R.K. v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:04-cv-02338

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 1:55 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Doe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Kosnoff +1 206 257 3590 tim@kosnoff.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Pfau +1 206 462 4334 +1 206 623 3624 michael@pcvalaw.com
No Logo Kenneth Fleming, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Kosnoff +1 206 257 3590 tim@kosnoff.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Pfau +1 206 462 4334 +1 206 623 3624 michael@pcvalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GORDON THOMAS HONEYWELL MALANCA PETERSON & DAHEIM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/12/2006 Joan Catherine Foley +1 206 676 7500 +1676757 +16 676 7575 jfoley@gth-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 2100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle A Menely +1 206 676 7500 +1676757 +16 676 7575 mmenely@gth-law.com
No Logo R.K., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Kosnoff +1 206 257 3590 tim@kosnoff.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Pfau +1 206 462 4334 +1 206 623 3624 michael@pcvalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 2100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle A Menely +1 206 676 7500 +1676757 +16 676 7575 mmenely@gth-law.com
No Logo T.D., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Kosnoff +1 206 257 3590 tim@kosnoff.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Pfau +1 206 462 4334 +1 206 623 3624 michael@pcvalaw.com
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FREY BUCK PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/18/2006 Thomas D Frey +1 206 623 9900 tfrey@freybuck.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Cooper Gordon +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 cgordon@gordontilden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Rosenberger +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 mrosenberger@gordontilden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey I Tilden +1 206 467 6477 jtilden@gordontilden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stafford Frey Cooper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/18/2006 Marcus B. Nash +1 206 623 9900
No Logo LDS Social Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BAILEY GRANT ONSAGER, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/18/2006 Thomas D Frey +1 206 623 9900 tfrey@freybuck.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Cooper Gordon +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 cgordon@gordontilden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Rosenberger +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 mrosenberger@gordontilden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey I Tilden +1 206 467 6477 jtilden@gordontilden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stafford Frey Cooper

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/18/2006 Marcus B. Nash +1 206 623 9900
  Entries (256) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial (morning session) held on 10/4/2006 before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Barry Fanning by telephone at 206-370-8507. or by e-mail at barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/4/2013, (BF) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
    SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of R.K. Against Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints; by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Gordon, Charles) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
      MANDATE of USCA (08-36042) as to 246 Notice of Appeal filed by R.K.; AFFIRMED; Motion to certify questions to the Washington Supreme Court is DENIED. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(LMK, ) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 253 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Court Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings filed for the following date(s): 10/12/06-Verdict before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez, (re 246 Notice of Appeal) Court Reporter: Barry Fanning. (LMK, )
          LREF
          Blank 252 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Court Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings filed for the following date(s): 10/10/06-Closing before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez, (re 246 Notice of Appeal) Court Reporter: Barry Fanning. (LMK, )
            LREF
            Blank 251 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007
            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff R.K. for proceedings held on 10/02/2006, 10/10/2006, 10/12/2006 Requesting Attorney: Michael T. Pfau. (Menely, Michelle)
              LREF
              Blank 250 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006
              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Joan Catherine Foley for Plaintiff R.K.. (Pfau, Michael)
                LREF
                Blank 249 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006
                TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (06-36042) as to 246 Notice of Appeal filed by R.K., : Appellant shall notify Appellee regarding transcripts by 12/14/06; Appellee to notify Appellant regarding any additional transcripts by 12/26/06; Transcript designation due by 01/03/07; Transcript by court reporter due by 02/05/07; Appellants opening brief due by 03/22/07; Appellees response brief due by 04/23/07; Appellants optional reply brief due within 14 days of service of the response brief. (LMK, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 248 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006
                  Civil Appeals Docketing Statement, by Plaintiff R.K., to be transmitted by Clerk to Circuit Court of Appeals. (Menely, Michelle)
                    LREF
                    Blank 247 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006
                    APPEAL NOTIFICATION packet sent to US Court of Appeals re 246 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Docket)(LMK, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 246 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL (06-36042) by Plaintiff R.K.. Filing Fee:. (Menely, Michelle) Modified on 12/11/2006; added CCA case number (LMK, ).
