Siag et al v. King & Spalding LLP et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:10-cv-00367
District Judge Melinda Harmon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Siag-Taba Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Doherty Wagner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett Wagner +1 281 583 8700 +2818 281 281 8701 brett@dwlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas and Locicero PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Joseph McGuire +1 813 984 3060 +1 813 984 3070 jmcguire@tlolawfirm.com
No Logo Waguih Siag, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Doherty Wagner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett Wagner +1 281 583 8700 +2818 281 281 8701 brett@dwlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas and Locicero PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Joseph McGuire +1 813 984 3060 +1 813 984 3070 jmcguire@tlolawfirm.com
v.
No Logo King & Spalding LLP, Defendant

Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

No Logo Reginald R. Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey C Kubin +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 jkubin@gibbsbruns.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (88) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 88 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
ORDER granting 86 Motion to Seal.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(dcartmill) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
    LREF
    Blank 87 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Clerks Notice
    CLERKS NOTICE re: 86 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Previously filed documents and attachments. Parties notified., filed. (esmith, ) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Motion to Seal
      Unopposed MOTION to Seal Previously filed documents and attachments by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/21/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 85 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
        ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE on 82 Agreed Stipulation Of Dismissal With Prejudice. Case terminated on September 27, 2010.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
          LREF
          Blank 84 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/27/2010 USCA Letter
          Court of Appeals LETTER advising The appellants' motion Mr. Waguih Siag and Siag-Taba Company's motion to dismiss the appeal has been granted. (USCA No. 10-20513), filed.(kguidry, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
            LREF
            Blank 83 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Proposed Order
            PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice re: 82 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed.(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
              LREF
              Blank 82 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 Stipulation of Dismissal
              STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed.(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                LREF
                Blank 81 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Letter
                Letter from Jeff Kubin, Gibbs & Bruns LLP re: Requesting the the Court not rule on any pending motions, pending the parties informing the Court within two weeks of a fully funded settlement in this matter., filed. (htippen, ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                  LREF
                  Blank 80 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 USCA Notice of Receipt of ROA
                  NOTICE of Receipt of Record on Appeal from US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 71 Notice of Appeal (USCA No. 10-20513). Record received by USCA on 8/25/2010, filed.(sjones, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 CD Request: Response
                    CD Request: Response re Certified Record on Appeal re: 78 Request for Record filed by Siag-Taba Company, Waguih Siag, filed. (smurdock, ) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Request for Record
                      REQUEST for Electronic Copy of Certified Record on Appeal re: 71 Notice of Appeal by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed.(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 USCA Notice of Receipt of ROA
                        NOTICE of Receipt of Record on Appeal from US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 71 Notice of Appeal (USCA No. 10-20513). Record received by USCA on August 19, 2010, filed.(jdav, ) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 76 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: 8/17/2010 Transmittal Letter on Appeal
                          Transmittal Letter on Appeal Certified re: 71 Notice of Appeal. A paper copy of the electronic record is being transmitted to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals in 15 volumes. CDs containing the electronic record are being sent to B. Wagner & R. Gibbs. (USCA No. 10-20513) (Tracking No: 1Z7262750346406475), filed.(clamey, ) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 USCA Case Number
                            Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 10-20513 re: 71 Notice of Appeal, filed.(pcrawford, ) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 74 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 Transcript Order Form - DKT-13Court Filing
                              DKT-13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Vincent Filardo. Transcript is already on file in Clerks office. Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 6/24/10 before Judge Melinda Harmon Court Reporter/Transcriber: Fred Warner. This order form relates to the following: 69 Transcript, filed.(amaly) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010 Supplement
                                SUPPLEMENT to 2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed.(Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 Notice of the Filing of an Appeal
                                  Notice of the Filing of an Appeal. DKT13 transcript order form WAS mailed to appellant (1 copy). Fee status: Paid. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: 71 Notice of Appeal, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appeal, # 2 Opinion & Order, # 3 Docket Sheet)(clamey, ) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 71 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Notice of Appeal
                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: 62 Order by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company (Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0541-6717490), filed.(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                      Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 69 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (dclark, ) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/18/2010, Entered: 7/18/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on June 24, 2010 before Judge Melinda Harmon. Court Reporter/Transcriber FWarner. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2010., filed. (fwarner, ) (Entered: 07/18/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 68 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Exhibits
                                          SEALED EVENT-EXHIBITS re: 64 Response by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31, # 2 Exhibit 32, # 3 Exhibit 33, # 4 Exhibit 34, # 5 Exhibit 35, # 6 Exhibit 36, # 7 Exhibit 37, # 8 Exhibit 38, # 9 Exhibit 39, # 10 Exhibit 40, # 11 Exhibit 41, # 12 Exhibit 42)(Gibbs, Robin) Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 67 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Exhibits
