow) Modified on 3/12/2007 (klm). (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 499 Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel the Depositions of Kathleen Giddings and Deloitte & Touche LLP (See ORDER for specifics) (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on March 8, 2007) (mfw) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix to Non-Party Deloitte & Touche LLP's in Support re 510 Response to Expedited Motion to Compel Deposition. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3) (jyg) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Non-Party Deloitte & Touche LLP's RESPONSE re 499 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel the Depositions of Kathleen Giddings and Deloitte & Touche LLP (jyg) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix of Exhibits in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 508 Response to Motion to Compel Depositions of Kathleen Giddings and Deloitte & Touche, LLP, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-H) (Behrens, R) Modified on 3/22/2007 (Gardner, Jo). (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 499 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel the Depositions of Kathleen Giddings and Deloitte & Touche LLP (Behrens, R) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Kathy Giddings re 499 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel the Depositions of Kathleen Giddings and Deloitte & Touche LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Hart, Terence) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 505 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Melissa J Swindle and the law firm of Jenkens & Gilchrist, terminated as to Banc of America Securities, LLC. and Credit Suisse First Boston, LLC. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 2/28/07) (cxb) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (Swindle, Melissa) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel the Depositions of Kathleen Giddings and Deloitte & Touche, LLP 499 , filed February 26, 2007 is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Irma C. Ramirez for hearing, (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on February 27, 2007) (jyg) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2007 (Gardner, Jo). (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to 499 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2007 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Irma C Ramirez. Respondent may file a response to the motion and brief containing citations to relevant authorities no later than Wednesday, March 7, 2007, by 12:00 p.m.. Movant may not file a reply. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on February 27, 2007) (mfw) Modified on 2/28/2007 (mfw). (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 499 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel the Depositions of Kathleen Giddings and Deloitte & Touche LLP (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8) (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel the Depositions of Kathleen Giddings and Deloitte & Touche LLP by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Manual Filing of Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion To Compel the Depositions of Kathleen Giddings and Deloitte & Touche LLP by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Radcliffe, Willow) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER on Plaintiffs Motion to Modify the Courts October 20, 2006 Scheduling Order 475 , filed February 1, 2007, and Amended Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Regarding Limit on Depositions 479 , filed February 6, 2007. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs motions in part and DENIES them in part as set forth in the order. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 02/16/07) (Boyle, Jane) Modified on 2/20/2007 (Gardner, Jo). (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 493 Reply to Response to Motion, In Support of Amended Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Regarding Limit on Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 33# 2 Exhibit 34# 3 Exhibit 35# 4 Exhibit 36# 5 Exhibit 37# 6 Exhibit 38# 7 Exhibit 39# 8 Exhibit 40# 9 Exhibit 41# 10 Exhibit 42# 11 Exhibit 43# 12 Exhibit 44# 13 Exhibit 45# 14 Exhibit 46# 15 Exhibit 47# 16 Exhibit 48) (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 479 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Amended Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Regarding Limit on Depositions PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING LIMIT ON DEPOSITIONS (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Manual Filing of Notice by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING BY PLAINTIFFS ALASKA ELECTRICAL PENSION FUND AND MASSACHUSETTS STATE CARPENTERS PENSION FUND (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 489 Response to Motion, to Modify the Court's October 26, 2006 Scheduling Order (Cleveland, C) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 475 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Court's October 20, 2006 Scheduling Order Defendants C. Scott Greer's and Renee J. Hornbaker's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Court's October 26, 2006 Scheduling Order (Cleveland, C) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Manual Filing of Appendix of Confidential Exhibits by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 486 Response to Motion, (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 486 Response to Motion, Appendix of Non-Confidential Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A to F) (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 479 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Amended Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Regarding Limit on Depositions (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation re 484 Response to Motion, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 to 25# 2 Exhibits 26-51) (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation re 475 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Court's October 20, 2006 Scheduling Order (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 479 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Amended Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Regarding Limit on Depositions Appendix of Non-Confidential Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Regarding Limit on Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12) (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Amended Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Regarding Limit on Depositions by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund with Memorandum in Support. (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Manual Filing of Notice by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Setting expedited briefing schedule on Plaintiffs Motion to Modify the Courts October 20, 2006 Scheduling Order (doc. 475), filed February 1, 2007. If Plaintiffs do wish to move for an increase in the number of depositions that they are allowed, Plaintiffs must file their motion by noon on Tuesday, February 6, 2007. Defendants shall respond to the motion(s) by noon on Friday, February 9, 2007, and Plaintiffs shall reply by noon on Tuesday, February 13, 2007. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 02/01/07) (Boyle, Jane) Modified on 2/1/2007 (skt). (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 475 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Court's October 20, 2006 Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29# 30 Exhibit 30# 31 Exhibit 31# 32 Exhibit 32) (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Court's October 20, 2006 Scheduling Order by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Douglas Fuchs for PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Signed by Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 1/30/07) (svc) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Ellen B Sessions, counsel for Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC. New address is: Fulbright & Jaworski L.L.P., 2200 Ross Ave, Ste 2800, Dallas, TX 75201 (Sessions, Ellen) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 465 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Regarding Limit on Depositions. If Plaintiffs can be more specific in their request, the Court would be willing to entertain a similar motion as this suit progresses. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 01/12/07) (psm) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 470 Response to Motion, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N) (Behrens, R) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 465 MOTION LIMIT ON DEPOSITIONS PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING LIMIT ON DEPOSITIONS (Behrens, R) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hamilton Lindley on behalf of all plaintiffs (Lindley, Hamilton) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation and ORDER Regarding Additional Document Production by Defendant Flowserve Corporation. See order for details. