Simmonds v. Goldman Sachs Group Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-01587
District Judge James L. Robart, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vanessa Simmonds, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey I Tilden +1 206 467 6477 jtilden@gordontilden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A Wilner +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 mwilner@gordontilden.com
v.
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman Sachs & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan P McBride +1 206 223 7000 mcbrider@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J. Meenaghan +1 206 223 7000 meenaghanb@lanepowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Unknown Role, Peloton Resources Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan P McBride +1 206 223 7000 mcbrider@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J. Meenaghan +1 206 223 7000 meenaghanb@lanepowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Coviello +1 212 455 7524 jcoviello@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. Ichel +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 dichel@stblaw.com
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Martin Jones
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin J Stone
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
OPINION OF USCA (NOT THE MANDATE); AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, AND REMANDED IN PART. (LMK) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
    BILL OF COSTS Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 39(e) by Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.. Noting Date 1/7/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Richard JL Lomuscio for Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co., Goldman Sachs & Co.. (Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
        TIME SCHEDULE ORDER as to 44 Notice of Appeal filed by Goldman Sachs Group Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co., JPMorgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. : Party who filed first appeal shall first brief on cross-appeal by 7/27/09; party who filed second appeal shall file second brief on cross-appeal by 8/26/09; third brief on cross-appeal due 9/25/09.(SA) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
          TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (09-35309) as to 42 Notice of Appeal, filed by Vanessa Simmonds : The schedule is set as follows: Designation of RT for Appellant Vanessa Simmonds due 04/20/2009. Designation of RT for Appellee Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc. and Red Hat, Inc. due 04/30/2009. Transcript order for Appellant Vanessa Simmonds due 05/11/2009. Transcript due for Orig Clerk USDC, Seattle on 06/09/2009. Certificate of record due 05/18/2009. Appellant Vanessa Simmonds opening brief due 07/27/2009. Appellee Goldman Sachs & Co., Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities, Inc. and Appellee Red Hat, Inc. answering brief due 08/25/2009. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (LMK) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
            APPEAL NOTIFICATION packet sent to US Court of Appeals re 44 Notice of CROSS Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Docket)(LMK) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
              REPRESENTATION STATEMENT, by Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., (re: 44 Notice of Appeal.) (Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                Civil Appeals Docketing Statement by Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., to be transmitted by Clerk to Circuit Court of Appeals. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order and Judgment)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF Cross APPEAL (09-35369) by Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs Group Inc, JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Wells, Christopher) Modified on 4/23/2009, add CCA case # (SA). (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                    APPEAL NOTIFICATION packet sent to US Court of Appeals re 42 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Docket)(LMK) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL (09-35309) as to 38 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,, 39 Judgment by Court by Plaintiff Vanessa Simmonds. Filing Fee $455, Receipt number 09810000000001721185. (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement, # 2 Docketing Statement)(Wilner, Mark) Modified on 4/15/2009; added CCA case number (LMK). (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        STIPULATION AND ORDER DENYING CONSOLIDATION FOR APPEAL ONLY (Dkt. #84) by Judge James L. Robart. (Order posted in all related cases)(MD) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Cases for Appeal Only by parties. (Wilner, Mark) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                            JUDGMENT BY COURT (MD) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER DISMISSING CASES RE:(56) Motion to Dismiss; (57) Motion to Dismiss in case 2:07-cv-01549-JLR; (47) Motion to Dismiss in case 2:07-cv-01572-JLR; (33) Motion to Dismiss in case 2:07-cv-01623-JLR; (39) Motion to Dismiss in case 2:07-cv-01654-JLR by Judge James L. Robart.(MD) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: Jeff Tilden, Jeff Thomas, Will Smart; Def Counsel: Barnes Ellis, Judith Welcom, David Kistenbroker, Joni Jacobsen, Ben Stone, Andrew Clubok, Brant Bishop, Chris Wells; CR: Kari McGrath; MOTION HEARING held on 1/16/2009. The court hears argument from counsel on pending motions. The court takes the matter under advisement.(CC) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER RE: Set Oral Argument on (56 in 2:07-cv-01549-JLR) Joint MOTION to Dismiss; (57 in 2:07-cv-01549-JLR) MOTION to Dismiss; (47 in 2:07-cv-01572-JLR) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss; (33 in 2:07-cv-01623-JLR) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss; (39 in 2:07-cv-01654-JLR) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2009 at 09:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion: (56 in 2:07-cv-01549-JLR) Joint MOTION to Dismiss, (57 in 2:07-cv-01549-JLR) MOTION to Dismiss, (47 in 2:07-cv-01572-JLR) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss, (46 in 2:07-cv-01572-JLR) MOTION to Dismiss, (33 in 2:07-cv-01623-JLR) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss, (39 in 2:07-cv-01654-JLR) Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2009 at 09:00 AM before Judge James L. Robart, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Red Hat Inc identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Legg Mason, Inc. for Red Hat Inc. Filed by Defendants Red Hat Inc, T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Legg Mason, Inc..(Stone, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER RE: LIAISON COUNSEL - The court orders as follows: 1. Liaison counsel is the only counsel authorized to file omnibus motions, pleadings or other matters in these coordinated cases; and 2. Service on liaison counsel shall constitute service on all defendants by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
