BB Energy Mgmt SA v. AMSPEC Svc LLC

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:10-cv-01169
District Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo BB Energy Mgmt SA, Plaintiff

Represented by Tisdale Law Offices LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Cozzolino Davies +1 212 354 0025 +1 212 869 0067 ldavies@tisdale-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Greene +1 203 254 8474
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Leonard Tisdale +1 212 354 0025 +1 212 869 0067 ttisdale@tisdale-law.com
v.
No Logo AMSPEC Svc LLC, Defendant

Represented by Loughlin Fitzgerald, P.C.-Wallingford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Glen Pierson +1 203 265 2035 +1 203 269 3487 gpierson@lflaw.com

Represented by United States Small Business Administration

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Thompson +1 415 977 8956 +1 415 744 0134 peter.thompson@ssa.gov
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1333
Nature of Suit 120 - Contract: Marine
Timeline
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/20/2010 at 03:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr.(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(kgilyard) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
Case transferred in from Connecticut. Case Number 3:09-cv-00526; Case transferred in electronically. (Entered: 04/12/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION & ORDER OF TRANSFER -. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 4/7/2010. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
Amended STIPULATION by AMSPEC Svc LLC, BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Thompson, Peter) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceeding held before Judge Christopher F. Droney: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/5/2010; 5 minutes. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION by AMSPEC Svc LLC, BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Thompson, Peter) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF E-FILE CALENDAR: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE is set for 4/5/10 at 11:30 AM before Judge Christopher F. Droney. Counsel are requested to initiate and participate in this conference via telephone. Once all parties are on the line, please telephone chambers at (860) 240-2635. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Cozzolino Davies on behalf of BB Energy Mgmt SA (Davies, Lauren) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT re 56 MOTION to Reopen Case Signed By Lauren C. Davies filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Davies, Lauren) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
Memorandum in Support re 56 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Davies, Lauren) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
MOTION to Reopen Case by BB Energy Mgmt SA.Responses due by 4/19/2010 (Davies, Lauren) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff may move to reopen within 30 days. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 3/4/10. (Droney, Christopher) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by AMSPEC Svc LLC. (Thompson, Peter) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER directing counsel to file a status report by March 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 2/22/10. (Droney, Christopher) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING granting 42 Motion for Reconsideration. The supplemental Rule B attachment is VACATED. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 12/23/09. (Gothers, M.)(12 pages) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 49 Letter. So ordered. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 11/9/09. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
Letter from Thomas L Tisdale, Esq. Dated 11/5/09 Re: brief adjournment of oral argument regarding Motion of reconsideration. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF E-FILE CALENDAR: ORAL ARGUMENT RE: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION [Dkt. # 42] is set for 11/13/09 at 2:00 PM in North Courtroom, 2nd Floor, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Christopher F. Droney. Each side will have 20 minutes for argument. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to 42 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 41 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,, filed by AMSPEC Svc LLC. (Thompson, Peter) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition Motions for Reconsideration and Stay re 42 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 41 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,, filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
Reset Deadlines as to 42 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 41 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,. Responses due by 10/8/2009 (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED ORDER directing plaintiff to respond to defendant's Motion for Reconsideration and Stay by 10/8/09 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 10/5/09. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER directing plaintiff to respond to defendant's Motion for Reconsideration and Stay by 9/8/09 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 10/5/09. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re 41 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,, by AMSPEC Svc LLC.Responses due by 10/23/2009 (Thompson, Peter) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 41 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
RULING Denying 21 AmSpec's Motion for Sanctions; Denying 23 BB Energy's cross-Motion for Sanctions and Granting BB Energy's motion for reinstatement of Rule B attachment. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 9/28/09. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
Supplemental AFFIDAVIT re 33 Memorandum in Opposition to 23 Motion for Sanctions filed by AMSPEC Svc LLC. (Thompson, Peter) Modified on 9/17/2009 to link to appropriate motion (Gothers, M.). (Entered: 09/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Christopher F. Droney: taking under advisement 21 Motion for Sanctions; taking under advisement 23 Motion for Sanctions; Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2009 re 23 Cross MOTION for Sanctions filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA, 21 MOTION for Sanctions filed by AMSPEC Svc LLC. 35 minutes(Court Reporter M. Marshal.) (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