                        LREF
                        Blank 245 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Court Filing
                        ORDER denying Plaintiff's 227 Motion for a New Trial by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(LT, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 244 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Court Filing
                          ORDER denying 228 Motion to Certify. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SES)
                            LREF
                            Blank 243 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006
                            PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 227 MOTION for New Trial (Menely, Michelle)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER re: 227 MOTION for New Trial filed by R.K. The following MINUTE ORDER is made at the direction of the Court and by the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez, United States District Judge: In order to avoid any potential confusion with respect to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(c), the Court hereby clarifies that defendant's response to plaintiff's motion for new trial is due Monday, November 13, 2006, and any reply by plaintiff is due Friday, November 17, 2006. (SES) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 242 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006
                                REPLY, filed by Plaintiff R.K., TO RESPONSE to 227 MOTION for New Trial (Menely, Michelle)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 241 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006
                                  PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 228 MOTION to Certify Question to WA Supreme Court (Menely, Michelle)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 240 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006
                                    REPLY, filed by Plaintiff R.K., TO RESPONSE to 228 MOTION to Certify Question to WA Supreme Court (Menely, Michelle)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 239 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006
                                      ORDER granting 234 Application for Bill of Costs in the amount of $ 6,655.88 against Defendant The Corporataion Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-Day Saints by Clerk U.S.District Court Bruce Rifkin.(Rifkin, Bruce)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 238 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006
                                        DECLARATION of Michael Rosenberger filed by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 227 MOTION for New Trial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rosenberger, Michael)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 237 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006
                                          RESPONSE, by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, to 227 MOTION for New Trial. (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 236 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006
                                            RESPONSE, by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, to 228 MOTION to Certify Question to WA Supreme Court. (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 235 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006
                                              DECLARATION of Michelle A. Menely Re Amendment 234 APPLICATION FOR BILL OF COSTS Amended by Plaintiff R.K. by Plaintiff R.K.. (Menely, Michelle) Modified duplicative text on 11/13/2006 (ECS, ).
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 234 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006
                                                APPLICATION FOR BILL OF COSTS Amended by Plaintiff R.K.. Noting Date 11/14/2006. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 233 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006
                                                  PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) Order Granting Plaintiff's Cost Petition. (Menely, Michelle) Modified links on 11/6/2006 (ECS, ).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 232 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006
                                                    DECLARATION of Michael T. Pfau Re: Plaintiff's Cost Petition by Plaintiff R.K.. (Menely, Michelle) Modified links on 11/6/2006 (ECS, ).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 231 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006
                                                      APPLICATION FOR BILL OF COSTS by Plaintiff R.K.. Noting Date 11/14/2006. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez - Dep Clerk: Melody Byrd; Pla Counsel: Michael Pfau, Tim Kosnoff; Def Counsel: Charles Gordon, Jeff Tilden; CR: Barry Fanning; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM; Courtroom: 13206; Jury Trial completed on 10/12/2006. Jury resumes deliberation at 9:00 AM and reaches a verdict at 4:35 PM. Verdict read in open court. Jury finds in favor of plaintiff. Jurors polled and excused. Court reads jury questions to counsel. Court in recess at 5:05 PM. (LW) (Entered: 10/13/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 229 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006
                                                          DECLARATION of Michael T. Pfau Re Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Question to Supreme Court filed by Plaintiff R.K. re 228 MOTION to Certify Question to WA Supreme Court (Menely, Michelle)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 228 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006
                                                            MOTION to Certify Question to WA Supreme Court by Plaintiff R.K.. Noting Date 11/17/2006. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 227 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006
                                                              MOTION for New Trial by Plaintiff R.K.. Noting Date 11/17/2006. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo S Martinez - Dep Clerk: Laurie Cuaresma; Pla Counsel: Michael Pfau, Tim Kosnoff, Michelle Menely; Def Counsel: Charles Gordon, Jeff Tilden; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM; Jury Trial - Jury in Deliberation Only held on 10/11/2006. (LC, ) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 226 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Court Filing
                                                                  Court's Instructions to the Jury by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LT, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo S Martinez - Dep Clerk: Laurie Cuaresma; Pla Counsel: Michael Pfau, Tim Kosnoff, Michelle Menely; Def Counsel: Charles Gordon, Jeff Tilden; CR: Susan Zielie (A.M.)/Barry Fanning (P.M.); Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM; Jury Trial held on 10/10/2006. Def calls KENNETH KELLER (via deposition) and SOUHIR BEN HAMIDA (via video deposition). Exhibit admitted; deposition transcripts published. Plaintiff rests; Defense rests. Jury is excused from the courtroom. Defendant moves for directed verdict; the motion to dimiss negligent training claim is granted; remaining motions denied. Plaintiff moves for directed verdict- motion denied. Following lunch recess, Court and counsel review jury instructions/exceptions. Court instructs the jury. Counsel present closing arguments to the jury. Jury will begin deliberations 10/11/06 9:00 AM. Court is in recess. (LC, ) (Entered: 10/10/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 225 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006