                                            SEALED EVENT-EXHIBITS re: 64 Response by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21, # 2 Exhibit 22, # 3 Exhibit 23, # 4 Exhibit 24, # 5 Exhibit 25, # 6 Exhibit 26, # 7 Exhibit 27, # 8 Exhibit 28, # 9 Exhibit 29, # 10 Exhibit 30)(Gibbs, Robin) Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 66 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Exhibits
                                              SEALED EVENT-EXHIBITS re: 64 Response by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11 (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit 11 (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit 11 (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit 12, # 5 Exhibit 13, # 6 Exhibit 14, # 7 Exhibit 15, # 8 Exhibit 16, # 9 Exhibit 17, # 10 Exhibit 18, # 11 Exhibit 19, # 12 Exhibit 20)(Gibbs, Robin) Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 65 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Exhibits
                                                SEALED EVENT-EXHIBITS re: 64 Response by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Gibbs, Robin) Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 64 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/6/2010 Response
                                                  SEALED EVENT-RESPONSE to Plaintiffs Application For Order to Vacate Arbitrators March 30, 2010 London Court of International Arbitration Order and Award and Stay Arbitration Proceedings, filed by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith. (Gibbs, Robin) Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Transcript Order Form - AO 435Court Filing
                                                    AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Sarina Rosenberg. This is to order a transcript of entire injunction hearing held on June 24 2010 before Judge Melinda Harmon. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Fred Warner, filed. (sguevara, ) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Doc. 7 in consolidated CA H-10-2096).(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                        Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Vincent Filardo as to Waguih Siag re: 10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (smurdock, ) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Injunction HearingCourt Filing
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. Preliminary INJUNCTION HEARING held on 6/24/2010. Exhibits admitted. The Court takes the matter under advisement. Order to issue. Appearances: Jeffrey C Kubin, Scott A Humphries, James J McGuire.(Court Reporter: Fred Warner), filed.(htippen, ) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Exhibit
                                                            Exhibit List by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed.(Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Exhibits
                                                              EXHIBITS by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, Touristic Investment & Hotels Management (SIAG) SAE, filed.(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                Memorandum in Support of Emergency MOTION for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, filed by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, Touristic Investment & Hotels Management (SIAG) SAE. (Wagner, Brett) Modified on 6/24/2010 (ckrus, ). (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Exhibits
                                                                  SEALED EVENT-EXHIBITS re: 51 Response by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 41, # 2 Exhibit 42, # 3 Exhibit 43, # 4 Exhibit 44, # 5 Exhibit 45, # 6 Exhibit 46)(Gibbs, Robin) Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 55 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Exhibits
                                                                    SEALED EVENT-EXHIBITS re: 51 Response by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31, # 2 Exhibit 32, # 3 Exhibit 33, # 4 Exhibit 34, # 5 Exhibit 35, # 6 Exhibit 36, # 7 Exhibit 37, # 8 Exhibit 38, # 9 Exhibit 39, # 10 Exhibit 40)(Gibbs, Robin) Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 54 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Exhibits
                                                                      SEALED EVENT- Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 53 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Exhibits
                                                                        SEALED EVENT-Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 52 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Exhibits
                                                                          SEALED EVENT-Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 51 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Response
                                                                            SEALED EVENT-Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting ( 16 in CA H-10-2096 (consolidated into CA H-10-367)Defendants' Motion For Leave to File A response Brief in Exceess of Twenty Pages to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion For Temporary Restraining order. The motion is granted.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Notice of SettingCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Injunction Hearing previously set before Judge Hittner in CA H-10-2096 (consolidated with CA H-10-367) for 6/24/2010 at 02:00 PM is RESET for a Hearing before Judge Melinda Harmon for 06/24/2010 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon, filed. (htippen, ) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Order to Consolidate CasesCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION: Lead Case No. 4:09-CV-367 and Member Case No. 4:09-cv-2096; granting 45 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:10-cv-367 and Member Case No. 4:10-cv-2096.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kstrouse, ) (Main Document 48 replaced on 6/23/2010) (kstrouse, ). (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                    REPLY in Support of 45 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:10-cv-367 and Member Case No. 4:10-cv-2096, filed by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition to 45 MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 4:10-cv-367 and Member Case No. 4:10-cv-2096, filed by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 45 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                        SEALED EVENT-Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                          Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James J McGuire re: 40 Notice of Resetting. Address Updated. Order renoticed., filed. (dcartmill) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                            Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James J McGuire re: 39 Clerks Notice, filed. (dgould) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                              Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James J McGuire re: 36 Order on Motion to Strike,,,, filed. (arrivera ) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James J McGuire as to Waguih Siag re: 35 Clerks Notice,, filed. (hler, ) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Notice of ResettingCourt Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 11/4/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy, filed. (bwhite, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE re: 38 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference. Parties notified., filed. (htippen, ) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010 Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010 Memorandum
