TAURUS IP, LLC v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Western District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-00481-bbc
District Judge Barbara B. Crabb, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Barbara B. Crabb
Last Updated February 2, 2017 at 1:08 AM EST (8.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Taurus Ip, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Newton +1 214 922 3400 +1 214 922 3899 mike.newton@alston.com

Represented by DeWitt Ross & Stevens, SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon P Axelrod +1 608 255 8891 jar@dewittross.com

Represented by Kajeer Yar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kajeer Yar +1 918 292 8158 +1 918 292 8158 kyar@yarlawfirm.com

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vastera, Inc.

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
No Logo Mazda Motor Of America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
No Logo Volvo Cars Of North America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
v.
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Defendant
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vastera, Inc.

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Unikel +1 312 583 2300

Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Burns +1 202 783 0800
Space Gary J Fischman +1 713 787 1400 +1 713 787 1440 fischmang@howrey.com
Space David Brian Fournier +1 312 846 5621 +1 312 264 0366 fournierd@howrey.com
Space Ryan Edward Lindsey +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 lindseyr@howrey.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew John Moore +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 matt.moore@lw.com

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com

Represented by Merchant & Gould, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shane Allen Brunner +1 608 280 6753 +1 608 283 2275 sbrunner@merchantgould.com
No Logo Mazda Motor Of America, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Brian Fournier +1 312 846 5621 +1 312 264 0366 fournierd@howrey.com
Space Ryan Edward Lindsey +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 lindseyr@howrey.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew John Moore +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 matt.moore@lw.com

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
Space Robert Unikel +1 312 583 2300

Represented by Merchant & Gould, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shane Allen Brunner +1 608 280 6753 +1 608 283 2275 sbrunner@merchantgould.com
Space Thomas R. Burns +1 202 783 0800
Space Gary J Fischman +1 713 787 1400 +1 713 787 1440 fischmang@howrey.com
No Logo Volvo Cars Of North America, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Brian Fournier +1 312 846 5621 +1 312 264 0366 fournierd@howrey.com
Space Ryan Edward Lindsey +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 lindseyr@howrey.com

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew John Moore +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 matt.moore@lw.com

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
Space Robert Unikel +1 312 583 2300

Represented by Merchant & Gould, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shane Allen Brunner +1 608 280 6753 +1 608 283 2275 sbrunner@merchantgould.com
Space Thomas R. Burns +1 202 783 0800
No Logo Taurus Ip, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
Other Parties
No Logo Acclaim Financial Group, LLC, Third Party Defendant

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
No Logo Constellation Ip, LLC, Third Party Defendant

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
No Logo ERICH SPANGENBERG, Third Party Defendant

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
No Logo Orion IP, LLC, Third Party Defendant

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
No Logo PLUTUS IP WISCONSIN, LLC, Third Party Defendant

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
No Logo PLUTUS IP, LLC, Third Party Defendant

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Third Party Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vastera, Inc.

