Waite v. Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:05-cv-00399

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 7:12 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomas A Waite, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Layne Nordstrom +1 509 924 9800 nordstrom8@qwest.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard C Eymann +1 509 747 0101 eymann@eahjlaw.com
v.
No Logo Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Witherspoon Kelley Davenport & Toole, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross P White +1 509 624 5265 +1 509 623 7574 rpw@witherspoonkelley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Witherspoon, Kelley, Davenport & Toole-SPO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T Rekofke +1 509 624 5265 btr@witherspoonkelley.com
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WITHERSPOON, KELLEY, DAVENPORT & TOOLE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross P White +1 509 624 5265 +1 509 623 7574 rpw@witherspoonkelley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Witherspoon, Kelley, Davenport & Toole-SPO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T Rekofke +1 509 624 5265 btr@witherspoonkelley.com
No Logo Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WITHERSPOON, KELLEY, DAVENPORT & TOOLE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross P White +1 509 624 5265 +1 509 623 7574 rpw@witherspoonkelley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Witherspoon, Kelley, Davenport & Toole-SPO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T Rekofke +1 509 624 5265 btr@witherspoonkelley.com
No Logo Donald C Fossum, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WITHERSPOON, KELLEY, DAVENPORT & TOOLE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross P White +1 509 624 5265 +1 509 623 7574 rpw@witherspoonkelley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Witherspoon, Kelley, Davenport & Toole-SPO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T Rekofke +1 509 624 5265 btr@witherspoonkelley.com
No Logo Steven D Brodhead, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paine Hamblen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Campbell Smythe +1 509 455 6000 +1 509 838 0007 andy.smythe@painehamblen.com
  Entries (139) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
Docket Annotation - Re Filing Error: 127 Declaration in Opposition to Motion **DOCUMENT CONTAINS PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS (i.e. DOB) - ATTORNEY IS DIRECTED TO REFILE THE ENTIRE DOCUMENT AS A PRAECIPE WITH THE PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS REDACTED** (CV, Case Administrator) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment : AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL the Motion Hearing currently set for 7/11/2007 is RESET for 7/10/2007 at 01:30 PM Richland for 119 , before Judge Edward F. Shea (DB, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 139 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Court Filing
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CS, Case Administrator)
        LREF
        Blank 138 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007
        Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss by Steven D Brodhead. (Smythe, Andrew)
          LREF
          Blank 137 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Court Filing
          ORDER CLOSING FILE. All pending motions denied as moot. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
            LREF
            Blank 136 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007
            NOTICE by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum Striking Summary Judgment Hearing (Rekofke, Brian)
              LREF
              Blank 135 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Court Filing
              ORDER Denying 83 Church Defendants' Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
                LREF
                Blank 134 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007
                STATEMENT OF REPLY FACTS re 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Rekofke, Brian)
                  LREF
                  Blank 133 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007
                  REPLY MEMORANDUM re 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Rekofke, Brian)
                    LREF
                    Blank 132 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007
                    Praecipe filed by Thomas A Waite: Re 127 Declaration in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Dismissal. (Nordstrom, Stephen)
                      LREF
                      Blank 129 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007
                      RESPONSE to Motion re 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steven D Brodhead. (Smythe, Andrew)
                        LREF
                        Blank 128 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007
                        STATEMENT OF FACTS re 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas A Waite. (Nordstrom, Stephen)
                          LREF
                          Blank 127 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007
                          DECLARATION by Stephen L. Nordstrom in Opposition re 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas A Waite. (Nordstrom, Stephen)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Order GRANTING Plaintiff leave to file a five-page surreply no later than May 11, 2007, on the issue of whether Plaintiff's counsel waived the claimed work-product privilege to any of the documents at issue in Defendants' Motion to Compel 83 . THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW; THIS ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING/NOTICE ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 126 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007
                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas A Waite. (Nordstrom, Stephen)
                                LREF
                                Blank 125 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007
                                STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Specific Claims filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 124 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007
                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Specific Claims filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Attachment)(Rekofke, Brian)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 123 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Court Filing
                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion Oral Argument Requested re 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2007 at 10:00 AM Richland for 119, before Judge Edward F. Shea (Rekofke, Brian)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 122 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007
                                      AFFIDAVIT by Ross P. White in Support re 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Order GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff for Four Days 96 . The Court finds good cause to extend the discovery cutoff from May 11, 2007, to May 15, 2007. All other deadlines remain as set in the Court's Amended Scheduling Order 19 . THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW; THIS ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 121 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007