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on December 22, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Manual Filing under seal of an unredacted version of 465 MOTION (pages 4, 6, 9-10) and 466 Appendix (exh 15-26) (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 12/27/2006 (lrl, ). (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix of Non-Confidential Documents in Support of 465 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order Re: Limit on Depositions filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14) (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 12/27/2006 (lrl, ). (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING LIMIT ON DEPOSITIONS [Redacted Version] by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 12/27/2006 (lrl, ). (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support of 461 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING ADDITIONAL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE CORPORATION filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Weaver, Lesley) Modified on 12/27/2006 (lrl, ). (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING ADDITIONAL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION BY DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE CORPORATION filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Weaver, Lesley) Modified on 12/27/2006 (lrl, ). (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference Proceedings held on 12/06/2006 before Judge Irma C Ramirez. The Official Record of the transcript is on file with the Clerk's Office. Contact the Clerk's Office at 214/753-2200 or the Court Reporter - Shawn McRoberts at 214/753-2349 to obtain a copy of the Official. (axm, ) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot 455 OBJECTION to Telephonic Hearing, requesting postponement and an Order that the conference not be held telephonically added. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on December 6, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 431 and 439 Motion to Compel as moot without prejudice to refiling. To the extent that any of the issues set forth in paragraph 6 above are not resolved during the face-to-face conference, Plaintiffs may re-file their motion to compel on those outstanding issues no later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, December 22, 2006. Defendants may file a response to any such motion no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, January 8, 2007. To the extent a motion is filed, a hearing will be conducted at 10:00 a.m. on Thursday, January 11, 2007. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on December 6, 2006) (jyg, ) Modified on 12/8/2006 (svc, ). (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 455 MOTION for Hearing Postponement PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS C. SCOTT GREERS AND RENEE J. HORNBAKERS OBJECTION TO TELECONFERENCE HEARING SET UNILATERALLY BY PLAINTIFFS BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE IRMA C. RAMIREZ (Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Judge Irma C. Ramirez: 455 Motion for Hearing filed by C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker Motions referred to Irma C Ramirez. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 11/20/06) (psm, ) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 11/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Hearing Postponement by C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker. Party OBJECTION to Telephonic Hearing, requesting postponement and an Order that the conference not be held telephonically added. (New, Everett) (Entered: 11/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings-Scheduling Conference held on October 20, 2006 before Judge Honorable Jane J. Boyle. Court Reporter: Shawnie Archuleta. (USC-not imaged) (jyg, ) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 451 Motion to Extend Time to Produce Tiff Images of Electronic Documents Timely Produced in Native Format Pursuant to Magistrate Judge's Order Dated October 13, 2006. It is therefore ordered that Flowserve's deadline to complete proudction is extended until October 31, 2006. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on October 25, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Andrew C Allen for Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on October 25, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 10/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Agreed MOTION to Extend Time to Produce Tiff Images of Electronic Documents Timely Produced in Native Format Pursuant to Magistrate Judge's Order Dated October 13, 2006 by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Flowserve Corporation (Behrens, R) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Hearing on Motion to Compel and Motion to Modify Scheduling Order held on 10/13/2006 before Judge Irma C. Ramirez. The Official Record of the transcript is on file with the Clerk's Office. Contact the Clerk's Office at 214/753-2200 or the Court Reporter - Betty Tate at 972/596-9442 to obtain a copy of the Official Record. (Attachments: # 1) (axm, ) Modified on 10/23/2006 (klm, ). (Entered: 10/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 421 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. See order for deadlines. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on October 20, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof of Service for Subpoena in a Civil Case served on Malcolm Platt on 10/12/2006. (kdc, ) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof of Service for Subpoena in a Civil Case served on Charles Rampacek on 10/12/0006. (kdc, ) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Richard P Rouco for Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund and Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 10/17/2006) (kdc, ) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: setting hearing for 10/20/06 at 10:00 a.m. on Plaintiffs' motion to 421 modify scheduling order. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 10/17/06) (Boyle, Jane) Modified on 10/18/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 441 Motion for Reconsideration as moot. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 10/16/06) (Boyle, Jane) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part 399 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Flowserve Corporation to Produce Knowledgeable Deponent Pursuant to FRCvP 30(b)(6). (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on 10/13/06) (klm, ) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Defendant's motion to modify the scheduling order reflected by minute entry dated August 8, 2006 [Docket No. 337], should be, and it is hereby, GRANTED, in part. Defendant shall complete production of all non-objectionable hard and electronic documents responsive to Plaintiffs' first and second requests for production of documents and all privilege logs no later than October 27, 2006. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on 10/13/06) (klm, ) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re 436 Order, and Objection to Proceeding on Motion to Compel Without Due Process by C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker with Brief in Support. (Murray, Todd) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 424 MOTION TO SET EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STAY CURRENT SCHEDULING DEADLINE. The parties shall confer about whether the conference should be held on Oct 17, 2006 or Oct 20, 2006 and provide the Court with their chosen date and time by noon on Oct 13, 2006. See order for detatils. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on October 11, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 424 MOTION to Set Expedited Briefing Schedule for Plas' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Pla's Motion to Stay Current Scheduling Deadlines (Huff, Carrie) Modified on 10/13/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' Request for Relief from Deadlines to File Discovery Motions 430 and Referring Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel 431 to Magistrate Judge Ramirez to hear at the October 13, 2006 hearing on discovery without the need for a written response from the Defendants. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 10/12/06) (Boyle, Jane) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 434 Response in Opposition, APPENDIX OF NON-CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE CORPORATION?S MOTION TO MODIFY MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER SCHEDULING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION DEADLINES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29# 30 Exhibit 30# 31 Exhibit 31# 32 Exhibit 32# 33 Exhibit 33# 34 Exhibit 34# 35 Exhibit 35# 36 Exhibit 36# 37 Exhibit 37)(Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 412 MOTION to Modify Magistrate Judge's Order Scheduling Document Production Deadlines (Weaver, Lesley) Modified on 10/13/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Manual Filing of Memorandum and Appendix by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 431 MOTION to Compel MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE CORPORATION TO SEARCH FOR AND PRODUCE RELEVANT DOCUMENTS, 432 Appendix in Support,,, (Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix of Non-Confidential Documents in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 431 MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE CORPORATION TO SEARCH FOR AND PRODUCE RELEVANT DOCUMENTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29# 30 Exhibit 30# 31 Exhibit 31# 32 Exhibit 32# 33 Exhibit 33# 34 Exhibit 34# 35 Exhibit 35# 36 Exhibit 43# 37 Exhibit 47# 38 Exhibit 48)(Weaver, Lesley) Modified on 10/13/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE CORPORATION TO SEARCH FOR AND PRODUCE RELEVANT DOCUMENTS by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund with Memorandum in Support. (Weaver, Lesley) Modified on 10/13/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Compel PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM DEADLINE TO FILE DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund with Memorandum in Support. (Weaver, Lesley) Modified on 10/13/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT re 426 Response in Opposition, 427 Appendix in Support,, Declaration of Matthew S. Chester by Flowserve Corporation. (Behrens, R) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re 426 Response in Opposition, 427 Appendix in Support,, Declaration of R. Thaddeus Behrens by Flowserve Corporation. (Behrens, R) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation re 426 Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Flowserve Corporation to Produce Knowledgeable Deponent Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25)(Behrens, R) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Flowserve Corporation re 399 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FLOWSERVE CORPORATION TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) (Behrens, R) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Further Appendix of Non-Confidential Exhibits in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation re 413 Appendix in Support, 412 MOTION to Modify Magistrate Judge's Order Scheduling Document Production Deadlines, 414 Notice of Manual Filing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12# 2 Exhibit 13# 3 Exhibit 14# 4 Exhibit 15 (Part One)# 5 Exhibit 15 (Part Two)# 6 Exhibit 15 (Part Three)# 7 Exhibit 15 (Part Four)# 8 Exhibit 16# 9 Exhibit 17# 10 Exhibit 19)(Chester, Matthew) Modified on 10/13/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SET EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STAY CURRENT SCHEDULING DEADLINE by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 10/10/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 10/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ex Kano S Sams, II on behalf of Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 10/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 421 MOTION Modification of Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 16# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27)(Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO MODIFY 167 SCHEDULING ORDER by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Sams, Ex Kano) Modified on 10/10/2006 (jyg, ). Modified on 10/11/2006 (klm, ). (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Standing Order for Electronic Filings Related to Matters Referred to the United States Magistrate Judge - see order for specifics. (jyg, ) (Entered: 10/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Set Deadlines as to 412 Motion to Modify Magistrate Judge's Order Scheduling Document Production Deadlines with Supporting Brief. Responses due by 10/11/2006. Movant may not file a reply. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2006 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma C Ramirez. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on September 28, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Set Deadlines as to 399 Motion to Compel COMPEL FLOWSERVE CORPORATION TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6). Responses due by 10/10/2006. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2006 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma C Ramirez. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on September 26, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Judge Irma C. Ramirez: 412 Motion to Modify Magistrate Judge's Order Scheduling Document Production Deadlines filed by Flowserve Corporation. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 09/27/06) (psm, ) Modified on 10/3/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 394 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Class Certification Record Based on Plas' Post-Hearing Production of Over 25,000 Pages. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 09/27/06) (Boyle, Jane) Modified on 10/3/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Manual Filing of Confidential Appendix by Flowserve Corporation re 412 MOTION to Modify Magistrate Judge's Order Scheduling Document Production Deadlines (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix of Non-Confidential Exhibits in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation re 412 MOTION to Modify Magistrate Judge's Order Scheduling Document Production Deadlines (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One to Three# 2 Exhibit Four# 3 Exhibit Five to Eleven)(Huff, Carrie) Modified on 10/10/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Modify Magistrate Judge's Order Scheduling Document Production Deadlines by Flowserve Corporation (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 411 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 410 Response in Opposition, APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO REOPEN CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Weaver, Lesley) Modified on 10/3/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 394 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement the Class Certification Record Based on Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Production of Over 25,000 Pages PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO REOPEN CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING (Weaver, Lesley) Modified on 10/3/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Judge Irma C. Ramirez: 399 Motion to Compel filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund,, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 09/26/06) (psm, ) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by G Douglas Jones for Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund and Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on September 22, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Peter Burke for Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund and Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on September 22, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey W Lawrence for Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund and Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on September 21, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Dennis J Herman for Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund and Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on September 21, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 399 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FLOWSERVE CORPORATION TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) (Attachments: # 1 TAB 1# 2 TAB 2-6# 3 TAB 7# 4 TAB 8# 5 TAB 9# 6 TAB 10# 7 TAB 11-15# 8 TAB 16-19)(Weaver, Lesley) Modified on 10/5/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FLOWSERVE CORPORATION TO PRODUCE KNOWLEDGEABLE DEPONENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Weaver, Lesley) Modified on 10/5/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 398 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 397 Response in Opposition, APPENDIX OF NON-CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REBUTTAL BRIEF TO FLOWSERVE DEFENDANTS' THIRD AND FOURTH SUPPLEMENTS AND POWERPOINT PRESENTATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14)(Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund PLAINTIFFS' REBUTTAL BRIEF TO FLOWSERVE CORPORATION DEFENDANTS' THIRD AND FOURTH SUPPLEMENTS AND POWERPOINT PRESENTATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (REDACTED VERSION) (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Manual Filing of PLAINTIFFS' REBUTTAL BRIEF TO FLOWSERVE CORPORATION DEFENDANTS' THIRD AND FOURTH SUPPLEMENTS AND POWERPOINT PRESENTATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT re 394 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement the Class Certification Record Based on Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Production of Over 25,000 Pages by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker. (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Supplement the Class Certification Record Based on Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Production of Over 25,000 Pages by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker with Brief in Support. (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings on Class Cerification held on September 7, 2006 before Judge Jane J Boyle. The Official Record of the transcript is on file with the Clerk's Office. Contact the Clerk's Office at 214/753-2200 or the Court Reporter - Shawnie Archuleta at 214/753-2747 to obtain a copy of the Official Record. (jyg, ) Modified on 9/25/2006 (svc, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2006 (rrj, ). Modified on 10/2/2006 (rrj, ). (Entered: 09/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Stipulation and ORDER Extending Time for Parties to Exchange Names of Potential Deponents to no later than September 19, 2006. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on September 15, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Parties to Exchange Names of Potential Deponents. The Court is of the opinion that the stipulation should be GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED that the parties exchange lists of potential witnesses to be deposed in October 2006 by September 19, 2006. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 09/18/06) (psm, ) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund and Proposed Order Extending Time for Parties to Exchange Names of Potential Deponents. (Kendall, Joe) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Brian Swerdlin for Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund and Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 9/11/06) (klm, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: As directed at the September 7, 2006 class certification hearing Plaintiffs Alaska Electrical Pension Fund and Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund may file a written rebuttal to the Flowserve Defendants' Third Supplement of Additional Confidential Witness Testimony to Opposition to Motion for Class Certification regarding confidential witnesses North, Mustafa, and Strader; Fourth Supplement regarding confidential witness Grommersch; and PowerPoint presentation no later than Friday, September 22, 2006. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 09/08/06) (psm, ) (Entered: 09/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 385 Supplemental Document Fourth Supplement of Additional Confidential Witness Testimony to Opposition to Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 78)(Behrens, R) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Document by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker as to 296 Sealed Document, Fourth Supplement of Additional Confidential Witness Testimony to Opposition to Motion for Class Certification. (Behrens, R) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC of Filing of Redacted Exhibits Per September 5, 2006 Order (Attachments: # 1 Appendix to Defendants PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Banc of America Securities LLC and Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification [Portions Redacted])(Ferris, Samantha) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 378 Order,, regarding Filing of Redacted Exhibits 8-12 in Support of Flowserve Defendants Opposition to Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8# 2 Exhibit 9# 3 Exhibit 10# 4 Exhibit 11# 5 Exhibit 12)(Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Manual Filing of Appendix by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 380 MOTION to Strike and in Limine (Confidential Ex. 1) (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 380 MOTION to Strike and in Limine for Purposes of Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2# 2 Exhibit 3)(Huff, Carrie) Modified on 9/8/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike and in Limine for Purposes of Class Certification by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker with Brief in Support. (Huff, Carrie) Modified on 9/8/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Sanford Svetcov for Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund and Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on Sept 5, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Court granted Dfts' Motion to Remove Plas' Confidentiality Designations and Resulting Seal Affecting Defendants' Oppositions to Motions for Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto, filed 7/31/06. The District Clerk is hereby directed to unseal and/or file the pleadings listed in the parties' letter attached hereto no later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, September 6, 2006. Further,Defendants are hereby ORDERED to electronically file new redaction versions of the listed pleadings or portions of pleadings no later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, September 6,2006. See order for details. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on Sept 5, 2006) (Attachments: # 1)(jyg, ) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 376 Supplemental THIRD SUPPLEMENT OF ADDITIONAL CONFIDENTIAL WITNESS TESTIMONY TO OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS FLOWSERVE, GREER & HORNBAKER TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 73 - 77)(Even, Nicholas) Modified on 9/8/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Document by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker as to 304 Response to Motion THIRD SUPPLEMENT OF ADDITIONAL CONFIDENTIAL WITNESS TESTIMONY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 368 Motion for Leave to File Plas' Rsponse to the Flowserve Dfts' Supplements. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 09/01/06) (psm, ) Modified on 9/12/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Designation of Mediator by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker. The parties advised the Court that they have selected Daniel Weinstein, JAMS. (Even, Nicholas) Modified on 11/28/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX OF NON-CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THE FLOWSERVE DEFENDANTS' "SUPPLEMENTS" IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11# 2 Exhibit 12# 3 Exhibit 13# 4 Exhibit 14# 5 Exhibit 15# 6 Exhibit 16# 7 Exhibit 17# 8 Exhibit 18# 9 Exhibit 19# 10 Exhibit 20)(Weaver, Lesley) Modified on 9/1/2006 (cxb, ). (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 368 MOTION for Leave to File Response to the Flowserve Defendants' "Supplements" in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Plaintiffs' Response to the Flowserve Defendants' "Supplements" in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Manual Filing of Notice by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 368 MOTION for Leave to File Response to the Flowserve Defendants' "Supplements" in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Weaver, Lesley) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Response to the Flowserve Defendants' "Supplements" in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 311 Motion to Remove Plaintiffs' Confidentiality Designations and Resulting Seal Affecting Defendants' Oppositions to Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto. No later than 5pm on Friday, Sept 1, 2006, the parties shall notify the Court in writing of their respective pleadings (identifying each pleading by docket number) which may be unsealed as a result of this ruling. These pleadings shall be unsealed by separate order. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on August 31, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 284 Response in Opposition Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Class Certification (Martin, Joshua) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 364 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 304 Response to Motion NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 362 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 259 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 321 Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Flowserve Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 08/29/06) (psm, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Susan K Alexander for Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund and Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on August 25, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 278 Motion to Strike: The Court GRANTS the motion in part and DENIES the motion in part as follows: 1. Plaintiffs' motion to strike responses denying knowledge or information sufficient to form a belief as to matters within the purview of Defendant's knowledge is DENIED. 2. Plaintiffs' motion to strike responses denying knowledge or information sufficient to form a belief as to the truth concerning what information a confidential witness gave to Plaintiffs is DENIED. 3. Plaintiffs' motion to strike Defendant's first and second affirmative defenses is GRANTED (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 08/28/06) (Boyle, Jane) Modified on 8/30/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 08/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 311 MOTION to Unseal Document 287 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Flowserve Corporation,, C Scott Greer,, Renee J Hornbaker,, 289 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Flowserve Corporation,, C Scott Greer,, Renee J Hornbaker,, 283 Notice of Manual (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Thomas Butterworth (Federman, William) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION/Faxed Letter Agreemetn by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker regarding motion hearing on Defendants' Motios for Class Certification... (jyg, ) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Reset Deadlines as to 311 Motion to Remove Plaintiffs' Confidentiality Designations and Resulting Seal Affecting Defendants' Oppositions to Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto. Responses due by 8/18/2006 Replies due by 8/24/2006. Motion Hearing reset for 8/31/2006 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma C Ramirez. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on August 18, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 353 Response in Opposition,, Appendix In Support Of Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Remove Plaintiffs' Confidentiality Designations And Resulting Seal Affecting Defendants' Oppositions To Motion For Class Certification And Exhibits Thereto (Attachments: # 1 Tab A# 2 Tab B# 3 Tab C)(Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 311 MOTION to Unseal Document 287 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Flowserve Corporation,, C Scott Greer,, Renee J Hornbaker,, 289 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Flowserve Corporation,, C Scott Greer,, Renee J Hornbaker,, 283 Notice of Manual Plaintiffs' Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Remove Plaintiffs' Confidentiality Designations And Resulting Seal Affecting Defendants' Oppositions To Motion For Class Certification And Exhibits Thereto (Sams, Ex Kano) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 304 Response to Motion, 351 Supplemental Document (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 69 - 72)(Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Document by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker as to 304 Response to Motion Second Supplement of Additional Confidential Witness Testimony. (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Motion Hearing reset for 9/7/2006 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J Boyle on Motion to Certify Class. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on August 17, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 348 Reply to Response to Motion,, Plaintiffs' Consolidated Reply To Defendants' Response To Plaintiffs' Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Plaintiffs' Reply To Flowserve Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Tab A)(Epstein, Kimberly) Modified on 8/17/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 321 MOTION/Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Plaintiffs' Reply To Flowserve Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification (Epstein, Kimberly) Modified on 8/17/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix of Additional Testimony in Support filed by C Scott Greer re 310 Response to Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant C. Scott Greer's Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint and Brief in Support (Murray, Todd) Modified on 8/17/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Brief in Support filed by C Scott Greer re 310 Response to Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant C. Scott Greer's Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint and Brief in Support (Murray, Todd) Modified on 8/17/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 340 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief and Appendix of Additional Testimony In Support of Response to Motion to Strike Portions of Greer's Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint and Brief in Support. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on August 16, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 278 MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT C. SCOTT GREER'S AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 341 Response to Motion, for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Flowserve Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification - Part 2 of 2 (Continuation of Appendix document #342) (Murray, Todd) Modified on 8/14/2006 (nap, ). (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 341 Response to Motion, for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Flowserve Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Murray, Todd) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 321 PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO FLOWSERVE DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION and Brief in Support (Murray, Todd) Modified on 8/14/2006 (nap, ). (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief and Appendix of Additional Testimony In Support of Response to Motion to Strike Portions of Greer's Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint by C Scott Greer with Brief in Support. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Murray, Todd) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Irma C Ramirez : Hearing held on 8/10/06. Issue: request for documents & testimony concerning former employee's communications with Flowserve, including affidavit allegedly drafted by Flowserve counsel and submitted in support of Flowserve's opposition to class certification. Defendant objects on basis of attorney-client privilege and attorney work product. Because issue concerns applicability of privilege, record should be made at deposition and formal motion should be filed.So ordered. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Willie Briscoe, Hamilton Lindley, Ex Kano Sams; Defense - Carrie Huff, Rodney Acker, Todd Murray, Charles Flynn, David Klaudt, M. Byron Wilder.(Not recorded)NO PDF ATTACHED - THIS IS A VIRTUAL MINUTE ENTRY. (lmm) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 321 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice PLAINTIFFS? REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? REPLY TO FLOWSERVE DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Irma C Ramirez : Telephone Conference. Issue # 1 - Request for date certain for Flowserve's production of documents. Rolling production to continue as planned. However, Flowserve shall complete production of 75% of all non-objectionable hard and electronic documents responsive to 1st & 2nd requests for production by 9/15/06, and production of 100% of such documents shall be completed by 9/30/06.Issue # 2 - Request for date for 30(b)(6) deposition of Flowserve concerning document retention. Deposition to be completed by 8/30/06.Issue # 3 - Request for expediting briefing and hearing of Defendants' pending motion to remove plaintiff's confidentiality designations. Request denied.Issue # 4 - Request for production of documents Court ordered produced by plaintiffs in May 1 order. Any supplementation to production to be completed by 9/15.Regarding issues #1 and # 4, disputes concerning objections and existence of documents or compliance with order to be asserted by formal discovery motion.So ordered. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Willie Briscoe, Hamilton Lindley, Lesley Weaver; Defense - Charles Flynn, Ellen Sessions, David Klaudt, Carrie Huff, Joshua Martin, Noel Hensley, Todd Murray.(Not recorded)NO PDF ATTACHED - THIS IS A VIRTUAL MINUTE ENTRY. (lmm, ) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RESETTING HEARING: On the parties' request, the evidentiary hearing set for August 22, 2006 at 2:00 p.m., has been reset for 10:00 a.m. on Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class (doc. 239). (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 08/08/06) (psm, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF of Service for Subpoena served on Leonard J. Fruci on 7/29/2006. (skt, ) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 333 Supplemental Document (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 65 - 68)(Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Document by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker as to 304 Response to Motion SUPPLEMENT OF ADDITIONAL CONFIDENTIAL WITNESS TESTIMONY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Granting Plumbers & Pipefitters Motion for Protective Order 238 . Because Plumbers & Pipefitters does not seek to become a class representative upon certification of a class in this action, the Court GRANTS the Motion for a Protective Order. The Court will address the Motion for Leave to Withdraw in conjunction with Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (doc. 259) at a later date. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 08/03/06) (Boyle, Jane) Modified on 8/4/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***UNSEALED PER 9/5/06 ORDER***Appendix of Confidential Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Motion to Remove Plaintiffs' Confidential Designations and Resulting Seal Affecting Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker, PriceWaterHouseCoopers LLP, Banc of America Securities LLC and Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8)(jyg, ) Modified on 9/6/2006 (lrl, ). (Entered: 08/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***UNSEALED PER 9/5/06 ORDER***Appendix of Confidential Documents in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Flowserve Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Harold Klagsbald, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Jerry Ryan, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Thomas Butterworth, Robert K Finnell. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(jyg, ) Modified on 9/6/2006 (lrl, ). (Entered: 08/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***UNSEALED PER 9/5/06 ORDER***Reply to Flowserve Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Harold Klagsbald, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Jerry Ryan, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Thomas Butterworth, Robert K Finnell. (jyg, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2006 (jyg, ). Modified on 9/6/2006 (lrl, ). (Entered: 08/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Lesley E Weaver for Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund and Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on August 1, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 08/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC To Paragraphs 10, 394 - 397, 399, 409, 410, 423, 424, 431, 433, 437, 438, 442, 443, 447 and 448 of Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Setting an expedited briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Flowserve Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (doc. 321), filed August 1, 2006. The Court sets an expedited briefing schedule so that it may fully consider Plaintiffs' Request before the hearing on class certification set for August 22, 2006. Defendants' response will be due on August 11, 2006. The deadline for Plaintiffs' reply is August 16, 2006. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 08/01/06) (Boyle, Jane) Modified on 8/3/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot 293 Motion for Protective Order Preventing Depositions of Lead Counsel's Investigators to Ensure Protection of Lead Counsel's Mental Impressions and Work Product and to Quash Subpoena of Sammy Hughes. The hearing set for 8/11/06 at 9:00 am is hereby cancelled. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on August 1, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Set Deadlines as to 311 Motion to to Remove Plaintiffs' Confidentiality Designations and Resulting Seal Affecting Defendants' Oppositions to Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto. Responses due by 8/21/2006; Replies due by 8/31/2006. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2006 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma C Ramirez. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on August 1, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Manual Filing of Memorandum by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 319 Reply to Response to Motion, (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 322 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 321 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO FLOWSERVE DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Epstein, Kimberly) Modified on 8/3/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Request for Judicial Notice PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO FLOWSERVE DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Epstein, Kimberly) Modified on 8/3/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 320 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 319 Reply to Response to Motion, APPENDIX OF NON-CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO FLOWSERVE DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16)(Epstein, Kimberly) Modified on 8/3/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 239 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO FLOWSERVE DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION) (Epstein, Kimberly) Modified on 8/3/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 239 MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Epstein, Kimberly) Modified on 8/3/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation re 316 Response to Motion, (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 to Appendix)(Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE filed by Flowserve Corporation re 293 MOTION for Protective Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PREVENTING DEPOSITIONS OF LEAD COUNSEL'S INVESTIGATORS TO ENSURE PROTECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL'S MENTAL IMPRESSIONS AND WORK PRODUCT AND TO QUASH SUBPOENA OF SAMMY HUGHES (Huff, Carrie) Modified on 8/1/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Judge Irma C. Ramirez: 311 Motion to Unseal Document,, filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP,, Banc of America Securities LLC,, Flowserve Corporation,, C Scott Greer,, Renee J Hornbaker,, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC,. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 08/01/06) (psm, ) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Manual Filing of Appendix by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 311 MOTION to Unseal Document 287 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Flowserve Corporation,, C Scott Greer,, Renee J Hornbaker,, 289 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Flowserve Corporation,, C Scott Greer,, Renee J Hornbaker,, 283 Notice of Manual (Appendix of Confidential Exhibits) (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 311 MOTION to Unseal Document 287 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Flowserve Corporation,, C Scott Greer,, Renee J Hornbaker,, 289 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Flowserve Corporation,, C Scott Greer,, Renee J Hornbaker,, 283 Notice of Manual (Appendix of Non-Confidential Exhibits) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT re 311 MOTION to Unseal Document 287 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Flowserve Corporation,, C Scott Greer,, Renee J Hornbaker,, 289 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Flowserve Corporation,, C Scott Greer,, Renee J Hornbaker,, 283 Notice of Manual Declaration of Thad Behrens by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Unseal Document 287 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Flowserve Corporation,, C Scott Greer,, Renee J Hornbaker,, 289 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Flowserve Corporation,, C Scott Greer,, Renee J Hornbaker,, 283 Notice of Manual Filing, filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP,, Banc of America Securities LLC,, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, to Remove Plaintiffs' Confidentiality Designations and Resulting Seal Affecting Defendants' Oppositions to Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker with and Brief in Support. (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by C Scott Greer re 278 MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT C. SCOTT GREER'S AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (Murray, Todd) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Granting in part and Denying in part the parties' Stipulation Modifying the Court's January 30, 2006 (doc. 303), and Granting parties' Agreed Motion to Extend Limitation of Number of Depositions (doc. 307), filed July 28, 2006. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/31/06) (Boyle, Jane) Modified on 8/1/2006 (jyg, ). (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Irma C Ramirez : Telephone Conference. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Willie Briscoe, Joe Kendall; Defense - Todd Murray, Ellen Sessions, Samantha Ferris, Carrie Huff, Noel Hensley.(Not recorded)Issue # 1 - Plaintiffs seek continuance of 8/11 hearing on motion to quash subpoenas of investigators until after 8/21 based on the previously-scheduled vacation of local counsel. Defendants object to a continuance because the class certification hearing is currently scheduled for 8/22. Plaintiffs' counsel will confer regarding a possible stipulation that the subpoenaed investigators will not be proffered as live witnesses or by declaration for purposes of class certification. If so stipulated, the hearing will not be necessary at this time, although the issue may arise later as to the merits. Plaintiffs' counsel will advise all parties and the Court in writing if they will agree to such a stipulation. If plaintiffs do not agree to so stipulate, then the Court will conduct another telephonic conference on 8/1 at 2:00 to determine whether a continuance will be granted. Plaintiffs will be responsible for arranging the conference.Issue # 2 - Plaintiffs seek a date certain for production of hard copy and electronic discovery by defendants. The parties are to confer, and to the extent that no reasonable agreement can be reached, the Court will conduct another telephonic conference next week. Plaintiffs will be responsible for arranging the conference at a time and date convenient for all interested parties.So ordered.NO PDF ATTACHED - THIS IS A VIRTUAL MINUTE ENTRY. (lmm) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION to Extend Limitation on Number of Depositions by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker (Behrens, R) (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Granting Parties' Joint Stipulation Extending Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants Banc of America Securities LLC's and Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint and Permitting Defendants to Amend Their First Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 07/27/06) (Boyle, Jane) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund Extending Plaintiffs' Deadline to File Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants Banc of America Securities LLC's and Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint and Permitting Defendants' to Amend Their First Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint. (Kendall, Joe) (Entered: 07/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 239 MOTION to Certify Class (Re-Filed Pursuant to Court Order Dated July 24, 2006) (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 167 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,, by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER MODIFYING THE COURT'S JANUARY 30, 2006 SCHEDULING ORDER. (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 301 Motion to Seal Document. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/24/06) (jrb, ) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION to Seal Document 286 Response in Opposition Pending Resolution of Disputes Over Confidentiality Designations and for Leave to Publicly File Substitute Brief With Further Redactions by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Behrens, R) (Entered: 07/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/7/06 before Judge Ramirez. The Official Record of the transcript is on file with the Clerk's Office. Contact the Clerk's Office at 214/753-2200 or the Court Reporter - Betty Tate at 972/596-9442 to obtain a copy of the Official Record. (svc, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/21/2006 (rrj, ). Modified on 7/21/2006 (rrj, ). (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Set Deadlines as to 293 Motion for Protective Order PREVENTING DEPOSITIONS OF LEAD COUNSEL'S INVESTIGATORS TO ENSURE PROTECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL'S MENTAL IMPRESSIONS AND WORK PRODUCT AND TO QUASH SUBPOENA OF SAMMY HUGHES. The requested discovery which is the subject of this motion is hereby STAYED pending further order of this Court. Responses due by 8/1/2006 Replies due by 8/8/2006. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2006 09:00 AM before Judge Jane J Boyle. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on July 18, 2006) (jyg, ) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER...Setting Deadlines as to 293 MOTION for Protective Order PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PREVENTING DEPOSITIONS OF LEAD COUNSEL'S INVESTIGATORS TO ENSURE PROTECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL'S MENTAL IMPRESSIONS AND WORK PRODUCT AND TO QUASH SUBPOENA OF SAMMY HUGHES. Responses due by 8/1/2006 Replies due by 8/8/2006. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2006 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma C Ramirez. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on 7/18/06) (svc, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***PORTIONS UNSEALED PER 9/5/06 ORDER - Exh 1-7 and 13-15 unsealed, Exh 8-12 remain sealed; See Doc #383 for redacted version of Exh 8-12***Appendix of Confidential Exhibits In Support of Opposition of Defendants Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker. (not imaged)(svc, ) Modified on 9/6/2006 (lrl, ). (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***UNSEALED Per 9/5/06 Order***Opposition of Defendants Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker. (Attachments: # 1)(svc, ) Modified on 9/6/2006 (lrl, ). (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Judge Irma C. Ramirez: 293 Motion for Protective Order, filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund,, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund,. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 07/18/06) (psm, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 294 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 293 MOTION for Protective Order PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PREVENTING DEPOSITIONS OF LEAD COUNSEL?S INVESTIGATORS TO ENSURE PROTECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL?S MENTAL IMPRESSIONS AND WORK PRODUCT AND TO QUASH SUBPOENA OF SAMMY HUGHES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PREVENTING DEPOSITIONS OF LEAD COUNSEL'S INVESTIGATORS TO ENSURE PROTECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL'S MENTAL IMPRESSIONS AND WORK PRODUCT AND TO QUASH SUBPOENA OF SAMMY HUGHES by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund with Memorandum in Support. (Epstein, Kimberly) Modified on 7/24/2006 (svc, ). (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Irma C Ramirez : Hearing held on 7/14/06. Re: subpoena of plaintiff's law firm's investigator, parties to file formal motion to quash subpoena. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Willie Briscoe, Kim Epstein; Defense - Noel Hensley.(Not recorded)NO PDF ATTACHED - THIS IS A VIRTUAL MINUTE ENTRY. (lmm) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***PORTIONS UNSEALED per 9/5/06 Order***Appendix to PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC. (svc, ) Exhibits B and C remain under seal, Exhibits A, and D-F unsealed per 9/5/06 order. Modified on 9/5/2006 (lrl, ). (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***UNSEALED Per 9/5/06 Order***PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC. (svc, ) Modified on 9/5/2006 (lrl, ). (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Manual Filing of of Exs. 1-15 Under Seal by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 288 Appendix in Support, (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 288 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 286 Response in Opposition (Attachments: # 1 Exs. 16- 21# 2 Exs. 22-26# 3 Exs. 27-33# 4 Exs. 34-38# 5 Ex. 39# 6 Exs. 40-48# 7 Exs. 49-54# 8 Exs. 55-64)(Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Manual Filing of (Unredacted Opposition to Motion for Class Certification) by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 286 Response in Opposition (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***SEE DOC #296 FOR COMPLETE, UNREDACTED VERSION***RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 239 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: # 1 Opposition (Part 2))(Even, Nicholas) Modified on 7/24/2006 (svc, ). Modified on 9/6/2006 (lrl, ). Modified on 9/6/2006 (lrl, ). (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC re 284 Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Martin, Joshua) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Martin, Joshua) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Manual Filing of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appendix Thereto by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC (Martin, Joshua) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 280 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Briefs Exceeding Page Limitations. Defendants may file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification not to exceed 65pages, and Plaintiffs may file a reply brief not to exceed 60 pages. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/13/06) (svc, ) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 259 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Briefs Exceeding Page Limitations by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix in Support filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 278 MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT C. SCOTT GREER'S AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT C. SCOTT GREER'S AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena in a Civil Case served on Sammy Hughes on 7/6/06. (svc, ) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 250 Motion for Sanctions. See order for other specifics. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on 7/7/06) (jrb, ) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 228 Motion for Attorney Fees (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on 7/7/06) (jrb, ) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Irma C Ramirez : Motion Hearing held on 7/7/06 re 228 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Flowserve Corporation,, 250 Motion for Sanctions, filed by Flowserve Corporation. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Joe Kendall; Defense - Nick Even.(Tape #314-315ICR.)NO PDF ATTACHED - THIS IS A VIRTUAL MINUTE ENTRY. (lmm, ) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 272 Reply to Response to Motion, APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS? RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL NO. 502 & 633 AS A NAMED PLAINTIFF AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLUDING FURTHER DISCOVERY OF SAID PLAINTIFF BY DEFENDANTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B1# 3 Exhibit B2# 4 Exhibit B3# 5 Exhibit C1# 6 Exhibit C2# 7 Exhibit C3# 8 Exhibit C4# 9 Exhibit D# 10 Exhibit E# 11 Exhibit F# 12 Exhibit G# 13 Exhibit H)(Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 238 MOTION to Withdraw 233 Appendix in Support, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL NOS. 502 & 633 AS A NAMED PLAINTIFF AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLUDING FURTHER DISCOVERY OF SAID PLAINTIFF BY (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 270 Response in Opposition,, APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL NO. 502 & 633 PENSION TRUST FUND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C1# 4 Exhibit C2# 5 Exhibit C3# 6 Exhibit C4# 7 Exhibit D# 8 Exhibit E1# 9 Exhibit E2# 10 Exhibit E3)(Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 259 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS AND PIPEFITTERS LOCAL NO. 502 & 633 PENSION TRUST FUND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix in Support filed by Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund of 268 Response to Motion, (skt, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE filed by Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund re 250 MOTION for Sanctions [CORRECTED] Motion Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) with Respect to Failure of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Fund Trust to Comply with Magistrate's May 1, 2006 Discovery Order (skt, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix in Support filed by Flowserve Corporation re 250 MOTION for Sanctions [CORRECTED] Motion Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) with Respect to Failure of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Fund Trust to Comply with Magistrate's May 1, 2006 Discovery Order APPENDIX OF ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 265 Response in Opposition,, APPENDIX IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL NOS. 522 & 633 PENSION FUND TRUST TO DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE CORPORATION'S MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 37(B)(2) (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 247 MOTION for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) with Respect to Failure of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Fund Trust to Comply with Magistrate's May 1, 2006 Discovery Order RESPONSE OF PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL NOS. 522 & 633 PENSION FUND TRUST TO DEFENDANT FLOWSERVE CORPORATION?S MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 37(b)(2) (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended ANSWER to Complaint by C Scott Greer to Fifth Amended Complaint (Morris, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Banc of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC to Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint (Acker, Rodney) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 217 Underwriter Defendants Banc of America Securities LLC's and Credit Suisse First Boston LLC's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer. Underwriter Defendants are ORDERED to electronically file their amended answer within three days of the date of this order. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 06/20/06) (psm, ) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 220 Defendant C. Scott Greer's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Defendant is ORDERED to electronically file his amended answer within three days of the date of this order. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 06/20/06) (psm, ) (Entered: 06/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 259 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker with Memorandum in Support. (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix in Support filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 257 Response to Motion, for Leave to Withdraw Plaintiff Plumbers & Pipefitters Local Nos. 502 & 633 as a Named Plaintiff and For Protective Order Precluding Further Discovery of Said Plaintiff by Defendants (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Banc of America Securities LLC, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Flowserve Corporation, C Scott Greer, Renee J Hornbaker re 238 MOTION to Withdraw 233 Appendix in Support, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL NOS. 502 & 633 AS A NAMED PLAINTIFF AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLUDING FURTHER DISCOVERY OF SAID PLAINTIFF BY (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER...Setting Deadlines as to 250 Motion for Sanctions,. Responses due by 6/29/2006 and Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2006 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Irma C Ramirez. (Signed by Judge Irma C Ramirez on 6/12/06) (svc, ) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Judge Magistrate Judge Irma Ramirez: 250 Motion for Sanctions, filed by Flowserve Corporation, (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/12/06) (Boyle, Jane) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 254 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *SEALED* Excerpts from Affidavit of Nicolas Even in Support of Defendant Flowserve Corporation's Motion under Fed. R. Civi. P. 37(B)(2) with Respect to Failure of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Fund Trust to Comply with Magistrate's May 1, 2006 Discovery Order by Flowserve Corporation. (kdc, ) Modified on 6/12/2006 (kdc, ). (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 253 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        *SEALED* Excerpts from Defendant Flowserve Corporation's Motion Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(B)(2) with Respect to Failure of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Fund Trust to Comply with Magistrate's May 1, 2006 Discovery Order by Flowserve Corporation. (kdc, ) Modified on 6/12/2006 (kdc, ). (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 141 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/09/06) (Boyle, Jane) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Manual Filing. (Even, Nicholas) Modified on 6/9/2006 (lmr, ). (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Sanctions [CORRECTED] Motion Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) with Respect to Failure of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Fund Trust to Comply with Magistrate's May 1, 2006 Discovery Order by Flowserve Corporation (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Manual Filing of Notice by Flowserve Corporation re 248 Affidavit,, 247 MOTION for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) with Respect to Failure of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Fund Trust to Comply with Magistrate's May 1, 2006 Discovery Order , portions of which have been manually filed Under Seal (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT re 247 MOTION for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) with Respect to Failure of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Fund Trust to Comply with Magistrate's May 1, 2006 Discovery Order Affidavit of Nicholas Even by Flowserve Corporation. (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2) with Respect to Failure of Plaintiff Pipefitters Locals 522 & 633 Pension Fund Trust to Comply with Magistrate's May 1, 2006 Discovery Order by Flowserve Corporation (Even, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Judge Irma C. Ramirez: 228 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Flowserve Corporation. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 06/05/06) (psm, ) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 228 MOTION for Attorney Fees Relating to Flowserve's Motion to Compel (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATIONBRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE...Granting 237 AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. Deadline for Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification May 30 2006,Deadline for Defendants' Response to Motion for Class Certification July 14, 2006, Deadline for Plaintiffs' Reply on Motion for Class Certification August 1, 2006,Hearing on Motion for Class Certification August 22, 2006. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/31/06) (svc, ) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Lauren M Winston for Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/31/06) (svc, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TOMAGISTRATE JUDGE'S MAY 1, 2006 ORDERS...Plaintiffs' Objection is OVERRULED in its entirety. See order for specifics. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/31/06) (svc, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 226 Motion to Expedite. Because the Court has ruled on the Motion for Partial Reconsideration and the deadline for compliance with the May 1, 2006 Discovery Orders has passed, the Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Stay as moot. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 05/31/06) (psm, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 240 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 239 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I# 2 Exhibit J# 3 Exhibit K-L# 4 Exhibit M-N)(Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Certify Class by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund with Memorandum in Support. (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL NOS. 502 & 633 AS A NAMED PLAINTIFF AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLUDING FURTHER DISCOVERY OF SAID PLAINTIFF BY DEFENDANTS by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension (Epstein, Kimberly) Modified on 5/31/2006 (svc, ). (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DOCKETED IN ERROR***Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund (Epstein, Kimberly) Modified on 5/31/2006 (svc, ). (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 222 MOTION for Reconsideration PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR EXPEDITED REVIEW AND PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF MAGISTRATE?S MAY 1, 2006 ORDERS PARTIALLY GRANTING DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER LIMITING SCOPE AND (Kendall, Joe) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Unfiling 232 MOTION to Withdraw NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL NOS. 502 & 633 AS A NAMED PLAINTIFF AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLUDING FURTHER DISCOVERY OF SAID PLAINTIFF BY DEFENDANTS filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund,, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund,, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, due to the following deficiency: No certificate of conference. (Signed by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/25/06) (svc, ) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix in Support filed by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund re 232 MOTION to Withdraw NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL NOS. 502 & 633 AS A NAMED PLAINTIFF AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLUDING FURTHER DISCOVERY OF SAID PLAINTIFF BY DEFENDANTS (Epstein, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***UNFILED PER 5/25/06 ORDER*** MOTION to Withdraw NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF PLUMBERS & PIPEFITTERS LOCAL NOS. 502 & 633 AS A NAMED PLAINTIFF AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER PRECLUDING FURTHER DISCOVERY OF SAID PLAINTIFF BY DEFENDANTS by Massachusetts State Carpenters Pension Fund, Pipefitters, Locals 522 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund with Memorandum in Support. (Epstein, Kimberly) Modified on 5/25/2006 (svc, ). (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Irma C Ramirez : Telephone Conference. Early informal provision of confidential witness names and numbers. Order to beproduced on May 30. (Not Recorded.) (svc, ) (Entered: 05/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE filed by Flowserve Corporation re 226 MOTION to Expedite EXPEDITED MOTION FOR A PARTIAL STAY OF COMPLIANCE WITH MAY 1, 2006 DISCOVERY ORDERS PENDING RESOLUTION OF EXPEDITED PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION MOTION (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Flowserve Corporation re 222 MOTION for Reconsideration PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR EXPEDITED REVIEW AND PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION OF MAGISTRATE?S MAY 1, 2006 ORDERS PARTIALLY GRANTING DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS? MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER LIMITING SCOPE AND NUMBER OF PLAINTIFF DEPOSITIONS (Huff, Carrie) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF