In Re: Refined Petroleum Products Antitrust Litigation
Federal Court Proceeding Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:07-md-01886
District Judge Sim Lake, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 7:04 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fast Break Foods, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Gotfryd +1 312 346 3466 +1 312 346 2829 wtglawproj@aol.com

Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Cochrane & Bresnahan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Alexander Cochrane +1 239 793 5268

Toggle Switch Represented by Pedersen & Houpt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly S. Cornell +1 312 261 2224 +1 312 261 1224 kcornell@pedersenhoupt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B Sloan +1 312 261 2138 +1 312 261 1138 jsloan@pedersenhoupt.com

Represented by Susman Heffner & Hurst LLP

No Logo Major Oil Co, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Gross

Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey L. Harrison +1 713 653 7807 +1 713 654 3367 gharrison@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Spectrum Stores, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Gross

Toggle Switch Represented by Cunningham Bounds, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard T Dorman +1 251 471 6191 +1 251 479 1031 rtd@cbcbb.com

Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey L. Harrison +1 713 653 7807 +1 713 654 3367 gharrison@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo WC Rice Oil Co, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Gross

Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey L. Harrison +1 713 653 7807 +1 713 654 3367 gharrison@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Aramco Services Company, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Anne Dolan +1 301 608 3000 +1 301 608 3007 jfkdc@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Carter Pace +1 713 221 1338 +1 713 221 1338 caroline.pace@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Gallagher +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 mike.gallagher@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shefsky & Froelich, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Timothy Eaton +1 312 527 4000 +1 312 527 5921 teaton@shefskylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raj Suresh Gandesha +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 rgandesha@whitecase.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Elaine Johnston +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 mejohnston@whitecase.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Milne +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 rmilne@whitecase.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J O'Sullivan +1 212 819 8641 +1 212 354 8113 tosullivan@whitecase.com
Citgo Petroleum Corporation Citgo Petroleum Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Carter Pace +1 713 221 1338 +1 713 221 1338 caroline.pace@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Eimer Stahl Klevron & Solberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Philip Eimer +1 312 660 7600 +1 312 692 1718 neimer@eimerstahl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neva Jane Burns Dowell +1 713 651 5414 + 713 651 5246 jdowell@fulbright.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard N Carrell +1 713 651 5447 +1 713 651 5246 rcarrell@fulbright.com
No Logo Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc., Consol Defendant

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Carter Pace +1 713 221 1338 +1 713 221 1338 caroline.pace@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vedder Price, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew F Carmody +1 312 609 7500 mcarmody@vedderprice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Doyle +1 312 609 7500 +1 312 609 5005 ddoyle@vedderprice.com
No Logo Lukoil Americas Corporation, Consol Defendant

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Carter Pace +1 713 221 1338 +1 713 221 1338 caroline.pace@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vedder Price, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew F Carmody +1 312 609 7500 mcarmody@vedderprice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Doyle +1 312 609 7500 +1 312 609 5005 ddoyle@vedderprice.com
No Logo Lukoil International Trading and Supply Company, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven C Wu +1 202 887 4589 +1 202 887 4288 swu@akingump.com
No Logo Lukoil Pan Americas, Llc, Consol Defendant

Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Carter Pace +1 713 221 1338 +1 713 221 1338 caroline.pace@bgllp.com
No Logo Motiva Enterprises LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barack Ferrazzano Kirschbaum & Nagelberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Scott Bernstein +1 312 984 3100 +1 312 984 3220 mark.bernstein@bfkn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shermin Kruse +1 312 984 3100 +1 312 984 3150 shermin.kruse@bfkpn.com
TERMINATED: 02/25/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Joy Macklin +1 312 984 3100 +1 312 984 3150 heather.macklin@bfkn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Maria Perez Simmons +1 312 984 3100 +1 312 984 3115 jessica.perez-simmons@bfkn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachael M Trummel +1 312 984 3100 rachael.trummel@bfkn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrack Ferrazzano et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ray G. Rezner +1 312 984 3100 +1 312 984 3150 ray.rezner@bfkn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Carter Pace +1 713 221 1338 +1 713 221 1338 caroline.pace@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alissa Brett Rubin +1 713 751 3200 +1 713 751 3290 arubin@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracie J Renfroe +1 713 751 3214 +1 713 751 3290 trenfroe@kslaw.com
No Logo PDV America, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Carter Pace +1 713 221 1338 +1 713 221 1338 caroline.pace@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom McNamara +1 303 892 9400 tom.mcnamara@dgslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gale Timothy Miller +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 gale.miller@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Eimer Stahl Klevron & Solberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Philip Eimer +1 312 660 7600 +1 312 692 1718 neimer@eimerstahl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie W. Jacobs +1 216 566 5500 +1 216 566 5800 Les.Jacobs@ThompsonHine.com
No Logo PDV Holding Inc, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Carter Pace +1 713 221 1338 +1 713 221 1338 caroline.pace@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom McNamara +1 303 892 9400 tom.mcnamara@dgslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gale Timothy Miller +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 gale.miller@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Eimer Stahl Klevron & Solberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Philip Eimer +1 312 660 7600 +1 312 692 1718 neimer@eimerstahl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie W. Jacobs +1 216 566 5500 +1 216 566 5800 Les.Jacobs@ThompsonHine.com
No Logo PDV Midwest Refining LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Carter Pace +1 713 221 1338 +1 713 221 1338 caroline.pace@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Eimer Stahl Klevron & Solberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan Philip Eimer +1 312 660 7600 +1 312 692 1718 neimer@eimerstahl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie W. Jacobs +1 216 566 5500 +1 216 566 5800 Les.Jacobs@ThompsonHine.com
Saudi Arabian Oil Company Saudi Arabian Oil Company, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Gallagher +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 mike.gallagher@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Elaine Johnston +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 mejohnston@whitecase.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Milne +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 rmilne@whitecase.com
No Logo Saudi Petroleum International Inc, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Anne Dolan +1 301 608 3000 +1 301 608 3007 jfkdc@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Carter Pace +1 713 221 1338 +1 713 221 1338 caroline.pace@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Gallagher +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 mike.gallagher@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shefsky & Froelich, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Timothy Eaton +1 312 527 4000 +1 312 527 5921 teaton@shefskylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raj Suresh Gandesha +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 rgandesha@whitecase.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Elaine Johnston +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 mejohnston@whitecase.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Milne +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 rmilne@whitecase.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J O'Sullivan +1 212 819 8641 +1 212 354 8113 tosullivan@whitecase.com
No Logo Saudi Refining, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Anne Dolan +1 301 608 3000 +1 301 608 3007 jfkdc@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Carter Pace +1 713 221 1338 +1 713 221 1338 caroline.pace@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Gallagher +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 mike.gallagher@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shefsky & Froelich, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Timothy Eaton +1 312 527 4000 +1 312 527 5921 teaton@shefskylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raj Suresh Gandesha +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 rgandesha@whitecase.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Elaine Johnston +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 mejohnston@whitecase.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Milne +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 rmilne@whitecase.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J O'Sullivan +1 212 819 8641 +1 212 354 8113 tosullivan@whitecase.com
No Logo Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thad T. Dameris +1 713 632 1410 +1 713 583 6297 thad.dameris@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Chamber Of Commerce Of The United States, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Yetter Coleman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory S Coleman +1 512 533 0150 +1 512 533 0120 gcoleman@yettercoleman.com
No Logo Federal Republic Of Nigeria, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Watt Beckworth Thompson & Henneman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B Beckworth +1 713 650 8100 +1 713 650 8141 jbeckworth@wattbeckworth.com
No Logo Government of the State of Kuwait, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinnis, Lochridge & Kilgore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D Baughman +1 713 615 8500 +1 713 615 8585 jbaughman@mcginnislaw.com
No Logo Socialist People's Libyan Arab Jamahiriya, Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "Great Socialist People's Libyan Arab Jamahiriya"

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Talmage Hedges, Jr. +1 713 654 4604 +1 713 374 2004 david.hedges@khh.com
No Logo Kingdom of Norway, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Ministry of Mines and Oil Republic of Ecuador, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thad T. Dameris +1 713 632 1410 +1 713 583 6297 thad.dameris@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Ministry of Petroleum and Mineral Resources of the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carrin Foreman Patman +1 713 221 1209 +1 713 221 1212 carrin.patman@bgllp.com
No Logo People's Democratic Republic of Algeria, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas M Farrell +1 713 353 6677 +1 713 571 9652 tfarrell@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Republic of Angola, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S Boyd +1 512 469 6109 +1 512 482 5095 jeff.boyd@tklaw.com
No Logo Republic of Indonesia, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Guy Arnot, III +1 713 223 8999 budarnot@gmail.com
No Logo Republic of Iraq, Amicus Curiae
No Logo The State of Qatar, Amicus Curiae
No Logo The United Mexican States, Amicus Curiae
No Logo United Arab Emirates, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton Lawless Farrell & Flack LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Richard P Keeton +1 713 571 9191 +1 713 571 9652 rkeeton@nickenskeeton.com
No Logo Central Ohio Energy, Inc., Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Gotfryd +1 312 346 3466 +1 312 346 2829 wtglawproj@aol.com

Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Donnell & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Thomas Poulos +1 312 263 0345 +1 312 263 4670 ttpoulos@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pedersen & Houpt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B Sloan +1 312 261 2138 +1 312 261 1138 jsloan@pedersenhoupt.com
No Logo Countywide Petroleum Co., Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Gotfryd +1 312 346 3466 +1 312 346 2829 wtglawproj@aol.com

Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund W. Searby +1 216 348 5400 +1 216 348 5474 esearby@mcdonaldhopkins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pedersen & Houpt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B Sloan +1 312 261 2138 +1 312 261 1138 jsloan@pedersenhoupt.com

Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Seeley, Savidge, Ebert & Gourash Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory D. Seeley +1 216 566 8200 +1 216 566 0213 gdseeley@sse-law.com
No Logo Green Oil Co, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Gotfryd +1 312 346 3466 +1 312 346 2829 wtglawproj@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cochrane & Bresnahan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Alexander Cochrane +1 239 793 5268

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gale Timothy Miller +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 gale.miller@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pedersen & Houpt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly S. Cornell +1 312 261 2224 +1 312 261 1224 kcornell@pedersenhoupt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B Sloan +1 312 261 2138 +1 312 261 1138 jsloan@pedersenhoupt.com

Represented by Susman Heffner & Hurst LLP

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1407
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Document
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
    The petition for a writ of certiorari filed with the Supreme Court has been denied (USCA No. 09-20084) (USSC No. 10-1371), filed.(jdav, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
      Record on Appeal Returned from the US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 55 Notice of Appeal, 11th Supplemental Record (Original) (1 vol.) forward to file room, 2nd Supplemental Record (3 vols.), 4th Supplemental Record (3 vols.), 6th Supplemental Record (3 vols.), 8th Supplemental Record (3 vols.), and 10th Supplemental Record (3 vols.) recycled (USCA No. 09-20084), filed.(kguidry, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
        Order of USCA re: 53 Notice of Appeal ; USCA No. 09-20084; AFFIRMED, filed.(jhancock) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
          Judgment of USCA re: 53 Notice of Appeal, ; USCA No. 09-20084; Judgment of District Court is AFFIRMED, filed.(jhancock) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
            Court of Appeals LETTER (USCA No. 09-20084). Record on appeal to be returned or recycled at a later date, filed.(jhancock) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 69 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
              Order of USCA for the Fifth Circuit (copy) re: 53 Notice of Appeal, ; USCA No. 09-20084. Court has Granted the Motion to Supplement or Correct the Record in this Case, filed.(jewilliams, ) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
                Transmittal Letter on Appeal Certified re: 55 Notice of Appeal,. A paper copy of the electronic record is being transmitted to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals in 42 volumes. (USCA No. 09-20084), filed. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement letter)(ypippin, ) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 65 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Heather Joy Macklin terminated.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                    Transmittal Letter on Appeal Certified re: 53 Notice of Appeal, 55 Notice of Appeal,. CDs containing the electronic record are being sent to the following via US Mail: R. Cunningham, C. Doellinger, M. Gallgher, M. Bernstein, M. Carmody, G. Harrison, W. Gotfryd, G. Coleman, J. Eaton, R. Carrell. (USCA No. 09-20084/09-20086), filed.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Heather J. Macklin to Withdraw as Attorney by Motiva Enterprises LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/16/2009. (lfilmore, ) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                        DKT-13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by William T. Gotfryd. Transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. This order form relates to the following: 53 Notice of Appeal,, filed.(pjameson, ) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                          Transmittal Letter on Appeal Certified re: 53 Notice of Appeal, 55 Notice of Appeal,. A paper copy of the electronic record is being transmitted to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals in 8 volumes and 1 volume of transcripts. (USCA No. 09-20084), filed.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/16/2009, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Filing and Certificate of Service re: 61 Notice (Other) by Fast Break Foods, LLC, Green Oil Co, Central Ohio Energy Inc, Countywide Petroleum Co., filed. (Gotfryd, William) (Entered: 02/16/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/16/2009, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Certain Plaintiffs' Certificate Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 10(b) by Fast Break Foods, LLC, Green Oil Co, Central Ohio Energy Inc, Countywide Petroleum Co., filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gotfryd, William) (Entered: 02/16/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 09-20086 re: 55 Notice of Appeal,, filed.(aalonzo, ) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Certain Plaintiffs' Certificate Pursuant to Fed.R.App.P. 10(b) by Spectrum Stores, Inc, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Harrison, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 58 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None