                                          MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support re 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Dismissal filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 120 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007
                                            STATEMENT OF FACTS re 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, C, D, E# 2 Exhibit F, G, H, I, J, K# 3 Exhibit L, M, N, O, P, Q, R, S)(Rekofke, Brian)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Order GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff for Four Days 95 . The Court will hear Defendants' Motion to Extend Discovery Cutff for Four Days 96 , without oral argument, on April 30, 2007. Plaintiff's response shall be filed no later than Friday, April 27, 2007. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW; THIS ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 119 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 118 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007
                                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Specific Claims filed by Thomas A Waite. (Nordstrom, Stephen)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 117 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Specific Claims filed by Thomas A Waite. (Nordstrom, Stephen)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007
                                                      LR 26.1 / LR 16.1 Attorney Report COP CPB and Fossum Third Supplemental Identification of Expert Witnesses and Disclosure of Experts' Preliminary Reports by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A# 2 Exhibit 2A# 3 Exhibit 3B)(Rekofke, Brian)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Specific Claims : Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2007 at 06:30 PM Without Oral Argument for 111, before Judge Edward F. Shea (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 114 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007
                                                          AFFIDAVIT by Brian T. Rekofke in Support re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Specific Claims filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rekofke, Brian)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 113 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007
                                                            STATEMENT OF FACTS re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Specific Claims filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 112 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007
                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Specific Claims filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 111 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Specific Claims by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 110 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007
                                                                  DECLARATION by Richard C. Eymann in Opposition re 83 First MOTION to Compel Documents and Answers in Response to Second Affidavit of Brian T. Rekofke filed by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 109 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007
                                                                    DECLARATION by Stephen L. Nordstrom in Opposition re 83 First MOTION to Compel Documents and Answers Second Declaration filed by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 108 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007
                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM re 83 First MOTION to Compel Documents and Answers Plaintiff's Surreply to Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 106 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007
                                                                        Second Supplemental Identification of Witnesses and Preliminary Reports by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 6-A)(Rekofke, Brian) Modified on 5/4/2007 modified text to correct title of document (CV, Case Administrator).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT by Thomas D. Walk in Support re 83 First MOTION to Compel Documents and Answers filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (White, Ross)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT by Brian T. Rekofke in Support re 83 First MOTION to Compel Documents and Answers (Second Affidavit) filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(White, Ross)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 103 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM re 83 First MOTION to Compel Documents and Answers filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (White, Ross)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 101 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007
                                                                                Witness List Plaintiff's Fifth Supplemental Identification of Expert Witnesses and Disclosure of Experts' Preliminary Reports by Thomas A Waite. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007
                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 96 MOTION for Discovery - Extend Discovery Cutoff For Four Days -, 95 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Defendants Motion To Extend Discovery Cutoff For Four Days filed by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT: Proceedings held on Tuesday, March 20, 2007, in Spokane, Washington, before The Honorable Edward F. Shea. Type of proceeding(s): Motion for Summary Judgment. Court Reporter: Stephanie Smithson. Volume Number: 1. Page Numbers: 1-21. Remote electronic access is not available for transcripts. (CS, Case Administrator) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 98 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 95 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Defendants Motion To Extend Discovery Cutoff For Four Days, 96 MOTION for Discovery - Extend Discovery Cutoff For Four Days - : Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2007 at 06:30 PM Without Oral Argument for 96 and for 95, before Judge Edward F. Shea (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by Brian T. Rekofke in Support re 96 MOTION for Discovery - Extend Discovery Cutoff For Four Days - And in Support of Motion To Expedite filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007
                                                                                          MOTION for Discovery - Extend Discovery Cutoff For Four Days - by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 95 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007
                                                                                            MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Defendants Motion To Extend Discovery Cutoff For Four Days by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007
