Chao v. Enron Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:03-cv-02257
District Judge Melinda Harmon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 3:23 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Chao, Elaine L. Chao, Elaine L., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Elaine L Chao"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, PROTECTIVE LIFE CORP
Unknown Role, News Corp
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Unknown Role, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ingersoll-Rand plc

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Labor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonya Levine +1 202 693 5600 +1 202 693 5610 levine.sonya@dol.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Springberg Parry +1 202 693 5614 +1 202 693 5610 parry.robin@dol.gov
TERMINATED: 06/23/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alan Schloss +1 202 693 5603 +1 202 693 5610 schloss.michael@dol.gov
v.
No Logo Charles A Lemaistre, Defendant
No Logo Cindy K Olson, Defendant
No Logo Enron Corp Employee Stock Ownership Plan, Defendant
No Logo Enron Corp Savings Plan, Defendant
Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Frank Savage, Defendant
No Logo Herbert S Winokur, Jr, Defendant
No Logo James S Prentice, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey K Skilling, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Mary Wahle +1 202 383 5366 +1 202 383 5313 kwahle@omm.com
No Logo John H Duncan, Defendant
No Logo John Mendelsohn, Defendant
No Logo John Wakeham, Defendant
No Logo Ken L Harrison, Defendant
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L Lay"
No Logo Linda Lay, Defendant
No Logo Norman P Blake, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Paula H Rieker, Defendant
No Logo Paulo V Ferraz Pereira, Defendant
No Logo Robert A Belfer, Defendant
No Logo Robert K Jaedicke, Defendant
No Logo Roderick J Hayslett, Defendant
No Logo Ronnie C Chan, Defendant
No Logo Sheila D Armsworth, Defendant
No Logo Tod A Lindholm, Defendant
No Logo Wendy L Gramm, Defendant
No Logo Deloitte & Touche LLP, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph D Cheavens +1 713 229 1215 +1 713 229 2850 joseph.cheavens@bakerbotts.com
No Logo Linda P Lay, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Nathan Sommers Jacobs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George R Gibson +1 713 892 4843 +1 713 892 4840 ggibson@nathansommers.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1001
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY in Support of Motion for Order to Show Cause, filed by Elaine L Chao. (Parry, Robin) Modified on 3/14/2008 - This reply relates to the motion at CA H-01-3913 #1348. (ltien, ). (Entered: 03/07/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Approval Hearing held on 12/1/2006 before Judge Melinda Harmon. Court Reporter: Anita G. Manley. Transcript is available for viewing in the office of the clerk , filed. (Attachments: # 1 Doc. Cont.) (sjones, ) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
      Consent Decree Between The Secretary of Labor and Linda Phillips Lay,ORDER Granting 58 Proposed Order( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ejuarez, ) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
        Consent Decree Between The Secretary of Labor and Jeffrey Skilling,ORDER Granting 54 Motion for Settlement .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) Parties notified.(ejuarez, ) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None
          Proposed Consent Decree Between the Secretary of Labor and Linda Phillips Lay, as Executive of the Estate of Kenneth Lee Lay, Deceased. This document was originally filed electronically at 4:01cv3913 #1278.(ltien, ) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. Preliminary Approval HEARING held on 12/1/2006. Consent Decree between the Secretary of Labor & Jeffery Skilling signed. Consent Decree between the Secretary of Labor and Linda Phillips Lay. Appearances:see attached.(Court Reporter: A Manley), filed.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None
              Tittle Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Settlement and Notice of Scheduling Preliminary Hearing, filed. (ltien, ) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None
                Tittle Plaintiffs' Notice of Settlement and Request to Schedule Preliminary Hearing, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ltien, ) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION for Settlement by Elaine L Chao, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/11/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Unopposed Motion)(Parry, Robin) (Entered: 11/21/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Settlement by Elaine L Chao, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/11/2006. (Parry, Robin) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None
