USA v. Wisconsin Electric Power Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00371
District Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 27, 2016 at 7:52 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Benjamin Fisherow +1 202 514 4628 +5144 514 514 4180
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven M Biskupic +1 312 222 0800 smbiskupic@michaelbest.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew V Richmond +1 414 297 1700 +1 414 297 4394 matthew.richmond@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arnold S Rosenthal +1 202 514 3446 arnold.rosenthal@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole Veilleux +1 202 616 8746 +1 202 514 8395 nicole.veilleux@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Wisconsin Electric Power Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP (Indianapolis)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E Conley +1 414 277 5609 +1 414 271 3552 daniel.conley@quarles.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel A Schneider +1 414 277 5829 +1 414 978 8829 rschneider@quarles.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WE Energies

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan H Martin +1 414 221 2712 +1 414 221 2139
No Logo Citizens Utility Board, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wisconsin Energy Conservation Corp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Edgar
No Logo Clean Wisconsin, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGillivray Westerberg & Bender LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela R McGillivray +1 608 310 3560 +1 608 256 0933 mcgillivray@mwbattorneys.com
No Logo Michael A Cox, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Michigan Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil David Gordon +1 571 373 7540 gordonn1@michigan.gov
No Logo Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MI Dept Attorney General (ENRA-Lansing)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil David Gordon +1 571 373 7540 gordonn1@michigan.gov
No Logo Sierra Club, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sanjay Narayan +1 406 586 9699 +5869 586 586 9695

Toggle Switch Represented by Sierra Club Legal Defense Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce E Nilles +1 608 257 4994 +1 608 257 3513
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joanne Marie Spalding +1 415 977 5725 joanne.spalding@sierraclub.org
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 7413(b)
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (124) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Order Approving Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Consent Decree
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Alter Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 120 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          SECOND AMENDED CONSENT DECREE signed by Chief Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr on 1/18/12. (cc: all counsel)(kah)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
            ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Modify Paragraph 96 of the Amended Consent Decree 117 . (cc: all counsel) ((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M Knepel on behalf of USA. Attorney(s) appearing: Susan M. Knepel (Knepel, Susan)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION to Modify Amended Consent Decree by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Veilleux, Nicole)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 116 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  AMENDED CONSENT DECREE signed by Judge Charles N Clevert Jr on 10/1/07. (cc: all counsel)(kah)
                    LREF
                    Blank 115 Filed: 9/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                    DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Charles N Clevert Jr on 9/30/07 granting 36 Motion for Entry of an Order. (cc: all counsel) (kah) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None
                      Docket Annotation: Letters now attached to doc. 109. (Attachments: # 1 Letter) (kah)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew V Richmond on behalf of USA. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew V. Richmond (Richmond, Matthew)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None
                          PDF Document Requirement form (SECOND NOTICE) sent to Nicole Veilleux and W Benjamin Fisherow regarding Letter filed on 5/7/07. (kah)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                            LETTER from the Court to W. Benjamin Fisherow. (cc: All Counsel) ((mj), C. N. CLEVERT, JR.)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                              PDF Document Requirement form sent to Nicole Veilleux and W. Benjamin Fisherow regarding Letters filed on 5/2/07. (kah)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                LETTER from Nicole Veilleux re: 4/2/07 letter she suspects the court did not receive. (kah) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2007 (kah).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Clean Wisconsin (McGillivray, Pamela)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