                                                                                              LR 26.1 / LR 16.1 Attorney Report Supplemental Identification of Expert Witnesses and Disclosure of Experts' Preliminary Reports by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5A - Burke Report)(Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007
                                                                                                DECLARATION by Richard C. Eymann in Opposition re 83 First MOTION to Compel Documents and Answers filed by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007
                                                                                                  DECLARATION by Stephen L. Nordstrom in Opposition re 83 First MOTION to Compel Documents and Answers filed by Thomas A Waite. (Nordstrom, Stephen)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses :DUE TO SCHEDULING CONFLICTS WITH THE COURT'S TRIAL CALENDAR the Motion Hearing currently set for 3/22/2007 is RESET for 3/20/2007 at 08:00 AM Spokane for 49 , before Judge Edward F. Shea (DB, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 03/13/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 91 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 83 First MOTION to Compel Documents and Answers filed by Thomas A Waite. (Nordstrom, Stephen)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 90 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER Granting 87 Joint Motion for Dismissal of Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. All other Defendants to remain as defendants in case. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Docket Annotation - Re Filing Error: 72 Witness List **ATTACHMENTS CONTAIN PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS; ATTORNEY MUST REFILE THE ENTIRE DOCUMENT WITH ALL PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS, INCLUDING DATES OF BIRTH, REDACTED** (CV, Case Administrator) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007
                                                                                                            Praecipe filed by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum: Re 87 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints (signed certification page). (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Witness List Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Identification of Expert Witnesses and Disclosure of Experts' Preliminary Reports by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard) Modified on 3/8/2007 DOCUMENT CONTAINS PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS - SEE PRAECIPE, CT REC 74 , TO VIEW REDACTED DOCUMENT (CV, Case Administrator). (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 87 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints : Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2007 at 06:30 PM Without Oral Argument for 87, before Judge Edward F. Shea (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007
                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Dismiss The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2007 at 06:30 PM Without Oral Argument before Judge Edward F. Shea (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Order GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time 65 . Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1), the Court finds good cause to extend the time for Plaintiff to file a reply memorandum in support of his Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO PDF TO ISSUE. THIS CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING ON THE MATTER. (DB, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007
                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by Brian T. Rekofke in Support re 83 First MOTION to Compel Documents and Answers filed by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Extend Expert Disclsoure Date for Neuropsychology Opinions 60 . Plaintiff does not object to the extension, and the parties represent that the extension will not impact the trial date or other deadlines in this matter. The Court therefore finds good cause to extend the deadline for Defendants to serve their neuropsychology expert disclosure, from January 6, 2007 to March 5, 2007. Plaintiff's deadline to make any expert disclosure in rebuttal is likewise extended from February 27, 2007 to April 3, 2007. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO PDF TO ISSUE. THIS CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING ON THE MATTER. (DB, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 83 First MOTION to Compel Documents and Answers filed by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007
                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Compel Documents and Answers by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                Letter from Counsel to Judge Shea dated March 30, 2007 regarding extension of plaintiff's deadline to make any expert neuropsychology disclosures. (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 49 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 58 Motion to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Date for Neuropsychology Opinions. The Defendants' submissions do not indicate whether Plaintiff intents to oppose their Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Date for Neuropsychology Opinions 60 . Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Date for Neuropsychology Opinions 60 shall be filed no later than February 21, 2007. This is a text-only entry; no PDF document will follow. This entry constitutes the Courts ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (LH, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward F. Shea : Motion Hearing held on 3/20/2007 re 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses filed by Thomas A Waite. (Reported/Recorded by: Stephanie Smithson) (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF Uncontroverted FACTS re 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses filed by all parties. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007
                                                                                                                                          Witness List Plaintiff's Fourth Supplemental Identification of Expert Witnesses and Disclosure of Experts' Preliminary Reports by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007
                                                                                                                                            Witness List Plaintiff's Identification of Rebuttal Expert Witnesses and Disclosure of Experts' Preliminary Reports by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007
