Nemelka v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00524
District Judge Paul G. Cassell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 4:10 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher M. Nemelka, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nemelka, Christopher M.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher M. Nemelka +1 801 928 8154
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant
No Logo Denis P. Smith, Defendant
No Logo Hyrum W. Smith, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey R. Holland, Defendant
No Logo Russell M. Ballard, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Paul G. Cassell on 07/18/2007. (asp) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007
    MOTION for Service of Process filed by Plaintiff Christopher M. Nemelka. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jwt) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007
      MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Christopher M. Nemelka. (jwt) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Court Filing
        COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Christopher M. Nemelka (Originally received by the court on 7/13/07). (Fee Status: IFP). Assigned to Judge Paul G. Cassell (jwt) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Court Filing
          ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Samuel Alba on 7/17/07. (jwt) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
            **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Received by the court on: 7/13/07) filed by Plaintiff Christopher M. Nemelka. (jwt) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 86 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?