Arrival Star, Inc. v. Cosco Container Lines Americas, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00933

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 4:06 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arrivalstar, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaufman & Canoles, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Edward Noona +1 757 624 3239 +1 757 624 3169 senoona@kaufcan.com
v.
No Logo Cosco Container Lines Americas, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Garvey Schubert & Barer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin J. Lambiotte +1 202 298 2525 +1 202 965 1729 blambiotte@gsblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garvey Shubert & Barer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin J. Lambiotte +1 202 298 2525 +1 202 965 1729 blambiotte@gsblaw.com
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, with prejudice, and each party bearing its own costs, including attorneys fees by Arrival Star, Inc. (kbar ) . (Entered: 10/17/2005)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
    AGREED ORDER granting 9 MOTION by Arrival Star, Inc. for Extension of Time through 10/14/05 to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the 1 Complaint and Cosco shall have through and including 10/14/05 to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed in this matter. Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/04/05. Copies sent: yes.(stas) (Entered: 10/05/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 9 MOTION by Arrival Star, Inc. for Extension of Time through 10/14/05 to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the 1 Complaint; Cosco Container Lines Americas, Inc. answer due 10/14/2005. Signed by Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. on 10/04/05. Copies sent: yes. (stas) (Entered: 10/04/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
        MOTION by Arrival Star, Inc. for Extension of Time through 10/14/05 to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the 1 Complaint. (stas) (Entered: 10/03/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Joseph Lambiotte, III on behalf of Cosco Container Lines Americas, Inc. (stas) (Entered: 09/29/2005)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
            SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Cosco Container Lines Americas, Inc. served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005. (pmil) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting application for Robert Allen Conley to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 100 182513. Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 08/22/05. Copies sent: yes.(stas) (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting application for Frederick Christopher Laney to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 100 182513. Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 08/22/05. Copies sent: yes.(stas) (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting application for Matthew George McAndrews to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 100 182513. Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 08/22/05. Copies sent: yes.(stas) (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting application of Raymond Pardo Niro, Jr. to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 100 182513. Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 08/22/05. Copies sent: yes.(stas) (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting application of Raymond Pardo Niro to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 100 182513. Signed by Judge Claude M. Hilton on 08/22/05. Copies sent: yes.(stas) (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None
                        COMPLAINT against Cosco Container Lines Americas, Inc., Filing fee $250.00, receipt number 200 48846 filed by Arrival Star, Inc.(pmil) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 47 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?