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
No Logo Mazda Motor Of America, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
No Logo Volvo Cars Of North America, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of David Pridham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Pridham +1 401 633 7247 +1 401 633 7247 david@PridhamIPLaw.com
Attributes
Office Madison
Filed 8/28/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause No cause code entered
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Dane
Terminated 6/13/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '08-1475'['FEDERAL CIRCUIT']
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
ORDER granting [55] Motion to Vacate final judgment per settlement agreement of the parties. Case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Barbara B Crabb on 10/24/2008. (llj)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008, Terminated: 10/24/2008 Motion to Vacate
Joint MOTION to Vacate Final Judgment by Defendants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., Third Party Defendants ERICH SPANGENBERG, ORION IP, LLC, PLUTUS IP, LLC, PLUTUS IP WISCONSIN, LLC, CONSTELLATION IP, LLC, Acclaim Financial Group, LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., Counter Claimants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., Counter Defendant TAURUS IP, LLC, Plaintiff TAURUS IP, LLC.Response due by 10/17/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Pridham, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 USCA Judgment
JUDGMENT from USCA for the Federal Circuit remanding to District Court so the parties may move the district court to vacate its judgment due to settlement. No record to be returned. (llj)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None USCA Case Number
USCA Case Number 08-1475 for [53] Notice of Appeal filed by TAURUS IP, LLC. (mmo)
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Transmission of Short Record to Seventh Circuit
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Appeal Information Sheet, Docket Sheet and Judgment to US Court of Appeals for the FEDERAL CIRCUIT re [53] Notice of Appeal. (mmo)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL to FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Plaintiff TAURUS IP, LLC as to [52] Judgment. Filing fee of $455 paid, receipt number 225325. No Docketing Statement filed. (Newton, Michael) Modified docket text on 7/7/2008 (Olson, Marlene).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 52 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Judgment*
JUDGMENT of declaratory relief pursuant to stipulation of dismissal and final judgment (#49) in favor of FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. against TAURUS IP, LLC. (BBC / LJ) (llj)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that judgment has been entered in #07-C-158. Court is now prepared to enter judgment in this case. Parties are directed to submit a copy of the proposed judgment. Signed by Judge Barbara B Crabb on 6/4/08. (mmo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [49] Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by TAURUS IP, LLC, CONSTELLATION IP, LLC, PLUTUS IP WISCONSIN, LLC, Acclaim Financial Group, LLC, ERICH SPANGENBERG, PLUTUS IP, LLC, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ORION IP, LLC, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. Signed by Judge Barbara B Crabb on 3/10/08. (mmo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Final Judgment by Defendants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., Third Party Defendants ERICH SPANGENBERG, ORION IP, LLC, PLUTUS IP, LLC, PLUTUS IP WISCONSIN, LLC, CONSTELLATION IP, LLC, Acclaim Financial Group, LLC, Third Party Plaintiffs FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., Counter Claimants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., Counter Defendant TAURUS IP, LLC, Plaintiff TAURUS IP, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Brunner, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
ORDER granting [40] Motion to file answer under seal. Signed by Judge Barbara B Crabb on 2/26/08. (krj)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 47 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Exhibit
Exhibit to [41] Answer to Amended Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Sealed Document). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 16# (2) Exhibit 17# (3) Exhibit 18# (4) Exhibit 19# (5) Exhibit 20# (6) Exhibit 21# (7) Exhibit 22# (8) Exhibit 23# (9) Exhibit 24# (10) Exhibit 25# (11) Exhibit 26# (12) Exhibit 27# (13) Exhibit 28# (14) Exhibit 29# (15) Exhibit 30# (16) Exhibit 31# (17) Exhibit 32) (Brunner, Shane) SUBSTITUTED FOR DOCKET #39.
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 46 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Exhibit
Exhibit to [41] Answer to Amended Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Sealed Document). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 8# (2) Exhibit 9# (3) Exhibit 10# (4) Exhibit 11# (5) Exhibit 12# (6) Exhibit 13# (7) Exhibit 14# (8) Exhibit 15) (Brunner, Shane) SUBSTITUTED FOR DOCKET #39.
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 45 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Exhibit
Exhibit to [41] Answer to Amended Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Sealed Document). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 6 (Part 3 of 3)# (2) Exhibit 7) (Brunner, Shane) SUBSTITUTED FOR DOCKET #39.
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Exhibit
Exhibit to [41] Answer to Amended Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Sealed Document). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 6 (Part 1 of 3)# (2) Exhibit 6 (Part 2 of 3)) (Brunner, Shane) SUBSTITUTED FOR DOCKET #39.
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Exhibit
Exhibit to [41] Answer to Amended Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Sealed Document). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 4# (2) Exhibit 5) (Brunner, Shane) SUBSTITUTED FOR DOCKET #39.
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 42 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Exhibit
Exhibit to [41] Answer to Amended Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Sealed Document). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3) (Brunner, Shane) SUBSTITUTED FOR DOCKET #39.
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