                      SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT with Jeffrey Skilling by Elaine L Chao, filed.(Parry, Robin) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER Setting Preliminary Approval Hearing set for 12/1/2006 at 01:30 PM before Judge Melinda Harmon.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(chorace, ) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                          Statement of the Secretary in Support of Directors' Response to Lead Plaintiffs' Petition for Writ ad Testificandum by Elaine L Chao, filed.(Parry, Robin) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                            OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING Tittle Plaintiffs' 1246 MOTION to Set Schedule for Continuation of Litigation and re: Secretary of Labor's 46 Response. Close of Written Discovery 11/30/06, Close of Fact Discovery 12/15/06, Disclosure of Expert Reports 01/05/07, Disclosure of Rebuttal Experts 02/02/07, Close of Expert Discovery 03/09/07, Motions for Summary Judgment 04/06/07, Responses 04/27/07 and Replies 05/11/07. If summary judgment not granted Court will set for trial during summer of 2007. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/27/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: None
                              ORDER of USCA for the Fifth Circuit (certified copy) dated 8/30/2006 (USCA No. 05-20582). Motin to substitute appellant Kenneth Lay with the executrix of his estate, Linda Lay is granted., filed.(mmar, ) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                ORDER of USCA for the Fifth Circuit (certified copy) dated 8/23/2006 (USCA No. 05-20380). Motion for an order substituting Linda Lay as executrix of Kenneth Lay's estate is granted., filed.(mmar, ) (Entered: 09/18/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None
                                  RESPONSE Enron Scheduling Statement, filed by Elaine L Chao. (Levine, Sonya) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER: Pltfs 42 Motion for Substitution of Deceased Party is GRANTED. Linda Lay is substituted as the proper party to proceed with respect to the claims filed by Pltf against Kenneth L Lay.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER RE AUGUST 24, 2006 RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The parties shall advise the Court of the status of their continuing discussions by 09/06/06 or file a motion to set a schedule for continuation of the litigation on that date. The response/opposition to the motion to set a schedule is due 09/15/06 and any reply shall be filed by 09/22/06.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        (COPY OF 1239 Minute Entry IN H-01-3913) for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/24/2006 (continued from 08/17/06) on Plaintiff's Motion for Rule 16 Conference. Appearances:See Attached For Appearnaces.(Court Reporter: Mayra Malone), filed.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Substitute Party in place of Ken L Lay by Elaine L Chao, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/11/2006. (Levine, Sonya) Modified on 8/25/2006 (ltien, ). (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            COPY OF 1238 MINUTES IN Tittle Matter (CA H-01-3913) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/17/2006. Appearances:See Attached For Appearances.(Court Reporter: Mayra Malone), filed.(htippen, ) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER: The 38 Motion for Sonya Lorge Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice as attorney for Elaine Chao is GRANTED .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to Kenneth L. Lay by Linda P Lay, filed.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Sonya Lorge Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elaine L Chao, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/28/2006. (Parry, Robin) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting Tittle CA H 01-3913 #1224 Motion for Rule 16 Conference.Rul3 16 Conference set for 8/17/2006 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      AMENDED ORDER amending CA H 01-3913 1221 Order. Plaintiffs' counsel for CA H 01-4040, H 01-4063, H 01-4089, H 01-4125, H 01-4128, H 01-4150, H 01-4208, H 01-4209, H 01-4209, H 01-4299, H 01-4326, H 02-267, H 02-1058, H 02-2160, H 02-3754, H 02-3942 shall file an appropriate motion to dismiss if the case is encompassed within the Tittle action or a statement to proceed independently. CA H 02-851 and CA H 03-2257 are coordinated with Tittle CA H 01-3913.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        COPY OF 4848 Order in Newby (CA 01-3624) ORDER AMENDING JULY 11, 2003 SCHEDULING ORDER.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          CONSENT DECREE between the Secretary of Labor and Enron Corp.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. FAIRNESS HEARING held on 9/12/2005 Jointly By Video Conference with US Bankruptcy Judge Gonzales in New York. Hearing held on Tittle Pltf's Mtn For Final Approval of Partial Settlement (No. 1071 CA H 01-3913) The parties presented to both Courts final settlement issues. Lynn Sarko for Tittle Pltfs addressed the settlement issues before Judge Harmon. Robin Perry appeared on behalf of the Dept of Labor. The Court approves the Tittle and Dept of Labor settlements, as stated on the record. Orders executed on the record. Appearances:See Attached List.(Court Reporter: Kathy Metzger), filed.