                                    Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 09-20084 re: 53 Notice of Appeal,, filed.(espencer, ) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                      Notice of the Filing of an Appeal. DKT13 transcript order form was not mailed to appellant. Fee status: Paid. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: 55 Notice of Appeal,, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation)(ypippin, ) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                        Notice of the Filing of an Appeal. DKT13 transcript order form was not mailed to appellant. Fee status: Paid. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: 53 Notice of Appeal,, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation)(ypippin, ) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Y re: 50 Final Judgment, 49 Memorandum and Opinion, by Spectrum Stores, Inc, Major Oil Co, Inc, WC Rice Oil Co, Inc (Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 05410000000004669489), filed.(Harrison, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Filing re: 53 Notice of Appeal, by Fast Break Foods, LLC, Green Oil Co, Central Ohio Energy Inc, Countywide Petroleum Co., filed. (Gotfryd, William) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 49 Memorandum and Opinion, by Fast Break Foods, LLC, Green Oil Co, Central Ohio Energy Inc, Countywide Petroleum Co. (Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 05410000000004663678), filed.(Gotfryd, William) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Steven C Wu re: 49 Memorandum and Opinion,, filed. (lfilmore, ) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Walter W. Noss re: 49 Memorandum and Opinion,, filed. (lfilmore, ) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 1/9/2009.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry No. 106 in CA H 06-3569, Docket Entry No. 136 in CA H-07-4409, Docket Entry No. 115 in CA H-07-443, Docket Entry No. 60 in CA H-07-4434, and Docket Entry No. 53 in CA H-08-241).(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                        Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney David M Lehn re: 47 Order, filed. (ledwards, ) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER extending briefing deadline for John Gokey. Defendants may file a consolidated response to Mr. Gokey's brief not to exceed 10 pages.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order.(kcarr, ) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF SERVED DEFENDANTS IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Saudi Petroleum International Inc, Aramco Services Company, Saudi Refining Inc, Motiva Enterprises LLC, PDV America, Inc., PDV Midwest Refining LLC, PDV Holding Inc, Lukoil Americas Corporation, Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc, Lukoil Pan Americas LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - Pt 1 of 3, # 2 Attachment 1 - Pt 2 of 3, # 3 Attachment 1 - Pt 3 of 3, # 4 Attachment 2, # 5 Attachment 3, # 6 Declaration of Hansel T. Pham, # 7 Exhibit 1 - 8)(Pace, Caroline) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NUMBER 1.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ealexander, ) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Corrected PROPOSED ORDER re: 41 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Practice and Procedure Order Number 1 Establishing a Master File Docket, filed.(Gotfryd, William) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 41 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Practice and Procedure Order Number 1 Establishing a Master File Docket by Fast Break Foods, LLC, filed.(Gotfryd, William) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Practice and Procedure Order Number 1 Establishing a Master File Docket by Fast Break Foods, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/11/2008. (Gotfryd, William) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Served Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in the MDL and Non-Spectrum Cases.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          Letter from Carolyn B. Lamm re: response to June 10, 2008 letter, filed. (ypippin, ) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 23 Motion of the People's Republic of Algeria for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of the Served Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by The State of Qatar, filed.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 22 Motion of the State of Qatar for Leave to file a Memorandum as Amicus Curiae.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 24 Motion of the Republic of Angola for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    Letter from the Ambassador of the Kingdom of Norway in Support of Served Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, filed. (hcarr, ) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Letter in Support of Served Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Kingdom of Norway, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/17/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - Ambassador's Letter, # 2 Attachment 2 - Birkeland Letter, # 3 Exhibit A to Birkeland Letter, # 4 Exhibit B to Birkeland Letter, # 5 Exhibit C to Birkeland Letter, # 6 Proposed Order)(Malin, Steven) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 28 Motion of the Government of the United Mexican States for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            Letter from The Kingdom of Norway re: Norway has been made aware of the Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint, filed. (mharrison, ) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J. Cooper and David H. Thompson on behalf of Spectrum Stores, Inc, Major Oil Co, Inc, WC Rice Oil Co, Inc, filed. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae in Support of the Served Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by The United Mexican States, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/5/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of the Government of The United Mexican States in Support of its Motion for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae in Support of the Served Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Declaration of Matthew D. Slater, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Proposed Order)(Slater, Matthew) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  BRIEF Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Chamber of Commerce of the United States, filed.