BCCA Appeal Group et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-01491
District Judge David C Godbey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BCCA Appeal Group, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Janoe +1 713 229 1553 scott.janoe@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew L Kuryla +1 713 229 1114 matthew.kuryla@bakerbotts.com
Space Jason C Moore +1 713 229 1234 +1 713 229 2714
No Logo Texas Association Of Business, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Janoe +1 713 229 1553 scott.janoe@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew L Kuryla +1 713 229 1114 matthew.kuryla@bakerbotts.com
Space Jason C Moore +1 713 229 1234 +1 713 229 2714
No Logo Texas Oil and Gas Association, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Janoe +1 713 229 1553 scott.janoe@bakerbotts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew L Kuryla +1 713 229 1114 matthew.kuryla@bakerbotts.com
Space Jason C Moore +1 713 229 1234 +1 713 229 2714
v.
No Logo RICHARD GREENE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Savers McGovern-DOJ +1 214 659 8650 + 214 767 2916 katherine.mcgovern@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/21/2009 Jessica O'Donnell +1 202 305 0851 jessica.odonnell@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/01/2009 Ann C Roberts-DOJ +1 806 472 7397 + 806 472 7394 ann.roberts@usdoj.gov
No Logo Stephen L Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Savers McGovern-DOJ +1 214 659 8650 + 214 767 2916 katherine.mcgovern@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/21/2009 Jessica O'Donnell +1 202 305 0851 jessica.odonnell@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/01/2009 Ann C Roberts-DOJ +1 806 472 7397 + 806 472 7394 ann.roberts@usdoj.gov
United States Environmental Protection Agency United States Environmental Protection Agency, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Savers McGovern-DOJ +1 214 659 8650 + 214 767 2916 katherine.mcgovern@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/21/2009 Jessica O'Donnell +1 202 305 0851 jessica.odonnell@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 07/01/2009 Ann C Roberts-DOJ +1 806 472 7397 + 806 472 7394 ann.roberts@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 7604
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
REPLY filed by BCCA Appeal Group, Texas Association of Business, Texas Oil and Gas Association re: 26 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Costs (Beckwith, Van) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
    RESPONSE filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, Stephen L Johnson, Richard Greene re: 26 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Costs (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Part 1 of 3 (pages 1-49), # 2 Appendix Part 2 of 3 (pages 50-88), # 3 Appendix Part 3 of 3 (pages 89 to end)) (Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
      Appendix in Support filed by BCCA Appeal Group, Texas Association of Business, Texas Oil and Gas Association re 26 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Costs (Beckwith, Van) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
        MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Costs filed by BCCA Appeal Group, Texas Association of Business, Texas Oil and Gas Association (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Beckwith, Van) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          CONSENT DECREE. (see order) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/21/2010) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (klm) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 23 Joint Motion to Stay Case - The Court will separately enter the previously lodged Consent Decree. The deadline for filing a motion for costs of litigation (including attorneys fees) is hereby extended until 120 days after entry of the Consent Decree. All claims in this action not governed by that Decree are hereby stayed. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/19/09) (jeh) Modified on 11/12/2009 (jeh). (Entered: 11/12/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
              Joint MOTION to Enter Consent Decree and Stay filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, Stephen L Johnson, Richard Greene, BCCA Appeal Group, Texas Association of Business, Texas Oil and Gas Association (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Savers McGovern-DOJ on behalf of United States Environmental Protection Agency, Stephen L Johnson, Richard Greene. (McGovern-DOJ, Katherine) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Lodging filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Consent Decree, # 2 Proposed Settlement Agreement) (Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, Stephen L Johnson, Richard Greene (Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 18 Joint MOTION to Govern Further Proceedings filed by Richard Greene, Texas Oil and Gas Association, BCCA Appeal Group, Stephen L Johnson, Texas Association of Business, United States Environmental Protection Agency. Answer due from United States Environmental Protection Agency on 2/13/2009. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/9/09) (klm) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                        Joint MOTION to Govern Further Proceedings filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, Stephen L Johnson, Richard Greene, BCCA Appeal Group, Texas Association of Business, Texas Oil and Gas Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Purdy, Angeline) Modified filers on 1/27/2009 (axm). (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency (Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                            AGREED ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS...Order granting 15 Motion to Stay. Proceedings in this matter shall be STAYED until 1/26/09. The parties shall file a separate motion or joint motions to govern further proceedings on or before 1/26/09. See order (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 10/31/08) (svc) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
                              Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, Stephen L Johnson, Richard Greene, BCCA Appeal Group, Texas Association of Business, Texas Oil and Gas Association (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (O'Donnell, Jessica) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica O'Donnell on behalf of United States Environmental Protection Agency, Stephen L Johnson, Richard Greene. (O'Donnell, Jessica) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Environmental Protection Agency ; served on 10/2/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Green Card to EPA) (Beckwith, Van) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney General; served on 9/4/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Green Card) (Beckwith, Van) Modified on 9/12/2008 (svc). (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Stephen L Johnson ; served on 9/2/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Green Card for Stephen L. Johnson) (Beckwith, Van) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney Richard B Roper, Dallas TX on 8/27/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Green Card) (Beckwith, Van) Modified on 8/29/2008 (jrb). (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Richard Greene ; served on 8/27/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Green Card) (Beckwith, Van) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                                            ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Exhibit 2 to 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff BCCA Appeal Group. (Beckwith, Van) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                                              ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Exhibit 1 to 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff BCCA Appeal Group. (Beckwith, Van) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER: It is ordered that this case is reassigned to the docket of Judge David C. Godbey and should reflect Civil Action No. 3:08-CV-1491-N. (Signed by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/26/08) (tln) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has randomly reassigned the case to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. (caw) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Standing Order Designating Case for ECF - see order for specifics. (Signed by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/26/2008) (axm) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BCCA Appeal Group, Texas Association of Business, Texas Oil and Gas Association. (axm) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                        Summons Issued as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, Stephen L Johnson, Richard Greene, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ISS-5) (axm) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT and Request for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against United States Environmental Protection Agency, Stephen L Johnson, Richard Greene filed by BCCA Appeal Group, Texas Association of Business, Texas Oil and Gas Association. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number 24599) (axm) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 220 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?