                                    LETTER from Intervenors (McGillivray, Pamela)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wisconsin Electric Power Company (Conley, Daniel)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        LETTER from Dan Conley to Judge Clevert (Attachments: # 1 letter agreement)(Conley, Daniel)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER signed by Judge Charles N Clevert Jr on 3/27/2006 denying 93 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing on matters related to supplemental filings. (cc: all counsel) ((mj), C. N. CLEVERT, JR.) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER signed by Judge Charles N Clevert Jr on 3/7/2006 granting 84 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages . (cc: all counsel) ((mj), C. N. CLEVERT, JR.) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wisconsin Electric Power Company (Oehler, Richard)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                LETTER from Defendant w/Attachment (Attachments: # 1)(Oehler, Richard)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wisconsin Electric Power Company (Oehler, Richard)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                    LETTER from Defendant w/attachments (Attachments: # 1 Att 1# 2 Att 2 part 1 of 2# 3 Att 2 part 2 of 2# 4 Att 3)(Oehler, Richard)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wisconsin Electric Power Company for Doc. No. 97 (Schneider, Rachel)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                        BRIEF in Opposition re 93 MOTION for Hearing on Matters Related to the Supplemental Findings filed by Wisconsin Electric Power Company. (Schneider, Rachel)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA (kah, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 93 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing on Matters Related to the Supplemental Filings filed by USA. (kah, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION of Joanne Spalding (kah, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                Rule 7.4 Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing on Matters Related to Supplemental Filings by Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michael A Cox, Citizens Utility Board, Clean Wisconsin, Sierra Club. (kah, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address as to Sierra Club Atty Bruce Nilles (kah, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    LETTER from Richard Oehler to Judge Clevert asking the court to not schedule a hearing during the time period of April 6-18, 2005. (kah, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                      Supplemental RESPONSE to Intervenor Pltfs Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Entry of the Proposed Amended Consent Decree filed by USA - (FILED IN PAPER FORMAT; SEE FILE). (kah, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          DECLARATION of Richard W. Oehler - (IN PAPER FORMAT; SEE FILE) (kah, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            DECLARATION of Terry L. Coughlin - (FILED IN PAPER FORMAT; SEE FILE) (kah, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE to Intervenors Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Entry of Proposed Amended Consent Decree filed by Wisconsin Electric Power Company - (FILED IN PAPER FORMAT; SEE FILE). (kah, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  Rule 7.4 Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Wisconsin Electric Power Company. (kah, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER signed by Judge Charles N Clevert Jr on 02/23/05 granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time: IT IS ORDERED that any responses to Intervenors Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Entry of Proposed Consent Decree shall be filed by 03/14/05 . (cc: all counsel) (kah, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA (kah, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        Unopposed Rule 7.4 Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Intervenors Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Entry of the Proposed Amended Consent Decree by USA. (kah, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Pamela R. McGillivray (kah, ) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Citizens Utility Board, Clean Wisconsin, Sierra Club (kah, ) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                              DECLARATION of David L. Macintosh in Support of the Supplemental Brief in Opposition to the Proposed Amended Consent Decree (kah, ) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                DECLARATION of J Phyllis Fox (kah, ) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Supplemental BRIEF in Opposition re 36 MOTION for Entry of Proposed Amended Consent Decree filed by Citizens Utility Board, Clean Wisconsin, Sierra Club. (kah, ) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER Modifying in part the court's September 28, 2004, decision and order signed by Judge Charles N Clevert Jr on 1/14/2005. Intervenors' supplemental brief in oppostion to proposed Amended Consent Decree due 2/8/05; andy response due 2/28/2005. (cc: all counsel)((mj), C. N. CLEVERT, JR.) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wisconsin Electric Power Company for Doc. #73 (Schneider, Rachel)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                        STIPULATION of the Parties to a Modification of the Court's September 28, 2004 Order (Doc. #69) by Wisconsin Electric Power Company (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Modifying in Part Doc. #69)(Schneider, Rachel)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND ADOPTING AS PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION signed by Judge Charles N Clevert Jr on 12/15/04: IT IS ORDERED that the stipulation is approved and adapted as an order of the court, except for paragraph 7 to the extent that it is inconsistent with the court's Case Management Procedures. (cc: all counsel)(kah, ) (Entered: 12/16/2004)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Citizens Utility Board, Clean Wisconsin, Michael A