Rinde v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00348

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 1:43 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rob Rinde, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Kosnoff +1 206 257 3590 tim@kosnoff.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Pfau +1 206 462 4334 +1 206 623 3624 michael@pcvalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 2100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle A Menely +1 206 676 7500 +1676757 +16 676 7575 mmenely@gth-law.com
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Cooper Gordon +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 cgordon@gordontilden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Rosenberger +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 mrosenberger@gordontilden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey I Tilden +1 206 467 6477 jtilden@gordontilden.com
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS re 18 Stipulation filed by Rob Rinde, by Judge James L. Robart. (TS, )
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007
    STIPULATION for FRCP 41(a) Dismissal Without Prejudice and Without Costs by parties. (Menely, Michelle)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007
      RESPONSE, by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, to 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pursuant to GR2(g)(4)(A). (Gordon, Charles)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007
        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pursuant to GR2(g)(4)(A) by Plaintiff Rob Rinde. Noting Date 7/26/2007.(Menely, Michelle)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Court Filing
          STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 Stipulation re: Expert Witness Disclosure filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/8/2007 and Defendant shall disclose its anticipated expert testimony pursuant FRCP 26(a)(2) as currently scheduled for 11/8/07,by Judge James L. Robart. (MD, )
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007
            STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re Expert Witness Disclosure by parties re 11 Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates,,,. (Gordon, Charles)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA upon Pierce County Sheriff's Office served on 6/4/2007. (TS, )
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007
                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA upon King County Sheriff's Office Served on 5/30/2007. (TS, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Court Filing
                  MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES, AND DESIGNATING CASE FOR MEDIATION; Length of Trial: *10 days*. Mediation shall be completed no later than thirty (30) days prior to the trial date. Jury Trial is set for 5/6/2008 at 09:00 AM before James L. Robart.,Joinder of Parties due by 8/21/2007,Amended Pleadings due by 11/8/2007,Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/8/2007,Motions due by 12/10/2007,Discovery completed by 1/7/2008,Dispositive motions due by 2/6/2008,Settlement conference to be held by 3/7/2008,39.1 mediation to be completed by 4/7/2008,Motions in Limine due by 4/8/2008,Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2008, Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2008 at 02:00 PM before James L. Robart.,Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/28/2008,Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 4/28/2008 by Judge James L. Robart. (CC, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties;. (Pfau, Michael)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007
                      INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Plaintiff Rob Rinde.(Menely, Michelle)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007
                        NOTICE of Change of Address of Attorney Michael Rosenberger. Filed by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Rosenberger, Michael)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Court Filing
                          ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENTJoint Status Report due by 5/21/2007,FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/7/2007.,Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/21/2007. by Judge James L. Robart. (CC, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007
                            VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Page 7 - 50# 2 Page 51 - 100# 3 Page 101 - 150# 4 Page 151 - 200# 5 Page 201 - 250# 6 Page 251 - 300# 7 Page 301 - 350# 8 Page 351 - 400# 9 Page 401 - 450# 10 Page 451 - 500# 11 Page 501 - 550# 12 Page 551 - 600# 13 Page 601- 650# 14 Page 651 - 706)(Rosenberger, Michael)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007
                              DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Rob Rinde. (Pfau, Michael)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007
                                Letter from Clerk to counsel re removal of case from state court and advising of district court case number, judge assignment, jury demand and motion noting requirements.. (PM, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re 2 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff 1 Notice of Removal. (PM, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007
                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO PLAINTIFF ; filed by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (PM, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007
                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 06-2-09825-1 SEA; (Receipt # SEA 7796), filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PM, )
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?