                                                                                                        First MEMORANDUM Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Defendants' First & Second Sur-Replies Filed in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration re: 33 Memorandum, 29 Memorandum, 36 Order on Motion to Strike,,, 31 Memorandum, 24 First MOTION to Strike 23 Supplement Brief in Further Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, 25 Memorandum, by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed.(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER denying 24 Motion to Strike; denying 28 Motion to Strike ; plaintiff may within seven days after this entry respond to any arguments or case law; thereafter no additional briefing will be allowed.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(bwhite, ) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE re: 28 First MOTION to Strike 27 Supplement al Brief Regarding Newly Discovered Dispositive Case Law Supporting Defendants' Motion to Compel ArbitrationFirst MOTION to Strike 27 Supplement al Brief Regarding Newly Discovered Dispositive Case Law Supporting Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration, 24 First MOTION to Strike 23 Supplement Brief in Further Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration. Parties notified., filed. (htippen, ) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 Reply
                                                                                                              REPLY to 33 Memorandum,, filed by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith. (Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Memorandum
                                                                                                                Second MEMORANDUM of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Second Sur-Reply or, Alternatively, for Leave to Respond to Defendants' Second Sur-Reply re: 29 Memorandum, 27 Supplement by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition to 28 First MOTION to Strike 27 Supplement al Brief Regarding Newly Discovered Dispositive Case Law Supporting Defendants' Motion to Compel ArbitrationFirst MOTION to Strike 27 Supplement al Brief Regarding Newly Discovered Dispositive Case Law Supporting Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration, filed by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith. (Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Memorandum
                                                                                                                    Second MEMORANDUM of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' First Sur-Reply or, Alternatively, for Leave to Respond to Defendants' First Sur-Reply re: 30 Response to Motion, 24 First MOTION to Strike 23 Supplement Brief in Further Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, 25 Memorandum, by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed.(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 24 First MOTION to Strike 23 Supplement Brief in Further Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by King & Spalding LLP. (Humphries, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Memorandum
                                                                                                                        First MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Second Sur-Reply or Alterntaively for Leave to Respond to Defendants' Second Sur-Reply re: 27 Supplement by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed.(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                          First MOTION to Strike 27 Supplement al Brief Regarding Newly Discovered Dispositive Case Law Supporting Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/3/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: 4/8/2010 Supplement
                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT to 2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                              Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James J McGuire re: 17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (jegonzalez, ) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                SEALED EVENT-Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                  First MOTION to Strike 23 Supplement Brief in Further Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/27/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: 4/2/2010 Supplement
                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to 2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit LCIA Interim Order)(Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James J McGuire as to Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company re: 17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (lfilmore, ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to 13 Cross MOTION to Remand, filed by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company. (Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition to 13 Cross MOTION to Remand, filed by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith. (Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of 2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, filed by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith. (Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(esmith, ) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED EVENT. Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED EVENT-Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER Granring re: 13 Cross MOTION to Remand, filed.(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 Motion to Remand
                                                                                                                                                        Cross MOTION to Remand by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2010. (Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Vincent Filardo, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice)(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/8/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for James J. McGuire to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice)(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to 2 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Responses due by 3/8/2010.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: 2/25/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/18/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time. Deft's deadline to move to dismiss, answer or otherwise plead is 14 days after ruling on deft's pending mtn to compel arbitration.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Waguih Siag, Siag-Taba Company, filed.(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Waguih Siag, filed.(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Certificate of Interested Parties
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed.(Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/12/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Answer Date by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Order for Initial Conference and DisclosureCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/2/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(jhancock) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Arbitration by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 334th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2010-01557 (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-5983620) filed by Reginald R Smith, King & Spalding LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gibbs, Robin) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 290 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?