Siag v. King & Spalding LLP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:10-cv-02096
District Judge Melinda Harmon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Waguih Siag, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Doherty Wagner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett Wagner +1 281 583 8700 +2818 281 281 8701 brett@dwlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Filardo +1 212 612 3265 +1 212 612 3297 Vincent.Filardo@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas and Locicero PL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Joseph McGuire +1 813 984 3060 +1 813 984 3070 jmcguire@tlolawfirm.com
v.
No Logo King & Spalding LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey C Kubin +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 jkubin@gibbsbruns.com
No Logo Reginald R. Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey C Kubin +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 jkubin@gibbsbruns.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
Transmittal Letter on Appeal Certified. A paper copy of the electronic record is being transmitted to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals in 3 volumes(blacy, ) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
    Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Vincent Filardo re: 13 Order on Motion to Transfer Case, filed. (rosaldana) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      COPY of OPINION AND ORDER (Doc. 62 in lead case CA H-10-367) denying 7 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 OrderCourt Filing
          COPY FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES --- ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. Lead Case No. 4:09-CV-367 and Member Case No. 4:09-cv-2096(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(kstrouse, ) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/14/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kubin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.
              SEALED EVENT-AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Waguih Siag filed by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Gibbs, Robin) Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Proposed Order
                PROPOSED ORDER re: 3 Affidavit, 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 1 Notice of Removal, 8 Notice of Setting, 4 Exhibits, filed.(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Order on Motion to Transfer CaseCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying 11 Motion to Transfer Case.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, ) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Response in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                    RESPONSE in Opposition to 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to Judge Harmon, 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Waguih Siag. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Motion to Transfer CaseCourt Filing
                      SEALED EVENT-MOTION to Transfer Case to Judge Harmon by King & Spalding LLP, Reginald R Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Proposed Order)(Gibbs, Robin) Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Vincent Filardo, Jr.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, ) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James J. McGuire.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, ) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Notice of SettingCourt Filing
                            NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Injunction Hearing set for 6/24/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8A before Judge David Hittner, filed. (ealexander, ) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order
                              MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Waguih Siag, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/8/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                First MOTION for Vincent Filardo, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Waguih Siag, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/8/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                  First MOTION for James J. McGuire to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Waguih Siag, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/8/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Exhibits
                                    First EXHIBITS re: 3 Affidavit, 1 Notice of Removal by Waguih Siag, filed.(Wagner, Brett) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                      LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010 Affidavit
                                      SEALED EVENT-AFFIDAVIT of Waguih Siag re: 1 Notice of Removal, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(Wagner, Brett) Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Order for Initial Conference and DisclosureCourt Filing
                                        ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/15/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(mmapps, ) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Notice of Removal
                                          SEALED EVENT-NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0541-6516816) filed by King & Spalding LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Gibbs, Robin) Modified on 10/13/2010 (dcartmill). (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Space Space

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 423 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?