                                                                                                                                              Praecipe filed by Thomas A Waite: Re [72] Witness List,. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                Identification of Expert Witnesses and Disclosure of Experts' Preliminary Reports by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3A - Wise Report)(White, Ross) Modified on 3/7/2007 modified docket text to reflect correct title of document (CV, Case Administrator).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM re 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses filed by Thomas A Waite. (Nordstrom, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 60 MOTION Extend Expert Disclosure Date for Neuropsychology Opinons filed by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Expedited Hearing-- NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply : Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2007 at 06:30 PM Without Oral Argument for 65, before Judge Edward F. Shea (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT by Ross P. White in Support re 60 MOTION Extend Expert Disclosure Date for Neuropsychology Opinons filed by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum, Steven D Brodhead. (White, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support re 60 MOTION Extend Expert Disclosure Date for Neuropsychology Opinons filed by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum, Steven D Brodhead. (White, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 60 MOTION Extend Expert Disclosure Date for Neuropsychology Opinons : Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2007 at 06:30 PM Without Oral Argument for 60, before Judge Edward F. Shea (White, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Extend Expert Disclosure Date for Neuropsychology Opinons by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum, Steven D Brodhead. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 58 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Date for Neuropsychology Opinions : Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2007 at 06:30 PM Without Oral Argument for 58, before Judge Edward F. Shea (White, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Date for Neuropsychology Opinions by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum, Steven D Brodhead. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT by Ross P. White in Opposition re 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses filed by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(White, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF LR 56 FACTS re 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses filed by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum. (White, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses filed by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum. (White, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses (Joinder in Church Defendants' Response) filed by Steven D Brodhead. (Smythe, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing - Text entry; no PDF document. - By Court: Telephonic Status Conference on the issue of whether a Rule 35 Examination of the Plaintiff should be ordered and if ordered, the procedures and locations of such examinations is set for 1/25/2007 08:30 AM in Telephonic Argument before Judge Edward F. Shea. PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO CALL THE COURT'S PUBLIC CONFERENCE LINE (509) 376-8880 AT THE TIME SPECIFIED FOR HEARING. USE OF CELLULAR PHONES IS PROHIBITED. (DB, Courtroom Deputy). (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION by Stephen L. Nordstrom in Support re 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses filed by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Order GRANTING Motion to Expedite 34 and GRANTING Motion to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates 36 . The expert disclosure deadline for Defendant's CR 26(a)(2) is extended to 2/16/2007. The parties shall confer and contact the courtroom deputy to schedule a telephonic hearing this week on the issue of whether a Rule 35 examination of the plaintiff should be ordered and if ordered, the procedures and locations of such examination. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW; THIS ENTRY CONSTITUTES THE COURT'S RULING ON THE MATTER. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS re 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses filed by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION by Stephen L. Nordstrom in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates for Neuropsychology Opinions filed by Thomas A Waite. (Nordstrom, Stephen)**ATTACHMENTS CONTAIN PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS, SEE PRAECIPE FILED W/REDACTED DOCUMENT, CT REC 48 **Modified on 1/23/2007 (CV, Case Administrator). (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses filed by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion Oral Argument Requested re 49 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses : Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2007 at 01:30 PM Spokane for 49, before Judge Edward F. Shea (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Re: Affirmative Defenses by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                              Praecipe filed by Thomas A Waite: Re [42] Declaration in Opposition to Motion, refiled with redacted exhibit. (Nordstrom, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                Praecipe filed by Thomas A Waite: Re [42] Declaration in Opposition to Motion,. (Nordstrom, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Errata filed by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum: Corrected 1st page of Kimbrough Report. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LR 26.1 / LR 16.1 Attorney Report Identification of Expert Witnesses and Disclosure of Experts' Preliminary Reports by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Matthew Mecham# 2 Exhibit Scott Kimbrough# 3 Exhibit Wise# 4 Exhibit Tindall# 5 Exhibit Burke# 6 Exhibit Knowles)(Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates for Neuropsychology Opinions filed by Thomas A Waite. (Nordstrom, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Ross P White on behalf of Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum (White, Ross)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 36 MOTION to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates for Neuropsychology Opinions : Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2007 at 06:30 PM Without Oral Argument for 36, before Judge Edward F. Shea (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT by Brian T. Rekofke in Support re 36 MOTION to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates for Neuropsychology Opinions filed by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum, Steven D Brodhead. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Annotation - Re Filing Error: 30 Second Supplemental Identification of Expert Witnesses and Disclosure of Experts' Preliminary Reports **ATTORNEY MUST FILE A PRAECIPE WITH REDACATED EXHIBITS ATTACHED PURSUANT TO LR 10.1(j) (i.e. DOB's must be redacted)** (CV, Case Administrator) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support re 36 MOTION to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates for Neuropsychology Opinions filed by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum, Steven D Brodhead. (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness List Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Identification of Expert Witnesses and Disclosure of Experts' Preliminary Reports by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard) SEE REDACTED DOCUMENT FILED UNDER PRAECIPE, CT REC 33 Modified on 1/5/2007 (CV, Case Administrator). Modified on 1/16/2007 (CV, Case Administrator). (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates for Neuropsychology Opinions by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum, Steven D Brodhead. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue)(Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 34 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates Concerning Neuropsychological Opinions : Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2007 at 06:30 PM Without Oral Argument for 34, before Judge Edward F. Shea (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates Concerning Neuropsychological Opinions by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum, Steven D Brodhead. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Expedite)(Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Praecipe filed by Thomas A Waite: Re [30] Witness List, Second Praecipe at Court's directive. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Praecipe filed by Thomas A Waite: Re [30] Witness List,. (Eymann, Richard) AMENDED PDF TO BE FILED WITH COMPLETE DOCUMENT ATTACHED Modified on 1/10/2007 (CV, Case Administrator).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List Plaintiff's First Supplemental Identification of Expert Witnesses and Disclosure of Experts' Preliminary Reports by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Witness List Plaintiff's Identification of Expert Witnesses and Disclosure of Experts' Preliminary Reports by Thomas A Waite. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits C-D# 2 Exhibit E)(Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 24 Parties' Stipulated Motion to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates and 21 Motion to Expedite Hearing Thereon. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 24 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates: Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2006 at 06:30 PM Without Oral Argument for 24, before Judge Edward F. Shea (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support re 24 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates filed by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulated MOTION to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates by Thomas A Waite. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re 21 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Parties' Stipulated Motion to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates: Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2006 at 06:30 PM Without Oral Argument for 21, before Judge Edward F. Shea (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support re 21 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Parties' Stipulated Motion to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates filed by Thomas A Waite. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Parties' Stipulated Motion to Continue Expert Disclosure Dates by Thomas A Waite. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum.(Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing - Text entry; no PDF document. - By Court: DUE TO SCHEDULING CONFLICTS WITH THE COURT'S TRIAL CALENDAR the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 08/17/2006 is RESET for 8/22/2006 09:15 AM in Telephonic Argument before Judge Edward F. Shea. PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO CALL THE COURT'S PUBLIC CONFERENCE LINE (509) 376-8880 AT THE TIME SPECIFIED FOR HEARING. USE OF CELLULAR PHONES IS PROHIBITED. (DB, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2007 10:00 AM in Richland before Judge Edward F. Shea. Jury Trial set for 9/17/2007 09:00 AM in Spokane before Judge Edward F. Shea. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing - Text entry; no PDF document. - By Court: DUE TO SCHEDULING CONFLICTS WITH THE COURT'S TRIAL CALENDAR the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 07/26/2006 is RESET for 8/17/2006 09:45 AM in Telephonic Argument before Judge Edward F. Shea. PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO CALL THE COURT'S PUBLIC CONFERENCE LINE (509) 376-8880 AT THE TIME SPECIFIED FOR HEARING. USE OF CELLULAR PHONES IS PROHIBITED.(DB, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 07/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2007 10:00 AM in Richland before Judge Edward F. Shea. Jury Trial set for 9/17/2007 09:00 AM in Spokane before Judge Edward F. Shea. Signed by Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing - Text entry; no PDF document. - By Court:DUE TO SCHEDULING CONFLICTS WITH THE COURT'S CALENDAR Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 7/26/2006 09:45 AM in Telephonic Argument before Judge Edward F. Shea. PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO CALL THE COURT'S PUBLIC CONFERENCE LINE (509) 376-8880 AT THE TIME SPECIFIED FOR HEARING. USE OF CELLULAR PHONES IS PROHIBITED. (DB, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Richard Eymann to Judge Shea dated 8/21/06 re: dates for scheduling conference (CV, Case Administrator)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing - Text entry; no PDF document. - By Court: DUE TO SCHEDULING CONFLICTS WITH THE COURT'S CALENDAR the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/13/2006 is RESET for 7/26/2006 09:45 AM in Telephonic Argument before Judge Edward F. Shea. PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO CALL THE COURT'S PUBLIC CONFERENCE LINE AT THE TIME SPECIFIED FOR HEARING. USE OF CELLULAR PHONES IS PROHIBITED.(DB, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Edward F. Shea : Scheduling Conference held on 8/22/2006. (Reported/Recorded by: Stephanie Smithson) (DB, Courtroom Deputy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint Status Certificate and Discovery Plan by all parties. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints. (Coleman, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing - Text entry; no PDF document. - By Court: DUE TO SCHEDULING CONFLICTS the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 05/31/06 is RESET to 6/13/2006 10:15 AM in Telephonic Argument before Judge Edward F. Shea. Parties are directed to call the Court's publice conference line (509) 376-8880 at the time specified for hearing. Use of celluar phones is prohibited.(DB, Courtroom Deputy) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2006 09:00 AM in Telephonic Argument before Judge Edward F. Shea. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Magistrate form)(DB, Courtroom Deputy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T Rekofke on behalf of Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints, Donald C Fossum (Rekofke, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Steven D Brodhead.(Smythe, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas A Waite re Steven D Brodhead. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas A Waite re Donald C Fossum. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Service by ABC Legal Services re 1 Complaint (CV, Case Administrator)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas A Waite re Church of Jesus Christ, Latterday Saints. (Eymann, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 250; Receipt # SPO000785). Summons issued. Jury Demand. Filed by Thomas A Waite. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RF, Case Administrator)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 14 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?