Cox, Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Sierra Club, Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STIPULATION REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Citizens Utility Board, Clean Wisconsin, Michael A Cox, Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Sierra Club, Wisconsin Electric Power Company - SEE Stipulation for Details. (kah, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                DECISION & ORDER signed by Judge Charles N Clevert Jr on 09/28/04: IT IS ORDERED that intervenors 51 Motion to Stay is granted; FURTHER ORDERED that the intervenors shall undertake limited discovery relating to the scope of the alleged violations at the Valley and Presque Isle plants; all discovery shall be completed by 12/23/04; FURTHER ORDERED that the Intervenors shall present their relevant findings in the form of a supplemental brief in opposition to the proposed amended consent decree by 01/17/05; any response to be filed by 02/04/05; a hearing, if necessary, will be scheduled soon thereafter; FURTHER ORDERED that 58 Motion for Leave to File deft's reply to intervenors response to the motion to enter proposed amended consent decree and opposition to intervenors motion for stay in excess of the page limit is granted. (cc: all counsel) (kah, ) (Entered: 09/29/2004)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Pltf's Motion for Order of Entry of Amended Consent Decree held on 08/17/04 before Judge Charles N. Clevert. Court Reporter: Cynthia M. Bohman (kah, ) - (IN JUDGES FILE)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on 36 MOTION for Entry of amended consent decree, 51 MOTION to Stay: Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2004 10:00 AM in Courtroom 222 before Judge Charles N Clevert Jr. (cc: all counsel)(kah, ) (Entered: 08/04/2004)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA (kah, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Letter REQUEST by USA for the court to hold another status conference. (kah, )
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          LETTER from Wisconsin Electric re: Motion to Enter Proposed Amended Consent Decree. (kah, )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            LETTER from counsel for the USA re: scheduling of a hearing on pltf's pending motion. (kah, ) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY BRIEF in Support re 51 MOTION to Stay filed by Citizens Utility Board, Clean Wisconsin, Sierra Club. (kah, ) (Entered: 12/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING USA'S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT signed by Judge Charles N Clevert Jr on 12/15/03: IT IS ORDERED that the Court hereby GRANTS 56 Motion for Leave to exceed page limit. (cc: all counsel) (kah, ) (Entered: 12/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, ) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ....BRIEF in Opposition re 51 MOTION to Stay filed by Wisconsin Electric Power Company. (kah, ) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Rule 7.4 Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit by Wisconsin Electric Power Company. (kah, ) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ...BRIEF in Opposition re 51 MOTION to Stay filed by USA. (kah, )
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by USA. (kah, )
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Citizens Utility Board, Clean Wisconsin, Sierra Club (kah, ) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Eric Olson in Support of Motion to Stay (kah, ) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of David L. Macintosh, Sc.D in Support of Motion to Stay (kah, ) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ...BRIEF in Support re 51 MOTION to Stay filed by Citizens Utility Board, Clean Wisconsin, Sierra Club. (kah, ) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay by Citizens Utility Board, Clean Wisconsin, Sierra Club. (kah, ) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ORIGINAL DOCUMENT re 27 Declaration of Michael Prausa. (kah, ) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, ) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint of Clean Wisconsin, Sierra Club, and Citizens Utility Board by Wisconsin Electric Power Company.(kah, ) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            ORIGINAL DOCUMENT re 29 Declaration of Dennis Dums. (kah, ) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Citizens Utility Board, Clean Wisconsin, Sierra Club.(kah, ) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                DECISION & ORDER signed by Judge Charles N Clevert Jr on 11/3/03: IT IS ORDERED that Clean Wisconsin's, Sierra Club's and Citizens Utility Board's 23 Motion to Intervene is granted; the intervenor applicants complaint, attached to Doc. #23, is filed instanter; any answer or responsive pleading to the intervenor applicants complaint to be filed by 11/17/03; FURTHER ORDERED that Clean Wisconsin, Sierra Club and Citizens Utility Board file a brief responding to the proposed amended consent decree by 11/24/03; any reply to the intervenors brief must be filed by 12/8/03; after all submissions have been reviewed, the court will schedule a hearing; FURTHER ORDERED that the 40 Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit is granted. (cc: all counsel) (kah, ) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, ) (Entered: 10/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Intervene filed by Defendant Wisconsin Electric Power Company; deft DOES NOT OPPOSE this motion. (kah, ) (Entered: 10/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff USA (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Intervene filed by Plaintiff