Blue Nile Inc v. ICE.com Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:06-cv-01002

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 25, 2019 at 8:06 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Blue, Nile, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M Thomas , +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 jthomas@gordontilden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca S Engrav +1 206 359 8000 +1 206 359 7168 REngrav@perkinscoie.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L. McDougall , +1 206 359 8000 +1 206 359 9000 EMcDougall@perkinscoie.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Breena Michelle Roos +1 206 359 6225 +1 206 359 7225 broos@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Odimo Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Christensen O'Connor Johnson Kindness PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William David Shenk +1 206 682 8100 +1 206 695 1626 david.shenk@cojk.com
v.
No Logo Ice.com, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CALFO EAKES & OSTROVSKY, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angelo J Calfo +1 206 294 7440 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoeakes.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/30/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY Stellman Keehnel +1 206 839 4800 stellman.keehnel@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarmuth Wilsdon PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy E. Roller +1 206 516 3800 +1 206 516 3888 jroller@yarmuth.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lyle A Tenpenny +1 206 516 3800 ltenpenny@yarmuth.com
No Logo Odimo Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Christensen O'Connor Johnson Kindness PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William David Shenk +1 206 682 8100 +1 206 695 1626 david.shenk@cojk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Microsoft Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven P Fricke +1 425 882 8080 steven.fricke@microsoft.com
No Logo Blue, Nile, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M Thomas , +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 jthomas@gordontilden.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 stipulation
STIPULATION for Dismissal of Action by parties. (Engrav, Rebecca)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
    ORDER granting in part and denying in part dft Ice.com's 24 Motion to Dismiss claims preempted by the copyright act by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 LetterCourt Filing
      Letter from US District Judge Robert S. Lasnik re 37 Proposed Confidentiality Agreement: the Court declines to sign the proposed Stipulated Protective Order. (LT, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
        STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Answer Counterclaims: Plaintiff Blue Nile, Inc. shall have an extension of time until January 31, 2007 to answer Odimo's counterclaism, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LT, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 stipulation
          STIPULATION of Confidentiality Agreement and Stipulated Protective Order Relating to the Transaction Whereby Ice.com Acquired Odimo's Diamond and Jewelry Business by parties. (Fricke, Steven)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 stipulation
            STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER ODIMO INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS by parties. (Engrav, Rebecca)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
              STIPULATION AND ORDER extending to December 18, 2006, the time for Plaintiff to answer Odimo's counterclaims, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LT, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 stipulation
                STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer Odimo's Counterclaims by parties re 26 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim. (McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/24/2006, Entered: 11/24/2006 Reply to Response to motion
                  REPLY, filed by Defendant ICE.com Inc, TO RESPONSE to 24 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Preempted by the Copyright Act (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tenpenny, Lyle)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/24/2006, Entered: 11/24/2006 Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates
                    MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 3-5 days. Jury Trial is set for 10/1/2007 at 09:00 AM before Hon Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 12/22/2006; Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2007; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/4/2007; Discovery completed by 6/3/2007; Dispositive motions due by 7/3/2007; Settlement conference to be held by 8/2/2007; 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/1/2007; Motions in Limine due by 9/3/2007; Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2007; Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/26/2007; Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/26/2007; (KERR, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Joint Status Report
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by all parties. Est. Trial Days: 3-5. (McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Response to motion
                        RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Blue Nile Inc, Counter Defendant Blue Nile Inc, to 24 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Preempted by the Copyright Act. (Attachments: # 1)(Thomas, Jeffrey)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Notice of Attorney Association
                          NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Jeffrey M Thomas on behalf of Plaintiff Blue Nile Inc, Counter Defendant Blue Nile Inc (Thomas, Jeffrey)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 LetterCourt Filing
                            Letter from Judge Lasnik to parties re 27 Proposed Stipulation; the court declines to sign the proposed stipulation and order. (RS, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 stipulation
                              STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT by parties. (Shenk, William)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Answer to amended complaint
                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Blue Nile Inc by Odimo Inc.(Shenk, William)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006 Order on Motion To Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting 22 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorneys Angelo J. Calfo, Lyle A Tenpenny, and Jeremy E Roller for Defendant ICE.com Inc. Attorney Stellman Keehnel terminated, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(LT, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                    MOTION to Dismiss Claims Preempted by the Copyright Act by Defendant ICE.com Inc. Noting Date 11/24/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 through 3# 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service)(Calfo, Angelo)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Joint Status Report OrderCourt Filing
                                      AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/21/2006; by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                        STIPULATED MOTION and Proposed Order to Substitute Attorney by Defendant ICE.com Inc. Noting Date 10/25/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Calfo, Angelo) Modified duplicative text on 10/26/2006 (ECS, ).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Ice.com to respond to amended complaint, etc by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 stipulation
                                            STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Ice.com to Respond to Amended Complaint and taking off calendar by parties re 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint. (Keehnel, Stellman)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Defendant ICE.com Inc. Noting Date 10/24/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(Keehnel, Stellman)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint: Defendant Odimo Inc. shall have to and including November 13, 2006 to respond to the complaint in this action, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LT, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Notice of appearance
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stellman Keehnel on behalf of Defendant ICE.com Inc (Keehnel, Stellman)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 stipulation
                                                    STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by parties. (Shenk, William)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend time to 10/10/06 to respond to complaint by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 stipulation
                                                        STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by parties. (Shenk, William)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint: Defendant Odimo Inc. shall have to and including October 4, 2006 to respond to the complaint in this action, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LT, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 stipulation
                                                            STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by parties. (Shenk, William)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/2/06 to File Answer re 3 Amended Complaint filed by Odimo Inc, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006 Joint Status Report OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2006; by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 3 Amended Complaint by Defendant Odimo Inc. Noting Date 9/25/2006. (Shenk, William)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Notice of appearance
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William David Shenk on behalf of Defendant Odimo Inc (Shenk, William)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint on Ice.com by Plaintiff Blue Nile Inc on 8/3/2006 (McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                        ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint on Odimo Inc. by Plaintiff Blue Nile Inc on 8/15/2006 (McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Praecipe for a Summons
                                                                          PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Blue Nile Inc. Clerk issued. (RS, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Praecipe for a Summons
                                                                            PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 3 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Blue Nile Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Summons# 2 Summons)(McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Amended Complaint
                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants, filed by Blue Nile Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit pages 16-24)(McDougall-Tural, Elizabeth)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Plaintiff. (MKB)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Complaint
                                                                                  COMPLAINT against defendants Ice.com Inc., and Odimo, Inc (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # SEA 2612) , filed by Blue Nile Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MKB)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 18 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?