                                                                      JURY QUESTION AND JUDGE'S RESPONSE(RS, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 224 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                        Jury Question with Judge's response.(CL, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 223 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                          Jury Question with Judge's response.(CL, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 222 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                            Jury Questions with Judge's response.(CL, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 221 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
                                                                              JUDGMENT by jury verdict in favor of plaintiff in the amount of $87,500.00(RS, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 220 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
                                                                                SPECIAL JURY VERDICT FORM(RS, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez - Dep Clerk: Lowell Williams; Pla Counsel: Michael Pfau, Tim Kosnoff; Def Counsel: Charles Gordon, Jeff Tilden; CR: Susan Ziele-AM/Barry Fanning-PM; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM; Courtroom: 13206; Jury Trial - DAY 4 held on 10/5/2006. Pla calls JON ROBERT CONTE and JOVINE UMALI. By stipulation of counsel, dft calls JULIE GARASI-ELLIS and FRED WISE out of order. Exhibits admitted. Jury Trial to resume October 10, 2006 at 9:00 AM. (LW) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 219 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER directing clerk to pay for juror lunches by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez - Dep Clerk: Lowell Williams; Pla Counsel: Michael Pfau, Tim Kosnoff; Def Counsel: Charles Gordon, Jeff Tilden; CR: Barry Fanning-AM/Susan Ziele-PM; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM; Courtroom: 13206; Jury Trial - DAY 3 held on 10/4/2006. Pla calls ROBERT PIERCE KELLY, RICHARD PETTIT (by video deposition), RANDALL BORLAND and ROCHELLE MARIE COPE. Exhibits admitted. Jury Trial to resume 10/5/2006 at 9:00 AM. (LW) (Entered: 10/04/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 217 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                        Jury Question with Judge's response(RS, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 216 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER directing clerk to pay jurors lunches by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo S Martinez - Dep Clerk: Laurie Cuaresma; Pla Counsel: Michael Pfau, Tim Kosnoff; Def Counsel: Charles Gordon, Jeff Tilden; CR: Susan Zielie (A.M.)/Barry Fanning (P.M.); Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM; Jury Trial - DAY 2 held on 10/3/2006. Counsel make opening statements. Plaintiff case begins. Pl calls JAMES ALLENBACH (by video dep), DOROTHY KELLY, SCOTT PETTIT, JACK (ONEFREY) LOHOLT (by video dep). Exhibits admitted. Court will resume on 10/4/06 at 9:00 a.m. (LC, ) Modified on 10/4/2006 to correct Mr. Loholt's name. (SES). (Entered: 10/03/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 213 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                                                                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints Regarding Amended Complaint and Allenbach Complaint (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 212 Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: 10/9/2006
                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff R.K. (SUPPLEMENTAL) (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo S Martinez - Dep Clerk: Laurie Cuaresma; Pla Counsel: Michael Pfau, Tim Kosnoff, Michelle Menely; Def Counsel: Charles Gordon, Jeffrey Tilden; CR: Susan Zielie (AM)/Barry Fanning (PM); Time of Hearing: 8:30 AM; Jury Trial - DAY 1 begun on 10/2/2006, Voir Dire held on 10/2/2006. Jury empaneled and sworn; Court gives preliminary instructions to jury. JURY TRIAL will continue on 10/3/2006 at 09:00 AM before Hon. Ricardo S Martinez. (LC, ) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 211 Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: 10/9/2006
                                                                                                    REQUEST by Plaintiff R.K., Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints for Instruction Regarding Stipulation. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 210 Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: 10/9/2006
                                                                                                      Proposed Special Jury Verdict Form by Plaintiff R.K. (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 209 Filed: 10/9/2006, Entered: 10/9/2006
                                                                                                        Proposed Special Jury Verdict Form by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 206 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006
                                                                                                          Proposed Special Jury Verdict Form by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 204 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006
                                                                                                            Jury Peremptory Challenges (RS, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 202 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 198 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(CM)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                The following MINUTE ORDER has been made at the direction of the Court and by the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez, United States District Judge: On September 28, 2006, the Court modified the caption of this case from Fleming, et al. v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, et al. to R.K. v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, et al, in order to reflect that only one plaintiff remains. The parties and the Court have been utilizing this modified caption for some time, and shall continue to use this new caption throughout the remainder of this action. (SES) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 201 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER OF DISMISSAL of plaintiff's claims against dft LDS Social Services ; case caption revised by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 200 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006
                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 198 MOTION for Reconsideration re 175 Order on Motion in Limine, 174 Order on Motion in Limine. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 199 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006
                                                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF (Corrected) by Plaintiff R.K. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 198 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re 175 Order on Motion in Limine, 174 Order on Motion in Limine by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 9/28/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 196 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006