ANSWER to Amended Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against ERICH SPANGENBERG, ORION IP, LLC, PLUTUS IP, LLC, PLUTUS IP WISCONSIN, LLC, CONSTELLATION IP, LLC, Acclaim Financial Group, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Defendants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., Plaintiff TAURUS IP, LLC. (Attachments: # (1)) (Brunner, Shane) (Sealed Document) Modified on 3/3/2008 (Jensen, Lori).
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008, Terminated: 2/27/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
MOTION to Seal Document Answer by Defendants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Brunner, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Corrective Action
CORRECTIVE ACTION: Docket Nos. 36-39 filed incorrectly, please disregard. Documents to be refiled, along with Motion to Seal Answer, Defenses, Counterclaim, Third-Party Complaint. (arw)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008, Terminated: 2/26/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
DISREGARD - INCORRECT EVENT TYPE MOTION to Seal Document [33] Amended Complaint Exhibits 7-32 to Answer, Defenses, Counterclaims, and Complaint (Sealed Document) by Defendants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 7# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 8# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 9# (4) Exhibit Exhibit 10# (5) Exhibit Exhibit 11# (6) Exhibit Exhibit 12# (7) Exhibit Exhibit 13# (8) Exhibit Exhibit 14# (9) Exhibit Exhibit 15# (10) Exhibit Exhibit 16# (11) Exhibit Exhibit 17# (12) Exhibit Exhibit 18# (13) Exhibit Exhibit 19# (14) Exhibit Exhibit 20# (15) Exhibit Exhibit 21# (16) Exhibit Exhibit 22# (17) Exhibit Exhibit 23# (18) Exhibit Exhibit 24# (19) Exhibit Exhibit 25# (20) Exhibit Exhibit 26# (21) Exhibit Exhibit 27# (22) Exhibit Exhibit 28# (23) Exhibit Exhibit 29# (24) Exhibit Exhibit 30# (25) Exhibit Exhibit 31# (26) Exhibit Exhibit 32) (Brunner, Shane) Modified on 2/27/2008 (Jacobson, Kris).
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008, Terminated: 2/26/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
DISREGARD - INCORRECT EVENT TYPE MOTION to Seal Document [33] Amended Complaint Exhibit 6 to Answer, Defenses, Counterclaims and Complaint (Sealed Document) by Defendants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 6 (Part 1 of 3)# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 6 (Part 2 of 3)# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 6 (Part 3 of 3)) (Brunner, Shane)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008, Terminated: 2/26/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
DISREGARD - INCORRECT EVENT TYPE MOTION to Seal Document [33] Amended Complaint Exhibits to Answer, Defenses, Counterclaim and Complaint (Sealed Document) by Defendants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5) (Brunner, Shane)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 36 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008, Terminated: 2/26/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
DISREGARD - INCORRECT EVENT TYPE MOTION to Seal Document [33] Amended Complaint Answer, Defenses, Counterclaims and Complaint (Sealed Document) by Defendants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Brunner, Shane)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Order on Motion for ClarificationCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part [32] Motion for Clarification; page 4 of the 2/4/08 court order corrected to state "In response, Spangenberg sent defendants a list of patents owned by Orion and its affiliates. Among the patents identified, the list included the two patents implicated in the then-pending litigations and the '658 patent." Signed by Judge Barbara B Crabb on 2/21/08. (krj)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Brief in Opposition
BRIEF in Opposition by Defendants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. re: [32] MOTION for Clarification re [31] Order on Motion to Dismiss, and Brief in Support filed by TAURUS IP, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Brunner, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT in accordance with Court's February 5, 2008 Opinion and Order (Docket No. 31) against all defendants, filed by TAURUS IP, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Patent-in-suit# (2) Certificate of Service) (Yar, Kajeer)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008, Terminated: 2/22/2008 Motion for Clarification
MOTION for Clarification re [31] Order on Motion to Dismiss, and Brief in Support by Plaintiff TAURUS IP, LLC.Response due by 2/20/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Yar, Kajeer)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part [8] Motion to Dismiss; motion to dismiss or stay case denied; motion for more definite statement granted. Plaintiff has until 2/14/08 to file amended complaint or present complaint to be dismissed. Signed by Judge Barbara B Crabb on 2/4/08. (krj)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/23/2008 at 09:00 AM. Claims Construction Initial Brief due by 4/24/2008, Claims Construction Response Brief due by 5/15/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 8/22/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker on 2/1/08. (krj) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2008 (Jacobson, Kris).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Telephone Status Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen L Crocker : Telephone Status Conference held on 2/1/2008 [:05] (cak)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Set/Reset Pretrial or Status Conference
Set/Reset Pretrial or Status Conference: Attorney Unikel responsible for setting up the call.Telephone Status Conference set for 2/1/2008 at 11:30 AM. (krj)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Text-Only OrderCourt Filing
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order Granting [27] MOTION for scheduling conference filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker on 1/28/08. (krj)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008, Terminated: 1/28/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION for scheduling conference by Defendants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. Response due by 1/24/2008. (krj)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: 11/23/2007 Text-Only OrderCourt Filing