Supplemental AFFIDAVIT re 23 Cross MOTION for Sanctions Signed By Thomas L. Tisdale filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT re 23 Cross MOTION for Sanctions in Further Support Signed By Dawn C. Kubie filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF E-FILE CALENDAR: ORAL ARGUMENT RE: ALL PENDING MOTIONS is set for 9/10/09 at 10:00 AM in North Courtroom, 2nd Floor, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Christopher F. Droney. Each side will have 20 minutes for argument. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. (Szczygiel, G.) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT re 34 Memorandum in Support of 23 Cross Motion for Sanctions Signed By Thomas L. Tisdale filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Tisdale, Thomas) Modified on 7/21/2009 to link to appropriate motion (Gothers, M.). (Entered: 07/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None
Memorandum in Support re 23 Cross MOTION for Sanctions REPLY MEMORANDUM filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition re 23 Cross MOTION for Sanctions filed by AMSPEC Svc LLC. (Thompson, Peter) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to 21 MOTION for Sanctions filed by AMSPEC Svc LLC. (Thompson, Peter) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BB Energy Mgmt SA re 26 Affidavit, of Timothy J. Nast (Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BB Energy Mgmt SA re 25 Affidavit, (Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BB Energy Mgmt SA re 27 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BB Energy Mgmt SA re 23 Cross MOTION for Sanctions (Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
Memorandum in Support re 23 Cross MOTION for Sanctions filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Bauer, J.) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT re 21 MOTION for Sanctions and 23 Cross MOTION for Sanctions and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions Signed By Timothy J. Nast filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tisdale, Thomas)Links Modified on 6/19/2009 (Bauer, J.). (Entered: 06/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT re 23 MOTION for Sanctions and 24 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, for Sanctions filed by Defendant and in Support of Plaintiff's Crossmotion Signed By Dawn C. Kubie filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Tisdale, Thomas) Links Modified on 6/19/2009 (Bauer, J.). (Entered: 06/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition to Amspec Services, LLC's Motion for Sanctions and in Support of Plaintiff's Crossmotion for Sanctions Against Amspec Services, LLC re 23 Cross MOTION for Sanctions, 21 MOTION for Sanctions filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
Cross MOTION for Sanctions by BB Energy Mgmt SA.Responses due by 7/9/2009 (Tisdale, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
Memorandum in Support re 21 MOTION for Sanctions filed by AMSPEC Svc LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Peter) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
MOTION for Sanctions by AMSPEC Svc LLC.Responses due by 6/22/2009 (Thompson, Peter) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Vacate; granting 18 Motion to Vacate. The original ex parte order for process of maritime attachment is vacated and the attached property is released. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 5/29/09. (Droney, Christopher) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT of Defendant by AMSPEC Svc LLC. (Thompson, Peter) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
Emergency MOTION to Vacate 10 EX PARTE ORDER FOR PROCESS OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT. by AMSPEC Svc LLC. (Thompson, Peter) Links and text Modified on 5/29/2009 (Bauer, J.). (Entered: 05/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
Memorandum in Support re 16 MOTION to Vacate the Supplemental Rule B Writ of Attachment and to Release All Previously Attached Property filed by AMSPEC Svc LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibt B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Thompson, Peter) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
MOTION to Vacate the Supplemental Rule B Writ of Attachment and to Release All Previously Attached Property by AMSPEC Svc LLC. (Thompson, Peter) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER directing counsel to file a status report within one week. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 5/21/09. (Droney, Christopher) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Glencore Ltd Writ Issued, Acknowledgement filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None
ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Peter Thompson. Signed by Clerk on 5/7/09. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter Thompson. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number H028181. by AMSPEC Svc LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Peter Thompson)(Gothers, M.) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by W. Glen Pierson on behalf of AMSPEC Svc LLC (Pierson, W.) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
EX PARTE ORDER FOR PROCESS OF MARITIME ATTACHMENT. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 4/6/09. (Gothers, M.) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
Docket Entry Correction re 1 Complaint. MODIFIED TO ADD RECEIPT NUMBER. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
PROPOSED EX PARTE ORDER for Process of Maritime Attachment re 1 Complaint by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
PROPOSED ORDER Appointing Special Process Server re 1 Complaint by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support of Prayer for Maritime Attachment by BB Energy Mgmt SA re 1 Complaint. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Greene on behalf of BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Christopher F. Droney on 4/2/2009. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 7/2/2009. Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2009. Discovery due by 10/2/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2009. Signed by Clerk on 4/2/2009. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against AMSPEC Svc LLC (Filing fee $350, Receipt number B017655), filed by BB Energy Mgmt SA. (Heard, J.) Modified on 4/2/2009 (Heard, J.). (Entered: 04/02/2009)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 144 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?