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of preliminary approval hearing held on 7/27/05 before Judge Melinda Harmon. Court Reporter: Bruce Slavin , filed. (cpeebles) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER - Granting Tittle Plaintiff's request for a hearing on fairness of settlement (with Enron) pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.23(e); Setting Hearing on July 27, 2005 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon on Motion for Preliminary approval of Partial Settlement; Setting a Joint Hearing, with video conferencing, for Final Approval of the Tittle Settlement on September 12, 2005 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon; Granting The Secretary of Labor's request that she be allowed to participate in the preliminary approval hearing and that the Consent Decree between the Secretary of Labor and Enron Corporation be considered for final approval by both judges at the joint hearing. (Order is docketed as 1008 in CA H-01-3913).( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 29 Motion to Substitute Attorney-in-Charge on Behalf of Plaintiff United States Department of Labor. Attorney Robin Springberg substituted for Attorney Michael Schloss. Michael Schloss terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Substitute Attorney Robin Springberry Parry in place of Michael Schloss, MOTION for Michael Schloss to Withdraw as Attorney by Elaine L Chao, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/11/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(rroberts, ) (Entered: 06/20/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding Deloitte & Touche LLP's Confidential Documents.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 06/08/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by Deloitte & Touche LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2005. (Ref CA H 01-3913 #972) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kmurphy, ) Modified on 6/1/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 06/01/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER Amending the Deposition Protocol Order .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(rwestmoreland, ) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER re: 8 Motion for Protective Order; Parties shall meet and attempt to agree to a protective order within ten days of the entry of this order and that should Parties fail to reach an agreeable protective order, they are to submit to the Court their proposasls.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION SCHEDULING.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon and Judge Arthur J. Gonzalez) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 01/18/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER denying Bank Defts' CA H 01-3624 #2552 Motion to Modify Deposition Protocol.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon and Judge Arthur J Gonzalez ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/14/2004 on CA H 01-3624)(Reference Entry of CA H 01-3624 #2821) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                  Minute entry: Fairness Hearing on Partial Settlement held. Apps: See Attached Appearance List. Ct Reporter: J.Sanchez Hearing held on Preliminary Approval of Partial Settlement. Lynn Sarko for Plaintiff presented an overview of the settlement, as stated on the record. The Court heard argument from settling defts, objectors and parties for the insurance and pension plan, as stated on the record. The Court Ordered the parties to post their power point presentations to the parties' website, as stated on the record. Mr. Sarko for pltf asked the Court to approve the settlement, approve a plan of allocation, lift the stay, and set a briefing schedule, as stated on the record. Appropriate mtns and Orders will be filed. (kmurphy) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). (Entered: 08/20/2004)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Copy of CONSENT DECREE between the Secretary of Labor and Enron former Outside Director Ken L Harrison, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (Original: #749 in H 01-3913) (ddarneille) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Copy of AMENDED CONSENT DECREE between the Secretary of Labor and Enron's former Outside Directors, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (Original: #748 in H 01-3913) (ddarneille) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Copy of CONSENT DECREE between the Secretary of Labor and the Administrative Committee defendants, Keith A Crane and William J Gulyassy, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (original: #747 in H 01-3913) (ddarneille) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                          Minute entry: Hearing on Preliminary Approval of Partial Settlement held. Apps: See Attached. The pltfs and settling defts addressed the Court on the proposed settlement. Objections were heard by the non-settling defts. The settling parties will file an amended settlement agreement and amended order on preliminary approval on May 25 or 26, as stated on the record. Non settling parties to file further objections by May 28. Deft Enron to respond to motion to intervene by May 24, as stated on the record. Three (3) Consent Decrees executed on the record. Ct Reporter: C Barron. (ddarneille) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Preliminary Hearing on proposed partial Settlement of claims in the Tittle case for 3:00 5/20/04 before Judge Melinda Harmon ; counsel in H.03-2257 may attend. Objections to settlement to be filed by 7/9/04; Responses to objection and briefs in support of Final Approval to be filed by 8/9/04. Hearing on Final