(Coleman, Gregory) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of the Served Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss by United Arab Emirates, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of the United Arab Emirates as Amicus Curiae in Support of the Served Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss)(Keeton, Richard) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of the Served Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Republic of Angola, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhbit A through C, # 2 Appendix Exhibit D through M)(Boyd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Opposed MOTION for Republic of Angola to Appear as Party by Republic of Angola, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/5/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Boyd, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum as Amicus Curiae in Support of the Served Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by People's Democratic Republic of Algeria, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/5/2008. (Attachments: # 1 The People's Democratic Republic of Algeria's Memorandum as Amicus Curiae in Support of the Served Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 List of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Proposed Order)(Farrell, Thomas) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION for Leave to File To appear as Amicus Curiae in Support of the Served Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by The State of Qatar, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cox, Joseph) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Amica BRIEF filed by Consul General of the Russian Federation, filed.(jbradford, ) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Matthew D. Slater added for the Government of the United Mexican States, amicus curiae.(Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Matthew D Slater to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The United Mexican States, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/2/2008. (rvazquez, ) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RETURN of Service Unexecuted as to The Embassy of the Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela re: request for Service Abroad of Judicial or Extrajudicial Documents, filed.(sjones, ) Modified on 4/16/2008 (sjones, ). (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Letter from Carolyn B. Lamm re: attempted service of process, filed. (ypippin, ) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Tanya s. Chutkan added for Countywide Petroleum.( Signed by Judge Sim Lake ) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Hamish P.M. Hume added for Countywide Petroleum.( Signed by Judge Sim Lake ) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. William A. Isaacson added ro Countywide Petroleum.( Signed by Judge Sim Lake ) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Tanya S. Chutkan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Countywide Petroleum, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2008. (mharrison, ) Modified on 7/25/2008 (ltien, ). (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Hamish PM Hume to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Countywide Petroleum, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2008. (jbradford, ) Modified on 7/25/2008 (ltien, ). (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for William A Isaacson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Countywide Petroleum, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2008. (jbradford, ) Modified on 7/25/2008 (ltien, ). (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Tanya S Chutkan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Countywide Petroleum, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2008. (smurdock, ) Modified on 7/25/2008 (ltien, ). (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Hamish PM Hume to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Countywide Petroleum, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2008. (smurdock, ) Modified on 7/25/2008 (ltien, ). (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for William A Isaacson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Countywide Petroleum, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/26/2008. (smurdock, ) Modified on 7/25/2008 (ltien, ). (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          PRESERVATION ORDER.( Signed by Judge Sim Lake ) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Agreed preservation order due 2/29/2008.( Signed by Judge Sim Lake ) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To Agree on a Preservation Order by Refined Petroleum Products Antitrust Litigation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of scheduling conference held on january 23, 2008 before Judge Sim Lake. Court Reporter: johnny sanchez. Transcript is available for viewing in the office of the clerk, filed. (jsanchez, ) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Scheduling Conference held. Appearances: Geoff Harrison, David Stellings, William Isaacson, William Gotfryd, James Sloan, Robert Davy, John Cochrane, Nate Eimer, Carolynn Lamm, Etom McNamara, James Tuite, Robert Milne. Ct Reporter: J. Sanchez Consolidated Complaint due by 2/8/2008. Amici Brief due by 5/16/2008. Motion to Dismiss Filing due by 4/11/2008. Responses due by 6/20/2008. Replies due by 7/25/2008.( Signed by Judge Sim Lake ) Parties notified.(hcarr, ) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Conditional Transfer Order 1 adding NDIL case 1:07cv6462 to MDL, filed. (rwestmoreland, ) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Transfer Order creating MDL case, filed. (rwestmoreland, ) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 363 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?