Boyd v. First National Collection Bureau

Federal Civil Lawsuit Utah District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00848
District Judge Ted Stewart, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Ted Stewart
Last Updated September 14, 2016 at 5:47 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jason Boyd, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of Ronald W. Ady

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald W. Ady +1 801 530 3122 adyr@80law.com
v.
No Logo First National Collection Bureau, Defendant

Represented by Moss & Barnett, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Ryan Bedell +1 612 347 0310 +1 612 339 6686 bedellj@moss-barnett.com

Represented by PETERS SCOFIELD

Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
Timeline
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: 1/27/2012 Order on Motion to Dismiss
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012 Motion to Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 Status Report
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial hearing set for November 9, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. vacated. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2012. Discovery due by 9/15/2012. Motions due by 10/31/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2013 02:30 PM in Room 142 before Judge Ted Stewart. 3 Day Jury Trial set for 4/1/2013 08:30 AM in Room 142 before Judge Ted Stewart. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 10/19/2011. (tls) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/10/2011, Entered: None
REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed scheduling order)(Ady, Ronald) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Support re 16 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or Alternatively Summary Judgment filed by Defendant First National Collection Bureau. (Scofield, David) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or Alternatively Summary Judgment filed by Defendant First National Collection Bureau. (Scofield, David) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James R. Bedell for First National Collection Bureau. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 09/22/2011. (tls) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
Defendant's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James R. Bedell, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1439124, filed by Defendant First National Collection Bureau. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A; Application of James R. Bedell for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit B; ECF Registration Form, # 3 Exhibit C; Proposed Form of Order)(Scofield, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by Theresa Brown)The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/formpage.html, should be prepared 30 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date.NOTICE TO COUNSEL, The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel(a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report; and(b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to ipt@utd.uscourts.gov30 days before the scheduled hearing. See instructions at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/ipt.html Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2011 10:30 AM in Room 477 before Magistrate Judge David Nuffer. (tab) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint filed by First National Collection Bureau. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Affidavit of Scott Carroll, # 2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Scott Carroll-- FNCB Account Notes)(Scofield, David) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: Initial SchedulingThe court's IPT Clerk will now set the case for the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference. (tls) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jason Boyd, Defendant First National Collection Bureau. (tls) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint filed by First National Collection Bureau.(Scofield, David) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant First National Collection Bureau. (Scofield, David) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for First National Collection Bureau answer due 8/3/2011. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 07/20/2011. (tls) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, to and Including AUGUST 3, 2011, filed by Defendant First National Collection Bureau. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A; Proposed Form of Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Scofield, David) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Boyd as to Jason Boyd served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Summons -- executed)(Ady, Ronald) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 2 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process for 14 days following entry of this order. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 06/28/2011. (tls) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time time for service of process filed by Plaintiff Jason Boyd. (Ady, Ronald) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time time for service of process filed by Plaintiff Jason Boyd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ady, Ronald) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/21/2011 Court Filing
COMPLAINT against First National Collection Bureau (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4681039569), filed by Jason Boyd. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (tls) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 124 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?