Approval set for 9:00 8/19/04, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 05/13/2004)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Alan A Harley if further support of [8-1] motion for protective order by non-party Deloitte & Touche LLP, filed. (tward) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). (Entered: 05/03/2004)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY by Deloitte & Touche LL in further support of [8-1] motion for protective order, filed. (tward) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). (Entered: 04/29/2004)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE/Submission of waiver of service of summons by Elaine L Chao, filed. (tward) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). (Entered: 04/22/2004)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Jeffrey K Skilling to Non-Party Deloitte & Touche LLP's [8-1] motion for protective order, filed. (tward) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). (Entered: 04/07/2004)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Secretary of Labor's submission of waivers of service of summons, filed. (tward) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). (Entered: 03/30/2004)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Elaine L Chao to Deloitte & Touche LLP's [8-1] motion for protective order, filed. (tward) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). (Entered: 03/25/2004)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing of affidavit of Mark Loizeaux by Deloitte & Touche LL, filed. (tward) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). (Entered: 03/18/2004)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Ian K Hochman in support of [8-1] motion for protective order by non-party Deloitte & Touche LLP, filed. (tward) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). (Entered: 03/18/2004)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for protective order by non-party Deloitte & Touche LL, Motion Docket Date 4/4/04 [8-1] motion , filed. (tward) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). (Entered: 03/18/2004)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER; The Pretrial-Scheduling Order, which shall apply to the Tittle and Newby actions and those consolidated and coordinated cases for discovery purposes, shall be as follows: Deposition of fact witnesses in Newby Tittle and the consolidated and coordinated actions, as governed by the Deposition Protocol Order, commence on 6/2/04; Deadline to join new parties to file a third-party complaint or cross complaint/claims is 8/2/04 ; All fact discovery, including, without limitation, document, deposition, and third party discovery completed by 1/3/06; Pltfs expert witnesses named and comprehensive reports of their opinions furnished by 1/3/06; Deft's expert witnesses named and comprehensive reports of their opinions furnished by 2/21/06; Pltf's rebuttal expert witnesses named and their comprehensive opinion reports furnished by 3/17/06; Expert Discovery completed by 4/14/06; Motions for Summary Judgments in Newby and Tittle may be filed up to 5/15/06; Opposition to a summary-judgment motion filed before Friday, 4/14/06 is due 45 days after the date the motion is filed; Opposition to summary-judgment motions filed after 4/14/06 is due by 6/30/06; All replies are due 30 days after the opposition is filed; Joint Pretrial orders in Newby and Tittle shall be filed by 9/15/06; Pretrial Conference at 1:30 pm on 10/2/06; Trial begins at 9:00 am on 10/16/06 before Judge Melinda Harmon. As to consolidated, related and coordinated cases not currently proceeding under the controlling Newby and Tittle consolidated complaints, the Court's ruling in Part I of the July 11, 2003 Scheduling Order will govern the schedule for those cases, entered. Parties notified. (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (tward) (Entered: 03/12/2004)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  DEPOSITION PROTOCOL ORDER, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon and Judge Arthur Gonzalez, US Bankruptcy Judge, SDNY) (tward) (Entered: 03/11/2004)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION pursuant to order entered 12/12/01 in H.01-3913 this case is consolidated into lead case H.01-3913; notice to counsel that a scheduling conference is set for 9:00 7/10/03, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (ddarneille) (Entered: 07/08/2003)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER pursuant to L. R. 1, entered. Attorney Michael Schloss is admitted pro hac vice for the pltf. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (amaly) (Entered: 07/07/2003)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL, entered; Parties notified. (signed by Judge Nancy F. Atlas) Case reassigned to Judge Melinda Harmon. (ddarneille) (Entered: 07/07/2003)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Order setting Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference on 1:00 10/3/03 before Judge Nancy F. Atlas and Order to Disclose Interested Persons, filed. Parties notified. (bchurchill) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT by Elaine L Chao filed; (bchurchill) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2006 (mgoolsby, ). (Entered: 07/01/2003)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 113 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?