                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff R.K. and by Defendant (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 195 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006
                                                                                                                            TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiff R.K. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 194 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006
                                                                                                                              TRIAL BRIEF by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 193 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: 9/27/2006
                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (Joint Jury Instructions) (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 192 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Scott Pettit served on 9/20/06. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 191 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Bishop Philip Coleman served on 9/17/06. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo S Martinez - Dep Clerk: Laurie Cuaresma; Pla Counsel: Michael Pfau, Timothy Kosnoff, Michelle Menely; Def Counsel: Michael Rosenberger; Time of Hearing: 10:00 AM; Courtroom: In Chambers;Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/19/2006. Trial will begin 10/2/06 (expected to last 7-10 days). Counsel will advise Court regarding requested number of jurors; court will allow the parties to submit supplemental juror questionnaire. Parties request clarification of Court's order on Def.Motion in Limine; Court will review and clarify. (LC, ) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 190 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006
                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Rachelle Cope served on 9/17/06. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 189 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 188 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER of ClarificationSigned by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (CM )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 186 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006
                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) Pretrial Order (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 185 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 163 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SES)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 184 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 161 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SES)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 183 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 182 Reply to Response to Motion. (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 182 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY, filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, TO RESPONSE to 161 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 181 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                        PRAECIPE re 178 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 180 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 179 Declaration, 178 Reply to Response to Motion. (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 179 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                            Second DECLARATION of Michael Rosenberger filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 161 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 178 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY, filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, TO RESPONSE to 161 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 177 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Michelle A. Menely filed by Plaintiff R.K. re 163 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 176 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY, filed by Plaintiff R.K., TO RESPONSE to 161 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 175 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 140 Motion in Limine and imposing sanctions for failure to follow Local Rules with respect to proper length of briefing. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SES)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 174 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 141 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SES)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 173 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Michael T. Pfau RE: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions in Limine filed by Plaintiff R.K. re 161 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 172 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE, by Plaintiff R.K., to 161 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Oral Argument Requested. (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 171 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Michael Rosenberger filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 163 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 170 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, to 163 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 169 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                Second DECLARATION of Michael Rosenberger filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 141 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Clergy-Penitent Communication (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 168 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY, filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, TO RESPONSE to 141 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Clergy-Penitent Communication (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                    Second DECLARATION of Michael Rosenberger filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 140 MOTIONS IN LIMINE To Exclude Reporting Statute (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY, filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, TO RESPONSE to 140 MOTIONS IN LIMINE To Exclude Reporting Statute (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA upon Warland Wight, Ph.D. served on August 31, 2006, filed by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (LT, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 164 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of MIchael T. Pfau filed by Plaintiff R.K. re 163 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 163 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Plaintiff R.K.. Noting Date 9/15/2006.Oral Argument Requested. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 162 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michael Rosenberger filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 161 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 161 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 9/15/2006.Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 160 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Michael T. Pfau Re: Plaintiff R.K.