USA. (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by Plaintiff USA. (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by W Benjamin Fisherow on behalf of USA. (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ATTACHMENTS to the Brief in Support of the United States Motion to Enter Proposed Amended Consent Decree by Plaintiff USA. (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF in Support re 36 MOTION to Enter Proposed Amended Consent Decree filed by Plaintiff USA. (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Enter Amended Consent Decree as the Order of this Court by Plaintiff USA. (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Proceedings held on 06/26/03 before Judge Clevert. Court Reporter: Cynthia Bohman (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CORRECTED BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Clean Wisconsin's, Sierra Club's, and Citizens Utility Board's Motion to Intervene filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Citizens Utility Board, Clean Wisconsin, Sierra Club. (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter REQUEST by Plaintiff USA for the 10/9/03 hearing to be rescheduled. (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intervenor Plaintiffs Citizens Utility Board, Clean Wisconsin, Sierra Club (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Bruce Nilles (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Eric Uram (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION (copy) of Dennis Dums (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of John Rebers (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION (copy) of Michael Prausa (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Marcus Looze (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Interest by Intervenor Plaintiff Sierra Club (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF in Support re 23 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Citizens Utility Board, Clean Wisconsin, Sierra Club. (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor pltfs Sierra Club, Clean Wisconsin, Citizens Utility Board w/attached Proposed Intervenor Applicants Complaint (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION OF MICHAEL A COX, ATTY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, EX REL. MICHIGAN DEPT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY filed by Michael A Cox, Michigan Department of Environmental Quality.(kah, ) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN AND THE UNITED STATES SEEKING INTERVENTION BY THE STATE OF MICHIGAN signed by Judge Charles N Clevert on 07/21/03: IT IS ORDERED that 18 Motion to Intervene is granted; FURTHER ORDERED the Complaint in Intervention submitted with the Joint Motion shall be filed instanter . (cc: all counsel) (kah, ) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED Amended Consent Decree filed by Plaintiff USA, Defendant Wisconsin Electric Power Company, Movants Michigan Department of Environmental Quality, Michael A Cox (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Amended Consent Decree by Plaintiff USA (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION of the State of Michigan and the USA Seeking Intervention by the State of Michigan by Plaintiff USA, Movant Michael A Cox, Movant Michigan Department of Environmental Quality. (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles N Clevert : Status Conference held on 6/26/2003; pltf has extended the time for public comment on the consent decree; pltf intends to file an application to intervene on behalf of the State of Michigan and simultaneously file a proposed amended consent decree; pltfs filings will restart the 30 day comment period; once comments have been received, pltf anticipates any revisions to the proposed amended consent decree can be made within 30 days; A tentative hearing on the proposed amended consent decree set for 10/9/2003 09:00 AM before Judge Charles N Clevert. (Court Reporter Cynthia Bohman) (kah, ) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER from William J. Lavelette re: the consent decree. (kah, ) (Entered: 06/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from Steven Bulik, Coordinator with Citizens for Responsible Power, to Thomas Skinner, Regional Administrator for the US Environmental Protection Agency, Region 5, re: the proposed Consent Decree. (kah, ) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, ) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Interest by Defendant Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, ) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel A Schneider, Daniel E Conley on behalf of Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, ) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, ) (Entered: 05/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REFUSAL of Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Defendant Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, ) (Entered: 05/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REFUSAL of Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff USA (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Susan H Martin on behalf of Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W Oehler on behalf of Wisconsin Electric Power Company (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by Plaintiff USA (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED Consent Decree filed by Plaintiff USA (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree by Plaintiff USA (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) against Wisconsin Electric Power Company filed by USA. Consent Forms Distributed for Magistrate Judge A E Goodstein. (kah, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?