Central Laborers' Pension Fund, et al v. Integrated Electrical Services Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:04-cv-03342
District Judge Keith P. Ellison, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 12:58 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason M. Leviton +1 617 398 5600 +1 617 507 6020

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Seth Devore +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 jdevore@cohenmilstein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel S. Sommers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 dsommers@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jeffrey Toll +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 stoll@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwartz Junell Greenburg & Oathout, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger B Greenberg +1 713 752 0017 + 713 752 0327 rgreenberg@schwartz-junell.com
No Logo Corinne Orem, Plaintiff
No Logo Elaine English, Plaintiff
No Logo Jack Zimny, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jeffrey Toll +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 stoll@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwartz Junell Greenburg & Oathout, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger B Greenberg +1 713 752 0017 + 713 752 0327 rgreenberg@schwartz-junell.com
No Logo James Elmore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218
No Logo Park Partners LLP, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Herbert Allen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED N. Scott Fletcher +1 832 239 3846 sfletcher@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David T Harvin +1 713 758 2368 +1 713 615 5269 dharvin@velaw.com
Space Michael C. Holmes +1 713 758 3234 +1 713 615 5168 mholmes@velaw.com
No Logo Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED N. Scott Fletcher +1 832 239 3846 sfletcher@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David T Harvin +1 713 758 2368 +1 713 615 5269 dharvin@velaw.com
Space Michael C. Holmes +1 713 758 3234 +1 713 615 5168 mholmes@velaw.com
No Logo Jeffrey Pugh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED N. Scott Fletcher +1 832 239 3846 sfletcher@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David T Harvin +1 713 758 2368 +1 713 615 5269 dharvin@velaw.com
Space Michael C. Holmes +1 713 758 3234 +1 713 615 5168 mholmes@velaw.com
No Logo William W Reynolds, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED N. Scott Fletcher +1 832 239 3846 sfletcher@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David T Harvin +1 713 758 2368 +1 713 615 5269 dharvin@velaw.com
Space Michael C. Holmes +1 713 758 3234 +1 713 615 5168 mholmes@velaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
Judgment of USCA for the Fifth Circuit (certified copy) dated 08/21/07 issued as mandate 09/12/07; re: 57 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 06-20135. Judgment Affirmed, filed.(dbiagas, ) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
    Per Curiam of USCA for the Fifth Circuit (certified copy) dated August 21, 2007 re: 57 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 06-20135. AFFIRMED, filed.(jdav, ) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
      Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals LETTER advising The electronic copy of the record (12 volumes) to be recycled (USCA No. 06-20135), filed.(dbiagas, ) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
        Transmittal Letter on Appeal re: 57 Notice of Appeal. A certified, 1 volume paper copy of the suplemental electronic record (#'s 58-64) is being transmitted to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 06-20135), filed.(jdavenport, ) (Entered: 11/03/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None
          Transmittal Letter on Appeal Certified re: 57 Notice of Appeal. An 11 volume, certified paper copy of the electronic record is being transmitted to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 06-20135), filed.(jdavenport, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
            Record on Appeal with certified docket sheet transmitted to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 57 Notice of Appeal ; consisting of 1 volume of electronic record (USCA No. 06-20135), filed.(jdavenport, ) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
              Partial Opposition to Defendant Integrated Electrical Services Inc.'s Suggestion of Bankruptcy 61 by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: None
                Notice of Docketing Notice of Appeal from US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 57 Notice of Appeal. USCA No. 06-20135, filed.(jdavenport, ) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: None
                  SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., filed.(ceaton, ) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 60 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                    FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant .( Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison ) Parties notified.(mmapps, ) (Entered: 02/22/2006)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None
                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Central Laborers' Pension Fund. Transcript is already on file in the Clerks office , filed.(jbradford, ) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: None
                        Transmittal Letter to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 57 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: paid, filed.(jdavenport, ) (Entered: 02/08/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 56 Memorandum & Order by Central Laborers' Pension Fund (Filing fee $ 255), filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 02/02/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 31 MOTION to Dismiss.( Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison ) Parties notified.(svaught) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None
                              Lead Plaintiff's Post Argument Submission by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None
                                Supplemental BRIEF in Support re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss by Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., Herbert Allen, William W Reynolds, Jeffrey Pugh, filed.(Fletcher, N) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 49 MOTION to Withdraw and Strike Erroneously Filed Document. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to remove Lead plaintiff's post-argument submission doc. 48. The parties are ordered to make their final post-arguments submissions no later than 1/5/2006.( Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison ) Parties notified.(bthomas, ) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                    PROPOSED ORDER re: 51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time and Setting Page Limitations, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time and Setting Page Limitations by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/24/2006. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                        PROPOSED ORDER re: 49 MOTION to Withdraw and Strike Erroneously Filed Document, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Withdraw and Strike Erroneously Filed Document by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/24/2006. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                            Lead Plaintiff's Post Argument Submission by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT of telephonic hearing held on 12/21/05 before Judge Keith Ellison. Court Reporter: Edward Reed, filed. (cpeebles) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2006 (jdavenport, ). (Entered: 01/03/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER SETTING Telephonic Hearing set for 12/21/2005 at 02:00 PM Room 8631 before Judge Keith P Ellison.( Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison ) Parties notified.(svaught) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                  Defendants' Joint Reply in Support of 31 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., Herbert Allen, C Byron Snyder, William W Reynolds, Jeffrey Pugh. (rroberts, ) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                    APPENDIX re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss by Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., Herbert Allen, Herbert Allen, C Byron Snyder, William W Reynolds, Jeffrey Pugh, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit 18)(rroberts, ) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time .( Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison ) Parties notified.(pmartinez, ) (Entered: 10/20/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss by Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., Herbert Allen, William W Reynolds, Jeffrey Pugh, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/7/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order on Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time)(Fletcher, N) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                          APPENDIX re: 39 Memorandum by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Tabs 1-4# 2 Appendix Tabs 5-11)(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                            DECLARATION of Roger B. Greenberg in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re: 39 Memorandum, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time and Enlargement of Page Limitations. Brief in Opposition due by 9/28/2005.( Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison ) Parties notified.(bthomas, ) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Firm Address by Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP, filed. (chorace, ) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER re: 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time and Enlargement of Page Limitations, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time and Enlargement of Page Limitations by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/6/2005. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Roger B. Greenberg and the lawfirm of Schwartz Junell Greenberg & Oathout LLP, counsel for Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          APPENDIX TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS LEAD PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT re: 32 Memorandum by all defendants, filed.(mewilliams, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2005 (mewilliams, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2005 (mewilliams, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2005 (mewilliams, ). (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            JOINT MEMORANDUM In Support of Their 31 MOTION to Dismiss Lead Pltfs Amended Complaint, by Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation)(psmith, ) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Lead Pltfs Amended Complaint, by Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., Herbert Allen, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/25/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(psmith, ) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits Applicable to Briefs.( Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison ) Parties notified.(pfoster, ) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Exceed Page Limits Applicable to Briefs by Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., Herbert Allen, William W Reynolds, Jeffrey Pugh, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order proposed Order)(Fletcher, N) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                    AMENDED Consolidated Complaint against all defendants filed by Central Laborers' Pension Fund.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 25 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Dealines; the Lead Plaintiff shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint on or before June 6, 2005.( Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison ) Parties notified.(pfoster, ) (Entered: 05/19/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER re: 25 Agreed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order Deadlines as to 11 Order, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                          Agreed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order Deadlines as to 11 Order by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/7/2005. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua S Devore to appear for Central Laborers' Pension Fund.( Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison ) Parties notified.(sfedele, ) (Entered: 04/20/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jason Leviton to appear for Central Laborers' Pension Fund.( Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison ) Parties notified.(sfedele, ) (Entered: 04/20/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Sommers for Central Laborers' Pension Fund.( Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison ) Parties notified.(sfedele, ) (Entered: 04/20/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting 17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice .( Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison ) Parties notified.(pmartinez, ) (Entered: 04/20/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Daniel S. Sommers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2005. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION for Jason M. Leviton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2005. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION for Joshua S. Devore to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2005. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Steven J. Toll to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2005. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER: The 4 Motion to Appoint Lead Pltf and the 4 Motion for Approval is GRANTED. Central Laborers' Pension Fund is the most adequate Lead Pltf and the court approves the law firm of Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll to serve as Lead Counsel and Schwartz, Junell, Greenberg & Oathout as Liaison Counsel.( Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER re: 4 MOTION to Appoint MOTION for Approval MOTION for Approval MOTION to Consolidate and MOTION to Consolidate and, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 03/22/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 02/08/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REQUEST for Status Report, filed. (jholland, ) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Reassignment. Pursuant to Special Order No. H-2005-1, this case is reassigned to Judge Keith P Ellison. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect. All court settings are vacated , filed. (bdaniel, ) (Entered: 01/13/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Joint Scheduling Plan. See order for details.( Signed by Judge David Hittner ) Parties notified.(ealexander, ) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        REC'D JT. PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN, filed.(sjones, ) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David T Harvin, N. Scott Fletcher and Michael C Holmes on behalf of all defendants, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/21/2004)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 4 Motion to Consolidate Cases Lead Case # H-03-3342 and Member Case #H-04-3352 and H-04-3558 and H-04-3602 and H-04-3842.( Signed by Judge David Hittner ) Parties notified.(ealexander, ) (Entered: 11/19/2004)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                DECLARATION in support of 4 MOTION for consolidation, appointment as lead pltf, and for approval of chocie of lead and liaison counsel by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Cont.# 2 Declaration Cont.)(sjones, ) Modified on 10/25/2004 (sjones, ). (Entered: 10/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM of Law in support of 4 MOTION for consolidation, appointment as lead pltf & and for approval of choice of lead and liaison counsel by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed.(sjones, ) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for consolidation, appointment as lead pltf AND for approval of choice of lead AND liaison counsel by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/8/2004. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(sjones, ) (Entered: 10/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF FINANCIALLY INTERESTED PARTIES by Corinne Orem , filed. (sjones) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2006 (jdavenport, ). (Entered: 08/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Order setting Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference on 9:30 11/17/04 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith and Order to Disclose Interested Persons, filed. Parties notified. (bchurchill) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2006 (jdavenport, ). (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT by Corinne Orem filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 547538 (bchurchill) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2006 (jdavenport, ). (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?