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order Granting [11] MOTION to Admit Kajeer Yar and Michael J. Newton Pro Hac Vice filed by TAURUS IP, LLC. KAJEER YAR for TAURUS IP, LLC, Michael John Newton for TAURUS IP, LLC admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker on 11/20/07. (elc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/23/2007, Entered: 11/23/2007 Text-Only OrderCourt Filing
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order Granting [18] MOTION to Admit Matthew J. Moore, Ryan E. Lindsey, Thomas R. Burns, Jr., David B. Fournier and Robert W. Unikel Pro Hac Vice filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker on 11/20/07. (elc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Brief in Reply
BRIEF in Reply in Support re: [8] MOTION to Dismiss or stay filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. (elc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Claims Construction Briefing and Scheduling
Scheduling set re: Claims Construction. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/9/2008 09:00 at AM.,Claims Construction Initial Brief due by 3/21/2008.,Claims Construction Response Brief due by 4/18/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker on 11/14/07. (elc)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Robert W. Unikel re: [18] MOTION to Admit Matthew J. Moore, Ryan E. Lindsey, Thomas R. Burns, Jr., David B. Fournier and Robert W. Unikel Pro Hac Vice. (elc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of David B. Fournier re: [18] MOTION to Admit Matthew J. Moore, Ryan E. Lindsey, Thomas R. Burns, Jr., David B. Fournier and Robert W. Unikel Pro Hac Vice. (elc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Ryan E. Lindsey re: [18] MOTION to Admit Matthew J. Moore, Ryan E. Lindsey, Thomas R. Burns, Jr., David B. Fournier and Robert W. Unikel Pro Hac Vice. (elc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Thomas R. Burns re: [18] MOTION to Admit Matthew J. Moore, Ryan E. Lindsey, Thomas R. Burns, Jr., David B. Fournier and Robert W. Unikel Pro Hac Vice. (elc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Mathew J. Moore re: [18] MOTION to Admit Matthew J. Moore, Ryan E. Lindsey, Thomas R. Burns, Jr., David B. Fournier and Robert W. Unikel Pro Hac Vice. (elc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
MOTION to Admit Matthew J. Moore, Ryan E. Lindsey, Thomas R. Burns, Jr., David B. Fournier and Robert W. Unikel Pro Hac Vice by Defendants. (elc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Pretrial Conference OrderCourt Filing
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER -Amendments to Pleadings due by 1/2/2008.,Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2008.,,Motions in Limine due by 12/1/2008.,Response to Motion due by 12/15/2008.,Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2008 04:00 at PM,Final Pretrial Submissions due 12/11/2008,Jury Selection and Trial set for 1/5/2009 at 09:00 AM.,Activity by 11/6/2008 Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L Crocker on 11/14/07. (elc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen L Crocker : Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 11/14/2007 [:18] (cak)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Kajeer Yar re: [8] MOTION to Dismiss filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Sealed Document) (elc)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Brief in Opposition
BRIEF in Opposition by Plaintiff TAURUS IP, LLC re: [8] MOTION to Dismiss filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Sealed Document) (elc)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REPORT by Defendants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., Plaintiff TAURUS IP, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (elc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Michael J. Newton filed by Plaintiff TAURUS IP, LLC re: [11] MOTION to Admit Kajeer Yar and Michael J. Newton Pro Hac Vice filed by TAURUS IP, LLC (rep)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Kajeer Yar filed by Plaintiff TAURUS IP, LLC re: [11] MOTION to Admit Kajeer Yar and Michael J. Newton Pro Hac Vice filed by TAURUS IP, LLC (rep)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007, Terminated: 11/23/2007 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
MOTION to Admit Kajeer Yar and Michael J. Newton Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff TAURUS IP, LLC. (rep)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Affidavit
AFFIDAVIT of Robert Unikel re: [8] MOTION to Dismiss or Stay or Alt. for a more Definite Statement filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. (elc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Brief in Support
BRIEF in Support by Defendants re: [8] MOTION to Dismiss or Stay and Alt. for a more definite statement filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Sealed Document) (elc)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Or Stay Case and Alternatively for a more Definite Statement by Defendants FORD MOTOR COMPANY, MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC., VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, INC.Brief in Opposition due by 11/8/2007.Brief in Reply due by 11/19/2007. (elc)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Jams docket entry
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DAVID PRIDHAM ON BEHALF OF PLTF.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
ORDER GRANTING DEFTS. MAZDA MOTOR AND FORD MOTOR MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; ANSWER DUE 10/18/07. (SLC)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007, Terminated: 9/14/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION (UNOPPOSED) BY DEFTS. MAZDA MOTOR AND FORD MOTOR FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Summons
SUMMONS
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Corporate Disclosure Statement
DISCLOSURE OF CORP. AFFIL. & FINAN. INT. BY PLTF.
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Complaint
COMPLAINT - SUMMONS ISSUED.
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Jams docket entry
JS-44
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Jams docket entry
NORTC ; FEE PAID; NON-RANDOM ASSIGNMENT.
LREF
Blank  Filed: None, Entered: None Jams docket entry
Jams Import Utility Entry
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 118 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?