                                          Amended MOTION Underwriter Defendants' Amended Motion for Overlength Brief re (43 in 2:07-cv-01549-JLR) MOTION Leave to File Overlength Brief, (46 in 2:07-cv-01549-JLR) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Leave to File Overlength Brief by Defendants Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Robertson Stephens, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Credit Suisse Group, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, Lehman Brothers Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Bear Stearns & Co Inc, Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/18/2008 (Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                            ORDER re 24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Joseph M McLaughlin for J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD, ) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                              ORDER re 23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS David W Ichel for J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD, ) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                ORDER re 22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Richard JL Lomuscio for Goldman Sachs & Co., by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD, ) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                  ORDER re 21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Matthew Peller for Goldman Sachs & Co., by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD, ) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                    ORDER re 20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Penny Shane for Goldman Sachs & Co., by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD, ) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                      ORDER re 19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS David MJ Rein for Goldman Sachs & Co., by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD, ) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                        ORDER re 18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Gandolfo V DiBlasi for Goldman Sachs & Co., by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD, ) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph M. McLaughlin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001445423. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David W. Ichel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001445412. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard J.L. Lomuscio FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001445398. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew Peller FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001445365. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Penny Shane FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001445361. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David M.J. Rein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001445340. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gandolfo V. DiBlasi FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 09810000000001445314. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: Jeff Tilden, Jeff Thomas, Will Smart, Ian Birk; Def Counsel: Andrew Clubok, Brant Bishop, Christopher Wells; CR: Susan Zielie; STATUS CONFERENCE held April 28, 2008. Underwriter defendants will file one coordinated motion to dismiss and issuer defendants will file one coordinated motion to dismiss. Opening briefs due July 25, 2008; Responsive briefs due Sept. 8,2008; and Reply briefs due Oct. 23,2008, with page limits in compliance with Local Rules. These cases will be coordinated for pretrial purposes using case no. 07-1549 as the master docket. The parties should familiarize themselves with the CM/ECF upgrades. The parties agree to a stay of discovery pending the courts decision on the motion to dismiss. Jeff Thomas shall act as liaison counsel for plaintiff and Christopher Wells, Andrew Clubok and Brant Bishop will act as liaison counsel for Underwriter defendants. Issuer defendants agree to promptly notify the court of their chosen liaison counsel. There shall be no further amendments to the complaints or additional parties added without first seeking leave of court. Liaison counsel for the Underwriter defendants agree to keep the court apprised of the status of the New York "IPO litigation." (CC) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          ORDER re 14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS as pro hac vice atty for Defendant J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD, Correct case no. is C07-1587JLR) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            AMENDMENT Notice of Appearance by Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.. (Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey Coviello FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 1422783. (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Application Form)(Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties; estimated Trial Days: 20.. (Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher Brian Wells on behalf of Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.. (Wells, Christopher) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by counsel for Goldman, Sachs & Co. on behalf of Plaintiff Vanessa Simmonds on 03/12/08. (Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. mailed on 2/29/2008 (Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT For Recovery of Short-Swing Profits Under Section 16(b) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 against defendant(s) Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Red Hat Inc with JURY DEMAND, filed by Vanessa Simmonds.(Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          ORDER/APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joni S Jacobsen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Red Hat Inc by Joni Sue Jacobsen. (Receipt No. SEA15718). (MD, ) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            ORDER/APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David H Kistenbroker FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Red Hat Inc by David Kistenbroker. (Receipt No. SEA15718). (MD, ) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J Stone on behalf of Defendant Red Hat Inc. (Stone, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/22/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT. Status Conference set for 4/28/2008 at 01:30 PM before James L. Robart, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD, ) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE Plaintiffs Withdrawal of Motion to Consolidate Related Cases for Pretrial Proceedings re Docket Annotation ; filed by Plaintiff Vanessa Simmonds. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Red Hat Inc mailed on 1/11/2008 (Thomas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER by Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Honorable Thomas S. Zilly transfers the above captioned case as related to C07-1549JLR to the Honorable James L. Robart for all further proceedings. All futurepleadings shall bear the cause number C07-1587JLR. (CL, ) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT FOR RECOVERY OF SHORT-SWING PROFITS - JURY DEMAND against all defendants (Summons(es) NOT issued)(Receipt # SEA12510), filed by Vanessa Simmonds. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Transmittal email)(MKB) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 188 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?