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Mandatory Reporting Statute filed by Plaintiff R.K. re 140 MOTIONS IN LIMINE To Exclude Reporting Statute (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-pp 3-10# 2 Exhibit B-pp11# 3 Exhibit C- pp 12)(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 159 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, by Plaintiff R.K., to 140 MOTIONS IN LIMINE To Exclude Reporting Statute. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Proposed Order)(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER re: 155 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, LDS Social Services. The following MINUTE ORDER is made at the direction of the Court and by the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez: On August 30, 2006, defendants requested leave of this Court to file approximately 20 motions in limine in one overlength brief not to exceed 36 pages in length. The Court agrees that such overlength brief is appropriate. Accordingly, defendants' motion to file an overlength brief containing their motions in limine is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response shall not exceed 36 pages in length. Local Rule CR 7(f)(4). Defendants' reply shall not exceed one-half the total length of plaintiff's response. Local Rule CR 7(f)(4).(SES) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Michael T. Pfau Re: Plaintiff R.K.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Clergy-Penitent Communication filed by Plaintiff R.K. re 141 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Clergy-Penitent Communication (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- pp 4-7# 2 Exhibit B-pp 8-11# 3 Exhibit C-pp 12-15)(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE, by Plaintiff R.K., to 141 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Clergy-Penitent Communication. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Proposed Order)(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 8/30/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATED ORDER by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. The Court RE-NOTES for 9/8/06 the following motions: 141 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Clergy-Penitent Communication, 140 MOTIONS IN LIMINE To Exclude Reporting Statute. Response ddl 9/1/06, reply ddl 9/8/06.(CL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 153 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Defendant's 123 Motion to Segregate Damages Resulting from Intentional Tortfeasor by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(LT, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 131 Defendants' Motion in Limine by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(MD, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDERTo Change Noting Date of Defendant's Motions in Limine by Plaintiff R.K.. Noting Date 9/8/2006. (Pfau, Michael) Modified on 8/28/2006 (CL, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA upon Ruth Adams, University Registrar - Seattle Pacific University served on 8/11/2006, filed by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (LT, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' 29 Amended Complaint by LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 148 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael Rosenberger filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 131 MOTIONS IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF: (1) LOHOLT'S OTHER ACTS OF ABUSE; (2) DAMAGES SUFFERED BY OTHER VICTIMS; AND (3) DEFENDANTS' SETTLEMENTS WITH OTHERS (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY, filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, TO RESPONSE to 131 MOTIONS IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF: (1) LOHOLT'S OTHER ACTS OF ABUSE; (2) DAMAGES SUFFERED BY OTHER VICTIMS; AND (3) DEFENDANTS' SETTLEMENTS WITH OTHERS (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY, filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, TO RESPONSE to 123 MOTION TO SEGREGATE DAMAGES RESULTING FROM INTENTIONAL SEXUAL ABUSE (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 121 Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SES )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Michael Rosenberger filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 141 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Clergy-Penitent Communication (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Randall Borland filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 141 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Clergy-Penitent Communication (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Richard E. Pettit filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 141 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Clergy-Penitent Communication (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Clergy-Penitent Communication by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 9/1/2006.Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTIONS IN LIMINE To Exclude Reporting Statute by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 9/1/2006.Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Michelle A. Menely RE: Plaintiff R.K.'s Oppostion to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Evidence filed by Plaintiff R.K. re 131 MOTIONS IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF: (1) LOHOLT'S OTHER ACTS OF ABUSE; (2) DAMAGES SUFFERED BY OTHER VICTIMS; AND (3) DEFENDANTS' SETTLEMENTS WITH OTHERS (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by Plaintiff R.K., to 131 MOTIONS IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF: (1) LOHOLT'S OTHER ACTS OF ABUSE; (2) DAMAGES SUFFERED BY OTHER VICTIMS; AND (3) DEFENDANTS' SETTLEMENTS WITH OTHERS. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Michelle A. Menely RE: Plaintiff R.K.'s Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Segregate Damages resulting from Intentional Sexual Abuse filed by Plaintiff R.K. re 123 MOTION TO SEGREGATE DAMAGES RESULTING FROM INTENTIONAL SEXUAL ABUSE (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE, by Plaintiff R.K., to 123 MOTION TO SEGREGATE DAMAGES RESULTING FROM INTENTIONAL SEXUAL ABUSE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service)(Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER re: 133 Stipulated MOTION to Change Noting Date of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Evidence and Defendant's Motion to segregate Damages filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, LDS Social Services, and R.K. The following MINUTE ORDER is made at the direction of the Court and by the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez: Pursuant to the parties' stipulated motion, the Court hereby RE-NOTES defendant's Motion to Segregate (Dkt. #123) and defendant's Motions In Limine (Dkt. #131) for consideration on 8/18/2006. The Court also adopts the parties' stipulated briefing schedule. (SES) (Entered: 08/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/4/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Keith Waterland served on 7/30/06. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulated MOTION to Change Noting Date of Defendant's Motion to Exclude Evidence and Defendant's Motion to segregate Damages by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Plaintiff R.K.. Noting Date 8/3/2006. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Souhir Ben Hamida PhD served on 7/22/06. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTIONS IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF: (1) LOHOLT'S OTHER ACTS OF ABUSE; (2) DAMAGES SUFFERED BY OTHER VICTIMS; AND (3) DEFENDANTS' SETTLEMENTS WITH OTHERS by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 8/11/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 116 Motion to take depositions after discovery cutoff by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY, filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, TO RESPONSE to 121 MOTION to Amend Answer to Add At-Fault Entity (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Anger Control Treatment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, by Plaintiff R.K., to 121 MOTION to Amend Answer to Add At-Fault Entity. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Pacific Lutheran University Inc served on 7/18/06. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Records Custodian for Kent School District served on 7/17/06. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 124 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Records Custodian for Federal Way Public School District served on 7/17/06. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION TO SEGREGATE DAMAGES RESULTING FROM INTENTIONAL SEXUAL ABUSE by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 8/11/2006.Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tilden, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michael Rosenberger filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 121 MOTION to Amend Answer to Add At-Fault Entity (Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend Answer to Add At-Fault Entity by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 7/26/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberger, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second DECLARATION of Charles C. Gordon filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 116 MOTION for Leave to Take Depositions After Discovery Cutoff (Gordon, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY, filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, TO RESPONSE to 116 MOTION for Leave to Take Depositions After Discovery Cutoff (Gordon, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE, by Plaintiff R.K., to 116 MOTION for Leave to Take Depositions After Discovery Cutoff. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael T. Pfau RE: Plaintiff R.K.'s Opposition to Defendant's Motion to take Depositions after Discovery Cutoff# 2 Proposed Order)(Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 112 Motion for Discharge of Litigation Guardian ad Litem for John Doe by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(LT, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION and Proposed Order for Leave to Take Depositions After Discovery Cutoff by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 7/14/2006. (Attachments: # 1Declaration of Counsel # 2Declaration of Marcus B. Nash)(Gordon, Charles) Modified/Described Attachments on 6/30/2006 (ECS, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT Report of Litigation Guardian Ad Litem by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D.. (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michael T. Pfau in Support of Motion for Discharge of Litigation Guardian ad Litem filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D. re 112 MOTION Discharge of Litigation Guardian ad Litem (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Litigation Guardian ad Litem filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D. re 112 MOTION Discharge of Litigation Guardian ad Litem (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Discharge of Litigation Guardian ad Litem by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D.. Noting Date 7/7/2006. (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT of Litigation Guardian Ad Litem by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D.. (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Litigation Guardian Ad Litem by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D.. (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael T Pfau on behalf of Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D. (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Jeffrey I Tilden is substituted as counsel for Defendants. Attorney Marcus B. Nash terminated. (Tilden, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 105 Motion for appointment of litigation guardian ad litem by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michael T. Pfau filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D. re 105 MOTION to Appoint Litigation Guardian Ad Litem (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Litigation Guardian Ad Litem by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D.. Noting Date 5/2/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing claims of plaintiff T.D. by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Claims of Plaintiff T.D. by parties. (Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing claims of plaintiff John Doe by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(CM )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Order Dismissing Claims of Plaintiff John Doe by parties. (Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 66 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(MKB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *7-10 days*. Jury Trial is set for 10/2/2006 at 09:00 AM before Hon. Ricardo S Martinez. Motions in Limine due by 9/5/2006; Pretrial Order due by 9/20/2006; Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/27/2006; Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/27/2006; by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (LC, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Conrad Fred Sodenkamp Jr served on 2/21/06. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Michael T. Pfau. (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Michael T. Pfau. (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Brian Brinkley served on 2/19/06. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Michael Pfau to Deputy Clerks. (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND REVISED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *4-5 weeks*. Jury Trial PREVIOUSLY SET for 5/22/2006 at 09:00 AM before Hon. Ricardo S Martinez (see 12/5/05 ORDER, DKT#60). Motions in Limine due by 4/24/2006; Pretrial Order due by 5/10/2006; Trial briefs to be submitted by 5/17/2006; Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 5/17/2006; by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (LC, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY, filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, TO RESPONSE to 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Statute of Limitations (Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY, filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, TO RESPONSE to 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF KENNETH FLEMING; dfts The Corp of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and LDS Social Services are dismissed with prejudice by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' 61 Motion to Compel by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Claims of Plaintiff Kenneth Fleming by parties. (Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D., to 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Statute of Limitations, 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Oral Argument Requested. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Jon Conte, Ph.D. filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D. re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Statute of Limitations, 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D., to 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Statute of Limitations, 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Oral Argument Requested. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 83 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Stuart A. Greenberg filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D. re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Statute of Limitations, 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D., to 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Statute of Limitations, 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Oral Argument Requested. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Michael T. Pfau filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D. re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Statute of Limitations, 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits B-C# 2 Exhibit D# 3 Exhibits E-I# 4 Exhibits J-K)(Menely, Michelle) Modified duplicative text on 1/31/2006 (ECS, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D., to 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Plfs Oppos to SJ Gen Mots Supplement(2))(Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D., to 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Statute of Limitations. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Part two of Oppos to SJ Statute Limit)(Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 77 Stipulation filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, LDS Social Services. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SES)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO PERMIT JACK ONEFREY TO ENTER UNITED STATES FOR DEPOSITION by parties. (Nash, Marcus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 75 Stipulation filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SES)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Permit LoHolt to Enter for Deposition by parties. (Nash, Marcus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental DECLARATION of Michael T. Pfau filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D. re 61 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D., TO RESPONSE to 61 MOTION to Compel (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by parties. (Foley, Joan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Marcus B. Nash filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 61 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Nash, Marcus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE, by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, to 61 MOTION to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Marcus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Marcus B. Nash filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Statute of Limitations, 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F-1# 7 Exhibit F-2# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J)(Nash, Marcus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Barbara Searle filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Statute of Limitations, 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Nash, Marcus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Statute of Limitations by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 2/3/2006.Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Marcus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 2/3/2006.Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Marcus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 63 Motion for Leave to file overlength brief. The following MINUTE ORDER is made at the direction of the Court and by the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez: Defendants have filed a Motion for Leave to File an Overlength Brief for its Consolidated Motion for Summary Judgment. (Dkt. #63). Pursuant to Local Rule CR 7(f), defendants have requested seven additional pages, for a total of 31 pages. Having reviewed defendants' motion, and the balance of the record, the Court finds good cause to GRANT defendants' motion to file an overlength brief. Pursuant to Local Rule CR 7(f)(4), plaintiffs shall also be allowed seven additional pages for their response to defendants' consolidated motion for summary judgment. Defendants' reply brief "shall not exceed one-half the total length" of plaintiffs' brief. Local Rule CR 7(f)(4).(SES) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 1/5/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Marcus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Michael T. Pfau filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D. re 61 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of 2)(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D.. Noting Date 1/13/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Continue deadlines for dispositive motions and for mediation by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed MOTION to Continue Dispositive Motion and Mediation Deadlines by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 11/30/2005. (Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER striking 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(MKB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D., TO RESPONSE to 50 MOTION to Compel (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Marcus B. Nash filed by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 50 MOTION to Compel (Bolasina, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE, by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, to 50 MOTION to Compel. (Bolasina, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Jon Conte PhD served on 10/12/05. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Stuart Greenberg PhD served on 10/7/05. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRAECIPE with proposed order attached re 50 MOTION to Compel. (Menely, Michelle) Modified text on 10/11/2005 (RS, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Michael Pfau re 50 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Kenneth Fleming. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Kenneth Fleming. Noting Date 10/28/2005. (Menely, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kevin Boren on 10/13/04 by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe.(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brad J. Keller on 10/14/05 by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe.(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting pltfs' 37 Motion for issuance of letters rogatory by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (Attachments: # 1 letter rogatory signed by Judge Martinez)(RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Kathryn Wheeler served on 9/21/05. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Christina Threlkeld served on 9/20/05. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF AMENDED DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Dan Fleming served on 9/17/05. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Conrad Fred Sodenkamp Jr served on 9/19/05. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Robert Shephard served on 9/8/05. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Bishop F. Rex Johansen served on 9/4/05. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Thomas Manning Jr, Brian Gross, Yvonne Shephard, Bishop Phillip Coleman, Faye Miller, Jack Gaines Sr served on 9/7/05. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Steven T. Reich re 37 MOTION to Take Deposition from Jack "Loholt" Onefrey, 38 Praecipe to attach Document by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of declaration)(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRAECIPE to attach document (Proposed Order) re 37 MOTION to Take Deposition from Jack "Loholt" Onefrey by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D.. (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for letters rogatory re taking a Deposition from Jack "Loholt" Onefrey by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D.. Noting Date 9/26/2005. (Pfau, Michael) Text Modified on 9/16/2005 (RS, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 34 Motion to Amend case schedule re mediation. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.Mediation deadline is now set for December 16, 2005.(CM )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Thomas D. Frey filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 34 Agreed MOTION to Amend 23 Scheduling Order,, (Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION to Amend 23 Scheduling Order,, by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, R.K., T.D.. Noting Date 5/11/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint by LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.(Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 30 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Fleming and Doe's Answers to First Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, (Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Marcus B. Nash filed by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 30 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Fleming and Doe's Answers to First Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs Fleming and Doe's Answers to First Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 4/29/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants, filed by Kenneth Fleming, John Doe.(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 9 defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Punitive Damages Claim is signed by Judge Ricardo Martinez.(MKB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 24 Motion to Amend Complaint is signed by Judge Ricardo Martinez. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint no later than (10) days from the date of this order. (MKB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE, by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, to 24 MOTION to Amend Complaint. (Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Michael T. Pfau filed by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe re 24 MOTION to Amend Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Complaint by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe. Noting Date 3/25/2005. (Pfau, Michael) Text Modified on 3/16/2005 (RS, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial reset for 4/10/2006 09:00 AM before Hon. Ricardo Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 3/18/2005; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/7/2005; Motions due by 10/7/2005; Discovery completed by 10/31/2005; Dispositive motions due by 11/30/2005; 39.1 Mediation to be completed by 5/27/2005; Motions in Limine due by 3/13/2006; Pretrial Order due by 3/29/2006; Trial briefs and exhibits to be submitted by 4/5/2006; Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 4/5/2006; Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 4/5/2006 by Judge Ricardo Martinez. (LW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from attorneys for defendants re continuance of trial. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from plaintiffs' attorneys requesting telephonic status conf with Judge to discuss adjustment in trial date. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from attorneys for dfts requesting continuance of trial date. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/6/2006 09:00 AM before Hon. Ricardo Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 3/18/2005; Expert Witness Disclosure due by 9/7/2005; Motions due by 10/7/2005; Discovery due by 10/31/2005; Dispositive motions due by 11/30/2005; 39.1 Mediation to be completed by 5/27/2005; Motions in Limine due by 2/6/2006; Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2006; Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/1/2006; Voir dire/jury instructions due by 3/1/2006; Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 3/1/2006 by Judge Ricardo Martinez. (LW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Phillip Coleman served on 2/7/05. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Dorothy Kelly served on 2/6/05. (RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by all parties. Est. Trial Days: 20 days by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe, Kenneth Fleming, John Doe.(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe.(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY, filed by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, TO RESPONSE to 9 MOTION to Dismiss Punitive Damage Claims Under CR12(b)(6) (Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Kenneth Fleming re 11 Response to Motion, 12 Declaration,,. (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Timothy D. Kosnoff in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Fleming re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Punitive Damage Claims Under CR12(b)(6) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint# 2 Exhibit Gerdes Editorial# 3 Exhibit Voris Editorial# 4 Exhibit McKay Editorial# 5 Exhibit Davis Editorial# 6 Exhibit Smith Editorial# 7 Exhibit Hale Dep# 8 Exhibit Ludlow Editorial# 9 Exhibit Liddell Dep# 10 Exhibit Helps for Leaders# 11 Exhibit Handbook# 12 Exhibit Helpline Intake Form# 13 Exhibit Liddell Affidavit# 14 Exhibit Morman Corp Empire# 15 Exhibit Morman America)(Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Kenneth Fleming, to 9 MOTION to Dismiss Punitive Damage Claims Under CR12(b)(6). (Pfau, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Marcus B. Nash filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Fleming, Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Punitive Damage Claims Under CR12(b)(6) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit pp 4-17# 2 Exhibit pp. 18-34)(Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Punitive Damage Claims Under CR12(b)(6) by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Noting Date 1/7/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Frey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2005; by Judge Ricardo Martinez. (LC, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.(RS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Kenneth Fleming, John Doe. (LT, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 2 Verification of State Court, 3 Notice 4 Certification 1 Notice of Removal,. (PM, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATION RE SERVICE OF re 1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (PM, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (PM, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (PM, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants LDS Social Services, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints from King County Superior Court, case number 04-2-33910-3KNT. (Receipt # 318826) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PM, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?